Roe v. Lynch
Defendant / Appellee: MARIANNE LYNCH, District Attorney for Prosecutorial District V
Plaintiff / Appellant: RICHARD ROE
Case Number: 20-1702
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 FIVE (5) paper copies of appendix [ # 6364575-2 ] submitted by Appellant Richard Roe. [20-1702] (ATC) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:44 AM]
September 8, 2020 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6364553-2 ] submitted by Appellant Richard Roe. [20-1702] (ATC) [Entered: 09/14/2020 11:43 AM]
September 3, 2020 APPENDIX filed by Appellant Richard Roe. Number of volumes: 1. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2020. [20-1702] (AVN) [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:45 AM]
September 3, 2020 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Richard Roe. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 09/10/2020 . Brief due 10/05/2020 for APPELLEE Marianne Lynch. [20-1702] (LIM) [Entered: 09/03/2020 09:16 AM]
September 3, 2020 APPENDIX tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. Certificate of service dated 09/03/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 09/03/2020 08:58 AM]
September 3, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 09/03/2020 08:56 AM]
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: The brief and appendix filed by appellant Richard Roe on August 24, 2020 are not in compliance. Appellant Richard Roe is ordered to file a conforming brief and appendix by September 9, 2020 . The corrected brief and one copy of the corrected appendix must be served on all parties to the appeal, and the certificate(s) of service must be updated to include the new date of service. The due date for appellee's brief shall run from service of the corrected brief, in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 31. [20-1702] (GB) [Entered: 09/02/2020 12:37 PM]
August 24, 2020 APPENDIX tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. Certificate of service dated 08/24/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 08/24/2020 08:44 AM]
August 24, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Richard Roe. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 08/24/2020 08:42 AM]
July 24, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Marianne Lynch filed by Attorney Jonathan R. Bolton. Certificate of service dated 07/24/2020. [20-1702] (JRB) [Entered: 07/24/2020 12:45 PM]
July 22, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 08/31/2020 for appellant Richard Roe. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1702] (GB) [Entered: 07/22/2020 03:04 PM]
July 22, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Richard Roe. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:19 AM]
July 22, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Richard Roe filed by Attorney Michael A. Cunniff. Certificate of service dated 07/22/2020. [20-1702] (MAC) [Entered: 07/22/2020 11:16 AM]
July 20, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #18) filed by Appellant Richard Roe. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 08/03/2020 . [20-1702] (GB) [Entered: 07/20/2020 07:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Roe v. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARIANNE LYNCH, District Attorney for Prosecutorial District V
Represented By: Jonathan Richard Bolton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD ROE
Represented By: Michael A. Cunniff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?