UTIER v. PREPA, et al
Petitioner: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Interested Party: MAYAGUEZANOS POR LA SALUD Y EL AMBIENTE, INC., AD HOC GROUP OF PREPA BONDHOLDERS, OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS, COMITE YABUCOENO PRO-CALIDAD DE VIDA, INC, WINDMAR RENEWABLE ENERGY, INC., CORTLAND CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES LLC, ULTRA MASTER LTD, PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, ECOELECTRICA, L.P., CAMBIO P.R., INSTITUTO DE COMPETITIVIDAD Y SOSTENIBILIDAD ECONOMICA DE PUERTO RICO, GAS NATURAL APROVISIONAMIENTOS SDG, S.A., ALIANZA COMUNITARIA AMBIENTALISTA DEL SURESTE, INC., SOLUS OPPORTUNITIES FUND 5 LP, SYNCORA GUARANTEE INC., NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION, ASSURED GUARANTY CORPORATION, EL PUENTE DE WILLIAMSBURG, INC., Enlace Latino de Accin Climtica, CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS, SISTEMA DE RETIRO DE LOS EMPLEADOS DE LA AUTORIDAD DE ENERGIA ELECTRICA, (SREAEE), COALICION DE ORGANIZACIONES ANTI-INCINERACION INC., SOLA LTD, PUERTO RICO HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO, ULTRA NB LLC, ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for the Non-Recourse PREPA Bonds, CAMPAMENTO CONTRA LAS CENIZAS EN PEUELAS, INC., AMIGOS DEL RIO GUAYNABO, INC., COMITE DIALOGO AMBIENTAL, INC., ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO, CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS, SIERRA CLUB, INC., UNION DE TRABAJADORES DE LA INDUSTRIA ELECTRICA Y RIEGO, (UTIER), CAMPAMENTO CONTRA LAS CENIZAS EN PENUELAS, INC., COALICION DE ORGANIZACIONES ANTI-INCINERACION, INC. and SIERRA CLUB, INC., Puerto Rico chapter
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21, US Trustee and MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS, US Trustee
Debtor / Appellee: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA), FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD and COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
3Rd Party Plaintiff: GS FAJARDO SOLAR LLC
Case Number: 20-1709
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Josue N. Torres-Crespo for Appellee Commonwealth of Puerto Rico in 20-1709. Copy of Order entered November 2, 2020. Forwarded to Conde. El Monte Sur 180, Aptm. 1105-B, San Juan, PR 00918-0000. [20-1685, 20-1709, 20-1710] (JMK) [Entered: 11/13/2020 09:00 AM]
November 2, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 12/14/2020 for appellant Alianza Comunitaria Ambientalista del Sureste, Inc., Amigos del Rio Guaynabo, Inc., CAMBIO P.R., Campamento Contra las Cenizas en Penuelas, Inc., Coalicion De Organizaciones Anti-Incineracion, Inc., Comite Dialogo Ambiental, Inc., Comite Yabucoeno Pro-Calidad De Vida, Inc, El Puente de Williamsburg, Inc., Mayaguezanos Por La Salud Y El Ambiente, Inc., Sierra Club, Inc., Union de Trabajadores de la Industria Electrica y Riego and Windmar Renewable Energy, Inc.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1685, 20-1709, 20-1710] (GRC) [Entered: 11/02/2020 11:29 AM]
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appeal Nos. 20-1685, 20-1709, and 20-1710 are consolidated for purposes of briefing and oral argument. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(b)(2). The parties are directed to use the above caption on all future filings related to these cases. The clerk will set a briefing schedule in due course. Appellants may file separate briefs. Appellees' consolidated brief shall be due within thirty days after service of the last appellant's brief. [20-1685, 20-1709, 20-1710] (GRC) [Entered: 11/02/2020 11:11 AM]
September 4, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: John T. Duffey for UTIER, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and U.S. Bank National Association, Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and AAFAF, David D. Cleary for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Daniel Desatnik for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, John T. Duffey for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and U.S. Bank National Association, Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and AAFAF, Kevin Finger for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Nathan A. Haynes for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Clark T. Whitmore for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and U.S. Bank National Association, Nicholas Baker for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC, Nicholas A. Bassett for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, James R. Bliss for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, My Chi To for Syncora Guarantee Inc., David D. Cleary for AAFAF, Daniel Desatnik for AAFAF, John T. Duffey for U.S. Bank National Association, Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and AAFAF, Kevin Finger for AAFAF, Bryce L. Friedman for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC, Marcia Goldstein for National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation, Nathan A. Haynes for AAFAF, Angela K. Herring for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Emil A. Kleinhaus for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Richard G. Mason for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Sarah E. Phillips for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC, Clark T. Whitmore for U.S. Bank National Association, Amy R. Wolf for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC and James B. Worthington for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. [20-1709] (GRC) [Entered: 09/04/2020 01:20 PM]
August 14, 2020 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 1951, 2038, 2039 (notice of appeal and memorandum opinion and order), 2041, 2042. [20-1685, 20-1709, 20-1710] (GRC) [Entered: 08/14/2020 05:59 PM]
August 14, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 08/28/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: John T. Duffey for UTIER, Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and U.S. Bank National Association, Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and AAFAF, David D. Cleary for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Daniel Desatnik for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, John T. Duffey for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and U.S. Bank National Association, Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and AAFAF, Kevin Finger for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Nathan A. Haynes for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Clark T. Whitmore for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and U.S. Bank National Association, Nicholas Baker for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC, Nicholas A. Bassett for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, James R. Bliss for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, My Chi To for Syncora Guarantee Inc., Daniel Desatnik for AAFAF, John T. Duffey for U.S. Bank National Association, Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and AAFAF, Cristina B. Fernandez-Niggerman for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Kevin Finger for AAFAF, Bryce L. Friedman for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC, Marcia Goldstein for National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation, Nathan A. Haynes for AAFAF, Angela K. Herring for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Emil A. Kleinhaus for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Richard G. Mason for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Sarah E. Phillips for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC, Clark T. Whitmore for U.S. Bank National Association, Amy R. Wolf for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC and James B. Worthington for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. [20-1709] (GRC) [Entered: 08/14/2020 05:15 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1709] (MJB) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:16 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1709] (MDH) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:09 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Paul V. Possinger. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1709] (PVP) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:05 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Stephen L. Ratner. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1709] (SLR) [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:59 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1709] (JER) [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:55 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1709] (TWM) [Entered: 08/05/2020 01:51 PM]
August 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant UTIER in 20-1709 filed by Attorney Rolando Emmanuelli Jimenez. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1709, 20-1685, 20-1710] (RE) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:38 PM]
August 3, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant UTIER. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1709] (JEM) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:36 PM]
August 3, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant UTIER indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1709] (JEM) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:35 PM]
August 3, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant UTIER. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1709] (JEM) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:33 PM]
August 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant UTIER in 20-1709 filed by Attorney Jessica Esther Mendez Colberg. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1709, 20-1710, 20-1685] (JEM) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:31 PM]
July 27, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #2041) filed by Appellant UTIER. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 08/10/2020. [20-1709] (GRC) [Entered: 07/27/2020 12:12 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: UTIER v. PREPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAYAGUEZANOS POR LA SALUD Y EL AMBIENTE, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AD HOC GROUP OF PREPA BONDHOLDERS
Represented By: Nayda Perez-Roman
Represented By: Thomas Moers Mayer
Represented By: Linette Figueroa-Torres
Represented By: Amy Caton
Represented By: Natan Hamerman
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Represented By: Alice J. Byowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By: James R. Bliss
Represented By: Juan Carlos Nieves-Gonzalez
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: James B. Worthington
Represented By: Cristina B. Fernandez-Niggerman
Represented By: Nicholas A. Bassett
Represented By: Israel Fernandez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COMITE YABUCOENO PRO-CALIDAD DE VIDA, INC
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WINDMAR RENEWABLE ENERGY, INC.
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CORTLAND CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES LLC
Represented By: John F. Lynch
Represented By: Richard G. Mason
Represented By: Emil A. Kleinhaus
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani
Represented By: Amy R. Wolf
Represented By: Angela K. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ULTRA MASTER LTD
Represented By: Nicholas Baker
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Sarah E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ECOELECTRICA, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMBIO P.R.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INSTITUTO DE COMPETITIVIDAD Y SOSTENIBILIDAD ECONOMICA DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GAS NATURAL APROVISIONAMIENTOS SDG, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALIANZA COMUNITARIA AMBIENTALISTA DEL SURESTE, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOLUS OPPORTUNITIES FUND 5 LP
Represented By: Nicholas Baker
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Sarah E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SYNCORA GUARANTEE INC.
Represented By: My Chi To
Represented By: Elie J. Worenklein
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Carlos A. Rodriguez-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION
Represented By: Kelly Diblasi
Represented By: Luis A. Oliver-Fraticelli
Represented By: Gregory Silbert
Represented By: Robert Berezin
Represented By: Marcia Goldstein
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Jonathan D. Polkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSURED GUARANTY CORPORATION
Represented By: Howard Robert Hawkins Jr.
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Represented By: Thomas J. Curtin
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Mark C. Ellenberg
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas-Sanchez
Represented By: Casey J. Servais
Represented By: Ellen M. Halstead
Represented By: Heriberto J. Burgos-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EL PUENTE DE WILLIAMSBURG, INC., Enlace Latino de Accin Climtica
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SISTEMA DE RETIRO DE LOS EMPLEADOS DE LA AUTORIDAD DE ENERGIA ELECTRICA, (SREAEE)
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COALICION DE ORGANIZACIONES ANTI-INCINERACION INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOLA LTD
Represented By: Nicholas Baker
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Sarah E. Phillips
Represented By: Jose Luis Ramirez-Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ULTRA NB LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Baker
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Sarah E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Howard Robert Hawkins Jr.
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Represented By: Thomas J. Curtin
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Mark C. Ellenberg
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas-Sanchez
Represented By: Casey J. Servais
Represented By: Ellen M. Halstead
Represented By: Heriberto J. Burgos-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for the Non-Recourse PREPA Bonds
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Represented By: Clark T. Whitmore
Represented By: William Z. Pentelovitch
Represented By: Iris Jannette Cabrera-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMPAMENTO CONTRA LAS CENIZAS EN PEUELAS, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMIGOS DEL RIO GUAYNABO, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COMITE DIALOGO AMBIENTAL, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SIERRA CLUB, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNION DE TRABAJADORES DE LA INDUSTRIA ELECTRICA Y RIEGO, (UTIER)
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMPAMENTO CONTRA LAS CENIZAS EN PENUELAS, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Represented By: Ruth Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COALICION DE ORGANIZACIONES ANTI-INCINERACION, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SIERRA CLUB, INC., Puerto Rico chapter
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21, US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS, US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Represented By: Daniel Desatnik
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Peter M. Friedman
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: David D. Cleary
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Kevin Finger
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Nathan A. Haynes
Represented By: Iris Jannette Cabrera-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Daniel Desatnik
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: David D. Cleary
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Represented By: Clark T. Whitmore
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Kevin Finger
Represented By: William Z. Pentelovitch
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Shiloh Rainwater
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Nathan A. Haynes
Represented By: Iris Jannette Cabrera-Gomez
Represented By: Peter M. Friedman
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Represented By: John J. Rapisardi
Represented By: Michael Kelly Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Daniel Desatnik
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: David D. Cleary
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Represented By: Clark T. Whitmore
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Kevin Finger
Represented By: William Z. Pentelovitch
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Shiloh Rainwater
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Nathan A. Haynes
Represented By: Iris Jannette Cabrera-Gomez
Represented By: Michael Kelly Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Michel Mir-Martinez
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Valerie Concepcion-Cintron
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: GS FAJARDO SOLAR LLC
Represented By: Brian Uelk
Represented By: Ismael H. Herrero III
Represented By: John R. Dodd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?