Windmar Renewable Energy v. PREPA, et al
Petitioner: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Interested Party: CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS, AD HOC GROUP OF PREPA BONDHOLDERS, ALIANZA COMUNITARIA AMBIENTALISTA DEL SURESTE, INC., COMITE YABUCOENO PRO-CALIDAD DE VIDA, INC, CORTLAND CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES LLC, ULTRA MASTER LTD, PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, ECOELECTRICA, L.P., CAMBIO P.R., INSTITUTO DE COMPETITIVIDAD Y SOSTENIBILIDAD ECONOMICA DE PUERTO RICO, WINDMAR RENEWABLE ENERGY, INC., GAS NATURAL APROVISIONAMIENTOS SDG, S.A., MAYAGUEZANOS POR LA SALUD Y EL AMBIENTE, INC., SOLUS OPPORTUNITIES FUND 5 LP, SYNCORA GUARANTEE INC., NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION, ASSURED GUARANTY CORPORATION, EL PUENTE DE WILLIAMSBURG, INC., Enlace Latino de Accin Climtica, SISTEMA DE RETIRO DE LOS EMPLEADOS DE LA AUTORIDAD DE ENERGIA ELECTRICA, (SREAEE), COALICION DE ORGANIZACIONES ANTI-INCINERACION INC., SOLA LTD, PUERTO RICO HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS, ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO, ULTRA NB LLC, UNION DE TRABAJADORES DE LA INDUSTRIA ELECTRICA Y RIEGO, (UTIER), ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORPORATION, U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for the Non-Recourse PREPA Bonds, CAMPAMENTO CONTRA LAS CENIZAS EN PEUELAS, INC., AMIGOS DEL RIO GUAYNABO, INC., COMITE DIALOGO AMBIENTAL, INC., ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO, CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS and SIERRA CLUB, INC.
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21, US Trustee and MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS, US Trustee
Debtor / Appellee: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA) and FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Case Number: 20-1710
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney My Chi To for Not Party Syncora Guarantee Inc. Copy of Notice issued September 3, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1710] (JMK) [Entered: 09/17/2020 04:26 PM]
September 3, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: David D. Cleary for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Daniel Desatnik for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, John T. Duffey for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and U.S. Bank National Association, UTIER, Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and AAFAF, Kevin Finger for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Nathan A. Haynes for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Clark T. Whitmore for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and U.S. Bank National Association, Nicholas Baker for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC, Nicholas A. Bassett for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, James R. Bliss for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, My Chi To for Syncora Guarantee Inc., David D. Cleary for AAFAF, Daniel Desatnik for AAFAF, John T. Duffey for U.S. Bank National Association, UTIER, Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and AAFAF, Kevin Finger for AAFAF, Bryce L. Friedman for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC, Peter M. Friedman for AAFAF, Marcia Goldstein for National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation, Nathan A. Haynes for AAFAF, Angela K. Herring for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Emil A. Kleinhaus for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Richard G. Mason for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Sarah E. Phillips for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC, Clark T. Whitmore for U.S. Bank National Association, Amy R. Wolf for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC and James B. Worthington for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. [20-1710] (GRC) [Entered: 09/03/2020 01:17 PM]
August 14, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 08/28/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: David D. Cleary for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Daniel Desatnik for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, John T. Duffey for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and U.S. Bank National Association, UTIER, Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and AAFAF, Kevin Finger for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Nathan A. Haynes for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), FOMB and AAFAF, Nicholas Baker for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC, James R. Bliss for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, My Chi To for Syncora Guarantee Inc., David D. Cleary for AAFAF, Daniel Desatnik for AAFAF, John T. Duffey for U.S. Bank National Association, UTIER, Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and AAFAF, Kevin Finger for AAFAF, Marcia Goldstein for National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation, Nathan A. Haynes for AAFAF, Angela K. Herring for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Richard G. Mason for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC, Sarah E. Phillips for Sola Ltd, Ultra Master Ltd, Solus Opportunities Fund 5 LP and Ultra NB LLC and Amy R. Wolf for Cortland Capital Market Services LLC. [20-1710] (GRC) [Entered: 08/14/2020 05:05 PM]
August 14, 2020 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 1951, 2038, 2039 (notice of appeal and memorandum opinion and order), 2041, 2042. [20-1685, 20-1709, 20-1710] (GRC) [Entered: 08/14/2020 05:59 PM]
August 12, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Windmar Renewable Energy, Inc. in 20-1710. Certificate of service dated 08/12/2020. [20-1710] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 20-1709. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (FEA) [Entered: 08/12/2020 04:10 PM]
August 12, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant Windmar Renewable Energy, Inc.Certificate of service dated 08/12/2020. [20-1710 CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF filer did not select the option that best describes the document. Document also should not have been filed in additional case 20-1709. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (FEA) [Entered: 08/12/2020 04:20 PM]
August 12, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Windmar Renewable Energy, Inc. in 20-1710 indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 08/12/2020. [20-1710] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 20-1709. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (FEA) [Entered: 08/12/2020 04:22 PM]
August 12, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Windmar Renewable Energy, Inc. in 20-1710 filed by Attorney Fernando E. Agrait. Certificate of service dated 08/12/2020. [20-1710] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case 20-1709. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (FEA) [Entered: 08/12/2020 04:08 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1710] (MJB) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:45 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1710] (TWM) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:24 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1710] (JER) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:33 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Stephen L. Ratner. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1710] (SLR) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:36 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Paul V. Possinger. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1710] (PVP) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:39 PM]
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 08/05/2020. [20-1710] (MDH) [Entered: 08/05/2020 02:43 PM]
August 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant UTIER in 20-1709 filed by Attorney Jessica Esther Mendez Colberg. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1709, 20-1710, 20-1685] (JEM) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:31 PM]
August 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant UTIER in 20-1709 filed by Attorney Rolando Emmanuelli Jimenez. Certificate of service dated 08/03/2020. [20-1709, 20-1685, 20-1710] (RE) [Entered: 08/03/2020 04:38 PM]
July 27, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #2042) filed by Appellant Windmar Renewable Energy, Inc.. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 08/10/2020. [20-1710] (GRC) [Entered: 07/27/2020 12:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Windmar Renewable Energy v. PREPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AD HOC GROUP OF PREPA BONDHOLDERS
Represented By: Manuel Fernandez-Bared
Represented By: Nayda Perez-Roman
Represented By: Thomas Moers Mayer
Represented By: Linette Figueroa-Torres
Represented By: Amy Caton
Represented By: Natan Hamerman
Represented By: Alice J. Byowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALIANZA COMUNITARIA AMBIENTALISTA DEL SURESTE, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COMITE YABUCOENO PRO-CALIDAD DE VIDA, INC
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CORTLAND CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES LLC
Represented By: John F. Lynch
Represented By: Richard G. Mason
Represented By: Emil A. Kleinhaus
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani
Represented By: Amy R. Wolf
Represented By: Angela K. Herring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ULTRA MASTER LTD
Represented By: Nicholas Baker
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Sarah E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ECOELECTRICA, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMBIO P.R.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INSTITUTO DE COMPETITIVIDAD Y SOSTENIBILIDAD ECONOMICA DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WINDMAR RENEWABLE ENERGY, INC.
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GAS NATURAL APROVISIONAMIENTOS SDG, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MAYAGUEZANOS POR LA SALUD Y EL AMBIENTE, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOLUS OPPORTUNITIES FUND 5 LP
Represented By: Nicholas Baker
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Sarah E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SYNCORA GUARANTEE INC.
Represented By: My Chi To
Represented By: Elie J. Worenklein
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Carlos A. Rodriguez-Vidal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION
Represented By: Kelly Diblasi
Represented By: Luis A. Oliver-Fraticelli
Represented By: Gregory Silbert
Represented By: Robert Berezin
Represented By: Marcia Goldstein
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Jonathan D. Polkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSURED GUARANTY CORPORATION
Represented By: Howard Robert Hawkins Jr.
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Represented By: Thomas J. Curtin
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Mark C. Ellenberg
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas-Sanchez
Represented By: Casey J. Servais
Represented By: Ellen M. Halstead
Represented By: Heriberto J. Burgos-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EL PUENTE DE WILLIAMSBURG, INC., Enlace Latino de Accin Climtica
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SISTEMA DE RETIRO DE LOS EMPLEADOS DE LA AUTORIDAD DE ENERGIA ELECTRICA, (SREAEE)
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COALICION DE ORGANIZACIONES ANTI-INCINERACION INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOLA LTD
Represented By: Nicholas Baker
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Sarah E. Phillips
Represented By: Jose Luis Ramirez-Coll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By: James R. Bliss
Represented By: Juan Carlos Nieves-Gonzalez
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: James B. Worthington
Represented By: Cristina B. Fernandez-Niggerman
Represented By: Nicholas A. Bassett
Represented By: Israel Fernandez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ULTRA NB LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Baker
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Sarah E. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNION DE TRABAJADORES DE LA INDUSTRIA ELECTRICA Y RIEGO, (UTIER)
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORPORATION
Represented By: Howard Robert Hawkins Jr.
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Represented By: Thomas J. Curtin
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Mark C. Ellenberg
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas-Sanchez
Represented By: Casey J. Servais
Represented By: Ellen M. Halstead
Represented By: Heriberto J. Burgos-Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee for the Non-Recourse PREPA Bonds
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Represented By: Clark T. Whitmore
Represented By: William Z. Pentelovitch
Represented By: Iris Jannette Cabrera-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMPAMENTO CONTRA LAS CENIZAS EN PEUELAS, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMIGOS DEL RIO GUAYNABO, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COMITE DIALOGO AMBIENTAL, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS
Represented By: Fernando Agrait
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SIERRA CLUB, INC.
Represented By: William Santiago-Sastre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21, US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS, US Trustee
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Represented By: Daniel Desatnik
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Peter M. Friedman
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: David D. Cleary
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Kevin Finger
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Nathan A. Haynes
Represented By: Iris Jannette Cabrera-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Daniel Desatnik
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: David D. Cleary
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Represented By: Clark T. Whitmore
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Kevin Finger
Represented By: William Z. Pentelovitch
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Shiloh Rainwater
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Nathan A. Haynes
Represented By: Iris Jannette Cabrera-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Daniel Desatnik
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: David D. Cleary
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Represented By: Clark T. Whitmore
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Kevin Finger
Represented By: William Z. Pentelovitch
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Shiloh Rainwater
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Nathan A. Haynes
Represented By: Iris Jannette Cabrera-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?