Victim Rights Law Center, et al v. Found. for Indiv. Rgts in Edu., et al
Interested Party: LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, WASC SENIOR COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY COMMISSION, ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC AND LAND-GRANT UNIVERSITIES, NATIONAL ALLIANCE FOR PARTNERSHIPS IN EQUITY, NATIONAL LGBTQ TASK FORCE, LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, AMERICAN INDIAN HIGHER EDUCATION CONSORTIUM, ASSOCIATION OF CATHOLIC COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES (ACCU), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY BUSINESS OFFICERS, AUTISTIC SELF ADVOCACY NETWORK, GLSEN, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF COMMUNITY COLLEGES, COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR HUMAN RESOURCES, NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS, TEN MEN - RHODE ISLAND COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, UNIVERSITY RISK MANAGEMENT AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATION (URMIA), CLEARINGHOUSE ON WOMEN'S ISSUES, JAPANESE AMERICAN CITIZENS LEAGUE, NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, AMERICAN DENTAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF GOVERNING BOARDS OF UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES (AGB), NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS, SURVIVORS OF SEXUAL VIOLENCE, AMERICAN MEN'S STUDIES ASSOCIATION, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF STATE COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, MIDDLE STATES COMMISSION ON HIGHER EDUCATION, CALIFORNIA WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, ASSOCIATION OF JESUIT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, MEN STOPPING VIOLENCE, COUNCIL FOR ADVANCEMENT AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, PROMUNDO, COUNCIL OF THE GREAT CITY SCHOOLS, NEW ENGLAND COMMISSION OF HIGHER EDUCATION, SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENTS' ASSOCIATION, AASA, JANA'S CAMPAIGN, INC., MEMBERS OF CONGRESS, NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY, ACCREDITATION COUNCIL FOR PHARMACY EDUCATION, CONNECT, INC., SOUTHEAST ASIA RESOURCE ACTION CENTER, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, LAW PROFESSORS, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR AFFIRMATIVE ACTION BY EQUAL OPPORTUNITY PROFESSIONALS, EDUCATION LAW CENTER, PA, MEN'S STORY PROJECT, NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF DIVERSITY OFFICERS IN HIGHER EDUCATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN UNIVERSITIES, FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, NASPA - STUDENT AFFAIRS ADMINISTRATORS IN HIGHER EDUCATION, VERA HOUSE, INC., MEN AND MASCULINITIES KNOWLEDGE COMMUNITY, NORTH AMERICAN MENENGAGE NETWORK, COUNCIL OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES (CIC) and AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION
Petitioner / Appellant: SPEECH FIRST, INC., INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER and FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION
Plaintiff / Appellee: VICTIM RIGHTS LAW CENTER, JILL DOE, ANNE DOE, EQUAL RIGHTS ADVOCATES, NANCY DOE, CHICAGO ALLIANCE AGAINST SEXUAL EXPLOITATION, JANE DOE, an individual by and through her mother and next friend Melissa White, SUSAN DOE, LISA DOE, SOBIA DOE and LEGAL VOICE
Defendant / Appellee: BETSY DEVOS, in her official capacity as Secretary of Education, KENNETH L. MARCUS, in his official capacity as Assistant Secretary for Civil Right and US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Case Number: 20-1748
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 NOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow: 09/02/2020, Motion Hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 09/24/2020 08:02 PM]
September 16, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellees Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice and Victim Rights Law Center. Certificate of service dated 09/16/2020. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:42 PM]
September 16, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Victim Rights Law Center, Legal Voice, Equal Rights Advocates and Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation filed by Attorney James R. Sigel. Certificate of service dated 09/16/2020. [20-1748] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachments must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (JRS) [Entered: 09/16/2020 04:23 PM]
September 16, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe and Shiwali G. Patel for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 09/16/2020 06:45 AM]
September 2, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Sunu P. Chandy for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Betsy DeVos and Kenneth L. Marcus, David A. Newman for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Julie G. O'Neill for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Roy L. Austin for Law Professors, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Paige Duggins-Clay for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Daniel P. Jaffe for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment and National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, Kristin M. Knuuttila for California Women's Law Center, Naomi M. Mann for Law Professors, Aleksandra O. Rushing for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Cari S. Simon for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment and National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and Saul E. Wolf for Survivors of Sexual Violence. [20-1748]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GB) [Entered: 09/02/2020 06:35 AM]
September 1, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 09/15/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Shiwali G. Patel for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe and Elizabeth Tang for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 09/01/2020 06:58 AM]
August 18, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 09/01/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Alexa R. Baltes for Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc., Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Betsy DeVos and Kenneth L. Marcus, David A. Newman for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Julie G. O'Neill for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe and Lisa Doe, Roy L. Austin for Law Professors, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Paige Duggins-Clay for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Daniel P. Jaffe for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment and National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools, Kristin M. Knuuttila for California Women's Law Center, Naomi M. Mann for Law Professors, Aleksandra O. Rushing for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Cari S. Simon for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment and National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and Saul E. Wolf for Survivors of Sexual Violence. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/18/2020 06:31 AM]
August 17, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 09/28/2020 for appellants Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/17/2020 01:40 PM]
August 16, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 08/16/2020. [20-1748] (CTN) [Entered: 08/16/2020 01:41 PM]
August 13, 2020 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney have been removed from the service list for this case: Daniel Tingley for Law Professors. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:51 AM]
August 13, 2020 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Lauren E. Snyder for Law Professors. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:44 AM]
August 13, 2020 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Lauren E. Snyder for Not Party Law Professors. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:43 AM]
August 12, 2020 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Daniel Tingley for Not Party Law Professors. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/13/2020 10:50 AM]
August 7, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc. filed by Attorney Cameron T. Norris. Certificate of service dated 08/07/2020. [20-1748] (CTN) [Entered: 08/07/2020 09:02 PM]
July 30, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #52) filed by Appellants Foundation for Individual Rights in Education, Independent Women's Law Center and Speech First, Inc. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 08/17/2020 . [20-1748] (GB) [Entered: 08/02/2020 06:36 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Victim Rights Law Center, et al v. Found. for Indiv. Rgts in Edu., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WASC SENIOR COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY COMMISSION
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC AND LAND-GRANT UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ALLIANCE FOR PARTNERSHIPS IN EQUITY
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL LGBTQ TASK FORCE
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN INDIAN HIGHER EDUCATION CONSORTIUM
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF CATHOLIC COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES (ACCU)
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY BUSINESS OFFICERS
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AUTISTIC SELF ADVOCACY NETWORK
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GLSEN
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF COMMUNITY COLLEGES
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR HUMAN RESOURCES
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TEN MEN - RHODE ISLAND COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNIVERSITY RISK MANAGEMENT AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATION (URMIA)
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CLEARINGHOUSE ON WOMEN'S ISSUES
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JAPANESE AMERICAN CITIZENS LEAGUE
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN DENTAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF GOVERNING BOARDS OF UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES (AGB)
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Represented By: Allen F. James
Represented By: John W. Borkowski
Represented By: Daniel P. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SURVIVORS OF SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN MEN'S STUDIES ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC.
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF STATE COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MIDDLE STATES COMMISSION ON HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CALIFORNIA WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF JESUIT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MEN STOPPING VIOLENCE
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COUNCIL FOR ADVANCEMENT AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PROMUNDO
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COUNCIL OF THE GREAT CITY SCHOOLS
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Represented By: Allen F. James
Represented By: John W. Borkowski
Represented By: Daniel P. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NEW ENGLAND COMMISSION OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENTS' ASSOCIATION, AASA
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Represented By: Allen F. James
Represented By: John W. Borkowski
Represented By: Daniel P. Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JANA'S CAMPAIGN, INC.
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MEMBERS OF CONGRESS
Represented By: Matthew S. Shapanka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ACCREDITATION COUNCIL FOR PHARMACY EDUCATION
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CONNECT, INC.
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOUTHEAST ASIA RESOURCE ACTION CENTER
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LAW PROFESSORS
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR AFFIRMATIVE ACTION BY EQUAL OPPORTUNITY PROFESSIONALS
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EDUCATION LAW CENTER, PA
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MEN'S STORY PROJECT
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF DIVERSITY OFFICERS IN HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NASPA - STUDENT AFFAIRS ADMINISTRATORS IN HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VERA HOUSE, INC.
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MEN AND MASCULINITIES KNOWLEDGE COMMUNITY
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NORTH AMERICAN MENENGAGE NETWORK
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COUNCIL OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES (CIC)
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SPEECH FIRST, INC.
Represented By: Patrick N. Strawbridge
Represented By: Alexa R. Baltes
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Patrick N. Strawbridge
Represented By: Alexa R. Baltes
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: Nicole J. Moss
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VICTIM RIGHTS LAW CENTER
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JILL DOE
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANNE DOE
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EQUAL RIGHTS ADVOCATES
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NANCY DOE
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHICAGO ALLIANCE AGAINST SEXUAL EXPLOITATION
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANE DOE, an individual by and through her mother and next friend Melissa White
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SUSAN DOE
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LISA DOE
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SOBIA DOE
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LEGAL VOICE
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BETSY DEVOS, in her official capacity as Secretary of Education
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KENNETH L. MARCUS, in his official capacity as Assistant Secretary for Civil Right
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?