Garcia-Parra, et al v. Caribbean Petroleum Corporation, et al
Plaintiff: PETRA RAMOS AMARO, ELIEZER CRUZ-APONTE, BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INC. and MAGDALENA CARABALLO
Defendant: GTRIMG FOUNDATION, UPT UNITED PRODUCT TANKERS (AMERICAS) LLC, ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC, CARIBBEAN PETROLEUM LP, WARDEN BAYAMON, 501, RAM ZEEVI, CARIBBEAN PETROLEUM REFINING, L. P., UPT UNITED PRODUCT TANKERS GMBH & CO. KG, BP NORTH AMERICA, INC., BEST PETROLEUM CORP., NAVIGATORS GROUP, INC., GULF, CAPE BRUNY TANKSCHIFFAHRTS, MAPFRE INSURANCE COMPANY, FTI CONSULTING, INC., as Liquidation Trustee, CHARTIS II, HARBOR FUEL SERVICES, INC., a/k/a Harbor Bunkering Corporation, CAPE BRUNY SHIPPING COMPANY LTD, QUALITY ENVIRONMENT, GOVERNOR OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, CHARTIS INSURANCE COMPANY OF PUERTO RICO, CARIBBEAN OIL LP, WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, Ace Limited, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, f/k/a Liberty International Underwriters, Inc., AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC., CARIBBEAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION, INPECOS A. G., NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY, CARIBBEAN PETROLEUM LIQUIDATION TRUST, Successor in interest to Caribbean Petroleum Corporation, INTERTEK USA, INC. N, FIRST OIL INTERNATIONAL, SHELL OIL COMPANY, BRITISH-AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION, TOTAL PETROLEUM PUERTO RICO CORPORATION, ADMINISTRACION DE CORRECCION and GAD ZEEVI
Defendant / Appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO, MAPFRE PUERTO RICO, BRITISH-AMERICAN OIL PRODUCING COMPANY, BRITISH-AMERICAN PETROLEUM INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, CHEVRON CORPORATION, SCHOELLER HOLDINGS LTD, DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE IN PUERTO RICO, BRITISH-AMERICAN PETROLEUM, INC., COLUMBIA SHIPMANAGEMENT (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH, TOTAL, S. A., CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION, COLUMBIA SHIPMANAGEMENT LTD, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and CATECO
Plaintiff / Appellant: HERIBERTO GARCIA-PARRA
Case Number: 20-1785
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Jules R. Cattie, III for Not Party Intertek USA, Inc. n. Copy of Notice issued January 14, 2021. Forwarded to Hoguet, Newman, Regal & Kenney, LLP 35th Flr 60 E 42nd St. New York, NY 10016. [20-1785] (ATC) [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:21 PM]
February 9, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Stuart L. Shapiro for Not Parties Gad Zeevi and Ram Zeevi. Copy of Notice issued January 8, 2021. [20-1785] (ATC) [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:16 PM]
February 9, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Nicholas E. Warywoda for Not Party Petra Ramos Amaro. Copy of Request for Removal from Service by Attorney Peter J. Cambs for Not Party Petra Ramos Amaro. [20-1785] (ATC) [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:13 PM]
February 9, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Matthew S. Schoen for Not Party Petra Ramos Amaro. Copy of Request for Removal from Service by Attorney Peter J. Cambs for Not Party Petra Ramos Amaro. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1785] (ATC) [Entered: 02/11/2021 04:09 PM]
February 8, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Nicholas E. Warywoda for Not Party Petra Ramos Amaro. Copy of Notice issued January 20, 2021. [20-1785] (ATC) [Entered: 02/11/2021 03:17 PM]
February 8, 2021 PLEADING tendered: Transcript Report/Order form filed by Appellant Heriberto Garcia-Parra. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 02/10/2021 01:24 PM]
January 29, 2021 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Ana Y. Correa for UPT United Product Tankers (Americas) LLC and BP Products North America, Inc., John Patrick Curley for Intertek USA, Inc. n, William A. Escobar for UPT United Product Tankers (Americas) LLC and BP Products North America, Inc., Kevin M. Haas for Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Helene R. Hechtkopf for Intertek USA, Inc. n, Katelyn Kiernan Brooks for Intertek USA, Inc. n, William F. Knowles for Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Marc Aaron Melzer for Intertek USA, Inc. n, John F. Nevares for Magdalena Caraballo, Eliezer Cruz-Aponte and Petra Ramos Amaro, Matthew S. Schoen for Petra Ramos Amaro, Anneke J. Shepard for Shell Oil Company and Nicholas E. Warywoda for Petra Ramos Amaro. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 01/29/2021 02:17 PM]
January 22, 2021 NOTICE of default issued. Appellant failed to file a transcript report/order form by the deadline. If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by 02/05/2021. Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 01/22/2021 05:42 PM]
January 22, 2021 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: T. Justin Simpson for Navigators Insurance Company. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 01/22/2021 05:31 PM]
January 22, 2021 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney T. Justin Simpson for Not Party Navigators Insurance Company. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 01/22/2021 05:28 PM]
January 22, 2021 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss for failure to pay the filing fee. Fee due 02/05/2021. [20-1785] (GAK) [Entered: 01/22/2021 04:13 PM]
January 20, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Susan Charters for Not Parties Caribbean Petroleum Corporation and Caribbean Petroleum Refining, L. P. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued December 22, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1785] (ATC) [Entered: 01/21/2021 04:07 PM]
January 20, 2021 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Peter J. Cambs for Petra Ramos Amaro. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 01/20/2021 11:53 PM]
January 20, 2021 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Peter J. Cambs for Not Party Petra Ramos Amaro. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 01/20/2021 11:36 PM]
January 14, 2021 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorney has been removed from the service list for this case: Carmen R. Toledo for Shell Oil Company. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 01/14/2021 06:01 PM]
January 14, 2021 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Carmen R. Toledo for Not Party Shell Oil Company. Certificate of service was not included. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 01/14/2021 05:59 PM]
January 8, 2021 NOTICE issued. After 01/22/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Peter J. Cambs for Petra Ramos Amaro, Jules R. Cattie, III for Intertek USA, Inc. n, Ana Y. Correa for UPT United Product Tankers (Americas) LLC and BP Products North America, Inc., John Patrick Curley for Intertek USA, Inc. n, William A. Escobar for UPT United Product Tankers (Americas) LLC and BP Products North America, Inc., Kevin M. Haas for Westchester Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Marc Aaron Melzer for Intertek USA, Inc. n, John F. Nevares for Magdalena Caraballo, Eliezer Cruz-Aponte and Petra Ramos Amaro, Matthew S. Schoen for Petra Ramos Amaro, Stuart L. Shapiro for Gad Zeevi and Ram Zeevi, Anneke J. Shepard for Shell Oil Company, T. Justin Simpson for Navigators Insurance Company, Carmen R. Toledo for Shell Oil Company and Nicholas E. Warywoda for Petra Ramos Amaro. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 01/08/2021 11:45 PM]
January 7, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Stuart L. Shapiro for Not Parties Gad Zeevi and Ram Zeevi. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued December 22, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1785] (ATC) [Entered: 01/11/2021 12:37 PM]
December 22, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #1629 ) filed by Appellant Heriberto Garcia-Parra. Transcript Report/Order form and Fee due 01/05/2021. [20-1785] (ALW) [Entered: 12/22/2020 09:53 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Garcia-Parra, et al v. Caribbean Petroleum Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GTRIMG FOUNDATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPT UNITED PRODUCT TANKERS (AMERICAS) LLC
Represented By: William A. Escobar
Represented By: Ana Y. Correa
Represented By: Jonathan K. Cooperman
Represented By: Mark Blumstein
Represented By: Francisco Manuel Viejo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROYAL DUTCH SHELL PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARIBBEAN PETROLEUM LP
Represented By: Raul M. Arias-Marxuach
Represented By: Francisco G. Bruno-Rovira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN BAYAMON, 501
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAM ZEEVI
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARIBBEAN PETROLEUM REFINING, L. P.
Represented By: Raul M. Arias-Marxuach
Represented By: Francisco G. Bruno-Rovira
Represented By: Myrna L. Ruiz Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UPT UNITED PRODUCT TANKERS GMBH & CO. KG
Represented By: Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEST PETROLEUM CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVIGATORS GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Francisco Jose Colon-Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GULF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPE BRUNY TANKSCHIFFAHRTS
Represented By: Jose Ramon Rivera-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAPFRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTI CONSULTING, INC., as Liquidation Trustee
Represented By: Isabel Lecompte-Shiba
Represented By: Francisco G. Bruno-Rovira
Represented By: Isabel Cristina Lecompte Shiba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARTIS II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HARBOR FUEL SERVICES, INC., a/k/a Harbor Bunkering Corporation
Represented By: Rafael Angel Ojeda-Diez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPE BRUNY SHIPPING COMPANY LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QUALITY ENVIRONMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNOR OF THE COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Christian E. Pagan-Cordoliani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARTIS INSURANCE COMPANY OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: John C. Bonnie
Represented By: Ian Carvajal-Zarabozo
Represented By: Luis N. Saldana-Roman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARIBBEAN OIL LP
Represented By: Raul M. Arias-Marxuach
Represented By: Francisco G. Bruno-Rovira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTCHESTER SURPLUS LINES INSURANCE COMPANY, Ace Limited
Represented By: Victoria D. Pierce-King
Represented By: Fernando J. Fornaris-Fernandez
Represented By: Kevin M. Haas
Represented By: William F. Knowles
Represented By: Thomas M. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, f/k/a Liberty International Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Hector A. Marmol-Lantigua
Represented By: Francisco E. Colon-Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARIBBEAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION
Represented By: Raul M. Arias-Marxuach
Represented By: Francisco G. Bruno-Rovira
Represented By: Myrna L. Ruiz Olmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INPECOS A. G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVIGATORS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Francisco Jose Colon-Pagan
Represented By: T. Justin Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARIBBEAN PETROLEUM LIQUIDATION TRUST, Successor in interest to Caribbean Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Francisco G. Bruno-Rovira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERTEK USA, INC. N
Represented By: Dora L. Monserrate
Represented By: Marc Aaron Melzer
Represented By: Ricardo R. Lozada Jr.
Represented By: Jules R. Cattie III
Represented By: John Patrick Curley
Represented By: Helene R. Hechtkopf
Represented By: Katelyn Kiernan Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIRST OIL INTERNATIONAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHELL OIL COMPANY
Represented By: Anneke J. Shepard
Represented By: Carmen R. Toledo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRITISH-AMERICAN PETROLEUM CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TOTAL PETROLEUM PUERTO RICO CORPORATION
Represented By: Nestor Mendez-Gomez
Represented By: Jason Rafael Aguilo-Suro
Represented By: Oreste Ricardo Ramos-Pruetzel
Represented By: Sara Lydia Velez-Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADMINISTRACION DE CORRECCION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GAD ZEEVI
Represented By: Stuart L. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETRA RAMOS AMARO
Represented By: Nicholas E. Warywoda
Represented By: John F. Nevares
Represented By: Matthew S. Schoen
Represented By: Peter J. Cambs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIEZER CRUZ-APONTE
Represented By: John F. Nevares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BP PRODUCTS NORTH AMERICA, INC.
Represented By: William A. Escobar
Represented By: Ana Y. Correa
Represented By: Jonathan K. Cooperman
Represented By: Mark Blumstein
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Francisco Manuel Viejo Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAGDALENA CARABALLO
Represented By: John F. Nevares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Christian E. Pagan-Cordoliani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAPFRE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Diego A. Ramos-Cayon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRITISH-AMERICAN OIL PRODUCING COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRITISH-AMERICAN PETROLEUM INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHEVRON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCHOELLER HOLDINGS LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF STATE POLICE IN PUERTO RICO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRITISH-AMERICAN PETROLEUM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLUMBIA SHIPMANAGEMENT (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TOTAL, S. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORRECTIONAL HEALTH SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLUMBIA SHIPMANAGEMENT LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Christian E. Pagan-Cordoliani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CATECO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HERIBERTO GARCIA-PARRA
Represented By: Heriberto Garcia-Parra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?