Equal Means Equal, et al v. Ferriero
Plaintiff / Appellant: THE YELLOW ROSES, KATHERINE WEITBRECHT and EQUAL MEANS EQUAL
Interested Party: LARATIFYERA, US CONFERENCE OF MAYORS, 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA, MADMOMS, SENIOR CARE OPTIONS, INC, TRAFFICKING IN AMERICA TASK FORCE, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, Northern New Jersey, ALICE PAUL INSTITUTE, WOMENS EQUAL RIGHTS NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC., ALLIES REACHING FOR EQUALITY, SCREEN ACTORS GUILD, American Federation of Television and Radio Artists (SAG-AFTRA), HOUSTON WOMEN'S MARCH ON, FUERZA MUNDIAL GLOBAL, VIRGINIA SEXUAL AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ACTION ALLIANCE, ACTIVISM CAUCUS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR WOMEN IN PSYCHOLOGY, MID COUNTY PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATES, ORGANIC CONSUMERS ASSOCIATION, MICHIGAN WOMAN FORWARD, ERA-NC ALLIANCE, EQUAL MEANS ERA, WOMEN'S COALITION, TRANSLATINA COALITION, WOMEN NC, NATIONAL WOMEN'S HISTORY ALLIANCE, f/k/a Women's National History Alliance, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, ERA Task Force Albuquerque Chapter, NURTURED PARENT, FUND FOR WOMEN ARTISTS, INC., d/b/a WomenArts, CODEPINK, COALITION TO ABOLISH SLAVERY AND TRAFFICKING, INDIVISIBLE WORCESTER MARYLAND, L.I.N.D.A ORGANIZATION, NATIONAL COALITION AGAINST VIOLENT ATHLETES, WOMAN'S CLUB OF OLYMPIA, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, Florida, ELIZABETH CADY STANTON TRUST, FOR FREEDOMS, UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST, FAIRFAX COUNTY COMMISSION FOR WOMEN, FLORA'S REFUGE AND RESOURCE, INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, Human Rights and Diversity Commission, ALBUQUERQUE CENTER FOR PEACE AND JUSTICE, NATIONAL CONGRESS OF BLACK WOMEN, INC., NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, Santa Fe, NATIONAL EQUAL RIGHTS AMENDMENT ALLIANCE, NATIONAL WOMENS POLITICAL CAUCUS, MOMS IN OFFICE, MADMOMS, Fight For Justice, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, Florida, NATIONAL GIRLS HEALTH AND JUSTICE INSTITUTE, DR. BRONNERS FAMILY FOUNDATION, TURNING POINT SUFFRAGIST MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION, CAMPUS SAFETY ADVOCACY GROUP, NEW JERSEY CRIME VICTIMS' LAW CENTER, ZONTA CLUB OF KENMORE, RETHINKING EVE LLC, ERA MINNESOTA, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, Seattle Chapter, ISLE OF WIGHT COUNTY HUMANE SOCIETY and INSTITUTE ON VIOLENCE, ABUSE AND TRAUMA
Defendant / Appellee: DAVID FERRIERO, in his official capacity as Archivist of the United States
Case Number: 20-1802
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 29, 2021 Summary Equal Means Equal v. Ferriero

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Liam Holland for Appellee David Ferriero. Copy of Notice issued September 11, 2020. Forwarding address unknown. [20-1802] (JMK) [Entered: 10/16/2020 12:00 PM]
October 13, 2020 U.S. SUPREME COURT ORDER entered on 10/13/2020. The petition for a writ of certiorari was denied. [20-1802] (ALW) [Entered: 10/15/2020 01:35 PM]
October 13, 2020 NOTIFICATION of action by the United States Supreme Court filed by Appellants Equal Means Equal, Katherine Weitbrecht and The Yellow Roses. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1802] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (WJM) [Entered: 10/13/2020 05:38 PM]
September 28, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal for David Ferriero, Liam Holland for David Ferriero, Laura D. Mangini for Organic Consumers Association, NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., American Association of University Women, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Screen Actors Guild, National Organization for Women Foundation, National Coalition Against Violent Athletes, Allies Reaching for Equality, MadMoms, Activism Caucus of The Association For Women In Psychology, Albuquerque Center for Peace and Justice, Alice Paul Institute, Campus Safety Advocacy Group, Coalition to Abolish Slavery and Trafficking, CODEPINK, Dr. Bronners Family Foundation, Elizabeth Cady Stanton Trust, ERA Minnesota, ERA-NC Alliance, Fairfax County Commission for Women, Flora's Refuge and Resource, FOR FREEDOMS, Fuerza Mundial Global, Fund for Women Artists, Inc., Houston Women's March On, Indivisible Worcester Maryland, Institute on Violence, Abuse and Trauma, Isle Of Wight County Humane Society, L.I.N.D.A Organization, Michigan ERAMerica, Michigan Woman Forward, Mid County Psychological Associates, Moms in Office, National Congress of Black Women, Inc., National Equal Rights Amendment Alliance, National Girls Health and Justice Institute, National Womens Political Caucus, New Jersey Crime Victims' Law Center, Nurtured Parent, Rethinking Eve LLC, Senior Care Options, Inc, Turning Point Suffragist Memorial Association, Women's Coalition, Trafficking in America Task Force, TransLatina Coalition, United Church of Christ, Virginia Sexual and Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Woman's Club of Olympia, Women NC, National Women's History Alliance and Zonta Club of Kenmore and Arlaine Rockey for Organic Consumers Association, NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., American Association of University Women, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Screen Actors Guild, National Organization for Women Foundation, National Coalition Against Violent Athletes, Allies Reaching for Equality, MadMoms, Activism Caucus of The Association For Women In Psychology, Albuquerque Center for Peace and Justice, Alice Paul Institute, Campus Safety Advocacy Group, Coalition to Abolish Slavery and Trafficking, CODEPINK, Dr. Bronners Family Foundation, Elizabeth Cady Stanton Trust, ERA Minnesota, ERA-NC Alliance, Fairfax County Commission for Women, Flora's Refuge and Resource, FOR FREEDOMS, Fuerza Mundial Global, Fund for Women Artists, Inc., Houston Women's March On, Indivisible Worcester Maryland, Institute on Violence, Abuse and Trauma, Isle Of Wight County Humane Society, L.I.N.D.A Organization, Michigan ERAMerica, Michigan Woman Forward, Mid County Psychological Associates, Moms in Office, National Congress of Black Women, Inc., National Equal Rights Amendment Alliance, National Girls Health and Justice Institute, National Womens Political Caucus, New Jersey Crime Victims' Law Center, Nurtured Parent, Rethinking Eve LLC, Senior Care Options, Inc, Turning Point Suffragist Memorial Association, Women's Coalition, Trafficking in America Task Force, TransLatina Coalition, United Church of Christ, Virginia Sexual and Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Woman's Club of Olympia, Women NC, National Women's History Alliance and Zonta Club of Kenmore. [20-1802] (ALW) [Entered: 09/28/2020 02:18 PM]
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appellants Equal Means Equal, Katherine Weitbrecht, and The Yellow Roses' September 25, 2020 motion to extend time is moot in light of this court's order of even date. [20-1802] (ALW) [Entered: 09/28/2020 02:10 PM]
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Rogeriee Thompson, Appellate Judge: Plaintiff-Appellants move to stay this appeal pending disposition of a petition for writ of certiorari filed with the United States Supreme Court. The motion, which is unopposed, is GRANTED , and the appeal is stayed pending further order. Plaintiff-Appellants shall file status reports at 60-day intervals, the first due 60 days from entry of this order, and shall promptly inform the Court of any decision on the cert petition. Status report due 11/24/2020 for Equal Means Equal, The Yellow Roses and Katherine Weitbrecht. [20-1802] (ALW) [Entered: 09/25/2020 02:25 PM]
September 25, 2020 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to file brief filed by Appellants Equal Means Equal, Katherine Weitbrecht and The Yellow Roses. Certificate of service dated 09/25/2020. [20-1802] (WJM) [Entered: 09/25/2020 02:15 PM]
September 11, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 09/25/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal for David Ferriero, Liam Holland for David Ferriero, Laura D. Mangini for Organic Consumers Association, NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., American Association of University Women, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Screen Actors Guild, National Organization for Women Foundation, National Coalition Against Violent Athletes, Allies Reaching for Equality, MadMoms, Activism Caucus of The Association For Women In Psychology, Albuquerque Center for Peace and Justice, Alice Paul Institute, Campus Safety Advocacy Group, Coalition to Abolish Slavery and Trafficking, CODEPINK, Dr. Bronners Family Foundation, Elizabeth Cady Stanton Trust, ERA Minnesota, ERA-NC Alliance, Fairfax County Commission for Women, Flora's Refuge and Resource, FOR FREEDOMS, Fuerza Mundial Global, Fund for Women Artists, Inc., Houston Women's March On, Indivisible Worcester Maryland, Institute on Violence, Abuse and Trauma, Isle Of Wight County Humane Society, L.I.N.D.A Organization, Michigan ERAMerica, Michigan Woman Forward, Mid County Psychological Associates, Moms in Office, National Congress of Black Women, Inc., National Equal Rights Amendment Alliance, National Girls Health and Justice Institute, National Womens Political Caucus, New Jersey Crime Victims' Law Center, Nurtured Parent, Rethinking Eve LLC, Senior Care Options, Inc, Turning Point Suffragist Memorial Association, Women's Coalition, Trafficking in America Task Force, TransLatina Coalition, United Church of Christ, Virginia Sexual and Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Woman's Club of Olympia, Women NC, National Women's History Alliance and Zonta Club of Kenmore, Kristine L. Roberts for US Conference of Mayors, 38 Agree for Georgia, LARatifyERA and Equal Means ERA and Arlaine Rockey for Organic Consumers Association, NAACP Legal Defense & Educational Fund, Inc., American Association of University Women, International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Screen Actors Guild, National Organization for Women Foundation, National Coalition Against Violent Athletes, Allies Reaching for Equality, MadMoms, Activism Caucus of The Association For Women In Psychology, Albuquerque Center for Peace and Justice, Alice Paul Institute, Campus Safety Advocacy Group, Coalition to Abolish Slavery and Trafficking, CODEPINK, Dr. Bronners Family Foundation, Elizabeth Cady Stanton Trust, ERA Minnesota, ERA-NC Alliance, Fairfax County Commission for Women, Flora's Refuge and Resource, FOR FREEDOMS, Fuerza Mundial Global, Fund for Women Artists, Inc., Houston Women's March On, Indivisible Worcester Maryland, Institute on Violence, Abuse and Trauma, Isle Of Wight County Humane Society, L.I.N.D.A Organization, Michigan ERAMerica, Michigan Woman Forward, Mid County Psychological Associates, Moms in Office, National Congress of Black Women, Inc., National Equal Rights Amendment Alliance, National Girls Health and Justice Institute, National Womens Political Caucus, New Jersey Crime Victims' Law Center, Nurtured Parent, Rethinking Eve LLC, Senior Care Options, Inc, Turning Point Suffragist Memorial Association, Women's Coalition, Trafficking in America Task Force, TransLatina Coalition, United Church of Christ, Virginia Sexual and Domestic Violence Action Alliance, Woman's Club of Olympia, Women NC, National Women's History Alliance and Zonta Club of Kenmore. [20-1802] (ALW) [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:37 PM]
September 11, 2020 MOTION to stay Proceedings filed by Appellants The Yellow Roses, Equal Means Equal and Katherine Weitbrecht. Certificate of service dated 09/11/2020. [20-1802] (WJM) [Entered: 09/11/2020 02:54 PM]
September 10, 2020 U.S. SUPREME COURT NOTICE advising a petition for a writ of certiorari was filed on 09/10/2020 and assigned case number 20-318. [20-1802] (ALW) [Entered: 09/11/2020 04:46 PM]
September 8, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellee David Ferriero to motion to stay [ # 6364132-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 09/08/2020. [20-1802] (TP) [Entered: 09/08/2020 08:43 PM]
September 1, 2020 MOTION to stay proceedings filed by Appellants Katherine Weitbrecht, The Yellow Roses and Equal Means Equal. Certificate of service dated 09/01/2020. [20-1802] (WJM) [Entered: 09/01/2020 07:01 PM]
August 28, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 10/07/2020 for appellant Equal Means Equal, The Yellow Roses and Katherine Weitbrecht. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1802] (ALW) [Entered: 08/28/2020 01:32 AM]
August 26, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee David Ferriero filed by Attorney Michael S. Raab. Certificate of service dated 08/26/2020. [20-1802] (MSR) [Entered: 08/26/2020 10:57 AM]
August 25, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee David Ferriero filed by Attorney Thomas Pulham. Certificate of service dated 08/25/2020. [20-1802] (TP) [Entered: 08/25/2020 05:22 PM]
August 21, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Equal Means Equal, The Yellow Roses and Katherine Weitbrecht indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 08/21/2020. [20-1802] (WJM) [Entered: 08/21/2020 09:59 AM]
August 21, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Equal Means Equal, The Yellow Roses and Katherine Weitbrecht filed by Attorney Wendy J. Murphy. Certificate of service dated 08/21/2020. [20-1802] (WJM) [Entered: 08/21/2020 09:57 AM]
August 21, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Equal Means Equal, The Yellow Roses and Katherine Weitbrecht. Certificate of service dated 08/21/2020. [20-1802] (WJM) [Entered: 08/21/2020 09:55 AM]
August 21, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #38) filed by Appellants Equal Means Equal, The Yellow Roses and Katherine Weitbrecht. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 09/04/2020. [20-1802] (ALW) [Entered: 08/21/2020 12:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Equal Means Equal, et al v. Ferriero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THE YELLOW ROSES
Represented By: Wendy J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHERINE WEITBRECHT
Represented By: Wendy J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EQUAL MEANS EQUAL
Represented By: Wendy J. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LARATIFYERA
Represented By: Kristine L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: US CONFERENCE OF MAYORS
Represented By: Kristine L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: 38 AGREE FOR GEORGIA
Represented By: Kristine L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MADMOMS
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SENIOR CARE OPTIONS, INC
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TRAFFICKING IN AMERICA TASK FORCE
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, Northern New Jersey
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALICE PAUL INSTITUTE
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WOMENS EQUAL RIGHTS NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE & EDUCATIONAL FUND, INC.
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALLIES REACHING FOR EQUALITY
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SCREEN ACTORS GUILD, American Federation of Television and Radio Artists (SAG-AFTRA)
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HOUSTON WOMEN'S MARCH ON
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FUERZA MUNDIAL GLOBAL
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VIRGINIA SEXUAL AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE ACTION ALLIANCE
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ACTIVISM CAUCUS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR WOMEN IN PSYCHOLOGY
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MID COUNTY PSYCHOLOGICAL ASSOCIATES
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ORGANIC CONSUMERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MICHIGAN WOMAN FORWARD
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ERA-NC ALLIANCE
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EQUAL MEANS ERA
Represented By: Kristine L. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WOMEN'S COALITION
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TRANSLATINA COALITION
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WOMEN NC
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL WOMEN'S HISTORY ALLIANCE, f/k/a Women's National History Alliance
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, ERA Task Force Albuquerque Chapter
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NURTURED PARENT
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FUND FOR WOMEN ARTISTS, INC., d/b/a WomenArts
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CODEPINK
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COALITION TO ABOLISH SLAVERY AND TRAFFICKING
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INDIVISIBLE WORCESTER MARYLAND
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: L.I.N.D.A ORGANIZATION
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL COALITION AGAINST VIOLENT ATHLETES
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WOMAN'S CLUB OF OLYMPIA
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, Florida
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ELIZABETH CADY STANTON TRUST
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FOR FREEDOMS
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNITED CHURCH OF CHRIST
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FAIRFAX COUNTY COMMISSION FOR WOMEN
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FLORA'S REFUGE AND RESOURCE
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INTERNATIONAL BROTHERHOOD OF TEAMSTERS, Human Rights and Diversity Commission
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALBUQUERQUE CENTER FOR PEACE AND JUSTICE
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL CONGRESS OF BLACK WOMEN, INC.
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, Santa Fe
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL EQUAL RIGHTS AMENDMENT ALLIANCE
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL WOMENS POLITICAL CAUCUS
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MOMS IN OFFICE
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MADMOMS, Fight For Justice
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, Florida
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL GIRLS HEALTH AND JUSTICE INSTITUTE
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DR. BRONNERS FAMILY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TURNING POINT SUFFRAGIST MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMPUS SAFETY ADVOCACY GROUP
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NEW JERSEY CRIME VICTIMS' LAW CENTER
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ZONTA CLUB OF KENMORE
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RETHINKING EVE LLC
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ERA MINNESOTA
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, Seattle Chapter
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ISLE OF WIGHT COUNTY HUMANE SOCIETY
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INSTITUTE ON VIOLENCE, ABUSE AND TRAUMA
Represented By: Arlaine Rockey
Represented By: Laura D. Mangini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID FERRIERO, in his official capacity as Archivist of the United States
Represented By: Rayford A. Farquhar
Represented By: Liam Holland
Represented By: Vinita B. Andrapalliyal
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Thomas Pulham
Represented By: Michael S. Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?