Assured Guaranty Corp., et al v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al
Defendant: APEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, LLC
Debtor / Appellee: PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY, COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO and FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Debtor: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO, PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, Depository Trust Company, a/k/a Cofina, PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA) and PUERTO RICO PUBLIC BUILDINGS AUTHORITY
3Rd Party Defendant: YOLANDA I. CORREA FONSECA
Interested Party: PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, PV PROPERTIES, INC., CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS, OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS, CANTOR-KATZ COLLATERAL MONITOR LLC, as collateral monitor for the GDB Debt Recovery Authority, ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO, AMERINATIONAL COMMUNITY SERVICES, LLC, ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO and CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS
Petitioner / Appellant: AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION, FINANCIAL GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ASSURED GUARANTY CORPORATION, NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION and ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORPORATION
3Rd Party Plaintiff: CRUZ-HERNANDEZ PLAINTIFF GROUP, NILDA AGOSTO MALDONADO PLAINTIFF GROUP, ARACELIS NAZARIO TORRES, MARIA CONSUELO FIGUEROA TORRES and CONSEJO DE SALUD DE LA COMUNIDAD DE LA PLAYA DE PONCE, INC.
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21 and MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS
Respondent / Appellee: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Amicus Curiae: SECURITIES INDUSTRY AND FINANCIAL MARKETS ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 20-1930
Filed: October 7, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
March 3, 2021 Summary Assured Guaranty Corp. v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellees Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC and AmeriNational Community Services, LLC. [20-1930] (RML) [Entered: 12/04/2020 05:24 PM]
December 4, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Amicus Curiae Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association. [20-1930] (CMP) [Entered: 12/04/2020 11:12 AM]
December 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Adam Deming. Certificate of service dated 12/03/2020. [20-1930] (AD) [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:05 PM]
December 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Elliot R. Stevens. Certificate of service dated 12/03/2020. [20-1930] (ERS) [Entered: 12/03/2020 11:52 AM]
December 2, 2020 NINE (9) paper copies of amicus brief [ # 6384722-2 ] submitted by Amicus Curiae Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association. [20-1930] (ATC) [Entered: 12/02/2020 10:10 AM]
November 30, 2020 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF filed by Amicus Curiae Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association in support of Appellant. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 12/07/2020 . [20-1930] (CMP) [Entered: 11/30/2020 01:03 PM]
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER: No objections having been filed, the Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association's motion for leave to file an amicus brief in support of the appellant is granted, and the brief is accepted for filing this day. [20-1930] (CMP) [Entered: 11/30/2020 12:53 PM]
November 27, 2020 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney James R. Bliss for Appellee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Copy of Notice issued November 18, 2020. [20-1930] (ATC) [Entered: 12/03/2020 03:30 PM]
November 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC filed by Attorney Abbey Walsh. Certificate of service dated 11/20/2020. [20-1930] (AW) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:49 PM]
November 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC filed by Attorney Douglas I. Koff. Certificate of service dated 11/20/2020. [20-1930] (DK) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:44 PM]
November 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC filed by Attorney Douglas S. Mintz. Certificate of service dated 11/20/2020. [20-1930] (DSM) [Entered: 11/20/2020 12:40 PM]
November 18, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 12/02/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Gabriel Morgan for National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation, Bradley R. Bobroff for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Lucia Chapman for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Valerie Concepcion-Cintron for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Peter D. Doyle for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Cristina B. Fernandez-Niggerman for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Carl Forbes, Jr. for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, David Litterine-Kaufman for Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC, Laura Metzger for Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC, Michel Mir-Martinez for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Matthew J. Morris for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Monica Perrigino for Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC, Scott Rutsky for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Chris Theodoridis for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, FOMB and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Josue N. Torres-Crespo for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and FOMB, Hadassa Waxman for Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), James B. Worthington for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Jared D. Zajac for Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority, FOMB and Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Kevin M. Carroll for Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association, Charles Alfred Cuprill for Consejo De Salud De La Comunidad De La Playa De Ponce, Inc., Maria J. DiConza for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Rachel Ehrlich Albanese for Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico, Ivonne Gonzalez-Morales for Nilda Agosto Maldonado Plaintiff Group and Cruz-Hernandez Plaintiff Group, Vanessa Hernandez Rodriguez for Maria Consuelo Figueroa Torres, Michael Kelly Malone for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA), Gregg M. Mashberg for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) and Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation, Daniel S. Shamah for Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) and Chris Theodoridis for Puerto Rico Sales Tax Financing Corporation. [20-1930] (CMP) [Entered: 11/18/2020 03:12 PM]
November 6, 2020 PLEADING tendered: Amicus Curiae Brief filed by Movant Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2020. [20-1930] (CMP) [Entered: 11/06/2020 02:30 PM]
November 4, 2020 MOTION for leave to file amicus curiae brief in support of Appellant filed by Movant(s) Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2020. [20-1930] (LA) [Entered: 11/04/2020 05:22 PM]
November 4, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed by Attorney Kyle R. Hosmer. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2020. [20-1930] (KH) [Entered: 11/04/2020 04:50 PM]
November 4, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2020. [20-1930] (LA) [Entered: 11/04/2020 04:39 PM]
November 4, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Securities Industry and Financial Markets Association filed by Attorney Laura Elizabeth Appleby. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2020. [20-1930] (LA) [Entered: 11/04/2020 04:36 PM]
November 2, 2020 FIVE (5) paper copies of appendix [ # 6377925-2 ] (Volumes: 5) submitted by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. [20-1930] (ATC) [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:13 PM]
November 2, 2020 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6377994-2 ] submitted by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. [20-1930] (ATC) [Entered: 11/02/2020 03:10 PM]
November 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Attorney Luc A. Despins. Certificate of service dated 11/02/2020. [20-1930] (LAD) [Entered: 11/02/2020 10:26 AM]
October 29, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-1930] (LIM) [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:22 AM]
October 29, 2020 APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/04/2020 . [20-1930] (LIM) [Entered: 10/29/2020 11:20 AM]
October 29, 2020 APPENDIX filed by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. Five paper copies of the electronically filed appendix must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 11/04/2020 [20-1930] (LIM) [Entered: 10/29/2020 09:17 AM]
October 28, 2020 APPENDIX tendered by Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-1930] (NKK) [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:43 PM]
October 28, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. [20-1930] (NKK) [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:31 PM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Nathaniel A.G. Zelinsky. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-1930] (NAZ) [Entered: 10/28/2020 08:02 PM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company filed by Attorney Reedy C. Swanson. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-1930] (RS) [Entered: 10/28/2020 07:48 PM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company filed by Attorney Mitchell P. Reich. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-1930] (MR) [Entered: 10/28/2020 07:41 PM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company filed by Attorney Sean Marotta. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-1930] (SMM) [Entered: 10/28/2020 07:32 PM]
October 28, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company filed by Attorney Neal Kumar Katyal. Certificate of service dated 10/28/2020. [20-1930] (NKK) [Entered: 10/28/2020 07:25 PM]
October 22, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Corporation and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation filed by Attorney Heriberto J. Burgos Perez. Certificate of service dated 10/22/2020. [20-1930] (HJB) [Entered: 10/22/2020 02:35 PM]
October 21, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC filed by Attorney Sarah Sloan. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2020. [20-1930] (SHS) [Entered: 10/21/2020 10:20 AM]
October 21, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC filed by Attorney Robert Loeb. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2020. [20-1930] (RML) [Entered: 10/21/2020 10:17 AM]
October 21, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Cantor-Katz Collateral Monitor LLC filed by Attorney Peter Amend. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2020. [20-1930] (PJA) [Entered: 10/21/2020 10:11 AM]
October 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) AmeriNational Community Services, LLC filed by Attorney Alejandro J. Cepeda-Diaz. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2020. [20-1930] (AJC) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:11 PM]
October 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) AmeriNational Community Services, LLC as servicer for the GDB Debt Recovery Authority filed by Attorney Arturo J. Garcia-Sola. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2020. [20-1930] (AJG) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:11 PM]
October 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) AmeriNational Community Services, LLC as servicer for the GDB Debt Recovery Authority filed by Attorney Nayuan Zouairabani. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2020. [20-1930] (NZ) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:07 PM]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Juan R. Torruella, Appellate Judge: Appellants' motion to expedite this appeal and appellees' cross-motion are resolved as follows: Appellants shall file their opening brief on or before October 28, 2020 ; Appellees shall file their response brief on or before December 7, 2020 ; Appellants' reply shall be filed on or before December 21, 2020 . We contemplate argument during the February 2021 sitting of this court. [20-1930] (CMP) [Entered: 10/20/2020 04:04 PM]
October 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Ashley Pavel. Certificate of service dated 10/19/2020. [20-1930] (AMP) [Entered: 10/19/2020 12:30 PM]
October 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney John J. Rapisardi. Certificate of service dated 10/19/2020. [20-1930] (JJR) [Entered: 10/19/2020 12:24 PM]
October 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Elizabeth L. McKeen. Certificate of service dated 10/19/2020. [20-1930] (ELM) [Entered: 10/19/2020 12:18 PM]
October 19, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Peter Friedman. Certificate of service dated 10/19/2020. [20-1930] (PMF) [Entered: 10/19/2020 12:13 PM]
October 16, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation to response and motion [ # 6374594-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2020. [20-1930] (NKK) [Entered: 10/16/2020 11:26 AM]
October 16, 2020 LETTER regarding typographical error in the Board's opposition to Appellants' motion to expedite (Doc. No. 117656107) filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan for Appellees Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, FOMB, Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority and Not Party Employees' Retirement System of the Government of Puerto Rico. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2020. [20-1930] (TWM) [Entered: 10/16/2020 09:23 AM]
October 15, 2020 RESPONSE to motion to expedite [ # 6373857-2 ] and CROSS MOTION for expedited briefing schedule filed by Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority. Certificate of service dated 10/15/2020. [20-1930]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (TWM) [Entered: 10/15/2020 11:50 AM]
October 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Lary Alan Rappaport. Certificate of service dated 10/15/2020. [20-1930] (LAR) [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:48 AM]
October 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Margaret A. Dale. Certificate of service dated 10/15/2020. [20-1930] (MAD) [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:45 AM]
October 15, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Jeffrey W. Levitan. Certificate of service dated 10/15/2020. [20-1930] (JWL) [Entered: 10/15/2020 09:41 AM]
October 14, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Eric Perez-Ochoa, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 10/14/2020. [20-1930] (EP) [Entered: 10/14/2020 05:19 PM]
October 13, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1930] (GS) [Entered: 10/13/2020 02:14 PM]
October 13, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants Assured Guaranty Corporation and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1930] (HRH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 01:11 PM]
October 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Ehud Barak. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1930] (EB) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:56 AM]
October 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1930] (MJB) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:52 AM]
October 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1930] (MDH) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:49 AM]
October 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Paul V. Possinger. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1930] (PVP) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:45 AM]
October 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Stephen L. Ratner. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1930] (SLR) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:42 AM]
October 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Michael A. Firestein. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1930] (MAF) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:39 AM]
October 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1930] (JER) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:35 AM]
October 13, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees FOMB, Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and Puerto Rico Highways and Transportation Authority filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2020. [20-1930] (TWM) [Entered: 10/13/2020 10:32 AM]
October 12, 2020 MOTION to expedite filed by Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/12/2020. [20-1930]. (NKK) [Entered: 10/12/2020 04:37 PM]
October 12, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/12/2020. [20-1930] (NKK) [Entered: 10/12/2020 04:33 PM]
October 12, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 10/12/2020. [20-1930] (NKK) [Entered: 10/12/2020 04:26 PM]
October 12, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Gregory Silbert. Certificate of service dated 10/12/2020. [20-1930] (GS) [Entered: 10/12/2020 03:39 PM]
October 12, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Corporation and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation filed by Attorney William J. Natbony. Certificate of service dated 10/12/2020. [20-1930] (WJN) [Entered: 10/12/2020 02:06 PM]
October 12, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Corporation and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation filed by Attorney Mark C. Ellenberg. Certificate of service dated 10/12/2020. [20-1930] (MCE) [Entered: 10/12/2020 02:03 PM]
October 12, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Corporation and Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation filed by Attorney Howard R. Hawkins Jr.. Certificate of service dated 10/12/2020. [20-1930] (HRH) [Entered: 10/12/2020 02:00 PM]
October 9, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Reedy C. Swanson. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2020. [20-1930] (RS) [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:43 AM]
October 9, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Mitchell P. Reich. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2020. [20-1930] (MR) [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:37 AM]
October 9, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Sean Marotta. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2020. [20-1930] (SMM) [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:23 AM]
October 9, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Ambac Assurance Corporation and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation filed by Attorney Neal Kumar Katyal. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2020. [20-1930] (NKK) [Entered: 10/09/2020 10:14 AM]
October 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (RAC) [Entered: 10/08/2020 09:43 PM]
October 8, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (DFD) [Entered: 10/08/2020 09:01 PM]
October 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney Jonathan Ohring. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (JO) [Entered: 10/08/2020 07:28 PM]
October 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney John J. Hughes, III. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (JJH) [Entered: 10/08/2020 07:24 PM]
October 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney Grant R. Mainland. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (GRM) [Entered: 10/08/2020 07:21 PM]
October 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney Atara Miller. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (AM) [Entered: 10/08/2020 07:15 PM]
October 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Ambac Assurance Corporation filed by Attorney Dennis F. Dunne. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (DFD) [Entered: 10/08/2020 07:04 PM]
October 8, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (JWC) [Entered: 10/08/2020 11:03 AM]
October 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company filed by Attorney Jason W. Callen. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (JWC) [Entered: 10/08/2020 11:01 AM]
October 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company filed by Attorney Maria E. Pico. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (MEP) [Entered: 10/08/2020 10:57 AM]
October 8, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Financial Guaranty Insurance Company filed by Attorney Martin A. Sosland. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1930] (MAS) [Entered: 10/08/2020 10:55 AM]
October 7, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #14389) filed by Appellants Ambac Assurance Corporation, Assured Guaranty Corporation, Assured Guaranty Municipal Corporation, Financial Guaranty Insurance Company and National Public Finance Guarantee Corporation. Docketing Statement due 10/21/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 10/21/2020. Appearance form due 10/21/2020. [20-1930] (CMP) [Entered: 10/07/2020 05:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Assured Guaranty Corp., et al v. Commonwealth of Puerto Rico, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: PUERTO RICO HIGHWAYS AND TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Hadassa Waxman
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Raul Castellanos-Malave
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Emanuel Rier
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: COMMONWEALTH OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Valerie Concepcion-Cintron
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Michel Mir-Martinez
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Adam Deming
Represented By: Elliot Rainer Stevens
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Represented By: Peter D. Doyle
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Jennifer L. Roche
Represented By: Susana I. Penagaricano Brown
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Michael R. Hackett
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Lucia Chapman
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Adele M. El-Khouri
Represented By: Donald B. Verrilli Jr.
Represented By: Matthew J. Morris
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Valerie Concepcion-Cintron
Represented By: Michael Luskin
Represented By: Chad Golder
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Scott Rutsky
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Stephan E. Hornung
Represented By: Rachel G. Miller Ziegler
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Philip Abelson
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Julia D. Alonzo
Represented By: Josue N. Torres-Crespo
Represented By: Ginger D. Anders
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Michael A. Firestein
Represented By: Michel Mir-Martinez
Represented By: Juan Carlos Ramirez-Ortiz
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Lary Alan Rappaport
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Bradley R. Bobroff
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Represented By: Adam Deming
Represented By: Elliot Rainer Stevens
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF THE GOVERNMENT OF PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Rachel Ehrlich Albanese
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Jose Alberto Sosa-Llorens
Represented By: Richard A. Chesley
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Steven O. Weise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO SALES TAX FINANCING CORPORATION, Depository Trust Company, a/k/a Cofina
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Ricardo Burgos-Vargas
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Chris Theodoridis
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Kevin J. Perra
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)
Represented By: Gregg M. Mashberg
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Hadassa Waxman
Represented By: Carl Forbes Jr.
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: Daniel S. Shamah
Represented By: Michael Kelly Malone
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Levitan
Represented By: Jared D. Zajac
Represented By: Maria J. DiConza
Represented By: Joseph P. Davis III
Represented By: Brian S. Rosen
Represented By: William D. Dalsen
Represented By: Guy Brenner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Daniel Jose Perez-Refojos
Represented By: Gabriel A. Miranda-Rivera
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO PUBLIC BUILDINGS AUTHORITY
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX GENERAL CONTRACTORS, LLC
Represented By: Luis E. Pabon-Roca
Represented By: Clarisa I. Sola-Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: YOLANDA I. CORREA FONSECA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PV PROPERTIES, INC.
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By: Israel Fernandez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: Cristina B. Fernandez-Niggerman
Represented By: James R. Bliss
Represented By: Juan Carlos Nieves-Gonzalez
Represented By: James B. Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CANTOR-KATZ COLLATERAL MONITOR LLC, as collateral monitor for the GDB Debt Recovery Authority
Represented By: Douglas Koff
Represented By: Robert Mark Loeb
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde Torres
Represented By: Peter J. Amend
Represented By: David Litterine-Kaufman
Represented By: Sarah Hartman Sloan
Represented By: Douglas S. Mintz
Represented By: Monica Perrigino
Represented By: Abbey Walsh
Represented By: Laura Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERINATIONAL COMMUNITY SERVICES, LLC
Represented By: Alejandro Jose Cepeda-Diaz
Represented By: Arturo J. Garcia-Sola
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: AMBAC ASSURANCE CORPORATION
Represented By: Dennis F. Dunne
Represented By: Roberto A. Camara-Fuertes
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Reedy Swanson
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky
Represented By: Jonathan Ohring
Represented By: Grant R. Mainland
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Represented By: John Joseph Hughes III
Represented By: Atara Miller
Represented By: Sonia E. Colon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: FINANCIAL GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Martin A. Sosland
Represented By: Maria Emilia Pico
Represented By: Jason W. Callen
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Reedy Swanson
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ASSURED GUARANTY CORPORATION
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas-Sanchez
Represented By: Casey J. Servais
Represented By: Heriberto J. Burgos-Perez
Represented By: Thomas J. Curtin
Represented By: Howard Robert Hawkins Jr.
Represented By: Mark C. Ellenberg
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Reedy Swanson
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: NATIONAL PUBLIC FINANCE GUARANTEE CORPORATION
Represented By: Jonathan D. Polkes
Represented By: Eric Perez-Ochoa
Represented By: Kelly Diblasi
Represented By: Robert Berezin
Represented By: Gregory Silbert
Represented By: Gabriel Morgan
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Reedy Swanson
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Represented By: Luis A. Oliver-Fraticelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ASSURED GUARANTY MUNICIPAL CORPORATION
Represented By: William J. Natbony
Represented By: Ricardo F. Casellas-Sanchez
Represented By: Casey J. Servais
Represented By: Heriberto J. Burgos-Perez
Represented By: Thomas J. Curtin
Represented By: Howard Robert Hawkins Jr.
Represented By: Mark C. Ellenberg
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Reedy Swanson
Represented By: Mitchell Reich
Represented By: Sean Michael Marotta
Represented By: Nathaniel Avi Gideon Zelinsky
Represented By: Neal Kumar Katyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CRUZ-HERNANDEZ PLAINTIFF GROUP
Represented By: Ivonne Gonzalez-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: NILDA AGOSTO MALDONADO PLAINTIFF GROUP
Represented By: Ivonne Gonzalez-Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: ARACELIS NAZARIO TORRES
Represented By: Carlos Alberto Ruiz Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: MARIA CONSUELO FIGUEROA TORRES
Represented By: Vanessa Hernandez Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: CONSEJO DE SALUD DE LA COMUNIDAD DE LA PLAYA DE PONCE, INC.
Represented By: Charles Alfred Cuprill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Carolina Velaz-Rivero
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: John J. Rapisardi
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Represented By: Ashley M. Pavel
Represented By: Suzzanne Uhland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SECURITIES INDUSTRY AND FINANCIAL MARKETS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Kevin M. Carroll
Represented By: Laura Appleby
Represented By: Kyle Hosmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?