The Gaspee Project, et al v. Mederos, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DIANE C. MEDEROS, in her official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections, DAVID H. SHOLES, in his official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections, RICHARD H. PIERCE, in his official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections, ISADORE S. RAMOS, in her official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections, STEPHEN P. ERICKSON, in his official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections, JENNIFER L. JOHNSON, in her official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections and WILLIAM E. WEST, in his official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections
Plaintiff / Appellant: ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT and GASPEE PROJECT
Case Number: 20-1944
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2020 APPENDIX tendered by Appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project. Certificate of service dated 11/30/2020. [20-1944] (DRS) [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:37 PM]
November 30, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project. [20-1944] (DRS) [Entered: 11/30/2020 02:29 PM]
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. The brief filed by appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project on November 16, 2020 is not in compliance. Appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project are ordered to file a conforming brief by November 30, 2020 . The corrected brief must be served on all parties to the appeal, and the certificate of service must be updated to include the new date of service. The due date for appellee's brief shall run from service of the corrected brief, in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 31. [20-1944] (GB) [Entered: 11/23/2020 03:28 PM]
November 18, 2020 NOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Lisa Schwam: 07/21/2020, Motion Hearing. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [20-1944] (GB) [Entered: 11/18/2020 01:35 PM]
November 17, 2020 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued directing appellants to file an appendix or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 45.0(a). Appendix due 12/01/2020 . [20-1944] (GB) [Entered: 11/17/2020 06:26 AM]
November 16, 2020 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project. [20-1944] (DRS) [Entered: 11/16/2020 06:50 PM]
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered. Upon consideration of notice in response to show cause order, Appellants' brief and appendix remain due on November 16, 2020. Either party may file a supplemental appendix provided that it is filed before briefing is complete. [20-1944] (GB) [Entered: 11/05/2020 03:28 PM]
November 3, 2020 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Brian Kelsey for Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project. [20-1944] (GB) [Entered: 11/03/2020 06:03 AM]
October 23, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Diane C. Mederos, Stephen P. Erickson, Jennifer L. Johnson, Richard H. Pierce, Isadore S. Ramos, David H. Sholes and William E. West filed by Attorney Santiago H. Posas. Certificate of service dated 10/23/2020. [20-1944] (SHP) [Entered: 10/23/2020 11:10 AM]
October 22, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project filed by Attorney Jeffrey Schwab. Certificate of service dated 10/22/2020. [20-1944] (JMS) [Entered: 10/22/2020 12:06 PM]
October 21, 2020 NOTICE in response to Clerk's show-cause order of 10/9/20 filed by Appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project. Certificate of service dated 10/21/2020. [20-1944] (DRS) [Entered: 10/21/2020 05:54 PM]
October 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Stephen P. Erickson, Jennifer L. Johnson, Diane C. Mederos, Richard H. Pierce, Isadore S. Ramos, David H. Sholes and William E. West filed by Attorney Raymond A. Marcaccio. Certificate of service dated 10/20/2020. [20-1944] (RAM) [Entered: 10/20/2020 09:22 AM]
October 19, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ordered: 07/21/2020, Motion to Dismiss Hearing. Transcript due 11/18/2020 from Court Reporter Lisa Schwam. [20-1944] (GB) [Entered: 10/18/2020 07:43 AM]
October 19, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 11/02/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Brian Kelsey for Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project and Jeffrey M. Schwab for Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project. [20-1944] (GB) [Entered: 10/18/2020 07:33 AM]
October 16, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 10/16/2020. [20-1944] (DRS) [Entered: 10/16/2020 03:04 PM]
October 9, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project filed by Attorney Daniel R. Suhr. Certificate of service dated 10/09/2020. [20-1944] (DRS) [Entered: 10/09/2020 12:03 PM]
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered. Upon consideration of appellees' notice, the parties shall advise the court in writing on or before October 23, 2020 whether a transcript is being ordered and attach a copy of the transcript order form, if applicable. [20-1944] (GB) [Entered: 10/09/2020 06:25 AM]
October 8, 2020 NOTICE filed by Appellees Stephen P. Erickson, Jennifer L. Johnson, Diane C. Mederos, Richard H. Pierce, Isadore S. Ramos, David H. Sholes and William E. West. Certificate of service dated 10/08/2020. [20-1944] (KCS) [Entered: 10/08/2020 04:24 PM]
October 7, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 11/16/2020 for appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-1944] (GB) [Entered: 10/07/2020 04:57 PM]
October 5, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Illinois Opportunity Project and Gaspee Project. Certificate of service dated 10/05/2020. [20-1944] (JSL) [Entered: 10/05/2020 05:21 PM]
October 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project filed by Attorney Joseph S. Larisa, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 10/05/2020. [20-1944] (JSL) [Entered: 10/05/2020 05:17 PM]
October 5, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Diane C. Mederos, Stephen P. Erickson, Jennifer L. Johnson, Richard H. Pierce, Isadore S. Ramos, David H. Sholes and William E. West filed by Attorney Katherine Connolly Sadeck. Certificate of service dated 10/05/2020. [20-1944] (KCS) [Entered: 10/05/2020 02:01 PM]
October 2, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #32) filed by Appellants Gaspee Project and Illinois Opportunity Project. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 10/16/2020 . [20-1944] (GB) [Entered: 10/02/2020 08:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: The Gaspee Project, et al v. Mederos, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DIANE C. MEDEROS, in her official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections
Represented By: Raymond A. Marcaccio
Represented By: Katherine Connolly Sadeck
Represented By: Sean Lyness
Represented By: Keith David Hoffmann
Represented By: Santiago H. Posas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID H. SHOLES, in his official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections
Represented By: Raymond A. Marcaccio
Represented By: Katherine Connolly Sadeck
Represented By: Sean Lyness
Represented By: Keith David Hoffmann
Represented By: Santiago H. Posas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RICHARD H. PIERCE, in his official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections
Represented By: Raymond A. Marcaccio
Represented By: Katherine Connolly Sadeck
Represented By: Sean Lyness
Represented By: Keith David Hoffmann
Represented By: Santiago H. Posas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ISADORE S. RAMOS, in her official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections
Represented By: Raymond A. Marcaccio
Represented By: Katherine Connolly Sadeck
Represented By: Sean Lyness
Represented By: Keith David Hoffmann
Represented By: Santiago H. Posas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN P. ERICKSON, in his official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections
Represented By: Raymond A. Marcaccio
Represented By: Katherine Connolly Sadeck
Represented By: Sean Lyness
Represented By: Keith David Hoffmann
Represented By: Santiago H. Posas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JENNIFER L. JOHNSON, in her official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections
Represented By: Raymond A. Marcaccio
Represented By: Katherine Connolly Sadeck
Represented By: Sean Lyness
Represented By: Keith David Hoffmann
Represented By: Santiago H. Posas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM E. WEST, in his official capacity as member of the Rhode Island State Board of Elections
Represented By: Raymond A. Marcaccio
Represented By: Katherine Connolly Sadeck
Represented By: Sean Lyness
Represented By: Keith David Hoffmann
Represented By: Santiago H. Posas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ILLINOIS OPPORTUNITY PROJECT
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Schwab
Represented By: Brian Kelsey
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Joseph S. Larisa Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GASPEE PROJECT
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Schwab
Represented By: Brian Kelsey
Represented By: Daniel Robert Suhr
Represented By: Joseph S. Larisa Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Schwab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?