Pena Martinez, et al v. US Dep't of Health and Human, et al
Plaintiff: JUAN RAMON VELEZ MARRERO
Defendant: UNITED STATES and US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Plaintiff / Appellee: RAMON LUIS RIVERA RIVERA, GAMALY VELEZ SANTIAGO, YOMARA VALDERRAMA SANTIAGO, MARITZA ROSADO CONCEPCION, VICTOR RAMON ILARRAZA ACEVEDO, MARIA LUISA AGUILAR GALINDEZ, NELIDA SANTIAGO ALVAREZ, ROSA MARIA ILARRAZA ROSADO and SIXTA GLADYS PENA-MARTINEZ
Interested Party: ALLARD K. LOWENSTEIN INTERNATIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS CLINIC AT YALE LAW SCHOOL, ESPACIOS ABIERTOS, LLC, PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, NYDIA M. VELAZQUEZ, Congresswoman and PUERTO RICO FOOD MARKETING, INDUSTRY AND DISTRIBUTION CHAMBER (MIDA)
Defendant / Appellant: US DEPT OF AGRICULTURE, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, SONNY PERDUE, in his official capacity as Secretary of Agriculture, SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION, ANDREW M. SAUL, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Social Security and ALEX MICHAEL AZAR, II, in his official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 20-1946
Filed: October 2, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Maria Luisa Aguilar Galindez, Victor Ramon Ilarraza Acevedo, Rosa Maria Ilarraza Rosado, Sixta Gladys Pena-Martinez, Ramon Luis Rivera Rivera, Maritza Rosado Concepcion, Nelida Santiago Alvarez, Yomara Valderrama Santiago and Gamaly Velez Santiago to motion to stay [ # 6371965-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 10/07/2020. [20-1946] (KMS) [Entered: 10/07/2020 10:47 PM]
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to amend caption filed by Appellees Sixta Gladys Pena-Martinez, Nelida Santiago Alvarez, Maria Luisa Aguilar Galindez, Gamaly Velez Santiago, Victor Ramon Ilarraza Acevedo, Rosa Maria Ilarraza Rosado, Ramon Luis Rivera Rivera, Yomara Valderrama Santiago and Maritza Rosado Concepcion. [20-1946] (CMP) [Entered: 10/06/2020 09:17 AM]
October 2, 2020 MOTION to amend caption filed by Appellees Maria Luisa Aguilar Galindez, Victor Ramon Ilarraza Acevedo, Rosa Maria Ilarraza Rosado, Sixta Gladys Pena-Martinez, Ramon Luis Rivera Rivera, Maritza Rosado Concepcion, Nelida Santiago Alvarez, Yomara Valderrama Santiago and Gamaly Velez Santiago. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2020. [20-1946] (RE) [Entered: 10/02/2020 06:18 PM]
October 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Alex Michael Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services and Sonny Perdue filed by Attorney Abby C. Wright. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2020. [20-1946] (ACW) [Entered: 10/02/2020 04:46 PM]
October 2, 2020 AMENDED MOTION to stay injunction pending appeal, or in the alternative for temporary administrative stay filed by Appellants Alex Michael Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Sonny Perdue, Andrew M. Saul, SSA and USDA. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2020. [20-1946] (LM) [Entered: 10/02/2020 04:05 PM]
October 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Maria Luisa Aguilar Galindez, Victor Ramon Ilarraza Acevedo, Sixta Gladys Pena-Martinez, Ramon Luis Rivera Rivera, Maritza Rosado Concepcion, Nelida Santiago Alvarez, Yomara Valderrama Santiago and Gamaly Velez Santiago filed by Attorney Rafael Escalera Rodriguez. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2020. [20-1946] (RE) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:33 PM]
October 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Maria Luisa Aguilar Galindez, Victor Ramon Ilarraza Acevedo, Sixta Gladys Pena-Martinez, Ramon Luis Rivera Rivera, Maritza Rosado Concepcion, Nelida Santiago Alvarez, Yomara Valderrama Santiago and Gamaly Velez Santiago filed by Attorney Alana Vizcarrondo-Santana. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2020. [20-1946] (AMV) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:29 PM]
October 2, 2020 EMERGENCY MOTION to stay injunction pending appeal, and in the alternative, for temporary administrative stay filed by Appellants Alex Michael Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Sonny Perdue, Andrew M. Saul, SSA and USDA. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2020. [20-1946] (LM) [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:03 PM]
October 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Maria Luisa Aguilar Galindez, Victor Ramon Ilarraza Acevedo, Sixta Gladys Pena-Martinez, Ramon Luis Rivera Rivera, Maritza Rosado Concepcion, Nelida Santiago Alvarez, Yomara Valderrama Santiago and Gamaly Velez Santiago filed by Attorney Jonathan Cooper. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2020. [20-1946] (JGC) [Entered: 10/02/2020 02:55 PM]
October 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Yomara Valderrama Santiago, Maria Luisa Aguilar Galindez, Sixta Gladys Pena-Martinez, Ramon Luis Rivera Rivera, Maritza Rosado Concepcion, Nelida Santiago Alvarez, Gamaly Velez Santiago and Victor Ramon Ilarraza Acevedo filed by Attorney Kathleen M. Sullivan. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2020. [20-1946] (KMS) [Entered: 10/02/2020 02:55 PM]
October 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Alex Michael Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Sonny Perdue, Andrew M. Saul, SSA and USDA filed by Attorney Laura E. Myron. Certificate of service dated 10/02/2020. [20-1946] (LM) [Entered: 10/02/2020 01:08 PM]
October 2, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #101) filed by Appellants Alex Michael Azar, II, Department of Health and Human Services, Sonny Perdue, Andrew M. Saul, SSA and USDA. Docketing Statement due 10/16/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 10/16/2020. Appearance form due 10/16/2020. [20-1946] (CMP) [Entered: 10/02/2020 12:22 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Pena Martinez, et al v. US Dep't of Health and Human, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAMON LUIS RIVERA RIVERA
Represented By: Efren Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GAMALY VELEZ SANTIAGO
Represented By: Efren Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: YOMARA VALDERRAMA SANTIAGO
Represented By: Efren Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARITZA ROSADO CONCEPCION
Represented By: Efren Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VICTOR RAMON ILARRAZA ACEVEDO
Represented By: Efren Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARIA LUISA AGUILAR GALINDEZ
Represented By: Efren Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NELIDA SANTIAGO ALVAREZ
Represented By: Efren Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROSA MARIA ILARRAZA ROSADO
Represented By: Efren Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SIXTA GLADYS PENA-MARTINEZ
Represented By: Efren Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Jonathan Gordon Cooper
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALLARD K. LOWENSTEIN INTERNATIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS CLINIC AT YALE LAW SCHOOL
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: James Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ESPACIOS ABIERTOS, LLC
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NYDIA M. VELAZQUEZ, Congresswoman
Represented By: Kathleen R. Heilman
Represented By: Emily Baver Slavin
Represented By: Luis Miguel Pellot Julia Jr.
Represented By: Donald C. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO FOOD MARKETING, INDUSTRY AND DISTRIBUTION CHAMBER (MIDA)
Represented By: Jose Rafael Gonzalez-Irizarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US ATTORNEY'S OFFICE
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: US DEPT OF AGRICULTURE
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Laura Myron
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Laura Myron
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SONNY PERDUE, in his official capacity as Secretary of Agriculture
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Laura Myron
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Laura Myron
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ANDREW M. SAUL, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Laura Myron
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEX MICHAEL AZAR, II, in his official capacity as Secretary of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Mariana E. Bauza Almonte
Represented By: Laura Myron
Represented By: Abby Christine Wright
Represented By: Daniel Riess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUAN RAMON VELEZ MARRERO
Represented By: Efren Rivera-Ramos
Represented By: Kathleen M. Sullivan
Represented By: Eugenio C. Romero
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Daniel A. Salinas-Serrano
Represented By: Rafael Escalera-Rodriguez
Represented By: Derek L. Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?