UTIER, et al v. PREPA, et al
Petitioner: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee
Debtor: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)
Interested Party: SCOTIABANK DE PUERTO RICO, OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS, WINDMAR RENEWABLE ENERGY, INC., ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO, WHITEFISH ENERGY HOLDINGS, LLC, PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION, INSTITUTO DE COMPETITIVIDAD Y SOSTENIBILIDAD ECONOMICA DE PUERTO RICO, CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS, COBRA ACQUISITIONS LLC, SOLUS ALTERNATIVE ASSET MANAGEMENT LP, PUERTO RICO HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, CORTLAND CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES LLC, SISTEMA DE RETIRO DE LOS EMPLEADOS DE LA AUTORIDAD DE ENERGIA ELECTRICA, (SREAEE), ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO, CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS, UNION DE TRABAJADORES DE LA INDUSTRIA ELECTRICA Y RIEGO, (UTIER), ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS Y CONSULTORES DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO, CORTLAND CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES LLC, as successor administrative agent and LUMA ENERGY LLC
Appellee: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
3Rd Party Plaintiff: GS FAJARDO SOLAR LLC
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS, United States Trustee and US TRUSTEE-REGION 21, US Trustee
Debtor / Appellee: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Case Number: 20-2041
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 BRIEFING schedule set. Appendix and Brief due 02/16/2021 for appellant Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and Union de Trabajadores de la Industria Electrica y Riego. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-2041] (GRC) [Entered: 01/04/2021 12:38 PM]
December 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Ashley Pavel. Certificate of service dated 12/03/2020. [20-2041] (AMP) [Entered: 12/03/2020 01:08 PM]
December 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Nancy A. Mitchell. Certificate of service dated 12/03/2020. [20-2041] (NAM) [Entered: 12/03/2020 01:02 PM]
December 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Peter Friedman. Certificate of service dated 12/03/2020. [20-2041] (PMF) [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:57 PM]
December 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee AAFAF filed by Attorney Elizabeth L. McKeen. Certificate of service dated 12/03/2020. [20-2041] (ELM) [Entered: 12/03/2020 12:52 PM]
December 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FOMB and Not Party Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Ehud Barak. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2020. [20-2041] (EB) [Entered: 12/02/2020 10:54 AM]
December 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FOMB and Not Party Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Martin J. Bienenstock. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2020. [20-2041] (MJB) [Entered: 12/02/2020 10:51 AM]
December 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FOMB and Not Party Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Margaret A. Dale. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2020. [20-2041] (MAD) [Entered: 12/02/2020 10:48 AM]
December 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FOMB and Not Party Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Mark D. Harris. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2020. [20-2041] (MDH) [Entered: 12/02/2020 10:45 AM]
December 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FOMB and Not Party Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Paul V. Possinger. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2020. [20-2041] (PVP) [Entered: 12/02/2020 10:42 AM]
December 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FOMB and Not Party Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Laura E. Stafford. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2020. [20-2041] (LES) [Entered: 12/02/2020 10:39 AM]
December 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FOMB and Not Party Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney John E. Roberts. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2020. [20-2041] (JER) [Entered: 12/02/2020 10:36 AM]
December 2, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FOMB and Not Party Puerto Rico Electric Power Authority (PREPA) filed by Attorney Timothy W. Mungovan. Certificate of service dated 12/02/2020. [20-2041] (TWM) [Entered: 12/02/2020 10:33 AM]
November 23, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and UTIER filed by Attorney Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg. Certificate of service dated 11/23/2020. [20-2041] (JEM) [Entered: 11/23/2020 04:57 PM]
November 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants UTIER and Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica filed by Attorney Rolando Emmanuelli Jimenez. Certificate of service dated 11/20/2020. [20-2041] (RE) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:41 PM]
November 20, 2020 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellants UTIER and Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica. Certificate of service dated 11/20/2020. [20-2041] (RE) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:39 PM]
November 20, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants UTIER and Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 11/20/2020. [20-2041] (RE) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:38 PM]
November 20, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants UTIER and Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica. Certificate of service dated 11/20/2020. [20-2041] (RE) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:36 PM]
November 20, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and UTIER filed by Attorney Jessica Esther Mendez Colberg. Certificate of service dated 11/20/2020. [20-2041] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (11/25/2020). (RE) [Entered: 11/20/2020 03:35 PM]
November 19, 2020 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellants Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and UTIER on 10/27/2020. [20-2041] (GRC) [Entered: 11/19/2020 12:57 PM]
November 19, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #2269) filed by Appellants Sistema de Retiro de los Empleados de la Autoridad de Energia Electrica and UTIER. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 12/03/2020. [20-2041] (GRC) [Entered: 11/19/2020 12:14 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: UTIER, et al v. PREPA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: PUERTO RICO ELECTRIC POWER AUTHORITY (PREPA)
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Richard G. Mason
Represented By: Michael E. Comerford
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Alberto Juan Enrique Aneses-Negron
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Chantel L. Febus
Represented By: Ericka C. Montull-Novoa
Represented By: Emil A. Kleinhaus
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: David D. Cleary
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Andrew V. Tenzer
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Kevin Finger
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Brian Bolin
Represented By: Diana M. Batlle-Barasorda
Represented By: Amy R. Wolf
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad
Represented By: Nathan A. Haynes
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SCOTIABANK DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Richard G. Mason
Represented By: Michael E. Comerford
Represented By: Alberto Juan Enrique Aneses-Negron
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: Ericka C. Montull-Novoa
Represented By: Emil A. Kleinhaus
Represented By: Andrew V. Tenzer
Represented By: Brian Bolin
Represented By: Diana M. Batlle-Barasorda
Represented By: Amy R. Wolf
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By: Michael E. Comerford
Represented By: Alberto Juan Enrique Aneses-Negron
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: Ericka C. Montull-Novoa
Represented By: Andrew V. Tenzer
Represented By: Diana M. Batlle-Barasorda
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Represented By: Juan Carlos Nieves-Gonzalez
Represented By: Israel Fernandez-Rodriguez
Represented By: Nicholas A. Bassett
Represented By: Cristina B. Fernandez-Niggerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WINDMAR RENEWABLE ENERGY, INC.
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WHITEFISH ENERGY HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Ann Marie Uetz
Represented By: Luisa Sussette Valle-Castro
Represented By: Carmen D. Conde Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO MANUFACTURERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INSTITUTO DE COMPETITIVIDAD Y SOSTENIBILIDAD ECONOMICA DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Michael E. Comerford
Represented By: Alberto Juan Enrique Aneses-Negron
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: Ericka C. Montull-Novoa
Represented By: Andrew V. Tenzer
Represented By: Diana M. Batlle-Barasorda
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMARA DE MERCADEO, INDUSTRIA Y DISTRIBUCION DE ALIMENTOS
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COBRA ACQUISITIONS LLC
Represented By: Allison S. Thornton
Represented By: Stephen M. Baldini
Represented By: Fernando Van Derdy
Represented By: Ira S. Dizengoff
Represented By: Alana Michelle Vizcarrondo-Santana
Represented By: Sylvia M. Arizmendi
Represented By: Scott M. Heimberg
Represented By: Philip C. Dublin
Represented By: Thomas P. McLish
Represented By: Rafael Escalera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOLUS ALTERNATIVE ASSET MANAGEMENT LP
Represented By: Richard G. Mason
Represented By: Michael E. Comerford
Represented By: Alberto Juan Enrique Aneses-Negron
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: Ericka C. Montull-Novoa
Represented By: Emil A. Kleinhaus
Represented By: Andrew V. Tenzer
Represented By: Brian Bolin
Represented By: Diana M. Batlle-Barasorda
Represented By: Amy R. Wolf
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PUERTO RICO HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CORTLAND CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Emil A. Kleinhaus
Represented By: Joseph C. Celentino
Represented By: Amy R. Wolf
Represented By: Angela K. Herring
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SISTEMA DE RETIRO DE LOS EMPLEADOS DE LA AUTORIDAD DE ENERGIA ELECTRICA, (SREAEE)
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE RESTAURANTES DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CENTRO UNIDO DE DETALLISTAS
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNION DE TRABAJADORES DE LA INDUSTRIA ELECTRICA Y RIEGO, (UTIER)
Represented By: Jessica Esther Mendez-Colberg
Represented By: Rolando Emmanuelli-Jimenez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASOCIACION DE CONTRATISTAS Y CONSULTORES DE ENERGIA RENOVABLE DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CORTLAND CAPITAL MARKET SERVICES LLC, as successor administrative agent
Represented By: Richard G. Mason
Represented By: Emil A. Kleinhaus
Represented By: Joseph C. Celentino
Represented By: Amy R. Wolf
Represented By: Angela K. Herring
Represented By: Nayuan Zouairabani-Trinidad
Represented By: Michael Cassel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LUMA ENERGY LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PUERTO RICO FISCAL AGENCY AND FINANCIAL ADVISORY AUTHORITY
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Daniel Desatnik
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: David D. Cleary
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Kevin Finger
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Nathan A. Haynes
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Michael Kelly Malone
Represented By: Ashley M. Pavel
Represented By: Luis C. Marini-Biaggi
Represented By: Maria J. DiConza
Represented By: Peter M. Friedman
Represented By: John J. Rapisardi
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, as Trustee
Represented By: Iris Jannette Cabrera-Gomez
Represented By: Eric A. Tulla
Represented By: William Z. Pentelovitch
Represented By: Clark T. Whitmore
Represented By: John T. Duffey
Represented By: Jason M. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: GS FAJARDO SOLAR LLC
Represented By: Brian Uelk
Represented By: Ismael H. Herrero III
Represented By: John R. Dodd
Represented By: Fernando E. Agrait-Betancourt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: MONSITA LECAROZ-ARRIBAS, United States Trustee
Represented By: Michael E. Comerford
Represented By: Alberto Juan Enrique Aneses-Negron
Represented By: Luc A. Despins
Represented By: Ericka C. Montull-Novoa
Represented By: Andrew V. Tenzer
Represented By: Diana M. Batlle-Barasorda
Represented By: Juan J. Casillas-Ayala
Represented By: Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas
Represented By: Georg Alexander Bongartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US TRUSTEE-REGION 21, US Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor / appellee: FINANCIAL OVERSIGHT AND MANAGEMENT BOARD
Represented By: Paul V. Possinger
Represented By: Daniel Desatnik
Represented By: John E. Roberts
Represented By: Timothy W. Mungovan
Represented By: Arturo Diaz-Angueira
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Carla Garcia-Benitez
Represented By: Martin J. Bienenstock
Represented By: David D. Cleary
Represented By: Maja Zerjal
Represented By: Nancy A. Mitchell
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Kevin Finger
Represented By: Katiuska Bolanos-Lugo
Represented By: Luis Francisco Del-Valle-Emmanuelli
Represented By: Ubaldo M. Fernandez
Represented By: Ehud Barak
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Represented By: Stephen L. Ratner
Represented By: Mark David Harris
Represented By: Nathan A. Haynes
Represented By: Hermann D. Bauer-Alvarez
Represented By: Michael Kelly Malone
Represented By: Jennifer L. Jones
Represented By: Ashley M. Pavel
Represented By: Peter M. Friedman
Represented By: Laura E. Stafford
Represented By: Elizabeth Lemond McKeen
Represented By: Margaret Antinori Dale
Represented By: Daniel Steven Desatnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?