A.C., et al v. Raimondo, et al
Defendant: KEN WAGNER, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Education of the State of Rhode Island
Petitioner: MARTHA L. MINOW, JULIE K. WATERSTONE, DANIELLE ALLEN, MICHAEL MEREDITH EPSTEIN, SAMANTHA DENNIS and MEIRA LEVINSON
Plaintiff / Appellant: J.W., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Chanda Womack, M.S., a minor, by his parent and guardian ad litem, Mark Santow, A.F., minor, by his parent and guardian ad litem, Aletha Forcier, A.C.C., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Nicolas Cahuec, N.X., a minor, by her parents and guardians ad litem, Youa Yang and Kao Xiong, M.S., a minor, by her parents and guardians ad litem, Maruth Sok and Lap Meas, J.R.H., a minor, by her parents and guardians ad litem, Moira Hinderer and Hillary Reser, I.M., a minor, by his parents and guardians ad litem Jessica Thigpen and Anthony Thigpen, A.C., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Torrence S. Waithe, A.W., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Chanda Womack, R.F., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Aletha Forcier, K.N.M.R., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Marisol Rivera Pitre, L.M., a minor, by her parents and guardians ad litem Jessica Thigpen and Anthony Thigpen and M.M.S., a minor, by his parent and guardian ad litem, Amie Tay
Interested Party: PROFESSOR SAM WINEBURG, CIVIC ENGAGEMENT RESEARCH GROUP, CAMPAIGN FOR THE CIVIC MISSION OF SCHOOLS, JOHN FRANCIS CICILLINE, LOU FREY INSTITUTE, PROFESSOR DAVID CAMPBELL and CENTER FOR INFORMATION AND RESEARCH ON CIVIC LEARNING AND ENGAGEMENT
Defendant / Appellee: NICHOLAS A. MATTIELLO, in his official capacity as Speaker of the Rhode Island House of Representatives, GINA M. RAIMONDO, in her official capacity as Governor of the State of Rhode Island, COUNCIL ON ELEMENTARY AND SECONDARY EDUCATION, DOMINICK J. RUGGERIO, in his official capacity as President of the Rhode Island Senate, RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION and ANGELICA INFANTE-GREEN, in her official capacity as Commissioner of Education of the State of Rhode Island
Case Number: 20-2082
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) 300th Anniversary University Professor at Harvard University Martha Minow filed by Attorney Yelena Konanova. Certificate of service dated 01/21/2021. [20-2082] (YK) [Entered: 01/21/2021 12:12 PM]
January 20, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Professor Danielle Allen, Professor Meira Levinson filed by Attorney William T. Russell, Jr.. Certificate of service dated 01/20/2021. [20-2082] (WTR) [Entered: 01/20/2021 10:12 AM]
January 8, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) Samantha Dennis, and Professors Julie K. Waterstone and Michael M. Epstein, in association with the Amicus Project at Southwestern Law School filed by Attorney Michael M. Epstein. Certificate of service dated 01/08/2021. [20-2082] (MME) [Entered: 01/08/2021 03:34 PM]
January 4, 2021 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Jordan G. Mickman and Gerard Paul Cobleigh. [20-2082] (AL) [Entered: 01/04/2021 03:44 PM]
December 22, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Angelica Infante-Green, Council on Elementary and Secondary Education and Rhode Island Board of Education filed by Attorney Anthony F. Cottone. Certificate of service dated 12/22/2020. [20-2082] (AFC) [Entered: 12/22/2020 02:14 PM]
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge: Upon consideration, plaintiffs-appellants A.C., A.C.C., A.F., R.F., I.M., L.M., K.N.M.R., J.R.H., M.S., M.M.S., M.S., A.W., J.W., and N.X.'s motion seeking leave to file an oversized opening brief containing up to 19,000 is allowed. [20-2082] (AL) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:28 PM]
December 18, 2020 MOTION for leave to file oversized Brief filed by Appellants A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X. and R.F.. Certificate of service dated 12/18/2020. [20-2082] (SDZ) [Entered: 12/18/2020 10:12 AM]
December 18, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Nicholas A. Mattiello, Gina M. Raimondo and Dominick J. Ruggerio filed by Attorney Michael W. Field. Certificate of service dated 12/18/2020. [20-2082] (MWF) [Entered: 12/18/2020 09:37 AM]
December 16, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 01/25/2021 for appellant A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., N.X. and R.F.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-2082] (AL) [Entered: 12/16/2020 12:37 PM]
December 16, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 12/30/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Jordan G. Mickman for J.W., A.C., A.C.C., A.F., R.F., I.M., L.M., K.N.M.R., J.R.H., M.S., M.M.S., A.W. and N.X. and Gerard Paul Cobleigh for David Campbell, Campaign for the Civic Mission of Schools, Center for Information and Research on Civic Learning and Engagement, Lou Frey Institute, Civic Engagement Research Group and Sam Wineburg. [20-2082] (AL) [Entered: 12/16/2020 12:21 PM]
December 16, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants A.C., A.C.C., J.W., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X. and R.F. indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 12/16/2020. [20-2082] (SDZ) [Entered: 12/16/2020 11:13 AM]
December 14, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X. and R.F. filed by Attorney Jennifer L Wood. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2020. [20-2082] (JLW) [Entered: 12/14/2020 03:31 PM]
December 3, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants A.C., A.C.C., A.F. and A.W. filed by Attorney Michael A. Rebell. Certificate of service dated 12/03/2020. [20-2082] (MAR) [Entered: 12/03/2020 11:38 AM]
December 1, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X. and R.F.. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2020. [20-2082] (SDZ) [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:04 AM]
December 1, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X. and R.F. filed by Attorney Samuel D. Zurier, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2020. [20-2082] (SDZ) [Entered: 12/01/2020 10:01 AM]
November 30, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #44) filed by Appellants A.C., A.C.C., A.F., A.W., I.M., J.R.H., J.W., K.N.M.R., L.M., M.M.S., M.S., M.S., N.X. and R.F. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 12/14/2020. [20-2082] (MNH) [Entered: 11/30/2020 04:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: A.C., et al v. Raimondo, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.W., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Chanda Womack
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M.S., a minor, by his parent and guardian ad litem, Mark Santow
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A.F., minor, by his parent and guardian ad litem, Aletha Forcier
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A.C.C., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Nicolas Cahuec
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: N.X., a minor, by her parents and guardians ad litem, Youa Yang and Kao Xiong
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M.S., a minor, by her parents and guardians ad litem, Maruth Sok and Lap Meas
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J.R.H., a minor, by her parents and guardians ad litem, Moira Hinderer and Hillary Reser
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: I.M., a minor, by his parents and guardians ad litem Jessica Thigpen and Anthony Thigpen
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A.C., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Torrence S. Waithe
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: A.W., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Chanda Womack
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: R.F., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Aletha Forcier
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: K.N.M.R., a minor, by her parent and guardian ad litem, Marisol Rivera Pitre
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: L.M., a minor, by her parents and guardians ad litem Jessica Thigpen and Anthony Thigpen
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: M.M.S., a minor, by his parent and guardian ad litem, Amie Tay
Represented By: Jennifer Louise Wood
Represented By: Samuel D. Zurier
Represented By: Jordan G. Mickman
Represented By: Michael A. Rebell
Represented By: Stephen M. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PROFESSOR SAM WINEBURG
Represented By: Gerard Paul Cobleigh
Represented By: Andrew J. Ceresney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CIVIC ENGAGEMENT RESEARCH GROUP
Represented By: Gerard Paul Cobleigh
Represented By: Andrew J. Ceresney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMPAIGN FOR THE CIVIC MISSION OF SCHOOLS
Represented By: Gerard Paul Cobleigh
Represented By: Andrew J. Ceresney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOHN FRANCIS CICILLINE
Represented By: John Francis Cicilline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LOU FREY INSTITUTE
Represented By: Gerard Paul Cobleigh
Represented By: Andrew J. Ceresney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PROFESSOR DAVID CAMPBELL
Represented By: Gerard Paul Cobleigh
Represented By: Andrew J. Ceresney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CENTER FOR INFORMATION AND RESEARCH ON CIVIC LEARNING AND ENGAGEMENT
Represented By: Gerard Paul Cobleigh
Represented By: Andrew J. Ceresney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICHOLAS A. MATTIELLO, in his official capacity as Speaker of the Rhode Island House of Representatives
Represented By: Andrea M. Shea
Represented By: Keith David Hoffmann
Represented By: Michael W. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GINA M. RAIMONDO, in her official capacity as Governor of the State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Andrea M. Shea
Represented By: Keith David Hoffmann
Represented By: Michael W. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNCIL ON ELEMENTARY AND SECONDARY EDUCATION
Represented By: Anthony Francis Cottone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DOMINICK J. RUGGERIO, in his official capacity as President of the Rhode Island Senate
Represented By: Andrea M. Shea
Represented By: Keith David Hoffmann
Represented By: Michael W. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Anthony Francis Cottone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELICA INFANTE-GREEN, in her official capacity as Commissioner of Education of the State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Anthony Francis Cottone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEN WAGNER, in his official capacity as Commissioner of Education of the State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Anthony Francis Cottone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARTHA L. MINOW
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JULIE K. WATERSTONE
Represented By: Michael Meredith Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DANIELLE ALLEN
Represented By: William T. Russell Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAEL MEREDITH EPSTEIN
Represented By: Michael Meredith Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SAMANTHA DENNIS
Represented By: Michael Meredith Epstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MEIRA LEVINSON
Represented By: William T. Russell Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?