Agustin v. Rosen, et al
Petitioner: ELEAZAR JOEL SANDOVAL AGUSTIN
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Security, Department of Homeland Security, KRISTEN SMITH, Field Office Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, MARK KOUMANS, Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, US DEPT. OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES and WILLIAM P. BARR, U.S. Attorney General
Respondent / Appellee: JEFFREY ROSEN, U.S. Attorney General and CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 20-2108
Filed: December 16, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 NINE (9) paper copies of appellant/petitioner brief [ # 6400416-2 ] submitted by Appellant Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin. [20-2108] (AJ) [Entered: 02/11/2021 11:35 AM]
February 9, 2021 APPENDIX filed by Appellant Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2021. [20-2108] (AVN) [Entered: 02/09/2021 01:20 PM]
February 9, 2021 APPELLANT'S BRIEF filed by Appellant Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2021. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 02/16/2021 . Brief due 03/11/2021 for APPELLEES Mark Koumans, Jeffrey Rosen, Kristen Smith, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Dept. of Homeland Security and Chad F. Wolf. [20-2108] (LIM) [Entered: 02/09/2021 10:02 AM]
February 9, 2021 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin. [20-2108] (HB) [Entered: 02/09/2021 08:52 AM]
February 9, 2021 APPENDIX tendered by Appellant Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin. Certificate of service dated 02/09/2021. [20-2108] (HB) [Entered: 02/09/2021 08:39 AM]
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER directing Appellant Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin to file a conforming brief and appendix. Brief and Appendix due 02/16/2021. [20-2108] (GRC) [Entered: 02/08/2021 03:13 PM]
February 2, 2021 APPENDIX tendered by Appellant Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [20-2108] (HB) [Entered: 02/02/2021 07:50 AM]
February 2, 2021 BRIEF tendered by Appellant Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin. [20-2108] (HB) [Entered: 02/02/2021 07:49 AM]
January 12, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees DHS, Chad F. Wolf, USCIS, Kristen Smith, Jeffrey Rosen and Mark Koumans filed by Attorney Anna Dichter. Certificate of service dated 01/12/2021. [20-2108] (AD) [Entered: 01/12/2021 08:50 AM]
December 31, 2020 Public docket note: Jeffrey Rosen was named Acting Attorney General of the United States on December 24, 2020. We have substituted him for William P. Barr, as the respondent. See Fed. R. App. P. 43(c)(2). [20-2108] (GRC) [Entered: 12/31/2020 10:50 AM]
December 30, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 02/08/2021 for appellant Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-2108] (GRC) [Entered: 12/30/2020 04:39 PM]
December 30, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Respondents William P. Barr, DHS, Mark Koumans, Kristen Smith, USCIS and Chad F. Wolf filed by Attorney Samuel P. Go. Certificate of service dated 12/30/2020. [20-2108] (SPG) [Entered: 12/30/2020 12:01 PM]
December 16, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Petitioner Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin. Certificate of service dated 12/16/2020. [20-2108] (HB) [Entered: 12/16/2020 02:35 PM]
December 16, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Petitioner Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin filed by Attorney Hans J. Bremer. Certificate of service dated 12/16/2020. [20-2108] (HB) [Entered: 12/16/2020 02:29 PM]
December 16, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Petitioner Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 12/16/2020. [20-2108] (HB) [Entered: 12/16/2020 02:11 PM]
December 16, 2020 NOTICE regarding application of Local Rule 18.0. [20-2108] (MNH) [Entered: 12/16/2020 10:54 AM]
December 16, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #15) filed by Petitioner Eleazar Joel Sandoval Agustin. Docketing Statement and Appearance form due 12/30/2020. [20-2108] (MNH) [Entered: 12/16/2020 10:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Agustin v. Rosen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Security, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Amy Romero
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: KRISTEN SMITH, Field Office Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Amy Romero
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK KOUMANS, Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Amy Romero
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US DEPT. OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Amy Romero
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Amy Romero
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Amy Romero
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ELEAZAR JOEL SANDOVAL AGUSTIN
Represented By: Hans Bremer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: JEFFREY ROSEN, U.S. Attorney General
Represented By: Amy Romero
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Samuel P. Go
Represented By: Anna Dichter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: CHAD F. WOLF, Acting Secretary, Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Amy Romero
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Samuel P. Go
Represented By: Anna Dichter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?