Constr. Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust v. Carbonite, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: VALERIE COSGROVE, RUBEN A. LUNA, individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, WILLIAM FENG, individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated, VALERIE COSGROVE, derivatively on behalf of CARBONITE, INC. and MICHAEL RANDOLPH, derivatively on behalf of CARBONITE, INC.
Defendant: LINDA CONNLY, MARINA LEVINSON, CHARLES F. KANE, TODD KRASNOW, DAVID FRIEND, SCOTT A. DANIELS and STEPHEN MUNFORD
Defendant / Appellee: ANTHONY FOLGER, MOHAMAD S. ALI and CARBONITE, INC.
Interested Party: CAMELOT EVENT DRIVEN FUND, A Series of Frank Funds Trust, TOM JOHNATAN OR-PAZ, PETER WU and PEORIA POLICE PENSION FUND
Plaintiff / Appellant: CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY AND LABORERS JOINT PENSION TRUST
Case Number: 20-2110
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Brief due February 24, 2021 for appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Appendix due 02/24/2021 for appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/23/2020 06:48 AM]
December 21, 2020 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Certificate of service dated 12/21/2020. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/21/2020 04:42 PM]
December 15, 2020 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 01/25/2021 for appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/15/2020 10:44 AM]
December 15, 2020 NOTICE issued. After 12/29/2020, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Robert D. Gerson and Philip T. Merenda for Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/15/2020 08:52 AM]
December 14, 2020 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2020. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/14/2020 12:09 PM]
December 14, 2020 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Certificate of service dated 12/14/2020. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/14/2020 12:08 PM]
December 11, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Carbonite, Inc., Mohamad S. Ali and Anthony Folger filed by Attorney Immanuel R. Foster. Certificate of service dated 12/11/2020. [20-2110] (IF) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:49 PM]
December 11, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Carbonite, Inc., Mohamad S. Ali and Anthony Folger filed by Attorney Alisha Q. Nanda. Certificate of service dated 12/11/2020. [20-2110] (AQN) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:46 PM]
December 11, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Carbonite, Inc., Mohamad S. Ali and Anthony Folger filed by Attorney James R. Carroll. Certificate of service dated 12/11/2020. [20-2110] (JRC) [Entered: 12/11/2020 12:44 PM]
December 1, 2020 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust filed by Attorney Andrew S. Love. Certificate of service dated 12/01/2020. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 12/01/2020 07:01 PM]
November 30, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #66) filed by Appellant Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust. Docketing Statement due 12/14/2020. Transcript Report/Order form due 12/14/2020. Appearance form due 12/14/2020. [20-2110] (AL) [Entered: 11/30/2020 12:57 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Constr. Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust v. Carbonite, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY FOLGER
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Alisha Q. Nanda
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MOHAMAD S. ALI
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Alisha Q. Nanda
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CARBONITE, INC.
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Alisha Q. Nanda
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA CONNLY
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Alisha Q. Nanda
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARINA LEVINSON
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Alisha Q. Nanda
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES F. KANE
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Alisha Q. Nanda
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TODD KRASNOW
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Alisha Q. Nanda
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID FRIEND
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Alisha Q. Nanda
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT A. DANIELS
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Alisha Q. Nanda
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MUNFORD
Represented By: Immanuel Foster
Represented By: Alisha Q. Nanda
Represented By: James R. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAMELOT EVENT DRIVEN FUND, A Series of Frank Funds Trust
Represented By: Joseph P. Calandrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TOM JOHNATAN OR-PAZ
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PETER WU
Represented By: Guillaume Buell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PEORIA POLICE PENSION FUND
Represented By: Leslie R. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY AND LABORERS JOINT PENSION TRUST
Represented By: Andrew Love
Represented By: Robert D. Gerson
Represented By: Theodore Michael Hess-Mahan
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Represented By: Philip T. Merenda
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Represented By: Philip Thomas Merenda III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE COSGROVE
Represented By: Michael Ira Fistel Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUBEN A. LUNA, individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Theodore Michael Hess-Mahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM FENG, individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Daryl DeValerio Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE COSGROVE, derivatively on behalf of CARBONITE, INC.
Represented By: Michael Ira Fistel Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL RANDOLPH, derivatively on behalf of CARBONITE, INC.
Represented By: Shannon L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?