Confederacion Hipica de PR, et al v. Confederacion de Jinetes PR, et al
Defendant: JESUS GUADALUPE, RAMON SANCHEZ, ALVIN COLON, JONATHAN AGOSTO, DAVID ORTIZ, JAN CARLOS SUAREZ, JOSE A. HERNANDEZ, JORGE G. ROBLES, ISRAEL O. RODRIGUEZ, ALEXIS VALDES, ERIK RAMIREZ, ANARDIS RODRIGUEZ, JAVIER SANTIAGO, KEVIN NAVARRO, PABLO RODRIGUEZ, JOSE M. RIVERA, ALFONSO CLAUDIO, JUAN CARLOS DIAZ, YASHIRA TOLENTINO, MISAEL MOLINA, ASOCIACION DE JINETES DE PUERTO RICO, INC. and ISMAEL PEREZ
Plaintiff / Appellee: CAMARERO RACE TRACK CORP and CONFEDERACION HIPICA DE PUERTO RICO, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: MARIO M. SANCHEZ, STEVEN FRET, PEDRO GONZALEZ, CONFEDERACION DE JINETES PUERTORRIQUENOS, INC., CARLOS QUINONES, EDWIN CASTRO, LUIS NEGRON, HECTOR RIVERA, KENNEL PELLOT, SASHA ORTIZ, HECTOR BERRIOS, MIGUEL A. SANCHEZ, CINDY SOTO, DAVID ROSARIO, ABNER ADORNO and JOMAR GARCIA
Interested Party: JOCKEYS' GUILD, INC.
Case Number: 20-2172
Filed: December 21, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 03/24/2021 for appellant Abner Adorno, Hector Berrios, Edwin Castro, Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc., Steven Fret, Jomar Garcia, Pedro Gonzalez, Luis Negron, Sasha Ortiz, Kennel Pellot, Carlos Quinones, Hector Rivera, David Rosario, Mario M. Sanchez, Miguel A. Sanchez and Cindy Soto. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [19-2201, 20-2172] (ALW) [Entered: 02/12/2021 07:58 PM]
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration, Appellants Abner Adorno, Hector Berrios, Edwin Castro, Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc., Steven Fret, Jomar Garcia, Pedro Gonzalez, Luis Negron, Sasha Ortiz, Kennel Pellot, Carlos Quinones, Hector Rivera, David Rosario, Mario M. Sanchez, Miguel A. Sanchez, Cindy Soto, and Not Parties Jonathan Agosto, Asociacion de Jinetes de Puerto Rico, Inc., Alfonso Claudio, Alvin Colon, Juan Carlos Diaz, Jesus Guadalupe, Jose A. Hernandez, Jockeys' Guild, Inc., Misael Molina, Kevin Navarro, David Ortiz, Ismael Perez, Erik Ramirez, Jose M. Rivera, Jorge G. Robles, Anardis Rodriguez, Israel O. Rodriguez, Pablo Rodriguez, Ramon Sanchez, Javier Santiago, Jan Carlos Suarez, Yashira Tolentino, Alexis Valdes motion to consolidate Appeal Nos. 19-2201 and 20-2172 is granted for purposes of briefing. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(b)(2). The briefing schedule previously issued on February 28, 2020 in 19-2201 is hereby vacated. A new consolidated briefing schedule will be issued as of the date of this order. The parties are directed to use the above caption on all future filings related to these cases. [19-2201, 20-2172] (ALW) [Entered: 02/12/2021 07:35 PM]
February 11, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Thomas M. Kennedy for Appellant Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc. and Not Party Jockeys' Guild, Inc.. Copy of Notice issued January 29, 2021. Forwarding address unknown. [20-2172] (ATC) [Entered: 02/12/2021 12:10 PM]
February 4, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Thomas M. Kennedy for Appellant Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc. and Not Party Jockeys' Guild, Inc.. Copy of Notice issued January 14, 2021. Forwarding address unknown. [20-2172] (ATC) [Entered: 02/04/2021 04:18 PM]
January 29, 2021 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Thomas M. Kennedy for Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc. and Jockeys' Guild, Inc. [20-2172] (ALW) [Entered: 01/29/2021 08:06 PM]
January 27, 2021 Filing fee was paid in the district court by Appellants Abner Adorno, Hector Berrios, Edwin Castro, Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc., Steven Fret, Jomar Garcia, Pedro Gonzalez, Luis Negron, Sasha Ortiz, Kennel Pellot, Carlos Quinones, Hector Rivera, David Rosario, Mario M. Sanchez, Miguel A. Sanchez and Cindy Soto on 01/26/2021. [20-2172] (DPO) [Entered: 01/27/2021 05:00 PM]
January 27, 2021 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: Fee paid in District Court on 1/26/2021. [20-2172] (DPO) [Entered: 01/27/2021 04:59 PM]
January 25, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Thomas M. Kennedy for Appellant Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc. and Not Party Jockeys' Guild, Inc. Copy of Notice issued January 14, 2021. Forwarding address unknown. [20-2172] (ATC) [Entered: 01/25/2021 04:34 PM]
January 14, 2021 NOTICE issued. After 01/28/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Thomas M. Kennedy for Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc. and Jockeys' Guild, Inc. [20-2172] (ALW) [Entered: 01/14/2021 09:58 PM]
January 13, 2021 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Appellants Abner Adorno, Hector Berrios, Edwin Castro, Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc., Steven Fret, Jomar Garcia, Pedro Gonzalez, Luis Negron, Sasha Ortiz, Kennel Pellot, Carlos Quinones, Hector Rivera, David Rosario, Mario M. Sanchez, Miguel A. Sanchez, Cindy Soto, Not Parties Jonathan Agosto, Asociacion de Jinetes de Puerto Rico, Inc., Alfonso Claudio, Alvin Colon, Juan Carlos Diaz, Jesus Guadalupe, Jose A. Hernandez, Jockeys' Guild, Inc., Misael Molina, Kevin Navarro, David Ortiz, Ismael Perez, Erik Ramirez, Jose M. Rivera, Jorge G. Robles, Anardis Rodriguez, Israel O. Rodriguez, Pablo Rodriguez, Ramon Sanchez, Javier Santiago, Jan Carlos Suarez, Yashira Tolentino, Alexis Valdes in 20-2172, 19-2201. Certificate of service dated 01/13/2021. [20-2172, 19-2201] CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was modified to correct relief, party selection, and docket text. (PJP) [Entered: 01/13/2021 03:55 PM]
January 11, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Abner Adorno, Hector Berrios, Edwin Castro, Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc., Steven Fret, Jomar Garcia, Pedro Gonzalez, Luis Negron, Sasha Ortiz, Kennel Pellot, Carlos Quinones, Hector Rivera, David Rosario, Mario M. Sanchez, Miguel A. Sanchez and Cindy Soto. Certificate of service dated 01/11/2021. [20-2172] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case, 19-2201. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. . (PJP) [Entered: 01/11/2021 01:37 PM]
January 4, 2021 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by AAppellants Abner Adorno, Hector Berrios, Edwin Castro, Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc., Steven Fret, Jomar Garcia, Pedro Gonzalez, Luis Negron, Sasha Ortiz, Kennel Pellot, Carlos Quinones, Hector Rivera, David Rosario, Mario M. Sanchez, Miguel A. Sanchez and Cindy Soto indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2021. [20-2172] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case, 19-2201. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (AAV) [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:19 PM]
January 4, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Abner Adorno, Hector Berrios, Edwin Castro, Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc., Steven Fret, Jomar Garcia, Pedro Gonzalez, Luis Negron, Sasha Ortiz, Kennel Pellot, Carlos Quinones, Hector Rivera, David Rosario, Mario M. Sanchez, Miguel A. Sanchez and Cindy Soto. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2021. [20-2172] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should not have been filed in additional case, 19-2201. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (AAV) [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:16 PM]
January 4, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc. in 20-2172, 19-2201 filed by Attorney Peter John Porrata. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2021. [20-2172, 19-2201] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (01/13/2021). (AAV) [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:04 PM]
January 4, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Abner Adorno, Hector Berrios, Edwin Castro, Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc., Steven Fret, Jomar Garcia, Pedro Gonzalez, Luis Negron, Sasha Ortiz, Kennel Pellot, Carlos Quinones, Hector Rivera, David Rosario, Mario M. Sanchez, Miguel A. Sanchez and Cindy Soto filed by Attorney Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot. Certificate of service dated 01/04/2021. [20-2172] CLERK'S NOTE: Document should have been filed in additional case, 19-2201. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (AAV) [Entered: 01/04/2021 10:02 PM]
December 21, 2020 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #333) filed by Appellants Abner Adorno, Hector Berrios, Edwin Castro, Confederacion de Jinetes Puertorriquenos, Inc., Steven Fret, Jomar Garcia, Pedro Gonzalez, Luis Negron, Sasha Ortiz, Kennel Pellot, Carlos Quinones, Hector Rivera, David Rosario, Mario M. Sanchez, Miguel A. Sanchez and Cindy Soto. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, Appearance form, and Fee due 01/04/2021. [20-2172] (MNH) [Entered: 12/21/2020 05:25 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Confederacion Hipica de PR, et al v. Confederacion de Jinetes PR, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESUS GUADALUPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAMON SANCHEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALVIN COLON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JONATHAN AGOSTO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAN CARLOS SUAREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE A. HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JORGE G. ROBLES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISRAEL O. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEXIS VALDES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIK RAMIREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANARDIS RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAVIER SANTIAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN NAVARRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PABLO RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE M. RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALFONSO CLAUDIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUAN CARLOS DIAZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YASHIRA TOLENTINO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISAEL MOLINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASOCIACION DE JINETES DE PUERTO RICO, INC.
Represented By: Pablo H. Montaner-Cordero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ISMAEL PEREZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CAMARERO RACE TRACK CORP
Represented By: Roberto LeFranc-Morales
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Represented By: Luz Yanix Vargas Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CONFEDERACION HIPICA DE PUERTO RICO, INC.
Represented By: Francisco J. Ramos-Martinez
Represented By: Roberto LeFranc-Morales
Represented By: Manuel Porro-Vizcarra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARIO M. SANCHEZ
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: STEVEN FRET
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PEDRO GONZALEZ
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CONFEDERACION DE JINETES PUERTORRIQUENOS, INC.
Represented By: Thomas M. Kennedy
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CARLOS QUINONES
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: EDWIN CASTRO
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LUIS NEGRON
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HECTOR RIVERA
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: KENNEL PELLOT
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SASHA ORTIZ
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: HECTOR BERRIOS
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MIGUEL A. SANCHEZ
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CINDY SOTO
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DAVID ROSARIO
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ABNER ADORNO
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JOMAR GARCIA
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Represented By: Peter John Porrata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOCKEYS' GUILD, INC.
Represented By: Thomas M. Kennedy
Represented By: Axel A. Vizcarra-Pellot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?