Doe, et al v. Shibinette
Defendant: NEW HAMPSHIRE CIRCUIT COURT DISTRICT DIVISION, MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, North Conway and ST. JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL, Nashua
Plaintiff / Appellee: DEBORAH A. TAYLOR, as guardian for Scott Stephen Johnstone, HUGGINS HOSPITAL, MARY HITCHCOCK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, LITTLETON HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, (Littleton Regional Hospital), JANE ROE, MONADNOCK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL, ELLIOT HOSPITAL, COTTAGE HOSPITAL, UPPER CONNECTICUT VALLEY HOSPITAL, LRGHEALTHCARE, (Franklin Hospital and Lakes Region General Hospital), ANDROSCOGGIN VALLEY HOSPITAL, SOUTHERN NEW HAMPSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, NEW LONDON HOSPITAL, JOHN DOE, CHESHIRE MEDICAL CENTER, ALICE PECK DAY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, NEW HAMPSHIRE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER, FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SPEARE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, (Parkland Medical Center and Portsmouth Regional Hospital), WEEKS MEDICAL CENTER, VALLEY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC., CHARLES COE, CONCORD HOSPITAL and LRGHEALTHCARE, (Franklin Regional Hospital and Lakes Region General Hospital)
Defendant / Appellant: LORI SHIBINETTE, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, official capacity
3Rd Party Defendant: HONORABLE DAVID D. KING
Case Number: 21-1058
Filed: January 27, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by David J. Barron, Appellate Judge: Appellees have filed a motion to expedite this appeal; appellant opposes. Having considered the motion and opposition thereto, we grant the motion. The issues to be briefed on appeal are limited to the denial of the appellant's motions to dismiss on Eleventh Amendment and standing grounds. The parties shall file their briefs according to the following schedule: (1) Appellant shall file her brief on or before April 12, 2021; (2) Appellees shall file their brief(s) on or before May 3, 2021; (3) Any reply shall be filed on or before May 13, 2021. Motions to extend will be strongly disfavored. Argument will be scheduled as appropriate. Appellant's motion to hold briefing and oral argument in abeyance is denied. [21-1058] (AL) [Entered: 03/22/2021 04:36 PM]
March 3, 2021 RESPONSE filed by Appellees New Hampshire Hospital Association, Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital, Androscoggin Valley Hospital, Catholic Medical Center, Cheshire Medical Center, Concord Hospital, Cottage Hospital, Elliot Hospital, HCA Health Services of New Hampshire, Huggins Hospital, Littleton Hospital Association, LRGHealthcare, Mary Hitchcock Memorial Hospital, Monadnock Community Hospital, New London Hospital, Southern New Hampshire Medical Center, Speare Memorial Hospital, Upper Connecticut Valley Hospital, Valley Regional Hospital, Inc., Weeks Medical Center and Frisbie Memorial Hospital to motion [ # 6404400-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 03/03/2021. [21-1058] (MDR) [Entered: 03/03/2021 11:18 AM]
March 3, 2021 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Scott Edward Sakowski for Lori Shibinette, Lara E. Veblen Trager for Jane Roe, John Doe, Charles Coe and Deborah A. Taylor and K. Allen Brooks for New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division and David D. King. [21-1058] (DPO) [Entered: 03/03/2021 10:10 AM]
February 26, 2021 RESPONSE filed by Appellees John Doe, Charles Coe, Jane Roe and Deborah A. Taylor to motion to hold case in abeyance [ # 6404400-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 02/26/2021. [21-1058] (GRB) [Entered: 02/26/2021 04:15 PM]
February 25, 2021 MOTION to hold case in abeyance filed by Appellant Lori Shibinette. Certificate of service dated 02/25/2021. [21-1058] (SRG) [Entered: 02/25/2021 04:57 PM]
February 18, 2021 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Lori Shibinette to motion to expedite [ # 6402186-2 ]. Certificate of service dated 02/18/2021. [21-1058] (SRG) [Entered: 02/18/2021 05:10 PM]
February 17, 2021 MOTION to expedite appeal filed by Appellees John Doe, Charles Coe, Jane Roe and Deborah A. Taylor. Certificate of service dated 02/17/2021. [21-1058] (GRB) [Entered: 02/17/2021 01:43 PM]
February 12, 2021 NOTICE issued. After 02/26/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Scott Edward Sakowski for Lori Shibinette, Lara E. Veblen Trager for Jane Roe, John Doe, Charles Coe and Deborah A. Taylor and K. Allen Brooks for New Hampshire Circuit Court District Division and David D. King. [21-1058] (AL) [Entered: 02/12/2021 05:36 PM]
February 3, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) New Hampshire Hospital Association et al. filed by Attorney James P. Harris. Certificate of service dated 02/03/2021. [21-1058] (JPH) [Entered: 02/03/2021 12:05 PM]
February 2, 2021 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Lori Shibinette indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1058] (AL) [Entered: 02/05/2021 09:16 AM]
February 2, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Lori Shibinette. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1058] CLERK'S NOTE: Additional attachment must be filed separately. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (SRG) [Entered: 02/02/2021 03:06 PM]
February 2, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Lori Shibinette filed by Attorney Samuel R.V. Garland. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1058] (SRG) [Entered: 02/02/2021 03:04 PM]
February 2, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Lori Shibinette filed by Attorney Anthony J. Galdieri. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1058] (AJG) [Entered: 02/02/2021 02:58 PM]
February 2, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Movant(s) New Hampshire Hospital Association et al. filed by Attorney Michael D. Ramsdell. Certificate of service dated 02/02/2021. [21-1058] (MDR) [Entered: 02/02/2021 12:54 PM]
February 1, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Charles Coe, John Doe, Jane Roe and Deborah A. Taylor filed by Attorney Henry Klementowicz. Certificate of service dated 02/01/2021. [21-1058] (HRK) [Entered: 02/01/2021 01:34 PM]
January 28, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees John Doe, Charles Coe, Jane Roe and Deborah A. Taylor filed by Attorney Gilles Bissonnette. Certificate of service dated 01/28/2021. [21-1058] (GRB) [Entered: 01/28/2021 08:46 AM]
January 27, 2021 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #205) filed by Appellant Lori Shibinette. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 02/10/2021. [21-1058] (DPO) [Entered: 01/27/2021 11:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Doe, et al v. Shibinette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DEBORAH A. TAYLOR, as guardian for Scott Stephen Johnstone
Represented By: Aaron J. Curtis
Represented By: Theodore E. Tsekerides
Represented By: Colin McGrath
Represented By: Henry R. Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Lara E. Veblen Trager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HUGGINS HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY HITCHCOCK MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LITTLETON HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, (Littleton Regional Hospital)
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANE ROE
Represented By: Aaron J. Curtis
Represented By: Theodore E. Tsekerides
Represented By: Colin McGrath
Represented By: Henry R. Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Lara E. Veblen Trager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MONADNOCK COMMUNITY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ELLIOT HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: COTTAGE HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UPPER CONNECTICUT VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LRGHEALTHCARE, (Franklin Hospital and Lakes Region General Hospital)
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANDROSCOGGIN VALLEY HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SOUTHERN NEW HAMPSHIRE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEW LONDON HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOHN DOE
Represented By: Aaron J. Curtis
Represented By: Theodore E. Tsekerides
Represented By: Colin McGrath
Represented By: Henry R. Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Lara E. Veblen Trager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHESHIRE MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALICE PECK DAY MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEW HAMPSHIRE HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CATHOLIC MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRISBIE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SPEARE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HCA HEALTH SERVICES OF NEW HAMPSHIRE, (Parkland Medical Center and Portsmouth Regional Hospital)
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WEEKS MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VALLEY REGIONAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHARLES COE
Represented By: Aaron J. Curtis
Represented By: Theodore E. Tsekerides
Represented By: Colin McGrath
Represented By: Henry R. Klementowicz
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Lara E. Veblen Trager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CONCORD HOSPITAL
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LRGHEALTHCARE, (Franklin Regional Hospital and Lakes Region General Hospital)
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Represented By: James P. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: LORI SHIBINETTE, Commissioner, NH Department of Health and Human Services, official capacity
Represented By: Samuel R. V. Garland
Represented By: Anthony J. Galdieri
Represented By: Daniel E. Will
Represented By: Scott Edward Sakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEW HAMPSHIRE CIRCUIT COURT DISTRICT DIVISION
Represented By: K. Allen Brooks
Represented By: Scott Edward Sakowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, North Conway
Represented By: Russell B. Pierce Jr.
Represented By: Mark G. Lavoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. JOSEPH'S HOSPITAL, Nashua
Represented By: Michael D. Ramsdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: HONORABLE DAVID D. KING
Represented By: K. Allen Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?