Widi v. Federal Bureau of Prisons, et al
Defendant: MARK ARGIR, Correction Officer, FCI Berlin, KEVIN RAMSAY, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, RANDY AMENT, Unit Manager, FCI Berlin, f/k/a R. Ament, BRIAN SMITH, FCI Greenville, PATRICK GERHART, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, SAMUEL QUEEN, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, JOSE SANTANA, Chief, US Armed Forces Reserve Complex, FNU LABRENZ, FCI Berlin, WILLIAM C. KNIGHT, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, f/k/a W. Knight, JAMIE BELANGER, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, BRENT SHALLOW, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, ANGELO GIAMUSSO, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, JERROD GRIMES, FCI Coleman, CHARLES NAPIER, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU Napier, FNU HAWES, CHRISTOPHER TOBIAS, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, f/k/a FNU Teale, f/k/a Tobias, ANDREA FERRON, Unit Team, FCI Berlin, NH, US PROBATION, and Pretrial Services, KRISTEN CROTEAU, quasi-Nurse, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Croteau, RYAN DONAHUE, FCI Berlin, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, Director, FNU EARLY, DONALD HUDSON, Warden, FCI Raybrook Warden, FCI Ray Brook, Warden, FCI Raybrook, f/k/a FNU Hudson, a/k/a Donald Hudson, YANCEY MATTEAU, Case Manager, FCI Ray Brook, f/k/a Matteau, SARA PARITSKY, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a S. Paritsky, LIRISSIA MCCOY, Health Services Administrator, FCI Berlin, f/k/a FNU McCoy, LYLE BALDRIDGE, CHRISTOPHER THIEL, CHRISTINE LARIN, Nurse, FCI Berlin, T. FOLNSBEE, FCI Berlin, DAVID SALAMY, Unit Manager, MICHAEL VINCENT, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a M. Vincent, CHRIS CASNER, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, FNU LANGLEY, (first name unknown), Correctional Counselor, FCI Berlin, NH, SIDNEY BRUCE, THOMAS J. NOONAN, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, BRUCE BIRKHOLTZ, A. CURREN, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, RICHARD SMITH, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a R. Smith, J. LEE, FCI Berlin, KATHY BILODEAU, Nurse, FCI Berlin, BRYAN BIRKHOLTZ, HOWARD ANDY, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a H. Andy, DEREK WAUGHAN, FCI Berlin, E. L. TATUM, Warden, FCI Berlin, NH, a/k/a Esker Lee Tatum, N. FLYNN, FCI Berlin, DAVID BOYNTON, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a D. Boynton, N. HAYDEN, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, B. COOPER, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, SCOTT HASTINGS, US Probation Officer, B. BEEGLE, FCI Berlin, PATRICK DEVENEY, FCI Berlin, KANS BOOZ LEWIS, Physician's Assistant, FCI Berlin, f/k/a K. Lewis, FNU TEMPKE, FCI Berlin, STEPHEN MCCONNELL, II, MICHELLE GONYEA, Case Management Coordinator, FCI Ray Brook, f/k/a FNU Gaunyea, FNU BARGER, (first name unknown) Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, CHARLES HUBBARD, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU Hubble, f/k/a Hubbard, DILLON BUNNELL, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, FNU KUZNECOW, (first name unknown) Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, A. GALLETTA, Captain, FCI Berlin, NH, RICHARD CONE, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, ERIC HERNANDEZ, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Eric Hernandez, CORY BALINAS, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, JAMES KELLEY, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, MATTHEW LOCK, OLIVER STRADLIN, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Oliver Spradlin, DEREK MYERS, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Derek Myers, M. DZUBAK, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a M. Dzubak, J. BUESCHER, FCI Berlin, JIMMIE D. PURSELLEY, III, JASON KELSEY, FCI Berlin, JEFFREY GLUC, Case Manager, FCI Ray Brook, f/k/a Jeffrey Glue, a/k/a Jeffrey Gluc, J. CHAPPELL, FCI Berlin, JOHN DOMITROVICH, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU Domitrovich, WANDA MULLINS, Unit Manager, FCI Berlin, NH, SHAWN FELIX, FCI Greenville, FARNON DIX, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a F. Dix, SCOTT TAWES, FCI Berlin, JAMES S. GAMBONE, MARK WILLIAMS, Associate Warden, FCI Berlin, JARED WYDRA, FCI Berlin, BRAD MALCOLM, Nurse, FCI Berlin, R. BROWN, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, ANDRE BOUCHARD, FCI Berlin, JOSHUA HULUME, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, f/k/a J. Hulume, JAMES THAGOURAS, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, WESLEY SHEA, FCI Berlin, E. QUINONES, FCI Berlin, L HOGAN, Correctional Counselor, FCI Berlin, NH, DOES 1 - 22, Correctional Officers, FCI Berlin, NH, MCDANIEL HOLLOWAY, Northeast Regional Clinical Director, Bureau of Prisons, TRAVIS TYLOR, FCI Berlin, JEREMY HESS, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Jeremy Hess, EMILY CRIMALDI, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU Crimaldi, DAN SULLIVAN, Case Management Coordinator, FCI Berlin, NH, JOSEPH L. NORWOOD, Northeast Regional Director, Bureau of Prisons, f/k/a J. L. Norwood, SHANE SMITH, FCI Berlin and MATTHEW APPLE, Case Manager, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Matthew Apple
Defendant / Appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES, RANDY AMENT, Unit Manager, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a R. Ament, CHRISTINE LARIN, Nurse, FCI Berlin, NH, J. BUESCHER, FCI Berlin, NH, RYAN DONAHUE, FCI Berlin, NH, JARED WYDRA, FCI Berlin, NH, T. FOLNSBEE, FCI Berlin, NH, A. CURREN, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH, BRAD MALCOLM, Nurse, FCI Berlin, NH, MARK WILLIAMS, Associate Warden, FCI Berlin, NH, TRAVIS TYLOR, FCI Berlin, NH, JEFFREY GLUC, Case Manager, FCI Ray Brook, f/k/a Jeffrey Glue, KRISTEN CROTEAU, quasi-Nurse, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a Croteau, KANS BOOZ LEWIS, Physician's Assistant, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a K. Lewis, MARK ARGIR, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, J. HESS, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a J. Hess, L. HOGAN, Correctional Counselor, FCI Berlin, NH, E. QUINONES, FCI Berlin, NH, FNU KUZNECOW, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, WESLEY SHEA, FCI Berlin, NH, DONALD HUDSON, Warden, FCI Raybrook, f/k/a FNU Hudson, a/k/a D. Hudson, M. APPLE, Case Manager, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a M. Apple, SHANE SMITH, FCI Berlin, NH, N. FLYNN, FCI Berlin, NH, B. BEEGLE, FCI Berlin, NH, JASON KELSEY, FCI Berlin, NH, ANDRE BOUCHARD, FCI Berlin, NH, JAMES SALVATORE GAMBONE, MARK DZUBAK, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a Mark Dzubak, E. HERNANDEZ, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a E. Hernandez, PATRICK DEVENEY, FCI Berlin, NH, CORY BALINAS, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, D. MYERS, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a D. Myers, FNU TEMPKE, FCI Berlin, NH, WILLIAM C. KNIGHT, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a W. Knight, B. COOPER, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, J. CHAPPELL, FCI Berlin, NH, N. HAYDEN, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH, CHARLES SAMUELS, JOSHUA HULUME, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a J. Hulume, J. LEE, FCI Berlin, NH, KATHY BILODEAU, Nurse, FCI Berlin, NH, FNU LABRENZ, FCI Berlin, NH, CHRISTOPHER TOBIAS, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU Teale, f/k/a Tobias, DEREK WAUGHAN, FCI Berlin, NH, LIRISSIA MCCOY, Health Services Administrator, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU McCoy, OLIVER STRADLIN, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a Oliver Spradlin and SCOTT TAWES, FCI Berlin, NH
Interested Party: BRIAN PATTERSON
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAVID J. WIDI, JR.
Case Number: 21-1085
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 05/18/2021 for appellant David J. Widi Jr. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1085] (ALW) [Entered: 04/08/2021 05:08 PM]
March 30, 2021 NOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Susan Bateman: 09/11/2020, Telephone Conference. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [21-1085] (JMK) [Entered: 03/30/2021 08:19 AM]
March 22, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ordered: 09/11/2020, Telephone Conference. Transcript(s) due 05/21/2021 from Court Reporter Susan Bateman [21-1085] (ALW) [Entered: 03/22/2021 01:50 AM]
March 19, 2021 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant David J. Widi, Jr. indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 03/19/2021. [21-1085] (DJW) [Entered: 03/19/2021 04:18 PM]
March 2, 2021 NOTICE of default issued. Appellant failed to file a transcript report/order form by the deadline. If transcripts are necessary for this appeal, appellant is directed to file a transcript order form by 03/16/2021. Absent a timely response, this court will set a briefing schedule, if appropriate. [21-1085] (ALW) [Entered: 03/02/2021 10:28 AM]
February 26, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Parties Randy Ament, Howard Andy, Matthew Apple, Mark Argir, Lyle Baldridge, Cory Balinas, B. Beegle, Jamie Belanger, Kathy Bilodeau, Bruce Birkholtz, Bryan Birkholtz, Kans Booz Lewis, Andre Bouchard, David Boynton, R. Brown, Sidney Bruce, J. Buescher, Dillon Bunnell, Chris Casner, J. Chappell, Richard Cone, B. Cooper, Emily Crimaldi, Kristen Croteau, A. Curren, Patrick Deveney, Farnon Dix, Does 1 - 22, John Domitrovich, Ryan Donahue, M. Dzubak, FNU Early, Federal Bureau of Prisons, Shawn Felix, Andrea Ferron, N. Flynn, FNU Barger, FNU Hawes, FNU Kuznecow, FNU LaBrenz, FNU Langley, FNU Tempke, T. Folnsbee, A. Galletta, James S. Gambone, Angelo Giamusso, Jeffrey Gluc, Michelle Gonyea, Jerrod Grimes, Scott Hastings, N. Hayden, Eric Hernandez, Jeremy Hess, L Hogan, Charles Hubbard, Donald Hudson, Joshua Hulume, James Kelley, Jason Kelsey, William C. Knight, Christine Larin, J. Lee, Matthew Lock, Brad Malcolm, Yancey Matteau, Stephen McConnell, II, Lirissia McCoy, McDaniel Holloway, Wanda Mullins, Derek Myers, Charles Napier, Thomas J. Noonan, Joseph L. Norwood, Sara Paritsky, Brian Patterson, Jimmie D. Purselley, III, Samuel Queen, E. Quinones, Kevin Ramsay, David Salamy, Jose Santana, Brent Shallow, Wesley Shea, Brian Smith, Richard Smith, Shane Smith, Oliver Stradlin, Dan Sullivan, E. L. Tatum, Scott Tawes, James Thagouras, Christopher Thiel, Christopher Tobias, Travis Tylor, US Probation, Michael Vincent, Derek Waughan, Mark Williams, Jared Wydra and Appellees Federal Bureau of Prisons and US filed by Attorney Frances S. Cohen. Certificate of service dated 02/26/2021. [21-1085] (FSC) [Entered: 02/26/2021 06:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Widi v. Federal Bureau of Prisons, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK ARGIR, Correction Officer, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN RAMSAY, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RANDY AMENT, Unit Manager, FCI Berlin, f/k/a R. Ament
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN SMITH, FCI Greenville
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK GERHART, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL QUEEN, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE SANTANA, Chief, US Armed Forces Reserve Complex
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LABRENZ, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM C. KNIGHT, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, f/k/a W. Knight
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMIE BELANGER, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENT SHALLOW, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGELO GIAMUSSO, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JERROD GRIMES, FCI Coleman
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES NAPIER, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU Napier
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU HAWES
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER TOBIAS, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, f/k/a FNU Teale, f/k/a Tobias
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREA FERRON, Unit Team, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US PROBATION, and Pretrial Services
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTEN CROTEAU, quasi-Nurse, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Croteau
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RYAN DONAHUE, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, Director
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU EARLY
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DONALD HUDSON, Warden, FCI Raybrook Warden, FCI Ray Brook, Warden, FCI Raybrook, f/k/a FNU Hudson, a/k/a Donald Hudson
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YANCEY MATTEAU, Case Manager, FCI Ray Brook, f/k/a Matteau
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SARA PARITSKY, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a S. Paritsky
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIRISSIA MCCOY, Health Services Administrator, FCI Berlin, f/k/a FNU McCoy
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LYLE BALDRIDGE
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER THIEL
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTINE LARIN, Nurse, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. FOLNSBEE, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID SALAMY, Unit Manager
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL VINCENT, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a M. Vincent
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRIS CASNER, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU LANGLEY, (first name unknown), Correctional Counselor, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SIDNEY BRUCE
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS J. NOONAN, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRUCE BIRKHOLTZ
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. CURREN, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD SMITH, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a R. Smith
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. LEE, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY BILODEAU, Nurse, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN BIRKHOLTZ
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOWARD ANDY, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a H. Andy
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK WAUGHAN, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. L. TATUM, Warden, FCI Berlin, NH, a/k/a Esker Lee Tatum
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. FLYNN, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BOYNTON, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a D. Boynton
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. HAYDEN, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. COOPER, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT HASTINGS, US Probation Officer
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. BEEGLE, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK DEVENEY, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KANS BOOZ LEWIS, Physician's Assistant, FCI Berlin, f/k/a K. Lewis
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU TEMPKE, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN MCCONNELL, II
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHELLE GONYEA, Case Management Coordinator, FCI Ray Brook, f/k/a FNU Gaunyea
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU BARGER, (first name unknown) Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARLES HUBBARD, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU Hubble, f/k/a Hubbard
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DILLON BUNNELL, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU KUZNECOW, (first name unknown) Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. GALLETTA, Captain, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD CONE, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC HERNANDEZ, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Eric Hernandez
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORY BALINAS, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES KELLEY, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW LOCK
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLIVER STRADLIN, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Oliver Spradlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEREK MYERS, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Derek Myers
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. DZUBAK, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a M. Dzubak
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. BUESCHER, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIMMIE D. PURSELLEY, III
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON KELSEY, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY GLUC, Case Manager, FCI Ray Brook, f/k/a Jeffrey Glue, a/k/a Jeffrey Gluc
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. CHAPPELL, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOMITROVICH, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU Domitrovich
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WANDA MULLINS, Unit Manager, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN FELIX, FCI Greenville
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FARNON DIX, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a F. Dix
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCOTT TAWES, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES S. GAMBONE
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARK WILLIAMS, Associate Warden, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JARED WYDRA, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRAD MALCOLM, Nurse, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. BROWN, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDRE BOUCHARD, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA HULUME, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, f/k/a J. Hulume
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES THAGOURAS, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESLEY SHEA, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. QUINONES, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L HOGAN, Correctional Counselor, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 - 22, Correctional Officers, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCDANIEL HOLLOWAY, Northeast Regional Clinical Director, Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRAVIS TYLOR, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEREMY HESS, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Jeremy Hess
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMILY CRIMALDI, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU Crimaldi
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAN SULLIVAN, Case Management Coordinator, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH L. NORWOOD, Northeast Regional Director, Bureau of Prisons, f/k/a J. L. Norwood
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHANE SMITH, FCI Berlin
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MATTHEW APPLE, Case Manager, FCI Berlin, f/k/a Matthew Apple
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RANDY AMENT, Unit Manager, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a R. Ament
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTINE LARIN, Nurse, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. BUESCHER, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RYAN DONAHUE, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JARED WYDRA, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. FOLNSBEE, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A. CURREN, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRAD MALCOLM, Nurse, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK WILLIAMS, Associate Warden, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRAVIS TYLOR, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY GLUC, Case Manager, FCI Ray Brook, f/k/a Jeffrey Glue
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KRISTEN CROTEAU, quasi-Nurse, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a Croteau
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KANS BOOZ LEWIS, Physician's Assistant, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a K. Lewis
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK ARGIR, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. HESS, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a J. Hess
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: L. HOGAN, Correctional Counselor, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. QUINONES, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU KUZNECOW, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WESLEY SHEA, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD HUDSON, Warden, FCI Raybrook, f/k/a FNU Hudson, a/k/a D. Hudson
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: M. APPLE, Case Manager, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a M. Apple
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHANE SMITH, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: N. FLYNN, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. BEEGLE, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON KELSEY, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDRE BOUCHARD, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAMES SALVATORE GAMBONE
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MARK DZUBAK, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a Mark Dzubak
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: E. HERNANDEZ, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a E. Hernandez
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PATRICK DEVENEY, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORY BALINAS, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D. MYERS, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a D. Myers
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU TEMPKE, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM C. KNIGHT, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a W. Knight
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: B. COOPER, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. CHAPPELL, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: N. HAYDEN, Lieutenant, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHARLES SAMUELS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSHUA HULUME, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a J. Hulume
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. LEE, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KATHY BILODEAU, Nurse, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FNU LABRENZ, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER TOBIAS, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU Teale, f/k/a Tobias
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEREK WAUGHAN, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LIRISSIA MCCOY, Health Services Administrator, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a FNU McCoy
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OLIVER STRADLIN, Correctional Officer, FCI Berlin, NH, f/k/a Oliver Spradlin
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SCOTT TAWES, FCI Berlin, NH
Represented By: Frances S. Cohen
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Represented By: T. David Plourde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BRIAN PATTERSON
Represented By: Seth R. Aframe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID J. WIDI, JR.
Represented By: David J. Widi Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?