Fraga v. US
Respondent / Appellee: UNITED STATES
Interested Party: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Petitioner / Appellant: ALEX FRAGA
Case Number: 21-1207
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER advising petitioner the request for a certificate of appealability will be submitted to this court for a decision. Date of denial by district court: March 29, 2021. [21-1207] (GAK) [Entered: 05/14/2021 04:06 PM]
May 13, 2021 SEALED AFFIDAVIT in support of request for Certificate of Appealability [6421915-2] filed by Attorney Ashley P. Allen for Appellant Alex Fraga. Certificate of service dated 05/10/2021. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 05/13/2021 03:43 PM]
May 13, 2021 SEALED REQUEST for certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Alex Fraga. Certificate of service dated 05/10/2021. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 05/13/2021 03:41 PM]
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by Jeffrey R. Howard, Chief Appellate Judge: Petitioner-appellant's "motion to seal" is granted. The tendered "request for a certificate of appealability" and counsel's affidavit are both accepted for filing under seal. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 05/13/2021 03:38 PM]
May 10, 2021 AFFIDAVIT ( provisionally filed under seal ) of Attorney Ashley P. Allen in support of request for a Certificate of Appealability [ # 6421080-2 ] filed by Appellant Alex Fraga. Certificate of service dated 05/10/2021. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 05/10/2021 04:34 PM]
May 10, 2021 PLEADING tendered: Request for a Certificate of Appealability ( provisionally filed under seal ) filed by Appellant Alex Fraga. Certificate of service dated 05/10/2021. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 05/10/2021 04:30 PM]
May 10, 2021 ASSENTED TO MOTION to file Request for a Certificate of Appealability under seal filed by Appellant Alex Fraga. Certificate of service dated 05/10/2021. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 05/10/2021 04:23 PM]
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to request certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Alex Fraga. Memorandum supporting issuance of CAP due 05/10/2021. [21-1207] (GAK) [Entered: 05/10/2021 11:18 AM]
May 7, 2021 MOTION to extend time to request a certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Alex Fraga. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2021. [21-1207] (APA) [Entered: 05/07/2021 08:52 PM]
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to request certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Alex Fraga. Memorandum supporting issuance of CAP due 05/06/2021. [21-1207] (GAK) [Entered: 05/03/2021 12:36 PM]
April 30, 2021 ASSENTED TO MOTION to extend time to request a certificate of appealability filed by Appellant Alex Fraga. Certificate of service dated 04/30/2021. [21-1207] (APA) [Entered: 04/30/2021 04:11 PM]
April 23, 2021 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Darrell Mook for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 04/23/2021 10:46 AM]
April 6, 2021 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Alex Fraga indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 04/06/2021. [21-1207] (APA) [Entered: 04/06/2021 03:06 PM]
April 6, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Alex Fraga. Certificate of service dated 04/06/2021. [21-1207] (APA) [Entered: 04/06/2021 03:05 PM]
April 6, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Alex Fraga filed by Attorney Ashley Allen. Certificate of service dated 04/06/2021. [21-1207] (APA) [Entered: 04/06/2021 03:05 PM]
April 1, 2021 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file an appearance form, docketing statement and transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Appearance form due 04/15/2021. Docketing Statement due 04/15/2021. Transcript report/order form due 04/15/2021. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 04/01/2021 08:19 AM]
April 1, 2021 NOTICE issued. After 04/15/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Darrell Mook for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 04/01/2021 08:17 AM]
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER directing petitioner to file a request for a certificate of appealabilty in this court by 04/29/2021. Date of denial by district court: March 29, 2021. [21-1207] (DPO) [Entered: 03/30/2021 11:51 AM]
March 30, 2021 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 86 - Order denying Certificate of Appealability, entered on 3/29/2021. [21-1207] (DPO) [Entered: 03/30/2021 11:47 AM]
March 19, 2021 CORRECTED ORDER* directing district court to issue or deny a certificate of appealability. *Corrected order issued to amend docket text. [21-1207]. (CMP) [Entered: 03/19/2021 02:53 PM]
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER directing district court to issue or deny a certificate of appealability. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 03/19/2021 12:29 PM]
March 16, 2021 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #81) filed by Appellant Alex Fraga. Docketing Statement due 03/30/2021. Transcript Report/Order form due 03/30/2021. Appearance form due 03/30/2021. [21-1207] (CMP) [Entered: 03/16/2021 04:44 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Fraga v. US
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Eric Rosen
Represented By: Alathea E. Porter
Represented By: Philip C. Cheng
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Darrell Mook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ALEX FRAGA
Represented By: Ashley P. Allen
Represented By: Alex Fraga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?