Gonzalez Berrios v. Triple S Propiedad, Inc.
Defendant: MENNONITE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC., EMERGENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC., HANNEY CORDERO-GONZALEZ, his Spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Cordero-Gonzalez, MEDICAL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC, VICTOR HERNANDEZ-FLORES, his spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Hernandez-Flores, RENAISSANCE RE SYNDICATE (LLOYD'S), ALEJANDRO MARMOLEJO-MORALES, Spouse Marmolejo-Morales, JOSE PEREZ-MATAMOROS, his spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Perez-Matamoros, ALEJANDRO MARMOLEJO-MORALES, MEDICAL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC., JOSE RIVERA RIVERA, VICTOR HERNANDEZ-FLORES, HANNEY CORDERO-GONZALEZ, JOSE PEREZ-MATAMOROS and PUERTO RICO MEDICAL DEFENSE INSURANCE CO.
3Rd Party Defendant: TRIPLE-S PROPIEDAD, INC. and SIMED
Defendant / Appellee: JOSE RIVERA RIVERA, his Spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Rivera-Rivera, MEDICAL DEFENSE INSURANCE CO., A,B,C,D,E,F,G, AND H INSURANCE COMPANIES and CORPORATIONS Z AND X
Interested Party: WANDA I. GONZALEZ-BERRIOS and NOREEN WISCOVITCH RENTAS
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANGELICA M. GONZALEZ BERRIOS
Case Number: 21-1242
Filed: April 1, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Glenda Labadie Jackson for Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios and Alejandro Hernandez-Rios for Jose Perez-Matamoros. [21-1242] (ALW) [Entered: 05/27/2021 01:10 PM]
May 21, 2021 MOTION to dismiss case filed by Appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios. Certificate of service dated 05/21/2021. [21-1242] (PR) [Entered: 05/21/2021 12:34 PM]
May 19, 2021 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/28/2021 for appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1242] (ALW) [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:00 PM]
May 10, 2021 NOTICE issued. After 05/24/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Glenda Labadie Jackson for Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios and Alejandro Hernandez-Rios for Jose Perez-Matamoros. [21-1242] (ALW) [Entered: 05/10/2021 02:12 AM]
April 22, 2021 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2021. [21-1242] (PR) [Entered: 04/22/2021 04:54 PM]
April 22, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios filed by Attorney Paul A. Rodriguez. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2021. [21-1242] (PR) [Entered: 04/22/2021 04:53 PM]
April 22, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2021. [21-1242] (PR) [Entered: 04/22/2021 04:52 PM]
April 22, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Not Party Triple-S Propiedad, Inc. filed by Attorney MIGUEL G. LAFFITTE. Certificate of service dated 04/22/2021. [21-1242] (MGL) [Entered: 04/22/2021 02:52 PM]
April 8, 2021 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #244 ) filed by Appellant Angelica M. Gonzalez Berrios. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 04/22/2021. [21-1242] (ALW) [Entered: 04/08/2021 01:31 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gonzalez Berrios v. Triple S Propiedad, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENNONITE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Vicente A. Sequeda-Torres
Represented By: Nuyen L. Marrero-Bonilla
Represented By: Christian Oscar Cintron-Perez
Represented By: Luis Sanchez-Betances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMERGENCY SERVICES GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANNEY CORDERO-GONZALEZ, his Spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Cordero-Gonzalez
Represented By: Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC
Represented By: Nuyen L. Marrero-Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR HERNANDEZ-FLORES, his spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Hernandez-Flores
Represented By: Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RENAISSANCE RE SYNDICATE (LLOYD'S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MARMOLEJO-MORALES, Spouse Marmolejo-Morales
Represented By: Benjamin Morales-del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE PEREZ-MATAMOROS, his spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Perez-Matamoros
Represented By: Alejandro Hernandez-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEJANDRO MARMOLEJO-MORALES
Represented By: Benjamin Morales-del Valle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEDICAL PROTECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Represented By: Nuyen L. Marrero-Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE RIVERA RIVERA
Represented By: Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VICTOR HERNANDEZ-FLORES
Represented By: Ramonita Dieppa-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HANNEY CORDERO-GONZALEZ
Represented By: Benito I. Rodriguez-Masso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE PEREZ-MATAMOROS
Represented By: Alejandro Hernandez-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO MEDICAL DEFENSE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Nuyen L. Marrero-Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: TRIPLE-S PROPIEDAD, INC.
Represented By: Miguel G. Laffitte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: SIMED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOSE RIVERA RIVERA, his Spouse and the conjugal legal partnership Rivera-Rivera
Represented By: Roberto E. Ruiz-Comas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEDICAL DEFENSE INSURANCE CO.
Represented By: Nuyen L. Marrero-Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: A,B,C,D,E,F,G, AND H INSURANCE COMPANIES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CORPORATIONS Z AND X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WANDA I. GONZALEZ-BERRIOS
Represented By: Nashely Pagan-Isona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NOREEN WISCOVITCH RENTAS
Represented By: Javier Franciso Vilarino Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANGELICA M. GONZALEZ BERRIOS
Represented By: Paul Rodriguez-Velez
Represented By: Glenda Labadie Jackson
Represented By: Carlos Concepcion-Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?