Medicaid & Medicare Advantage Products Ass'n of PR, et al v. Emanuelli-Hernandez, et al
Defendant: ASOCIACION DE HOSPITALES DE PUERTO RICO, HOSPITAL MENONITA CAGUAS, INC., MENNONITE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC., PUERTO RICO COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS-SURGEONS, HOSPITAL MENONITA GUAYAMA, INC., SAN JORGE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL INC., CLINICAL LABORATORIES ASSOCIATION INC. and PUERTO RICO ASSOCIATION OF RADIOLOGY IMAGING CENTERS INC.
Plaintiff / Appellee: MCS ADVANTAGE, INC., HUMANA HEALTH PLANS OF PUERTO RICO, INC., MMM HEALTHCARE, INC., MEDICARE AND MEDICAID ADVANTAGE PRODUCTS ASSOCIATION OF PUERTO RICO, INC., TRIPLE S ADVANTAGE, INC. and MEDICAID AND MEDICARE ADVANTAGE PRODUCTS ASSOCIATION OF PUERTO RICO, INC.
Defendant / Appellant: DOMINGO EMANUELLI HERNANDEZ, Secretary of the Department of Justice, MARIANO A. MIER-ROMEU, Puerto Rico Insurance Commissioner, DOMINGO EMANUELLI HERNANDEZ, in his official capacity as Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico and MARIANO A. MIER-ROMEU, in his official capacity as Puerto Rico Insurance Commissioner
Interested Party: SPECIALIST COOPERATIVES
Case Number: 21-1297
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Francisco J. Domenech-Fernandez for Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons and Luis Enrique Romero-Nieves for Clinical Laboratories Association Inc. and Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc. [21-1297] (AL) [Entered: 06/10/2021 01:13 PM]
June 10, 2021 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 07/20/2021 for appellant Domingo Emanuelli Hernandez, Mariano A. Mier-Romeu, Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Clinical Laboratories Association Inc., Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc., Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc., Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons and San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1297, 21-1379] (AL) [Entered: 06/10/2021 01:26 PM]
June 10, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Asociacion de Hospitales de Puerto Rico, Mennonite General Hospital, Inc., San Jorge Children's Hospital Inc., Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc., Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc., Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons, Clinical Laboratories Association Inc. and Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc. in 21-1379. Certificate of service dated 06/10/2021. [21-1379, 21-1297] (CSL) [Entered: 06/10/2021 01:44 PM]
June 9, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons in 21-1379, Not Party Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons in 21-1297 filed by Attorney Omar E. Martinez-Vazquez. Certificate of service dated 06/09/2021. [21-1379, 21-1297] (OEM) [Entered: 06/09/2021 06:50 PM]
June 8, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Clinical Laboratories Association Inc. and Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc. in 21-1379 filed by Attorney Luis M. Pellot-Julia. Certificate of service dated 06/08/2021. [21-1379, 21-1297] (LMP) [Entered: 06/08/2021 04:04 PM]
June 7, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Hospital Menonita Guayama, Inc. and Hospital Menonita Caguas, Inc. in 21-1379 filed by Attorney Luis Sanchez-Betances. Certificate of service dated 06/07/2021. [21-1297, 21-1379] (LS) [Entered: 06/07/2021 03:47 PM]
May 24, 2021 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellee MCS Advantage, Inc.. Certificate of service dated 05/24/2021. [21-1297] (RJC) [Entered: 05/24/2021 01:30 PM]
May 24, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MCS Advantage, Inc. filed by Attorney Ricardo J. Casellas-Santana. Certificate of service dated 05/24/2021. [21-1297] (RJC) [Entered: 05/24/2021 01:28 PM]
May 24, 2021 NOTICE of Proposed Corrections to Docketing Statements and Case Caption filed by Appellee MMM Healthcare, Inc. in 21-1297, 21-1379. Certificate of service dated 05/24/2021. [21-1297, 21-1379] (MBK) [Entered: 05/24/2021 04:42 PM]
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appeal Nos. 21-1297 and 21-1379 are consolidated for purposes of briefing and oral argument. See Fed. R. App. P. 3(b)(2). The parties are directed to use the above caption on all future filings related to these cases. [21-1297, 21-1379] (AL) [Entered: 05/21/2021 04:19 PM]
May 18, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MMM Healthcare, Inc. filed by Attorney Ankur J. Goel. Certificate of service dated 05/18/2021. [21-1297] (AJG) [Entered: 05/18/2021 04:36 PM]
May 12, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MCS Advantage, Inc. filed by Attorney Mariacte Correa. Certificate of service dated 05/12/2021. [21-1297] (MC) [Entered: 05/12/2021 05:36 PM]
May 12, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mariano A. Mier-Romeu and Domingo Emanuelli Hernandez filed by Attorney Omar Andino Figueroa. Certificate of service dated 05/12/2021. [21-1297] (OJA) [Entered: 05/12/2021 04:24 PM]
May 11, 2021 NOTICE issued. After 05/25/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Mariacte Correa Cestero for MCS Advantage, Inc., Francisco J. Domenech-Fernandez for Puerto Rico College of Physicians-Surgeons and Luis Enrique Romero-Nieves for Clinical Laboratories Association Inc. and Puerto Rico Association of Radiology Imaging Centers Inc.. [21-1297] (AL) [Entered: 05/11/2021 08:32 AM]
May 10, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Domingo Emanuelli Hernandez and Mariano A. Mier-Romeu. Certificate of service dated 05/10/2021. [21-1297] (CL) [Entered: 05/10/2021 04:51 PM]
May 10, 2021 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Domingo Emanuelli Hernandez and Mariano A. Mier-Romeu indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 05/10/2021. [21-1297] (CL) [Entered: 05/10/2021 04:52 PM]
May 7, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MMM Healthcare, Inc. filed by Attorney Roberto L. Prats Palerm. Certificate of service dated 05/07/2021. [21-1297] (RLP) [Entered: 05/07/2021 11:05 AM]
May 6, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Mariano A. Mier-Romeu and Domingo Emanuelli Hernandez filed by Attorney Carlos Lugo-Fiol. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2021. [21-1297] (CL) [Entered: 05/06/2021 04:56 PM]
May 6, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Triple S Advantage, Inc. filed by Attorney Luis R Roman. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2021. [21-1297] (LRR) [Entered: 05/06/2021 02:44 PM]
May 6, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Medicare and Medicaid Advantage Products Association of Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Attorney Jose A Hernandez. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2021. [21-1297] (JAH) [Entered: 05/06/2021 05:55 PM]
May 4, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MMM Healthcare, Inc. filed by Attorney Sarah P. Hogarth. Certificate of service dated 05/04/2021. [21-1297] (SH) [Entered: 05/04/2021 05:47 PM]
May 4, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MMM Healthcare, Inc. filed by Attorney Michael B. Kimberly. Certificate of service dated 05/04/2021. [21-1297] (MBK) [Entered: 05/04/2021 05:46 PM]
April 20, 2021 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 134. Amended Notice of Appeal . [21-1297] (AL) [Entered: 04/28/2021 10:13 AM]
April 20, 2021 AMENDED notice of appeal (doc. #134) filed by Appellants Domingo Emanuelli Hernandez and Mariano A. Mier-Romeu on 03/31/2021. [21-1297] (AL) [Entered: 04/28/2021 10:14 AM]
April 20, 2021 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entries: 138. Amended Notice of Appeal. [21-1297] (AL) [Entered: 04/28/2021 10:15 AM]
April 20, 2021 SECOND AMENDED notice of appeal (doc. #138) filed by Appellants Domingo Emanuelli Hernandez and Mariano A. Mier-Romeu on 04/09/2021. [21-1297] (AL) [Entered: 04/28/2021 10:16 AM]
April 20, 2021 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #133) filed by Appellants Domingo Emanuelli Hernandez and Mariano A. Mier-Romeu. Docketing Statement due 05/10/2021. Appearance form due 05/10/2021. [21-1297] (AL) [Entered: 04/26/2021 11:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Medicaid & Medicare Advantage Products Ass'n of PR, et al v. Emanuelli-Hernandez, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASOCIACION DE HOSPITALES DE PUERTO RICO
Represented By: Carla S. Loubriel
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPITAL MENONITA CAGUAS, INC.
Represented By: Carla S. Loubriel
Represented By: Jaime Jose Sifre Rodriguez
Represented By: Luis Sanchez-Betances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENNONITE GENERAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Carla S. Loubriel
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS-SURGEONS
Represented By: Francisco J. Domenech-Fernandez
Represented By: Omar E. Martinez-Vazquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOSPITAL MENONITA GUAYAMA, INC.
Represented By: Carla S. Loubriel
Represented By: Jaime Jose Sifre Rodriguez
Represented By: Luis Sanchez-Betances
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAN JORGE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL INC.
Represented By: Carla S. Loubriel
Represented By: Diana Perez-Seda
Represented By: Cesar T. Alcover-Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLINICAL LABORATORIES ASSOCIATION INC.
Represented By: Luis Enrique Romero-Nieves
Represented By: Luis Miguel Pellot Julia Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PUERTO RICO ASSOCIATION OF RADIOLOGY IMAGING CENTERS INC.
Represented By: Luis Enrique Romero-Nieves
Represented By: Luis Miguel Pellot Julia Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MCS ADVANTAGE, INC.
Represented By: Ricardo Jose Casellas-Santana
Represented By: Roberto Luis Prats Palerm
Represented By: Mariacte Correa Cestero
Represented By: Mariacte Correa-Cestero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: HUMANA HEALTH PLANS OF PUERTO RICO, INC.
Represented By: Roberto Luis Prats Palerm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MMM HEALTHCARE, INC.
Represented By: Michael Branch Kimberly
Represented By: Roberto Luis Prats Palerm
Represented By: Ankur J. Goel
Represented By: Sarah Hogarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MEDICARE AND MEDICAID ADVANTAGE PRODUCTS ASSOCIATION OF PUERTO RICO, INC.
Represented By: Roberto Luis Prats Palerm
Represented By: Jose A. Hernandez-Mayoral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: TRIPLE S ADVANTAGE, INC.
Represented By: Roberto Luis Prats Palerm
Represented By: Luis R. Roman-Negron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MEDICAID AND MEDICARE ADVANTAGE PRODUCTS ASSOCIATION OF PUERTO RICO, INC.
Represented By: Roberto Luis Prats Palerm
Represented By: Jose A. Hernandez-Mayoral
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DOMINGO EMANUELLI HERNANDEZ, Secretary of the Department of Justice
Represented By: Raul Castellanos-Malave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARIANO A. MIER-ROMEU, Puerto Rico Insurance Commissioner
Represented By: Raul Castellanos-Malave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: DOMINGO EMANUELLI HERNANDEZ, in his official capacity as Attorney General for the Commonwealth of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Raul Castellanos-Malave
Represented By: Omar J. Andino Figueroa
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MARIANO A. MIER-ROMEU, in his official capacity as Puerto Rico Insurance Commissioner
Represented By: Raul Castellanos-Malave
Represented By: Omar J. Andino Figueroa
Represented By: Carlos Lugo-Fiol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SPECIALIST COOPERATIVES
Represented By: Jaime E. Toro-Monserrate
Represented By: Angel Sosa-Baez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?