Washington-Del Valle, et al v. Mendez
Plaintiff: IVAN G. RIVERA-RIOS and NERY RIVERA-MELENDEZ
Defendant: WILFREDO RAMOS-GARCIA, ZAYDA E. RAMOS-HERNANDEZ, ANGEL REDONDO-SANTANA, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as Auxiliary Superintendent in Charge of Administration, THOMAS RIVERA-SCHATZ, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as President of the Senate of Puerto Rico, JOSE LUIS DALMAU-SANTIAGO, in his official capacity as President of the Senate of Puerto Rico, LISANDRA MALDONADO-ALVARADO, RAFAEL HERNANDEZ-MONTANEZ, KATHERINE ALFONSO URBINA, PABLO SASTRE-FERNANDEZ, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as Auxiliary Superintendent in Charge of Operations, GABRIEL HERNANDEZ-RODRIGUEZ, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as Chief of Staff of the President of the Senate and JOSE FIGUEROA-TORRES, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as Human Resources Director at the Office of the Superintendent of the Capitol Building
Defendant / Appellant: CARLOS JOHNNY MENDEZ, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as Speaker of the House of Representatives
Plaintiff / Appellee: LUIS A. RIVERA-GONZALEZ, ARIADNA LOPEZ, IVONNE BORRERO-CASADO, LYNNOTT ADORNO-GONZALEZ, GIANCARLO SANTIAGO-MARTINEZ, ADY PAZ-OTERO, GILBERTO PAGAN-RESTO, GIARA WASHINGTON-DEL VALLE, OMAR PADRO-PAGAN, REBECCA DE PEDRO-GONZALEZ, MARY LASTRA-RIVERA, ANTONIO SOLA-MARTI, EDWIN JIMENEZ-RESTO, CARLOS HERNANDEZ-RESTO, WANDA VICENTI-LATORRE, NELSON M. TORRES-MALDONADO, CATHERINE QUINONES-PIMENTEL, NEFTALI RAMOS-LOZADA, CHRISTIAN VEGA-VILLALBA, JONUEL NEGRON-DIAZ, JOSEPH RODRIGUEZ-RODRIGUEZ, JAZMINE T. MARTINEZ-GALINDEZ, JOSE RODRIGUEZ-CONCEPCION, JAVIER WALKER-CARRASQUILLO, ANA GONZALEZ-LEDESMA, FELIX RIVERA-GONZALEZ, JANICE MARCHAND-BAUZA, OMAR J. CLAUDIO-LLOPIZ, JOSE BETANCOURT-ALICEA, JEAN SANTIAGO-TORRES, JOSE NARVAEZ-CARRION, MYRIAM TORRES-RIOS, EMILIO ADORNO-OTERO, JUAN CRUZ-DONES, ALTAGRACIA TORRES-MARRERO, CRISTOBAL MAYSONET-GARCIA, IVELISSE GONZALEZ-ALEMAN, JUAN RODRIGUEZ-SAURE, ALEJANDRA ORTIZ-MELENDEZ, OSCAR LEDESMA-ALBORS, SARAI DIAZ-REYES, DOROTHY MYERS-ROSARIO, WILFREDO PALACIO-CAMACHO, JOSE R. BONILLA-CARABALLO, RAMON RIVERON-MUNOZ, JORGE IRIZARRY-PARIS, ARNALDO REYES-PEREZ, WANDA MORALESPEREZ, RAUL SANCHEZ, RUTH OLIVERO-ALVAREZ, JEAN LEON-RENTA, MIGUEL A. GONZALEZ-GERENA, CARLOS SANTOS-FIGUEROA, SATURNO CRUZ-CARRASQUILLO, LUIS SANTAELLA-DIAZ, JOSHUA FIGUEROA-SERRANO, EMMANUEL SOTO-RAMOS, IRVING BAYON-CORREA, RAQUEL VEGA-LOPEZ, FERNANDO FUENTES-RODRIGUEZ, JOSE A. ONTANO-ROSARIO, DIEGO RIVERA-ORTIZ, GENESIS HERNANDEZ-DIAZ, EDGAR CALDERON-LEBRON, FRANCES VAZQUEZ-RODRIGUEZ, JENNIFER M. AMBERT-MARTINEZ, JOSE ESPINOSA-DIAZ, WANDA CRUZ-DIAZ, PABLO SANTIAGO-RODRIGUEZ, ISALI TORRES-MARTINEZ, PRISCILA RIVERA-GONZALEZ, ALLAN A. GRIFFITH-FIGUEROA, AUGUSTO B. RIVERA-FALU, KASSANDRA I. VELA-CALO, LUIS G. AULI-FLORES and KEVIN PAREDES
Interested Party: PR DEPT OF JUSTICE
Case Number: 21-1332
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 NOTICE issued. After 06/02/2021, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Joel Torres-Ortiz for Angel Redondo-Santana, Thomas Rivera-Schatz, Zayda E. Ramos-Hernandez, Gabriel Hernandez-Rodriguez, Wilfredo Ramos-Garcia, Pablo Sastre-Fernandez and Katherine Alfonso Urbina. [21-1332] (AL) [Entered: 05/19/2021 04:11 PM]
May 18, 2021 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Carlos Johnny Mendez indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Certificate of service dated 05/18/2021. [21-1332] (IR) [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:48 PM]
May 18, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Carlos Johnny Mendez. Certificate of service dated 05/18/2021. [21-1332] (IR) [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:46 PM]
May 18, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Carlos Johnny Mendez filed by Attorney ISRAEL ROLDAN GONZALEZ. Certificate of service dated 05/18/2021. [21-1332] (IR) [Entered: 05/18/2021 03:42 PM]
May 6, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Lynnott Adorno-Gonzalez, Emilio Adorno-Otero, Jennifer M. Ambert-Martinez, Luis G. Auli-Flores, Irving Bayon-Correa, Jose Betancourt-Alicea, Jose R. Bonilla-Caraballo, Ivonne Borrero-Casado, Edgar Calderon-Lebron, Omar J. Claudio-Llopiz, Saturno Cruz-Carrasquillo, Wanda Cruz-Diaz, Juan Cruz-Dones, Rebecca De Pedro-Gonzalez, Sarai Diaz-Reyes, Jose Espinosa-Diaz, Joshua Figueroa-Serrano, Fernando Fuentes-Rodriguez, Ivelisse Gonzalez-Aleman, Miguel A. Gonzalez-Gerena, Ana Gonzalez-Ledesma, Allan A. Griffith-Figueroa, Genesis Hernandez-Diaz, Carlos Hernandez-Resto, Jorge Irizarry-Paris, Edwin Jimenez-Resto, Mary Lastra-Rivera, Oscar Ledesma-Albors, Jean Leon-Renta, Ariadna Lopez, Janice Marchand-Bauza, Jazmine T. Martinez-Galindez, Cristobal Maysonet-Garcia, Wanda MoralesPerez, Dorothy Myers-Rosario, Jose Narvaez-Carrion, Jonuel Negron-Diaz, Ruth Olivero-Alvarez, Jose A. Ontano-Rosario, Alejandra Ortiz-Melendez, Omar Padro-Pagan, Gilberto Pagan-Resto, Wilfredo Palacio-Camacho, Kevin Paredes, Ady Paz-Otero, Catherine Quinones-Pimentel, Neftali Ramos-Lozada, Arnaldo Reyes-Perez, Augusto B. Rivera-Falu, Felix Rivera-Gonzalez, Luis A. Rivera-Gonzalez, Priscila Rivera-Gonzalez, Diego Rivera-Ortiz, Ramon Riveron-Munoz, Jose Rodriguez-Concepcion, Joseph Rodriguez-Rodriguez, Juan Rodriguez-Saure, Raul Sanchez, Luis Santaella-Diaz, Giancarlo Santiago-Martinez, Pablo Santiago-Rodriguez, Jean Santiago-Torres, Carlos Santos-Figueroa, Antonio Sola-Marti, Emmanuel Soto-Ramos, Nelson M. Torres-Maldonado, Altagracia Torres-Marrero, Isali Torres-Martinez, Myriam Torres-Rios, Frances Vazquez-Rodriguez, Raquel Vega-Lopez, Christian Vega-Villalba, Kassandra I. Vela-Calo, Wanda Vicenti-Latorre, Javier Walker-Carrasquillo, Giara Washington-Del Valle and Not Parties Nery Rivera-Melendez and Ivan G. Rivera-Rios in 21-1332, Appellees Lynnott Adorno-Gonzalez, Emilio Adorno-Otero, Jennifer M. Ambert-Martinez, Luis G. Auli-Flores, Irving Bayon-Correa, Jose Betancourt-Alicea, Jose R. Bonilla-Caraballo, Ivonne Borrero-Casado, Edgar Calderon-Lebron, Omar J. Claudio-Llopiz, Saturno Cruz-Carrasquillo, Wanda Cruz-Diaz, Juan Cruz-Dones, Rebecca De Pedro-Gonzalez, Sarai Diaz-Reyes, Jose Espinosa-Diaz, Joshua Figueroa-Serrano, Fernando Fuentes-Rodriguez, Ivelisse Gonzalez-Aleman, Miguel A. Gonzalez-Gerena, Ana Gonzalez-Ledesma, Allan A. Griffith-Figueroa, Genesis Hernandez-Diaz, Carlos Hernandez-Resto, Jorge Irizarry-Paris, Edwin Jimenez-Resto, Mary Lastra-Rivera, Oscar Ledesma-Albors, Jean Leon-Renta, Ariadna Lopez, Janice Marchand-Bauza, Jazmine T. Martinez-Galindez, Cristobal Maysonet-Garcia, Wanda MoralesPerez, Dorothy Myers-Rosario, Jose Narvaez-Carrion, Jonuel Negron-Diaz, Ruth Olivero-Alvarez, Jose A. Ontano-Rosario, Alejandra Ortiz-Melendez, Omar Padro-Pagan, Gilberto Pagan-Resto, Wilfredo Palacio-Camacho, Kevin Paredes, Ady Paz-Otero, Catherine Quinones-Pimentel, Neftali Ramos-Lozada, Arnaldo Reyes-Perez, Augusto B. Rivera-Falu, Felix Rivera-Gonzalez, Luis A. Rivera-Gonzalez, Priscila Rivera-Gonzalez, Nery Rivera-Melendez, Diego Rivera-Ortiz, Ivan G. Rivera-Rios, Ramon Riveron-Munoz, Jose Rodriguez-Concepcion, Joseph Rodriguez-Rodriguez, Juan Rodriguez-Saure, Raul Sanchez, Luis Santaella-Diaz, Giancarlo Santiago-Martinez, Pablo Santiago-Rodriguez, Jean Santiago-Torres, Carlos Santos-Figueroa, Antonio Sola-Marti, Emmanuel Soto-Ramos, Nelson M. Torres-Maldonado, Altagracia Torres-Marrero, Isali Torres-Martinez, Myriam Torres-Rios, Frances Vazquez-Rodriguez, Raquel Vega-Lopez, Christian Vega-Villalba, Kassandra I. Vela-Calo, Wanda Vicenti-Latorre, Javier Walker-Carrasquillo and Giara Washington-Del Valle in 21-1231 filed by Attorney DAVID CARRION BARALT. Certificate of service dated 05/06/2021. [21-1332, 21-1231] (DC) [Entered: 05/06/2021 12:34 PM]
May 5, 2021 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #243) filed by Appellant Carlos Johnny Mendez. Docketing Statement due 05/19/2021. Transcript Report/Order form due 05/19/2021. Appearance form due 05/19/2021. [21-1332] (AL) [Entered: 05/05/2021 05:06 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Washington-Del Valle, et al v. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CARLOS JOHNNY MENDEZ, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as Speaker of the House of Representatives
Represented By: Victor Calderon-Cestero
Represented By: Amexis Joel Bonilla-Nieves
Represented By: Isis A. Roldan Marquez
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUIS A. RIVERA-GONZALEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARIADNA LOPEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IVONNE BORRERO-CASADO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LYNNOTT ADORNO-GONZALEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GIANCARLO SANTIAGO-MARTINEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ADY PAZ-OTERO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GILBERTO PAGAN-RESTO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GIARA WASHINGTON-DEL VALLE
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OMAR PADRO-PAGAN
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: REBECCA DE PEDRO-GONZALEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MARY LASTRA-RIVERA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANTONIO SOLA-MARTI
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDWIN JIMENEZ-RESTO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARLOS HERNANDEZ-RESTO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WANDA VICENTI-LATORRE
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NELSON M. TORRES-MALDONADO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CATHERINE QUINONES-PIMENTEL
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: NEFTALI RAMOS-LOZADA
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHRISTIAN VEGA-VILLALBA
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JONUEL NEGRON-DIAZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSEPH RODRIGUEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAZMINE T. MARTINEZ-GALINDEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE RODRIGUEZ-CONCEPCION
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JAVIER WALKER-CARRASQUILLO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ANA GONZALEZ-LEDESMA
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FELIX RIVERA-GONZALEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JANICE MARCHAND-BAUZA
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OMAR J. CLAUDIO-LLOPIZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE BETANCOURT-ALICEA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEAN SANTIAGO-TORRES
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE NARVAEZ-CARRION
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MYRIAM TORRES-RIOS
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMILIO ADORNO-OTERO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUAN CRUZ-DONES
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALTAGRACIA TORRES-MARRERO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CRISTOBAL MAYSONET-GARCIA
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IVELISSE GONZALEZ-ALEMAN
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JUAN RODRIGUEZ-SAURE
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALEJANDRA ORTIZ-MELENDEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: OSCAR LEDESMA-ALBORS
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SARAI DIAZ-REYES
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DOROTHY MYERS-ROSARIO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WILFREDO PALACIO-CAMACHO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE R. BONILLA-CARABALLO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAMON RIVERON-MUNOZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JORGE IRIZARRY-PARIS
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ARNALDO REYES-PEREZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WANDA MORALESPEREZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAUL SANCHEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RUTH OLIVERO-ALVAREZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JEAN LEON-RENTA
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MIGUEL A. GONZALEZ-GERENA
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CARLOS SANTOS-FIGUEROA
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: SATURNO CRUZ-CARRASQUILLO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUIS SANTAELLA-DIAZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSHUA FIGUEROA-SERRANO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EMMANUEL SOTO-RAMOS
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: IRVING BAYON-CORREA
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: RAQUEL VEGA-LOPEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FERNANDO FUENTES-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE A. ONTANO-ROSARIO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: DIEGO RIVERA-ORTIZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: GENESIS HERNANDEZ-DIAZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: EDGAR CALDERON-LEBRON
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: FRANCES VAZQUEZ-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JENNIFER M. AMBERT-MARTINEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: JOSE ESPINOSA-DIAZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: WANDA CRUZ-DIAZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PABLO SANTIAGO-RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ISALI TORRES-MARTINEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: PRISCILA RIVERA-GONZALEZ
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ALLAN A. GRIFFITH-FIGUEROA
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: AUGUSTO B. RIVERA-FALU
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KASSANDRA I. VELA-CALO
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: LUIS G. AULI-FLORES
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: KEVIN PAREDES
Represented By: David Carrion Baralt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IVAN G. RIVERA-RIOS
Represented By: Ivan G. Rivera-Rios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NERY RIVERA-MELENDEZ
Represented By: Nery Rivera-Melendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILFREDO RAMOS-GARCIA
Represented By: Jose A. Cabiya-Morales
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZAYDA E. RAMOS-HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Jose A. Cabiya-Morales
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANGEL REDONDO-SANTANA, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as Auxiliary Superintendent in Charge of Administration
Represented By: Jose A. Cabiya-Morales
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THOMAS RIVERA-SCHATZ, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as President of the Senate of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jose A. Cabiya-Morales
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE LUIS DALMAU-SANTIAGO, in his official capacity as President of the Senate of Puerto Rico
Represented By: Victor D. Candelario
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISANDRA MALDONADO-ALVARADO
Represented By: Victor Calderon-Cestero
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAFAEL HERNANDEZ-MONTANEZ
Represented By: Jorge Martinez-Luciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE ALFONSO URBINA
Represented By: Jose A. Cabiya-Morales
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PABLO SASTRE-FERNANDEZ, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as Auxiliary Superintendent in Charge of Operations
Represented By: Jose A. Cabiya-Morales
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GABRIEL HERNANDEZ-RODRIGUEZ, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as Chief of Staff of the President of the Senate
Represented By: Jose A. Cabiya-Morales
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Represented By: Joel Torres-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSE FIGUEROA-TORRES, in his personal capacity and in his official capacity as Human Resources Director at the Office of the Superintendent of the Capitol Building
Represented By: Eliezer Aldarondo-Ortiz
Represented By: David Rafael Rodriguez-Burns
Represented By: Claudio Aliff-Ortiz
Represented By: Eliezer Alberto Aldarondo-Lopez
Represented By: Sheila Johanna Torres-Delgado
Represented By: Ivan M. Castro-Ortiz
Represented By: Israel Roldan-Gonzalez
Represented By: Idza Diaz-Rivera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PR DEPT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Wandymar Burgos-Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?