Efreom, et al v. McKee, et al
Plaintiff: GREGORY MARCELLO
Plaintiff / Appellant: BARBARA A. MOUSSALLI, PAMELA J. DELVECCHIO, ADRIENNE R. DIMEO, DAVID GOODMAN, WILLIAM H. FERGUSON, BRIAN KENNEDY, DEAN L. LEES, JANET KELLER, JAMES E. BARDEN, MARILYN C. DISTEFANO, NORMA JEAN PALAZZO, JOSEPH F. CLIFFORD, III, MICHAEL N. SENERCHIA, MARY KATHERINE O'NEILL, ANTHONY J. RICCI, WILLIAM BLAIR, FRANCESCA BEDELL, JAMES H. COX, JANICE M. COLERICK, JOANN C. LOMBARDI, DENNIS F. ZIROLI, LAURIE A. SCIALABBA, KAREN M. TANNER, JAMES BEDELL, SUSAN L. HARTNETT, JEAN PETISCE-LYNCH, NANCY A. LEMME, BINYAMIN I. EFREOM, ROBERT M. PESATURO, JR., MARGARET HARRIS, MARY F SHERLOCK, PATRICIA E. GIAMMARCO, ANNMARIE BOLVIN, SANDRA L. MCCULLOUGH, CYNTHIA J. RONDEAU, KATHLYNE E. WALSH, CAROL SCHNEIDER, TIMOTHY H. MURPHY, WILLIAM P. BERUBE, ANTHONY T. BAGAGLIA, ROBERT J. DIMAIO, MAUREEN RITA VAVOLOTIS, KATHLEEN A. CRESCENZO, JOANNE A. MATISEWSKI, MARY G. KENNEDY, SANDRA A. CURRAN, ANTONETTA R. MELLO and MARY O'CONNELL MCKENNA
Defendant / Appellee: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF RHODE ISLAND, by and through Frank J. Karpinski, its Executive Director, SETH MAGAZINER, in his capacity as Chairperson of the Retirement Board and DANIEL J. MCKEE, in his capacity as Governor of the State of Rhode Island
Case Number: 21-1382
Filed: May 13, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2021 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Anthony T. Bagaglia, James E. Barden, Francesca Bedell, James Bedell, William P. Berube, William Blair, Annmarie Bolvin, Joseph F. Clifford, III, Janice M. Colerick, James H. Cox, Kathleen A. Crescenzo, Sandra A. Curran, Pamela J. DelVecchio, Robert J. DiMaio, Adrienne R. DiMeo, Marilyn C. DiStefano, Binyamin I. Efreom, William H. Ferguson, Patricia E. Giammarco, David Goodman, Margaret Harris, Susan L. Hartnett, Janet Keller, Brian Kennedy, Mary G. Kennedy, Dean L. Lees, Nancy A. Lemme, Joann C. Lombardi, Joanne A. Matisewski, Sandra L. McCullough, Antonetta R. Mello, Barbara A. Moussalli, Timothy H. Murphy, Mary O'Connell McKenna, Mary Katherine O'Neill, Norma Jean Palazzo, Robert M. Pesaturo, Jr., Jean Petisce-Lynch, Anthony J. Ricci, Cynthia J. Rondeau, Carol Schneider, Laurie A. Scialabba, Michael N. Senerchia, Mary F Sherlock, Karen M. Tanner, Maureen Rita Vavolotis, Kathlyne E. Walsh and Dennis F. Ziroli. Certificate of service dated 07/07/2021. [21-1382] CLERK'S NOTE: Party selection was INCORRECT. Correction made by clerk's office. No further action required. (GJW) [Entered: 07/07/2021 04:45 PM]
July 7, 2021 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued directing appellant to file a brief and appendix or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 45.0(a). Brief and Appendix due 07/21/2021. [21-1382] (GRC) [Entered: 07/07/2021 04:19 PM]
May 25, 2021 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 07/06/2021 for appellant Anthony T. Bagaglia, James E. Barden, Francesca Bedell, James Bedell, William P. Berube, William Blair, Annmarie Bolvin, Joseph F. Clifford III, Janice M. Colerick, James H. Cox, Kathleen A. Crescenzo, Sandra A. Curran, Pamela J. DelVecchio, Robert J. DiMaio, Adrienne R. DiMeo, Marilyn C. DiStefano, Binyamin I. Efreom, William H. Ferguson, Patricia E. Giammarco, David Goodman, Margaret Harris, Susan L. Hartnett, Janet Keller, Brian Kennedy, Mary G. Kennedy, Dean L. Lees, Nancy A. Lemme, Joann C. Lombardi, Joanne A. Matisewski, Sandra L. McCullough, Antonetta R. Mello, Barbara A. Moussalli, Timothy H. Murphy, Mary O'Connell McKenna, Mary Katherine O'Neill, Norma Jean Palazzo, Robert M. Pesaturo Jr., Jean Petisce-Lynch, Anthony J. Ricci, Cynthia J. Rondeau, Carol Schneider, Laurie A. Scialabba, Michael N. Senerchia, Mary F Sherlock, Karen M. Tanner, Maureen Rita Vavolotis, Kathlyne E. Walsh and Dennis F. Ziroli. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [21-1382] (GRC) [Entered: 05/25/2021 10:34 AM]
May 24, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Anthony T. Bagaglia, James E. Barden, Francesca Bedell, James Bedell, William P. Berube, William Blair, Annmarie Bolvin, Joseph F. Clifford, III, Janice M. Colerick, James H. Cox, Kathleen A. Crescenzo, Sandra A. Curran, Pamela J. DelVecchio, Robert J. DiMaio, Adrienne R. DiMeo, Marilyn C. DiStefano, Binyamin I. Efreom, William H. Ferguson, Patricia E. Giammarco, David Goodman, Margaret Harris, Susan L. Hartnett, Janet Keller, Brian Kennedy, Mary G. Kennedy, Dean L. Lees, Nancy A. Lemme, Joann C. Lombardi, Joanne A. Matisewski, Sandra L. McCullough, Antonetta R. Mello, Barbara A. Moussalli, Timothy H. Murphy, Mary O'Connell McKenna, Mary Katherine O'Neill, Norma Jean Palazzo, Robert M. Pesaturo, Jr., Jean Petisce-Lynch, Anthony J. Ricci, Cynthia J. Rondeau, Carol Schneider, Laurie A. Scialabba, Michael N. Senerchia, Mary F Sherlock, Karen M. Tanner, Maureen Rita Vavolotis, Kathlyne E. Walsh, Dennis F. Ziroli, Appellees Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island, Seth Magaziner, Daniel J. McKee and Not Party Gregory Marcello. Certificate of service dated 05/24/2021. [21-1382] (GJW) [Entered: 05/24/2021 04:33 PM]
May 24, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Anthony T. Bagaglia, James E. Barden, Francesca Bedell, James Bedell, William P. Berube, William Blair, Annmarie Bolvin, Joseph F. Clifford, III, Janice M. Colerick, James H. Cox, Kathleen A. Crescenzo, Sandra A. Curran, Pamela J. DelVecchio, Robert J. DiMaio, Adrienne R. DiMeo, Marilyn C. DiStefano, Binyamin I. Efreom, William H. Ferguson, Patricia E. Giammarco, David Goodman, Margaret Harris, Susan L. Hartnett, Janet Keller, Brian Kennedy, Mary G. Kennedy, Dean L. Lees, Nancy A. Lemme, Joann C. Lombardi, Joanne A. Matisewski, Sandra L. McCullough, Antonetta R. Mello, Barbara A. Moussalli, Timothy H. Murphy, Mary O'Connell McKenna, Mary Katherine O'Neill, Norma Jean Palazzo, Robert M. Pesaturo, Jr., Jean Petisce-Lynch, Anthony J. Ricci, Cynthia J. Rondeau, Carol Schneider, Laurie A. Scialabba, Michael N. Senerchia, Mary F Sherlock, Karen M. Tanner, Maureen Rita Vavolotis, Kathlyne E. Walsh, Dennis F. Ziroli and Appellees Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island, Seth Magaziner and Daniel J. McKee filed by Attorney George J. West, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 05/24/2021. [21-1382] (GJW) [Entered: 05/24/2021 04:32 PM]
May 20, 2021 SUPPLEMENTAL record filed. Docket entry: 31 (amended notice of appeal). [21-1382] (GRC) [Entered: 05/20/2021 12:16 PM]
May 20, 2021 AMENDED notice of appeal (doc. #31) filed by Appellant Brian Kennedy on 05/14/2021. [21-1382] (GRC) [Entered: 05/20/2021 12:15 PM]
May 19, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Daniel J. McKee and Seth Magaziner filed by Attorney Michael W. Field. Certificate of service dated 05/19/2021. [21-1382] (MWF) [Entered: 05/19/2021 02:30 PM]
May 17, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island filed by Attorney John A. Tarantino. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2021. [21-1382] (JAT) [Entered: 05/17/2021 09:35 AM]
May 17, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Employees' Retirement System of Rhode Island filed by Attorney Nicole J. Benjamin. Certificate of service dated 05/17/2021. [21-1382] (NJB) [Entered: 05/17/2021 09:37 AM]
May 14, 2021 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #29) filed by Appellants Anthony T. Bagaglia, James E. Barden, Francesca Bedell, James Bedell, William P. Berube, William Blair, Annmarie Bolvin, Joseph F. Clifford, III, Janice M. Colerick, James H. Cox, Kathleen A. Crescenzo, Sandra A. Curran, Pamela J. DelVecchio, Robert J. DiMaio, Adrienne R. DiMeo, Marilyn C. DiStefano, Binyamin I. Efreom, William H. Ferguson, Patricia E. Giammarco, David Goodman, Margaret Harris, Susan L. Hartnett, Janet Keller, Mary G. Kennedy, Dean L. Lees, Nancy A. Lemme, Joann C. Lombardi, Joanne A. Matisewski, Sandra L. McCullough, Antonetta R. Mello, Barbara A. Moussalli, Timothy H. Murphy, Mary O'Connell McKenna, Mary Katherine O'Neill, Norma Jean Palazzo, Robert M. Pesaturo, Jr., Jean Petisce-Lynch, Anthony J. Ricci, Cynthia J. Rondeau, Carol Schneider, Laurie A. Scialabba, Michael N. Senerchia, Mary F Sherlock, Karen M. Tanner, Maureen Rita Vavolotis, Kathlyne E. Walsh and Dennis F. Ziroli. Appearance form and Docketing Statement due 05/28/2021. [21-1382] (GRC) [Entered: 05/14/2021 12:56 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Efreom, et al v. McKee, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARBARA A. MOUSSALLI
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAMELA J. DELVECCHIO
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ADRIENNE R. DIMEO
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID GOODMAN
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM H. FERGUSON
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRIAN KENNEDY
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEAN L. LEES
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANET KELLER
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES E. BARDEN
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARILYN C. DISTEFANO
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NORMA JEAN PALAZZO
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH F. CLIFFORD, III
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL N. SENERCHIA
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY KATHERINE O'NEILL
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY J. RICCI
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM BLAIR
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCESCA BEDELL
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES H. COX
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANICE M. COLERICK
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOANN C. LOMBARDI
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DENNIS F. ZIROLI
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LAURIE A. SCIALABBA
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KAREN M. TANNER
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES BEDELL
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN L. HARTNETT
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEAN PETISCE-LYNCH
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY A. LEMME
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BINYAMIN I. EFREOM
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT M. PESATURO, JR.
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARGARET HARRIS
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY F SHERLOCK
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICIA E. GIAMMARCO
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANNMARIE BOLVIN
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDRA L. MCCULLOUGH
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CYNTHIA J. RONDEAU
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHLYNE E. WALSH
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CAROL SCHNEIDER
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY H. MURPHY
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM P. BERUBE
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY T. BAGAGLIA
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT J. DIMAIO
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MAUREEN RITA VAVOLOTIS
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KATHLEEN A. CRESCENZO
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOANNE A. MATISEWSKI
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY G. KENNEDY
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SANDRA A. CURRAN
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTONETTA R. MELLO
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY O'CONNELL MCKENNA
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT SYSTEM OF RHODE ISLAND, by and through Frank J. Karpinski, its Executive Director
Represented By: Nicole J. Benjamin
Represented By: John A. Tarantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SETH MAGAZINER, in his capacity as Chairperson of the Retirement Board
Represented By: Michael W. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL J. MCKEE, in his capacity as Governor of the State of Rhode Island
Represented By: Michael W. Field
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY MARCELLO
Represented By: George Joseph West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?