Victim Rights Law Center, et al v. Cardona, et al
Plaintiff: VICTIM RIGHTS LAW CENTER
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANNE DOE, EQUAL RIGHTS ADVOCATES, LEGAL VOICE, CHICAGO ALLIANCE AGAINST SEXUAL EXPLOITATION, JANE DOE, an individual by and through her mother and next friend Melissa White, SOBIA DOE, SUSAN DOE, JILL DOE, NANCY DOE, LISA DOE and MARY DOE
Defendant / Appellee: MIGUEL ANGEL CARDONA, in his official capacity as Secretary of Education, SUZANNE B. GOLDBERG, in her official capacity as Acting Assistant Secretary for Civil Rights and US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Interested Party: LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION, AUTISTIC SELF ADVOCACY NETWORK, EDUCATION LAW CENTER, PA, GLSEN, JAPANESE AMERICAN CITIZENS LEAGUE, LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS, NATIONAL ALLIANCE FOR PARTNERSHIPS IN EQUITY, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT, NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS, NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY, NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, NATIONAL LGBTQ TASK FORCE, SOUTHEAST ASIA RESOURCE ACTION CENTER, FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION, CLEARINGHOUSE ON WOMEN'S ISSUES, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS, AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF STATE COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS, AMERICAN DENTAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN INDIAN HIGHER EDUCATION CONSORTIUM, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN UNIVERSITIES, ASSOCIATION OF CATHOLIC COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES (ACCU), ASSOCIATION OF GOVERNING BOARDS OF UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES (AGB), ASSOCIATION OF JESUIT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC AND LAND-GRANT UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR HUMAN RESOURCES, COUNCIL FOR ADVANCEMENT AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATION, COUNCIL OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES (CIC), MIDDLE STATES COMMISSION ON HIGHER EDUCATION, NASPA - STUDENT AFFAIRS ADMINISTRATORS IN HIGHER EDUCATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY BUSINESS OFFICERS, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF DIVERSITY OFFICERS IN HIGHER EDUCATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES, NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, NEW ENGLAND COMMISSION OF HIGHER EDUCATION, UNIVERSITY RISK MANAGEMENT AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATION (URMIA), WASC SENIOR COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY COMMISSION, PROMUNDO, AMERICAN MEN'S STUDIES ASSOCIATION, CONNECT, INC., JANA'S CAMPAIGN, INC., MEN STOPPING VIOLENCE, MEN'S STORY PROJECT, MEN AND MASCULINITIES KNOWLEDGE COMMUNITY, NORTH AMERICAN MENENGAGE NETWORK, TEN MEN - RHODE ISLAND COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, VERA HOUSE, INC., KESHET WEINSTEIN, MELISSA GIDDENS, CAROLINE DOE, NJASSO, LILIAN DOE, ALEXI DOE, MORGAN DOE, DEENA DOE, KARA CAGLE, ANNA LUDES, STERLING RIETHMAN, CHRISSY BALL, JENNIFER BEDFORD, JANE DOE, 2, ANITAB.ORG, BERKELEY HIGH SCHOOL STOP HARASSING, BREAK THE CYCLE, COLORADO COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT, COMMUNITY LEGAL AID SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA, DAY ONE, END RAPE ON CAMPUS, FREEFROM, GIRLS INC., ILLINOIS COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT, LEGAL AID AT WORK, MARYLAND COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT, MINNESOTA COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT, NATIONAL ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE, NEW HAMPSHIRE COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE, NORTH CAROLINA COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT, PENNSYLVANIA COALITION AGAINST RAPE, ROCKY MOUNTAIN VICTIM LAW CENTER, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR AFFIRMATIVE ACTION BY EQUAL OPPORTUNITY PROFESSIONALS, WOMENS LAW PROJECT, SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENTS' ASSOCIATION, AASA, COUNCIL OF THE GREAT CITY SCHOOLS, LAW PROFESSORS, ACCREDITATION COUNCIL FOR PHARMACY EDUCATION, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF COMMUNITY COLLEGES, SURVIVORS OF SEXUAL VIOLENCE, CALIFORNIA WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, MEMBERS OF CONGRESS, STOP ABUSIVE AND VIOLENT ENVIRONMENTS, FAMILIES ADVOCATING FOR CAMPUS EQUALITY, NAOMI M. MANN, SAMUEL R. BAGENSTOS, DANIEL HEMEL, NICOLE HUBERFELD, KATHARINE K. BAKER, JON MICHAELS, BLAKE EMERSON, DEBORAH L. BRAKE, NANCY CANTALUPO, JOANNA L. GROSSMAN, ERIN BUZUVIS, DAVID S. COHEN, ANN MCGINLEY, RUBEN GARCIA, DAVID OPPENHEIMER, JANE DOE, 75, JODI SHORT, JONATHAN WEINBERG, DAVID A. SUPER, IAN AYRES, MICHAEL J. WISHNIE, ROBERT S. CHANG, HANNAH BRENNER JOHNSON, MICHELE DAUBER, DANIEL TAYLOR DEACON, SALLY GOLDFARB, JULIE GOLDSCHEID, VICTORIA F. NOURSE, JANE DOE INC., AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR ACCESS, EQUITY AND DIVERSITY, NEW YORK STATE COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT, FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION, INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, SPEECH FIRST, INC. and STATE OF TEXAS
Case Number: 21-1782
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 CERTIFIED mail return receipt card indicating mail was delivered, but not signed. Document(s) sent: Returned filing fee check as already paid in district court. [21-1782] (GAK) [Entered: 11/05/2021 02:08 PM]
November 4, 2021 NOTICE allowing request for removal from service list. The following attorneys have been removed from the service list for this case: Cynthia E. Tobisman for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity. [21-1445, 21-1773, 21-1777, 21-1782, 21-1783, 21-1853] (GAK) [Entered: 11/04/2021 12:30 PM]
November 4, 2021 NOTICE issued. After 11/18/2021, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Neena Chaudhry for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Mary Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe and Victim Rights Law Center, Caitlin A. Crujido for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Mary Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe and Victim Rights Law Center, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Mary Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe and Victim Rights Law Center, Evan M. Harris for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Mary Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe and Victim Rights Law Center, Kristin M. Knuuttila for Victim Rights Law Center and Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, David A. Newman for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe and Victim Rights Law Center, Julie G. O'Neill for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Mary Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe and Victim Rights Law Center, Amy Poyer for Victim Rights Law Center and Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law Center, Girls Inc., AnitaB.org, Berkeley High School Stop Harassing, Break the Cycle, Colorado Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Community Legal Aid Southern California, Day One, End Rape On Campus, FreeFrom, Illinois Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Jane Doe Inc., Legal Aid at Work, Maryland Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Minnesota Coalition Against Sexual Assault, National Alliance to End Sexual Violence, New Hampshire Coalition Against Domestic and Sexual Violence, New York State Coalition Against Sexual Assault, North Carolina Coalition Against Sexual Assault, Pennsylvania Coalition Against Rape, Rocky Mountain Victim Law Center and Womens Law Project, Robin A. Smith for Susan Doe, Jane Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Mary Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe and Victim Rights Law Center, Vanshika Vij for Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Mary Doe, Jill Doe, Legal Voice, Victim Rights Law Center, Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Sobia Doe, Nancy Doe, Lisa Doe and Victim Rights Law Center, Rebecca M. Kopplin for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, Steven A. Myers for US Department of Education, Suzanne B. Goldberg and Miguel Angel Cardona, Jesse R. Binnall for Stop Abusive and Violent Environments, John W. Borkowski for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Neena Chaudhry for Victim Rights Law Center, Lisa N. Cloutier for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Susan M. Cook for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Caitlin A. Crujido for Victim Rights Law Center, Kyle M. Druding for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Paige Duggins-Clay for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Ellen L. Eardley for Survivors of Sexual Violence, Jane Doe, Keshet Weinstein, Melissa Giddens, Caroline Doe, NJasso, Lilian Doe, Alexi Doe, Morgan Doe, Deena Doe, Kara Cagle, Anna Ludes, Sterling Riethman, Chrissy Ball and Jennifer Bedford, Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen for Victim Rights Law Center, Emily Fox for Members of Congress, Cynthia P. Garrett for Families Advocating for Campus Equality, Stephanie J. Gold for American Association of University Professors, American Council on Education, Association of American Medical Colleges, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-grant Universities, National Collegiate Athletic Association, National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities, Association of Catholic Colleges and Universities (ACCU), Association of Governing Boards of Universities and Colleges (AGB), Council of Independent Colleges (CIC), University Risk Management and Insurance Association (URMIA), WASC Senior College and University Commission, Accreditation Council for Pharmacy Education, American Association of Community Colleges, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Dental Education Association, American Indian Higher Education Consortium, Association of Jesuit Colleges and Universities, College and University Professional Association for Human Resources, Middle States Commission on Higher Education, NASPA - Student Affairs Administrators in Higher Education, National Association of College and University Business Officers, National Association of Diversity Officers in Higher Education, New England Commission of Higher Education and Council for Advancement and Support of Education, Evan M. Harris for Victim Rights Law Center, Daniel P. Jaffe for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Allen F. James for National Association of Secondary School Principals, Council of the Great City Schools and School Superintendents' Association, AASA, Geoffrey B. Kehlmann for Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity, Kristin M. Knuuttila for Feminist Majority Foundation, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, California Women's Law
November 3, 2021 REQUEST for removal from the service list filed by Attorney Cynthia E. Tobisman for Not Parties Lambda Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc., Feminist Majority Foundation, Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights Under Law, National Council of Jewish Women, American Association of University Women, Clearinghouse on Women's Issues, American Federation of Teachers, Japanese American Citizens League, National Center for Transgender Equality, National LGBTQ Task Force, League of United Latin American Citizens, American Humanist Association, GLSEN, Southeast Asia Resource Action Center, American Association for Affirmative Action by Equal Opportunity Professionals, Autistic Self Advocacy Network, Education Law Center, National Alliance for Partnerships in Equity, National Association of Councils on Developmental Disabilities, National Center for Parent Leadership, Advocacy and Community Empowerment, National Center for Special Education in Charter Schools and American Association for Access, Equity and Diversity. Certificate of service was not included. [21-1782] (GAK) [Entered: 11/04/2021 11:54 AM]
October 25, 2021 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Cynthia P. Garrett for Not Parties Families Advocating for Campus Equality and Families Advocating for Campus Equality. Copy of Case Opening Notice issued October 13, 2021. Forwarded to 3 West George St PO Box 71 Batesville, IN 47006-9998. [21-1782] (ATC) [Entered: 10/26/2021 04:09 PM]
October 25, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Miguel Angel Cardona and US Department of Education filed by Attorney Marleigh D Dover. Certificate of service dated 10/25/2021. [21-1782] (MDD) [Entered: 10/25/2021 10:51 AM]
October 19, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Miguel Angel Cardona, Suzanne B. Goldberg and US Department of Education filed by Attorney Stephanie R. Marcus. Certificate of service dated 10/19/2021. [21-1782] (SRM) [Entered: 10/19/2021 05:38 PM]
October 13, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Mary Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice and Victim Rights Law Center filed by Attorney James R. Sigel. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2021. [21-1782] (JRS) [Entered: 10/13/2021 12:53 PM]
October 13, 2021 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Mary Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Victim Rights Law Center and Legal Voice. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2021. [21-1782] (JRS) [Entered: 10/13/2021 12:50 PM]
October 13, 2021 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Mary Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice and Victim Rights Law Center filed by Attorney Michael F. Qian. Certificate of service dated 10/13/2021. [21-1782] (MQ) [Entered: 10/13/2021 12:55 PM]
October 13, 2021 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Mary Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice and Victim Rights Law Center indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 10/12/2021. [21-1782] (JRS) [Entered: 10/12/2021 06:47 PM]
October 13, 2021 TRANSCRIPT ordered: 11/18/2020, Bench Trial. Transcript(s) due 12/13/2021 from Court Reporter Richard Henry Romanow [21-1782] (GAK) [Entered: 10/13/2021 01:41 PM]
October 13, 2021 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #198) filed by Appellants Chicago Alliance Against Sexual Exploitation, Anne Doe, Jane Doe, Jill Doe, Lisa Doe, Mary Doe, Nancy Doe, Sobia Doe, Susan Doe, Equal Rights Advocates, Legal Voice and Victim Rights Law Center. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, Appearance form. and Fee due 10/27/2021. [21-1782] (GAK) [Entered: 10/13/2021 11:53 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Victim Rights Law Center, et al v. Cardona, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICTIM RIGHTS LAW CENTER
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: David A. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANNE DOE
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EQUAL RIGHTS ADVOCATES
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEGAL VOICE
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHICAGO ALLIANCE AGAINST SEXUAL EXPLOITATION
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JANE DOE, an individual by and through her mother and next friend Melissa White
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SOBIA DOE
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN DOE
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JILL DOE
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY DOE
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LISA DOE
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: David A. Newman
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARY DOE
Represented By: Sunu P. Chandy
Represented By: Neena Chaudhry
Represented By: Caitlin A. Crujido
Represented By: Natalie A. Fleming-Nolen
Represented By: Evan M. Harris
Represented By: Emily Martin
Represented By: Julie G. O'Neill
Represented By: Shiwali G. Patel
Represented By: Diane Lisa Rosenfeld
Represented By: Robin A. Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Tang
Represented By: Vanshika Vij
Represented By: Michael Qian
Represented By: James Reid Sigel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MIGUEL ANGEL CARDONA, in his official capacity as Secretary of Education
Represented By: Jennifer B. Dickey
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Stephanie Robin Marcus
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUZANNE B. GOLDBERG, in her official capacity as Acting Assistant Secretary for Civil Rights
Represented By: Jennifer B. Dickey
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Stephanie Robin Marcus
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: US DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Jennifer B. Dickey
Represented By: Rebecca M. Kopplin
Represented By: Donald Campbell Lockhart
Represented By: Jennifer Mascott
Represented By: Steven A. Myers
Represented By: Stephanie Robin Marcus
Represented By: Marleigh D. Dover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS UNDER LAW
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY WOMEN
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN HUMANIST ASSOCIATION
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AUTISTIC SELF ADVOCACY NETWORK
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: EDUCATION LAW CENTER, PA
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GLSEN
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JAPANESE AMERICAN CITIZENS LEAGUE
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LAMBDA LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC.
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LEAGUE OF UNITED LATIN AMERICAN CITIZENS
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ALLIANCE FOR PARTNERSHIPS IN EQUITY
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COUNCILS ON DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL CENTER FOR PARENT LEADERSHIP, ADVOCACY AND COMMUNITY EMPOWERMENT
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL CENTER FOR SPECIAL EDUCATION IN CHARTER SCHOOLS
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL CENTER FOR TRANSGENDER EQUALITY
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL LGBTQ TASK FORCE
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SOUTHEAST ASIA RESOURCE ACTION CENTER
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FEMINIST MAJORITY FOUNDATION
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CLEARINGHOUSE ON WOMEN'S ISSUES
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS
Represented By: John W. Borkowski
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Daniel P. Jaffe
Represented By: Allen F. James
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Represented By: Scott Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN COUNCIL ON EDUCATION
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF STATE COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN DENTAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN INDIAN HIGHER EDUCATION CONSORTIUM
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF CATHOLIC COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES (ACCU)
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF GOVERNING BOARDS OF UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES (AGB)
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF JESUIT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ASSOCIATION OF PUBLIC AND LAND-GRANT UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR HUMAN RESOURCES
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COUNCIL FOR ADVANCEMENT AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATION
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COUNCIL OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES (CIC)
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MIDDLE STATES COMMISSION ON HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NASPA - STUDENT AFFAIRS ADMINISTRATORS IN HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY BUSINESS OFFICERS
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF DIVERSITY OFFICERS IN HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF INDEPENDENT COLLEGES AND UNIVERSITIES
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NEW ENGLAND COMMISSION OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: UNIVERSITY RISK MANAGEMENT AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATION (URMIA)
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WASC SENIOR COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY COMMISSION
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PROMUNDO
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN MEN'S STUDIES ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CONNECT, INC.
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JANA'S CAMPAIGN, INC.
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MEN STOPPING VIOLENCE
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MEN'S STORY PROJECT
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MEN AND MASCULINITIES KNOWLEDGE COMMUNITY
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NORTH AMERICAN MENENGAGE NETWORK
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: TEN MEN - RHODE ISLAND COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VERA HOUSE, INC.
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Lauren A. Khouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KESHET WEINSTEIN
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MELISSA GIDDENS
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CAROLINE DOE
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NJASSO
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LILIAN DOE
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ALEXI DOE
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MORGAN DOE
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DEENA DOE
Represented By: Linda M. Correia
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KARA CAGLE
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ANNA LUDES
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: STERLING RIETHMAN
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CHRISSY BALL
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JENNIFER BEDFORD
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JANE DOE, 2
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ANITAB.ORG
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BERKELEY HIGH SCHOOL STOP HARASSING
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BREAK THE CYCLE
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COLORADO COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COMMUNITY LEGAL AID SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAY ONE
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: END RAPE ON CAMPUS
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FREEFROM
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: GIRLS INC.
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ILLINOIS COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LEGAL AID AT WORK
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MARYLAND COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MINNESOTA COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NATIONAL ALLIANCE TO END SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NEW HAMPSHIRE COALITION AGAINST DOMESTIC AND SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NORTH CAROLINA COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: PENNSYLVANIA COALITION AGAINST RAPE
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ROCKY MOUNTAIN VICTIM LAW CENTER
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR AFFIRMATIVE ACTION BY EQUAL OPPORTUNITY PROFESSIONALS
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: WOMENS LAW PROJECT
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SCHOOL SUPERINTENDENTS' ASSOCIATION, AASA
Represented By: John W. Borkowski
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Daniel P. Jaffe
Represented By: Allen F. James
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Represented By: Scott Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: COUNCIL OF THE GREAT CITY SCHOOLS
Represented By: John W. Borkowski
Represented By: Paige Duggins-Clay
Represented By: Daniel P. Jaffe
Represented By: Allen F. James
Represented By: Aleksandra O. Rushing
Represented By: Scott Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: LAW PROFESSORS
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ACCREDITATION COUNCIL FOR PHARMACY EDUCATION
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF COMMUNITY COLLEGES
Represented By: Susan M. Cook
Represented By: Kyle M. Druding
Represented By: Stephanie J. Gold
Represented By: Gregory Francis Noonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SURVIVORS OF SEXUAL VIOLENCE
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: CALIFORNIA WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MEMBERS OF CONGRESS
Represented By: Trisha Beth Anderson
Represented By: Nicole Antoine
Represented By: Carlton Forbes
Represented By: Emily Fox
Represented By: Matthew S. Shapanka
Represented By: Tyler Starr
Represented By: Carlton Eliot Forbes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: STOP ABUSIVE AND VIOLENT ENVIRONMENTS
Represented By: Jesse R. Binnall
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FAMILIES ADVOCATING FOR CAMPUS EQUALITY
Represented By: Tara Jill Davis
Represented By: Cynthia P. Garrett
Represented By: Andrew T. Miltenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NAOMI M. MANN
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SAMUEL R. BAGENSTOS
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DANIEL HEMEL
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NICOLE HUBERFELD
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: KATHARINE K. BAKER
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JON MICHAELS
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: BLAKE EMERSON
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DEBORAH L. BRAKE
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NANCY CANTALUPO
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JOANNA L. GROSSMAN
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ERIN BUZUVIS
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAVID S. COHEN
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ANN MCGINLEY
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: RUBEN GARCIA
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAVID OPPENHEIMER
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JANE DOE, 75
Represented By: Lisa N. Cloutier
Represented By: Ellen L. Eardley
Represented By: Cari S. Simon
Represented By: Saul E. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JODI SHORT
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JONATHAN WEINBERG
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DAVID A. SUPER
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: IAN AYRES
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MICHAEL J. WISHNIE
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: ROBERT S. CHANG
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: HANNAH BRENNER JOHNSON
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: MICHELE DAUBER
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: DANIEL TAYLOR DEACON
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SALLY GOLDFARB
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JULIE GOLDSCHEID
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: VICTORIA F. NOURSE
Represented By: Roy L. Austin
Represented By: Naomi M. Mann
Represented By: Lauren E. Snyder
Represented By: Daniel Tingley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: JANE DOE INC.
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR ACCESS, EQUITY AND DIVERSITY
Represented By: David Hinojosa
Represented By: Geoffrey B. Kehlmann
Represented By: Oren McCleary Sellstrom
Represented By: Cynthia E. Tobisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: NEW YORK STATE COALITION AGAINST SEXUAL ASSAULT
Represented By: Kristin M. Knuuttila
Represented By: Amy Poyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: FOUNDATION FOR INDIVIDUAL RIGHTS IN EDUCATION
Represented By: Brian W. Barnes
Represented By: Charles J. Cooper
Represented By: Nicole J. Moss
Represented By: Patrick N. Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: INDEPENDENT WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Represented By: Alexa R. Baltes
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Patrick N. Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SPEECH FIRST, INC.
Represented By: Alexa R. Baltes
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Norris
Represented By: Patrick N. Strawbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Kathleen T. Hunker
Represented By: Kenneth B. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?