Immediato, et al v. Postmates, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: DAMON IMMEDIATO, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, STEPHEN LEVINE, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated and ERIC WICKBERG, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Defendant / Appellee: POSTMATES, INC.
Case Number: 22-1015
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Stephen Levine, Damon Immediato and Eric Wickberg. Brief and Appendix due 05/02/2022 for appellant Damon Immediato, Stephen Levine and Eric Wickberg. We are disinclined to grant a request for further enlargement of this deadline. To the extent Appellee Postmates, Inc.'s February 22, 2022 response seeks an extension of time to file its brief, that request is premature as the appellant's brief has not been accepted for filing. See Fed. R. App. P. 31(a)(1) and 1st Cir. 31.0(a)(1). [22-1015] (GRC) [Entered: 02/23/2022 04:57 PM]
February 22, 2022 RESPONSE filed by Appellee Postmates, Inc. to [ # 6477852-2 ]. Served on 02/22/2022. [22-1015] (TE) [Entered: 02/22/2022 07:53 PM]
February 18, 2022 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Damon Immediato, Stephen Levine and Eric Wickberg. Served on 02/18/2022. [22-1015] (SEL) [Entered: 02/18/2022 11:52 AM]
February 18, 2022 NOTICE issued. The following attorney has failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Shaun A. Mathur for Postmates, Inc.. [22-1015] (GRC) [Entered: 02/18/2022 04:58 PM]
January 28, 2022 NOTICE issued. After 02/11/2022, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Dhananjay S. Manthripragada for Postmates, Inc., Michele L. Maryott for Postmates, Inc. and Shaun A. Mathur for Postmates, Inc.. [22-1015] (GRC) [Entered: 01/28/2022 11:54 AM]
January 20, 2022 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief due 03/01/2022 for appellant Damon Immediato, Stephen Levine and Eric Wickberg. Appendix due 03/01/2022 for appellant Damon Immediato, Stephen Levine and Eric Wickberg. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [22-1015] (CMP) [Entered: 01/20/2022 01:51 PM]
January 19, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Damon Immediato, Stephen Levine and Eric Wickberg filed by Attorney Michelle Cassorla. Served on 01/19/2022. [22-1015] (MC) [Entered: 01/19/2022 05:03 PM]
January 19, 2022 Mail returned as undeliverable to Attorney Shaun A. Mathur for Appellee Postmates, Inc.. Copy of case opening notice issued January 5, 2022. [22-1015] (ATC) [Entered: 01/19/2022 12:04 PM]
January 19, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Damon Immediato, Stephen Levine and Eric Wickberg filed by Attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan. Served on 01/19/2022. [22-1015] (SEL) [Entered: 01/19/2022 05:01 PM]
January 19, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Damon Immediato, Stephen Levine and Eric Wickberg. Served on 01/19/2022. [22-1015] (SEL) [Entered: 01/19/2022 05:02 PM]
January 5, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Postmates, Inc. filed by Attorney Theane Evangelis. Served on 01/05/2022. [22-1015] (TE) [Entered: 01/05/2022 05:42 PM]
January 5, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Postmates, Inc. filed by Attorney Blaine H. Evanson. Served on 01/05/2022. [22-1015] (BE) [Entered: 01/05/2022 05:45 PM]
January 5, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #29) filed by Appellants Damon Immediato, Stephen Levine and Eric Wickberg. Appearance form due 01/19/2022 and Docketing Statement due 01/19/2022. [22-1015] (GRC) [Entered: 01/05/2022 09:51 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Immediato, et al v. Postmates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAMON IMMEDIATO, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Michelle Cassorla
Represented By: Shannon Erika Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN LEVINE, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Michelle Cassorla
Represented By: Shannon Erika Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC WICKBERG, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Michelle Cassorla
Represented By: Shannon Erika Liss-Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: POSTMATES, INC.
Represented By: Theane Evangelis
Represented By: Blaine Evanson
Represented By: Joshua Seth Lipshutz
Represented By: Dhananjay S. Manthripragada
Represented By: Michele L. Maryott
Represented By: Shaun A. Mathur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?