Marcus, et al v. American Contract Bridge League
Plaintiff / Appellant: PETER MARCUS, MATT KOLTNOW, DIANNE BARTON-PAINE, PETER MARCUS, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated, MATT KOLTNOW, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated, DIANNE BARTON-PAINE, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated, ERIC BELL, JENNIFER CARMICHAEL, SUSAN S.M. DOE, HARRY FALK, JOHN GRAM, ARLEEN HARVEY, JEFFERY A. JACOB, CANDACE S. KOSCHNER, TERRY LAVENDER, KARL P. MILLER, JR., MCKENZIE MYERS, JOAN M. PARADEIS, KENNETH VANCLEVE, NANCY R. WATKINS, MARILYN WELLS and LYNN YOKEL
Defendant / Appellee: AMERICAN CONTRACT BRIDGE LEAGUE, INC. and AMERICAN CONTRACT BRIDGE LEAGUE
Case Number: 22-1134
Filed: March 8, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: The parties have filed cross-appeals in No. 1:17-cv-11165-FDS (D. Mass.). Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28.1, it is hereby ordered that the above-named plaintiffs be deemed the appellants/cross-appellees (appellants) and that defendant American Contract Bridge League be deemed the appellee/cross-appellant (appellee). The parties are directed to use the above caption on all future filings related to these cases. A briefing schedule will be set once the record on appeal, including all necessary transcripts, is complete. The attached information sheet sets forth the filing requirements for briefs filed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 28.1. [22-1134, 22-1135] (AL) [Entered: 04/28/2022 10:46 AM]
April 6, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Dianne Barton-Paine, Matt Koltnow and Peter Marcus filed by Attorney Peter Goselin. Served on 04/06/2022. [22-1134] (PG) [Entered: 04/06/2022 01:51 PM]
March 28, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee American Contract Bridge League, Inc. filed by Attorney Melissa L. McDonagh. Served on 03/28/2022. [22-1134] (MLM) [Entered: 03/28/2022 10:42 AM]
March 28, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee American Contract Bridge League, Inc. filed by Attorney Paul E. Prather. Served on 03/28/2022. [22-1134] (PEP) [Entered: 03/28/2022 10:59 AM]
March 25, 2022 NOTICE issued. After 04/08/2022, the following attorney will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless he registers for an appellate ECF account: Peter Goselin for Peter Marcus, Matt Koltnow and Dianne Barton-Paine. [22-1134] (AL) [Entered: 03/25/2022 11:43 AM]
March 24, 2022 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Dianne Barton-Paine, Matt Koltnow and Peter Marcus indicating the following transcripts are being ordered: 09/09/2020, Motion Hearing; 04/30/2021, Status Conference; 09/15/2021, Motion Hearing. Transcripts due 05/23/2022 from Court Reporter Valerie A. O'Hara. [22-1134] (AL) [Entered: 03/24/2022 10:57 AM]
March 22, 2022 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Dianne Barton-Paine, Matt Koltnow and Peter Marcus indicating transcripts are being ordered. Served on 03/22/2022. [22-1134] (RED) [Entered: 03/22/2022 06:54 PM]
March 22, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Dianne Barton-Paine, Matt Koltnow and Peter Marcus. Served on 03/22/2022. [22-1134] (RED) [Entered: 03/22/2022 12:50 PM]
March 21, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee American Contract Bridge League, Inc. filed by Attorney Francis J. Bingham. Served on 03/21/2022. [22-1134] (FJB) [Entered: 03/21/2022 02:00 PM]
March 14, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Dianne Barton-Paine, Peter Marcus and Matt Koltnow filed by Attorney Raymond Dinsmore. Served on 03/14/2022. [22-1134] (RED) [Entered: 03/14/2022 02:34 PM]
March 8, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #203) filed by Appellants Dianne Barton-Paine, Matt Koltnow and Peter Marcus. Docketing Statement due 03/22/2022. Transcript Report/Order form due 03/22/2022. Appearance form due 03/22/2022. [22-1134] (AL) [Entered: 03/08/2022 01:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Marcus, et al v. American Contract Bridge League
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PETER MARCUS
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATT KOLTNOW
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIANNE BARTON-PAINE
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PETER MARCUS, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATT KOLTNOW, on behalf of himself and others similarly situated
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIANNE BARTON-PAINE, on behalf of herself and others similarly situated
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC BELL
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JENNIFER CARMICHAEL
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SUSAN S.M. DOE
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: HARRY FALK
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN GRAM
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARLEEN HARVEY
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFERY A. JACOB
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CANDACE S. KOSCHNER
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TERRY LAVENDER
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KARL P. MILLER, JR.
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MCKENZIE MYERS
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOAN M. PARADEIS
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH VANCLEVE
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY R. WATKINS
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARILYN WELLS
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LYNN YOKEL
Represented By: Raymond E. Dinsmore III
Represented By: Peter Goselin
Represented By: Oren Nimni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN CONTRACT BRIDGE LEAGUE, INC.
Represented By: Francis J. Bingham
Represented By: Christopher B. Kaczmarek
Represented By: Melissa L. McDonagh
Represented By: Paul E. Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AMERICAN CONTRACT BRIDGE LEAGUE
Represented By: Francis J. Bingham
Represented By: Christopher B. Kaczmarek
Represented By: Melissa L. McDonagh
Represented By: Paul E. Prather
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?