Minturn v. Monrad, et al
Defendant: NORTHEAST INVESTORS TRUST
Plaintiff / Appellee: ROBERT B. MINTURN
Defendant / Appellant: BRUCE H. MONRAD, individually and as Special Personal Representative of the Estate of Ernest E. Monrad, PETER J. BLAMPFIELD, GEORGE P. BEAL, CHARLES R. DAUGHERTY and PETER J. BLAMPIED
Case Number: 22-1200
Filed: March 25, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Empl. Ret. Inc. Security Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Bruce H. Monrad, Peter J. Blampied, George P. Beal and Charles R. Daugherty. Brief and Appendix due June 8, 2022 for appellant George P. Beal, Peter J. Blampied, Charles R. Daugherty and Bruce H. Monrad. [22-1200] (AL) [Entered: 05/20/2022 05:54 PM]
May 13, 2022 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants George P. Beal, Peter J. Blampied, Charles R. Daugherty and Bruce H. Monrad. Served on 05/13/2022. [22-1200] (EPW) [Entered: 05/13/2022 12:34 PM]
April 8, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Robert B. Minturn filed by Attorney Douglas W. Salvesen. Served on 04/08/2022. [22-1200] (DWS) [Entered: 04/08/2022 09:27 AM]
April 8, 2022 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants George P. Beal, Peter J. Blampied, Charles R. Daugherty and Bruce H. Monrad indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 04/08/2022. [22-1200] (EPW) [Entered: 04/08/2022 02:15 PM]
April 8, 2022 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 05/18/2022 for appellant George P. Beal, Peter J. Blampied, Charles R. Daugherty and Bruce H. Monrad. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [22-1200] (AL) [Entered: 04/08/2022 03:03 PM]
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER : Upon consideration of defendants-appellants Bruce H. Monrad, et al.'s motion to amend caption and correct spelling, and upon review of the record in this case, the motion is granted in part. See Fed. R. App. P. 12(a) (" . . . the circuit clerk must docket the appeal under the title of the district court action. . ."). Defendant-appellant Peter J. Blampfield is henceforth identified as defendant-appellant Peter J. Blampied. Additional corrections requested by appellants were previously made as part of the court's routine case screening process. Northeast Investors Trust is named as a defendant in the district court and therefore remains as a defendant, although not an appellant, in this appeal. [22-1200] (AL) [Entered: 04/07/2022 01:36 PM]
April 7, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants George P. Beal, Peter J. Blampied, Charles R. Daugherty and Bruce H. Monrad. Served on 04/07/2022. [22-1200]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (EPW) [Entered: 04/07/2022 10:36 AM]
April 6, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants George P. Beal, Peter J. Blampied, Charles R. Daugherty and Bruce H. Monrad filed by Attorney David E. Lurie. Served on 04/06/2022. [22-1200] (DEL) [Entered: 04/06/2022 12:55 PM]
April 5, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants George P. Beal, Peter J. Blampied, Charles R. Daugherty and Bruce H. Monrad filed by Attorney E. Page Wilkins. Served on 04/05/2022. [22-1200]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (EPW) [Entered: 04/05/2022 04:40 PM]
April 5, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants George P. Beal, Peter J. Blampfield, Charles R. Daugherty and Bruce H. Monrad filed by Attorney David E. Lurie. Served on 04/05/2022. [22-1200] CLERK'S NOTE: The signature on the document does not match the name of the ECF filer under whose login and password the document was filed. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS (4/8/22.) (EPW) [Entered: 04/05/2022 04:41 PM]
April 5, 2022 MOTION to amend caption filed by Appellants George P. Beal, Peter J. Blampied, Charles R. Daugherty and Bruce H. Monrad. Served on 04/05/2022. [22-1200]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (EPW) [Entered: 04/05/2022 04:44 PM]
March 25, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #80) filed by Appellants George P. Beal, Peter J. Blampied, Charles R. Daugherty, Bruce H. Monrad, Ernest E. Monrad and Northeast Investors Trust. Docketing Statement due 04/08/2022. Transcript Report/Order form due 04/08/2022. Appearance form due 04/08/2022. [22-1200]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (AL) [Entered: 03/25/2022 04:34 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Minturn v. Monrad, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: ROBERT B. MINTURN
Represented By: Douglas W. Salvesen
Represented By: Richard J. Yurko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRUCE H. MONRAD, individually and as Special Personal Representative of the Estate of Ernest E. Monrad
Represented By: David E. Lurie
Represented By: Elizabeth Page Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PETER J. BLAMPFIELD
Represented By: David E. Lurie
Represented By: Elizabeth Page Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: GEORGE P. BEAL
Represented By: David E. Lurie
Represented By: Elizabeth Page Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: CHARLES R. DAUGHERTY
Represented By: David E. Lurie
Represented By: Elizabeth Page Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PETER J. BLAMPIED
Represented By: David E. Lurie
Represented By: Elizabeth Page Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTHEAST INVESTORS TRUST
Represented By: David E. Lurie
Represented By: Elizabeth Page Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?