Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts
Plaintiff / Appellant: MASSACHUSETTS LABORERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND and TRUSTEES OF THE MASSACHUSETTS LABORERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, as Fiduciaries
Defendant / Appellee: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MASSACHUSETTS
Case Number: 22-1317
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Empl. Ret. Inc. Security Act
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund filed by Attorney John Stokes. Served on 06/24/2022. [22-1317] (JRS) [Entered: 06/24/2022 05:56 PM]
June 18, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund filed by Attorney Peter K. Stris. Served on 06/18/2022. [22-1317] (PKS) [Entered: 06/18/2022 06:49 PM]
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration of the June 2, 2022 joint motion, Appellants Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund's principal brief and appendix are to be filed on, or before, August 8, 2022 . To the extent the motion seeks to extend the other briefing deadlines, motion is denied without prejudice as premature because the appellants' principal brief has not been accepted for filing. See Fed. R. App. P. 31(a)(1) and 1st Cir. 31.0(a)(1). [22-1317] (AL) [Entered: 06/08/2022 12:01 PM]
June 2, 2022 JOINT MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellants Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1317] (DBH) [Entered: 06/02/2022 03:12 PM]
May 18, 2022 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 06/27/2022 for appellant Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. Please see the court's general order issued April 20, 2020, requiring the electronic filing of appendices. [22-1317] (AL) [Entered: 05/18/2022 04:52 PM]
May 18, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund. Served on 05/18/2022. [22-1317] (DBH) [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:29 PM]
May 18, 2022 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 05/18/2022. [22-1317] (DBH) [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:28 PM]
May 18, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts filed by Attorney Evan Miller. Served on 05/18/2022. [22-1317] (EM) [Entered: 05/18/2022 09:38 AM]
May 18, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund filed by Attorney D. Brian Hufford. Served on 05/18/2022. [22-1317] (DBH) [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:21 PM]
May 18, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund filed by Attorney Jason S. Cowart. Served on 05/18/2022. [22-1317] (JC) [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:23 PM]
May 18, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund filed by Attorney Leila Bijan. Served on 05/18/2022. [22-1317] (LB) [Entered: 05/18/2022 12:25 PM]
May 17, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts filed by Attorney David Raimer. Served on 05/17/2022. [22-1317] (DTR) [Entered: 05/17/2022 04:37 PM]
May 4, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #23) filed by Appellants Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund and Trustees of the Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund. Docketing Statement due 05/18/2022. Appearance form due 05/18/2022. [22-1317] (AL) [Entered: 05/04/2022 04:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, et al v. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MASSACHUSETTS LABORERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND
Represented By: Leila Bijan
Represented By: Jason Cowart
Represented By: James Francis Grosso
Represented By: D. Brian Hufford
Represented By: John Randolph Stokes
Represented By: Peter K. Stris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRUSTEES OF THE MASSACHUSETTS LABORERS' HEALTH AND WELFARE FUND, as Fiduciaries
Represented By: Leila Bijan
Represented By: Jason Cowart
Represented By: James Francis Grosso
Represented By: D. Brian Hufford
Represented By: John Randolph Stokes
Represented By: Peter K. Stris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLUE CROSS BLUE SHIELD OF MASSACHUSETTS
Represented By: Amy Harman Burkart
Represented By: Evan Miller
Represented By: David T. Raimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?