Plazzi, et al v. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Plaintiff / Appellant: MATHEUS PLAZZI, JOSHUA PRESCOTT and TULIO BRITO COSTA
Defendant / Appellee: FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.
Case Number: 22-1365
Filed: May 22, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 APPELLANTS' BRIEF filed by Appellants Tulio Brito Costa, Matheus Plazzi and Joshua Prescott. Served on 07/15/2022. Nine paper copies identical to that of the electronically filed brief must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/25/2022 . Brief due 08/15/2022 for APPELLEE FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. [22-1365] (LIM) [Entered: 07/18/2022 09:26 AM]
July 18, 2022 APPENDIX filed by Appellants Tulio Brito Costa, Matheus Plazzi and Joshua Prescott. Served on 07/15/2022. Five paper copies of the electronically filed appendix must be submitted so that they are received by the court on or before 07/25/2022 [22-1365] (LIM) [Entered: 07/18/2022 09:43 AM]
July 15, 2022 APPENDIX tendered by Appellants Tulio Brito Costa, Matheus Plazzi and Joshua Prescott. Served on 07/15/2022. [22-1365] (SEL) [Entered: 07/15/2022 02:13 PM]
July 15, 2022 BRIEF tendered by Appellants Tulio Brito Costa, Matheus Plazzi and Joshua Prescott. [22-1365] (SEL) [Entered: 07/15/2022 02:12 PM]
July 11, 2022 NOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Kelly Mortellite: 03/02/2022, Teleconference. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [22-1365] (GB) [Entered: 07/20/2022 04:07 PM]
June 22, 2022 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Cheryl B. Pinarchick for FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., David J. Schaller for FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. and Jessica G. Scott for FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. [22-1365] (GB) [Entered: 06/22/2022 09:32 AM]
June 14, 2022 NOTICE of filing the following transcript in district court by Court Reporter Kelly Mortellite: 03/12/2022, Hearing on Motion to Dismiss. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [22-1365] (GB) [Entered: 07/11/2022 09:57 AM]
June 8, 2022 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellee FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. indicating transcripts are being ordered. Served on 06/08/2022. [22-1365] (BR) [Entered: 06/08/2022 02:11 PM]
June 8, 2022 TRANSCRIPT ordered: 03/12/2022, Motion to Dismiss Hearing. Transcript due 07/08/2022 from Court Reporter Kelly Mortellite [22-1365] (GB) [Entered: 06/08/2022 02:55 PM]
June 7, 2022 NOTICE issued. After 06/21/2022, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Cheryl B. Pinarchick for FedEx Ground Package System, Inc., David J. Schaller for FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. and Jessica G. Scott for FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. [22-1365] (GB) [Entered: 06/07/2022 06:01 AM]
June 6, 2022 NOTICE filed by Appellee FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.. Served on 06/06/2022. [22-1365] CLERK'S NOTE: The ECF Filer did not choose the best option to describe the document, the incorrect event was chosen. THE FILER IS DIRECTED TO RE-FILE THE DOCUMENT WITHIN TWO DAYS, BY 06/09/2022. (BR) [Entered: 06/06/2022 04:18 PM]
June 6, 2022 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 07/15/2022 for appellants Tulio Brito Costa, Matheus Plazzi and Joshua Prescott. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [22-1365] (GB) [Entered: 06/05/2022 07:26 PM]
June 2, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Matheus Plazzi, Joshua Prescott and Tulio Brito Costa filed by Attorney Harold Lichten. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1365] (HLL) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:15 PM]
June 2, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Tulio Brito Costa, Matheus Plazzi and Joshua Prescott filed by Attorney Shannon Liss-Riordan. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1365] (SEL) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:14 PM]
June 2, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Matheus Plazzi, Tulio Brito Costa and Joshua Prescott filed by Attorney Zach Rubin. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1365] (ZLR) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:18 PM]
June 2, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants Matheus Plazzi, Tulio Brito Costa and Joshua Prescott filed by Attorney Michelle Cassorla. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1365] (MC) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:20 PM]
June 2, 2022 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants Matheus Plazzi, Tulio Brito Costa and Joshua Prescott indicating transcripts are not necessary for this appeal. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1365] (SEL) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:23 PM]
June 2, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants Matheus Plazzi, Tulio Brito Costa and Joshua Prescott. Served on 06/02/2022. [22-1365] (SEL) [Entered: 06/02/2022 05:22 PM]
May 23, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee FedEx Ground Package System, Inc. filed by Attorney Brian T. Ruocco. Served on 05/23/2022. [22-1365] (BR) [Entered: 05/23/2022 04:16 PM]
May 23, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #24) filed by Appellants Tulio Brito Costa, Matheus Plazzi and Joshua Prescott. Appearance form, Docketing Statement and Transcript Report/Order form due 06/06/2022 . [22-1365] (GB) [Entered: 05/22/2022 06:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Plazzi, et al v. FedEx Ground Package System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATHEUS PLAZZI
Represented By: Michelle Cassorla
Represented By: Shannon Erika Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Zachary L. Rubin
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSHUA PRESCOTT
Represented By: Michelle Cassorla
Represented By: Shannon Erika Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Zachary L. Rubin
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TULIO BRITO COSTA
Represented By: Michelle Cassorla
Represented By: Shannon Erika Liss-Riordan
Represented By: Zachary L. Rubin
Represented By: Harold L. Lichten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FEDEX GROUND PACKAGE SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Cheryl B. Pinarchick
Represented By: Brian Ruocco
Represented By: David J. Schaller
Represented By: Jessica G. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?