Fiorillo v. Green, et al
Plaintiff: OCEAN VACATIONS REALTY TRUST, OCEAN DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC and OCEAN REALTY PARTNERS LLC
Defendant: SMITH DUGGAN BEULL & RUFO LLP, ANDREW P. STEMPLER and OS MANAGEMENT LLC
Plaintiff / Appellant: NICHOLAS J. FIORILLO, individually and as Trustee
Defendant / Appellee: RAYMOND GREEN, JOAN GREEN, SPIRO STYLIANOPOULOS, NICHOLAS J. NESGOS, DAVID J. REIER, RAYMOND C. GREEN LENDING TRUST, RAYMOND GREEN COMPANIES, INC., LAW FIRM OF ARENTFOX SCHIFF LLP, STEVEN DEANE and DEAN AUCTION ASSOCS.
Case Number: 22-1839
Filed: November 2, 2022
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 RESPONSE filed by Appellant Nicholas J. Fiorillo to order for lack of jurisdiction [ # 6530316-2 ]. Certificate of service was not included. [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 12/27/2022 10:40 AM]
December 19, 2022 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE to appellant's December 19, 2022 response [ # 6539848-2 ] to the court's show cause order filed by Appellant Nicholas J. Fiorillo. Certificate of service was not included. [22-1839]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (GB) [Entered: 12/29/2022 02:49 PM]
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appellees' objection to the November 8, 2022 docketing statement is noted. [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/21/2022 01:07 PM]
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER entered by David J. Barron, Chief Appellate Judge; Jeffrey R. Howard, Appellate Judge and Gustavo A. Gelpi, Jr., Appellate Judge: This matter is before the court on appellant's "Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal . . . ." As he acknowledges in the motion, appellant has failed to comply with Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 8(a)(1) by first seeking relief in the district court, and we are not persuaded by appellant's suggestion that such a motion would have been futile. In any event, appellant has not made a strong showing that he is likely to succeed on the merits and/or that he faces irreparable harm if a stay is denied. See Dist. 4 Lodge of the Int'l Ass'n of Machinists & Aerospace Workers Loc. Lodge 207 v. Raimondo , 18 F.4th 38, 42 (1st Cir. 2021) (stay factors; likelihood of success and danger of irreparable harm are most important). Accordingly, the motion is DENIED . [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/21/2022 03:52 PM]
November 18, 2022 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Raymond Green, Joan Green, Spiro Stylianopoulos, Nicholas J. Nesgos, David J. Reier, Raymond C. Green Lending Trust, Raymond Green Companies, Inc., Steven Deane, Dean Auction Assocs. and Law Firm of Arentfox Schiff LLP to [ # 6531352-2 ]. Served on 11/18/2022. [22-1839] (NJN) [Entered: 11/18/2022 03:50 PM]
November 18, 2022 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Dean Auction Assocs., Steven Deane, Joan Green, Raymond Green, Nicholas J. Nesgos, Law Firm of Arentfox Schiff LLP, Raymond C. Green Lending Trust, Raymond Green Companies, Inc., David J. Reier and Spiro Stylianopoulos filed by Attorney Nicholas J. Nesgos. Served on 11/18/2022. [22-1839] (NJN) [Entered: 11/18/2022 07:45 PM]
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Upon consideration of motion, it is ordered that the time for appellant Nicholas Fiorillo to file a response to the order to show cause be enlarged to and including December 19, 2022 . No further extension of this deadline should be expected. [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/15/2022 03:42 PM]
November 8, 2022 CERTIFICATE of service for filed by Appellant Nicholas J. Fiorillo. Served on 11/08/2022. [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/16/2022 11:01 AM]
November 8, 2022 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Nicholas J. Fiorillo. Served on 11/08/2022. [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/09/2022 02:55 PM]
November 8, 2022 MOTION to extend time to respond to show cause order filed by Appellant Nicholas J. Fiorillo. Served on 11/08/2022. [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/09/2022 02:57 PM]
November 7, 2022 EMERGENCY MOTION for stay pending appeal and for temporary stay pending consideration of motion filed by Appellant Nicholas J. Fiorillo. Certificate of service was not included. [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/07/2022 02:17 PM]
November 7, 2022 MOTION for summary judgment filed by Appellant Nicholas J. Fiorillo. Certificate of service was not included. [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/07/2022 02:31 PM]
November 7, 2022 MEMORANDUM in support of motion for summary judgment [ # 6530780-2 ] filed by Appellant Nicholas J. Fiorillo. Certificate of service was not included. [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/07/2022 02:33 PM]
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ORDER to Show Cause entered directing appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Show cause response due 11/18/2022 . [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/04/2022 09:21 AM]
November 2, 2022 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #5) filed by Appellant Nicholas J. Fiorillo. Fee due 11/16/2022. [22-1839] (JMK) [Entered: 11/02/2022 08:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Fiorillo v. Green, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NICHOLAS J. FIORILLO, individually and as Trustee
Represented By: Nicholas J. Fiorillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCEAN VACATIONS REALTY TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCEAN DEVELOPMENT PARTNERS LLC
Represented By: Neil Kreuzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OCEAN REALTY PARTNERS LLC
Represented By: Ocean Realty Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAYMOND GREEN
Represented By: Nathaniel J. Hyman
Represented By: Nicholas J. Nesgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOAN GREEN
Represented By: Nicholas J. Nesgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPIRO STYLIANOPOULOS
Represented By: Nicholas J. Nesgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NICHOLAS J. NESGOS
Represented By: Nicholas J. Nesgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID J. REIER
Represented By: Nicholas J. Nesgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAYMOND C. GREEN LENDING TRUST
Represented By: Nathaniel J. Hyman
Represented By: Nicholas J. Nesgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RAYMOND GREEN COMPANIES, INC.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Nesgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LAW FIRM OF ARENTFOX SCHIFF LLP
Represented By: Nicholas J. Nesgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEVEN DEANE
Represented By: Nicholas J. Nesgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DEAN AUCTION ASSOCS.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Nesgos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMITH DUGGAN BEULL & RUFO LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW P. STEMPLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OS MANAGEMENT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?