Southbridge RE, LLC v. Kiavi Funding, Inc., et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: SOUTHBRIDGE RE, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: KIAVI FUNDING, INC. and CHRISTIANA TRUST, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but as Trustee for Victoria Capital Trust
Case Number: 23-1480
Filed: June 7, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2023 TRANSCRIPT ordered: 06/15/2022, Motion Hearing; 04/27/2023, Motion Hearing. Transcript(s) due 08/28/2023 from Court Reporter FTR - MA [23-1480] (JMK) [Entered: 06/29/2023 10:21 AM]
June 28, 2023 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant Southbridge RE, LLC indicating transcripts are being ordered. Served on 06/28/2023. [23-1480]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to replace an attachment. (TSD) [Entered: 06/28/2023 12:17 PM]
June 23, 2023 NOTICE of default and intent to dismiss issued. The appellant is directed to file a transcript report/order form or this case will be dismissed for lack of prosecution in accordance with 1st Cir. R. 3.0(b). Transcript report/order form due 07/07/2023. [23-1480] (JMK) [Entered: 06/23/2023 04:28 PM]
June 20, 2023 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant Southbridge RE, LLC. Served on 06/20/2023. [23-1480] (TSD) [Entered: 06/20/2023 10:44 AM]
June 20, 2023 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant Southbridge RE, LLC filed by Attorney Todd S DIon. Served on 06/20/2023. [23-1480] (TSD) [Entered: 06/20/2023 10:44 AM]
June 12, 2023 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Christiana Trust and Kiavi Funding, Inc. filed by Attorney Brian C. Linehan, Esq.. Served on 06/12/2023. [23-1480] (BL) [Entered: 06/12/2023 12:32 PM]
June 7, 2023 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #66) filed by Appellant Southbridge RE, LLC. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 06/21/2023. [23-1480] (JMK) [Entered: 06/07/2023 11:24 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Southbridge RE, LLC v. Kiavi Funding, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SOUTHBRIDGE RE, LLC
Represented By: Todd Steven Dion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIAVI FUNDING, INC.
Represented By: Brian Linehan
Represented By: Reneau Jean Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTIANA TRUST, a Division of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB, not in its individual capacity but as Trustee for Victoria Capital Trust
Represented By: Brian Linehan
Represented By: Reneau Jean Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?