Rotondo v. Salisbury, et al
Plaintiff: GINO ROTONDO, SR.
Defendant: WAYNE T. SALISBURY, JR., individial capacity, KIMBERLY KANE, MD, individual capacity, LORI VENTITUOLO, individual capacity, PATRICIA ANNE COYNE-FAGUE, individual capacity, DR. DANIEL N. VALICENTI, individual capacity and official capacity, NURSE PRACTITIONER DAVE SASSO, individial capacity and official capacity, JOSEPH F. JANKOWSKI, individual capacity, KATHLEEN A LYONS, individual capacity, LT. RAFFERTY, individual capacity, LT. PERRY, individual capacity, MARYBETH, DR. SYNDER and JESSICA KEEFE
Case Number: 24-1410
Filed: April 26, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2024 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance of Jeffrey Latham filed by Appellees Kimberly Kane and Daniel N. Valicenti in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Served on 06/20/2024. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (JGL) [Entered: 06/20/2024 11:17 AM]
May 31, 2024 PLEADING tendered: Exhibits to motion [ # 6646451-4 ] consisting of new medical request forms (provisionally restricted due to personal indentifiers) filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 06/03/2024 10:30 PM]
May 31, 2024 LETTER requesting copies of all materials once they're entered filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 06/04/2024 10:34 AM]
May 31, 2024 LETTER MOTION for records of Judge McElroy and Chief Judge Smith filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 06/04/2024 10:25 AM]
May 31, 2024 MOTION memorandum to 1). appoint counsel, 2). sanction D.O.C., 3). access D.O.C to pay plaintiff's filing fees, and 4). add defendants filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 06/04/2024 10:02 AM]
May 31, 2024 AFFIDAVIT of retalition filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 06/04/2024 09:21 AM]
May 31, 2024 AFFIDAVIT of dying declarations filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 06/04/2024 12:07 AM]
May 31, 2024 NOTICE that Defendants lied to the Court filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 06/03/2024 10:39 PM]
May 31, 2024 MOTION to 1). reinstate case, 2). MOTION to reconsider motions from DE 49 onward and enter into the record 49-1 pages 1 to 34, 3). MOTION to accept new medical request forms, 4). MOTION to increase nominal, punitive, and compensatory damages, and 5). MOTION to reinstate defendant Paul Levassner filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 06/03/2024 09:46 PM]
May 31, 2024 MEMORANDUM motion to the First Circuit Court of Appeals requesting Court deal with Appellant's appeal filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 06/03/2024 08:03 PM]
May 31, 2024 MOTION for substitution of parties filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 06/03/2024 04:54 PM]
May 22, 2024 OBJECTION to Appellants Motion for Hearing [ # 6642932-3 ] filed by Appellees Patricia Anne Coyne-Fague, Joseph F. Jankowski, Kimberly Kane, Jessica Keefe, Kathleen A Lyons, Marybeth, Perry, Rafferty, Wayne T. Salisbury, Jr., Dave Sasso, Synder, Daniel N. Valicenti and Lori Ventituolo in 24-1410, 24-1338, 24-1358. Served on 05/22/2024. [24-1410, 24-1338, 24-1358]. CLERK'S NOTE: Docket entry was edited to modify the docket text. (MDP) [Entered: 05/22/2024 11:47 AM]
May 16, 2024 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing and for Consideration of Health and Prison Conditions filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 05/16/2024 02:18 PM]
May 13, 2024 MOTION for emergency consideration of requests regarding appeal, health conditions, request for stay, to amend complaint and other miscellaneous reliefs filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 05/14/2024 11:04 AM]
May 13, 2024 EMERGENCY MOTION for Hearing Requested Under Rule 28 48(b) having Authority of Special Session and Issuance of Protective Order filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 05/14/2024 11:56 AM]
May 13, 2024 EMERGENCY HEARING Requested Under Rule 28 Sec. 48(6) and Rule 80 (B)(2) Dying Declaration filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr. in 24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410. Certificate of service was not included. [24-1338, 24-1358, 24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 05/14/2024 11:18 AM]
April 30, 2024 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #70) filed by Appellant Gino Rotondo, Sr.. [24-1410] (ALW) [Entered: 04/30/2024 01:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Rotondo v. Salisbury, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINO ROTONDO, SR.
Represented By: Gino Rotondo Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAYNE T. SALISBURY, JR., individial capacity
Represented By: Marissa D. Pizana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY KANE, MD, individual capacity
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Latham
Represented By: Marissa D. Pizana
Represented By: Christine A. Stowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORI VENTITUOLO, individual capacity
Represented By: Marissa D. Pizana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICIA ANNE COYNE-FAGUE, individual capacity
Represented By: Marissa D. Pizana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. DANIEL N. VALICENTI, individual capacity and official capacity
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Latham
Represented By: Marissa D. Pizana
Represented By: Christine A. Stowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NURSE PRACTITIONER DAVE SASSO, individial capacity and official capacity
Represented By: Marissa D. Pizana
Represented By: Christine A. Stowell
Represented By: Alan R. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH F. JANKOWSKI, individual capacity
Represented By: Marissa D. Pizana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHLEEN A LYONS, individual capacity
Represented By: Marissa D. Pizana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. RAFFERTY, individual capacity
Represented By: Marissa D. Pizana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. PERRY, individual capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARYBETH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DR. SYNDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JESSICA KEEFE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?