BlueRadios, Inc. v. Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., et al
Plaintiff: BLUERADIOS, INC., a Colorado corporation
Defendant: STEPHEN D. BROOK, as Personal Representative of the Estate of David E. Brook, GERALD KAZANJIAN, an individual, HAMILTON, BROOK, SMITH & REYNOLDS, P.C., a Massachusetts professional corporation, LAWRENCE PERLEY COGSWELL, III, an individual, JOSHUA MATLOFF, an individual, NELSON SCOTT PIERCE, an individual and DAVID J. THIBODEAU, JR., an individual
Case Number: 24-1942
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, First Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2024 NOTICE issued. The following attorneys have failed to register for an appellate ECF account and will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case: Elizabeth J. Hyatt for BlueRadios, Inc., Michael Roger Krantz for Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., David J. Thibodeau, Jr., Lawrence Perley Cogswell, III, Gerald Kazanjian, Stephen D. Brook, Joshua Matloff and Nelson Scott Pierce and Erin Frohardt Tatman for Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., David J. Thibodeau, Jr., Lawrence Perley Cogswell, III, Gerald Kazanjian, Stephen D. Brook, Joshua Matloff and Nelson Scott Pierce. [24-1942] (GRC) [Entered: 12/05/2024 01:11 PM]
December 2, 2024 DISCLOSURE statement filed by Appellant BlueRadios, Inc.. [24-1942] (GRC) [Entered: 12/02/2024 11:54 AM]
December 2, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER granting motion to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant BlueRadios, Inc.. Brief due 01/22/2025 for appellant BlueRadios, Inc.. Appendix due 01/22/2025 for appellant BlueRadios, Inc.. [24-1942] (GRC) [Entered: 12/02/2024 11:24 AM]
November 27, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER entered: Appellees' letter concerning Appellant's docketing statement is noted. [24-1942] (GRC) [Entered: 11/27/2024 01:47 PM]
November 27, 2024 MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix filed by Appellant BlueRadios, Inc.. Served on 11/27/2024. [24-1942] (DBS) [Entered: 11/27/2024 01:26 PM]
November 21, 2024 LETTER regarding Local Rule 3.0(a)(3) Statement filed by Attorney William D. Hauptman for Appellees Stephen D. Brook, Lawrence Perley Cogswell, III, Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., Gerald Kazanjian, Joshua Matloff, Nelson Scott Pierce and David J. Thibodeau, Jr.. Served on 11/21/2024. [24-1942] (WDH) [Entered: 11/21/2024 06:42 PM]
November 15, 2024 NOTICE issued. After 11/29/2024, the following attorneys will no longer receive notice of court issued documents in this case unless they register for an appellate ECF account: Elizabeth J. Hyatt for BlueRadios, Inc., Michael Roger Krantz for Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., David J. Thibodeau, Jr., Lawrence Perley Cogswell, III, Gerald Kazanjian, Stephen D. Brook, Joshua Matloff and Nelson Scott Pierce and Erin Frohardt Tatman for Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., David J. Thibodeau, Jr., Lawrence Perley Cogswell, III, Gerald Kazanjian, Stephen D. Brook, Joshua Matloff and Nelson Scott Pierce. [24-1942] (GRC) [Entered: 11/15/2024 01:44 PM]
November 13, 2024 BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and Appendix due 12/23/2024 for appellant BlueRadios, Inc.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 21 days following service of appellee's brief. [24-1942] (GRC) [Entered: 11/13/2024 11:47 AM]
November 7, 2024 DOCKETING statement filed by Appellant BlueRadios, Inc.. Served on 11/07/2024. [24-1942] (DWS) [Entered: 11/07/2024 03:57 PM]
November 7, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellant BlueRadios, Inc. filed by Attorney Douglas W. Salvesen. Served on 11/07/2024. [24-1942] (DWS) [Entered: 11/07/2024 03:56 PM]
November 7, 2024 TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellant BlueRadios, Inc. indicating all necessary transcripts have already been filed in district court. Served on 11/07/2024. [24-1942] (DWS) [Entered: 11/07/2024 03:58 PM]
November 5, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees David J. Thibodeau, Jr., Nelson Scott Pierce, Joshua Matloff, Gerald Kazanjian, Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., Lawrence Perley Cogswell, III and Stephen D. Brook filed by Attorney William D. Hauptman. Served on 11/05/2024. [24-1942] (WDH) [Entered: 11/05/2024 04:02 PM]
November 5, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Stephen D. Brook, Lawrence Perley Cogswell, III, Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., Gerald Kazanjian, Joshua Matloff, Nelson Scott Pierce and David J. Thibodeau, Jr. filed by Attorney Carolyn J. Fairless. Served on 11/05/2024. [24-1942] (CJF) [Entered: 11/05/2024 04:03 PM]
November 5, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., David J. Thibodeau, Jr., Lawrence Perley Cogswell, III, Gerald Kazanjian, Stephen D. Brook, Joshua Matloff and Nelson Scott Pierce filed by Attorney David J. Schaller. Served on 11/05/2024. [24-1942] (DJS) [Entered: 11/05/2024 04:03 PM]
November 5, 2024 NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellees Stephen D. Brook, David J. Thibodeau, Jr., Lawrence Perley Cogswell, III, Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., Gerald Kazanjian, Joshua Matloff and Nelson Scott Pierce filed by Attorney Frederick R. Yarger. Served on 11/05/2024. [24-1942] (FRY) [Entered: 11/05/2024 04:03 PM]
October 24, 2024 CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #270) filed by Appellant BlueRadios, Inc. Docketing Statement, Transcript Report/Order form, and Appearance form due 11/07/2024 . [24-1942] (ATC) [Entered: 10/24/2024 08:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: BlueRadios, Inc. v. Hamilton, Brook, Smith & Reynolds, P.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN D. BROOK, as Personal Representative of the Estate of David E. Brook
Represented By: Richard M. Zielinski
Represented By: Erin Frohardt Tatman
Represented By: David J. Schaller
Represented By: Andrew T. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Roger Krantz
Represented By: William D. Hauptman
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Fairless
Represented By: Frederick R. Yarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERALD KAZANJIAN, an individual
Represented By: Richard M. Zielinski
Represented By: Erin Frohardt Tatman
Represented By: David J. Schaller
Represented By: Andrew T. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Roger Krantz
Represented By: William D. Hauptman
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Fairless
Represented By: Frederick R. Yarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMILTON, BROOK, SMITH & REYNOLDS, P.C., a Massachusetts professional corporation
Represented By: Richard M. Zielinski
Represented By: Erin Frohardt Tatman
Represented By: David J. Schaller
Represented By: Andrew T. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Roger Krantz
Represented By: William D. Hauptman
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Fairless
Represented By: Frederick R. Yarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAWRENCE PERLEY COGSWELL, III, an individual
Represented By: Richard M. Zielinski
Represented By: Erin Frohardt Tatman
Represented By: David J. Schaller
Represented By: Andrew T. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Roger Krantz
Represented By: William D. Hauptman
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Fairless
Represented By: Frederick R. Yarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA MATLOFF, an individual
Represented By: Richard M. Zielinski
Represented By: Erin Frohardt Tatman
Represented By: David J. Schaller
Represented By: Andrew T. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Roger Krantz
Represented By: William D. Hauptman
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Fairless
Represented By: Frederick R. Yarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NELSON SCOTT PIERCE, an individual
Represented By: Richard M. Zielinski
Represented By: Erin Frohardt Tatman
Represented By: David J. Schaller
Represented By: Andrew T. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Roger Krantz
Represented By: William D. Hauptman
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Fairless
Represented By: Frederick R. Yarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID J. THIBODEAU, JR., an individual
Represented By: Richard M. Zielinski
Represented By: Erin Frohardt Tatman
Represented By: David J. Schaller
Represented By: Andrew T. O'Connor
Represented By: Michael Roger Krantz
Represented By: William D. Hauptman
Represented By: Carolyn Jean Fairless
Represented By: Frederick R. Yarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BLUERADIOS, INC., a Colorado corporation
Represented By: David B. Seserman
Represented By: Douglas W. Salvesen
Represented By: Sanford F. Remz
Represented By: Michael T. Mihm
Represented By: Elizabeth J. Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?