Choi v. Barr
Petitioner: YUJEONG CHOI
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General and MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, United States Attorney General
Case Number: 19-9515
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2019 [10648008] Order filed by Clerk of the Court response to motion to dismiss case due on 05/24/2019 for Yujeong Choi. Served on 05/10/2019. [19-9515] [Entered: 05/10/2019 04:02 PM]
May 10, 2019 [10647905] Motion filed by Respondent Mr. William P. Barr to dismiss case. Served on: 05/10/2019. Manner of service: US mail. This pleading complies with all required (privacy, paper copy and virus) certifications: Yes. [19-9515] SP [Entered: 05/10/2019 01:01 PM]
April 16, 2019 [10641528] Agency jurisdictional review complete. Petitioner's brief due on 05/28/2019 for Yujeong Choi. [19-9515] [Entered: 04/16/2019 08:20 AM]
April 8, 2019 [10639436] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Sarah Pergolizzi for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 04/08/2019. Manner of Service: email [19-9515] [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:57 AM]
April 8, 2019 [10639427] Entry of appearance submitted by Sarah K. Pergolizzi for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 04/08/2019. Manner of Service: US mail. [19-9515]--[Edited 04/08/2019 by LG to remove PDF from entry, as pleading was filed on 4/8/2019] SP [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:44 AM]
April 1, 2019 [10637470] Petitioner's motion filed by Yujeong Choi for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Served on 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: hand delivery. [19-9515] [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:17 PM]
April 1, 2019 [10637467] Petition for review filed. Original. Served on 04/01/2019. Manner of Service: US mail and hand. Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, General Counsel, Oil, Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 04/01/2019 letter. Fee: IFP pending. Agency record due 05/13/2019 for William P. Barr. Notice of appearance due on 04/15/2019 for Yujeong Choi and William P. Barr [19-9515]--[Edited 04/01/2019 by LG to correct party] [Entered: 04/01/2019 12:11 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Choi v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Represented By: Lansing W. Tyler
Represented By: Oil Oil
Represented By: Sarah Pergolizzi
Represented By: General Counsel
Represented By: DOH/EOIR/BIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, United States Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: YUJEONG CHOI
Represented By: Yujeong Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?