Brown v. Bradley, et al
Defendant / Appellee: ANGELA BRADLEY, DAVID PATRICK, DENNIS SEMLER, CITY OF TULSA, KEVIN COX, G.T. BYNUM, JACK HENDERSON, BLAKE EWING, PHIL LAKIN, JR. and KAREN GILBERT
Plaintiff / Appellant: LESLIE BROWN, JR.
Case Number: 20-5063
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 [10760543] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1, Comments: Vol I - Pleadings. [20-5063] [Entered: 08/05/2020 10:50 AM]
July 31, 2020 [10759339] Jurisdictional review complete. Fee or ifp forms, notice of appearance, appellant's brief due on 09/09/2020 for Leslie Brown Jr. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 08/21/2020. [20-5063] [Entered: 07/31/2020 10:08 AM]
July 20, 2020 [10756282] Entry of appearance filed by Gerald M. Bender and Kristina L. Gray for Kevin Cox, City of Tulsa, Angela Bradley, Jack Henderson, G.T. Bynum, Blake Ewing, Karen Gilbert and Phil Lakin, Jr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/20/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. [20-5063] [Entered: 07/20/2020 08:49 AM]
July 20, 2020 [10756240] Entry of appearance submitted by Kristina L. Gray and Gerald M. Bender for Appellees Angela Bradley, G.T. Bynum, City of Tulsa, Mr. Kevin Cox, Blake Ewing, Karen Gilbert, Jack Henderson and Phil Lakin, Jr. for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: No. Served on 07/20/2020. Manner of Service: US mail. [20-5063] --[Edited 07/20/2020 by SLS to remove PDF from docket entry as the document has been filed.] KLG [Entered: 07/20/2020 08:02 AM]
July 17, 2020 [10756138] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. Douglas A. Wilson for Dennis Semler. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n (party previously disclosed). Served on 07/17/2020. Manner of Service: US mail, email [20-5063] [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:58 PM]
July 17, 2020 [10756118] Entry of appearance submitted by Douglas A. Wilson for Appellee Dennis Semler for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/17/2020. Manner of Service: email, US mail. --[Edited 07/17/2020 by MLB to remove pdf from docket; entry filed on 7/17/20][20-5063] DAW [Entered: 07/17/2020 02:17 PM]
July 17, 2020 [10755965] Deficiency notice issued. Type of deficiency: No entry of appearance filed on behalf of appellees. Notice of appearance due on 07/20/2020 for Angela Bradley, G.T. Bynum, City of Tulsa, Kevin Cox, Blake Ewing, Karen Gilbert, Jack Henderson, Phil Lakin Jr. and Dennis Semler. [20-5063] [Entered: 07/17/2020 09:09 AM]
June 25, 2020 [10750167] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 06/25/2020 Fee or ifp forms and notice of appearance due 07/27/2020 for Leslie Brown Jr. Notice of appearance due on 07/09/2020 for Angela Bradley, G.T. Bynum, City of Tulsa, Kevin Cox, Blake Ewing, Karen Gilbert, Jack Henderson, Phil Lakin Jr. and Dennis Semler. [20-5063] [Entered: 06/25/2020 04:43 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brown v. Bradley, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANGELA BRADLEY
Represented By: Gerald M. Bender Esq.
Represented By: Kristina L. Gray
Represented By: Gerald M. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID PATRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENNIS SEMLER
Represented By: Nicholas Charles Williams
Represented By: Douglas A. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY OF TULSA
Represented By: Kristina L. Gray
Represented By: Gerald M. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN COX
Represented By: Kristina L. Gray
Represented By: Gerald M. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: G.T. BYNUM
Represented By: Gerald M. Bender Esq.
Represented By: Kristina L. Gray
Represented By: Gerald M. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JACK HENDERSON
Represented By: Kristina L. Gray
Represented By: Gerald M. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BLAKE EWING
Represented By: Kristina L. Gray
Represented By: Gerald M. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PHIL LAKIN, JR.
Represented By: Kristina L. Gray
Represented By: Gerald M. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KAREN GILBERT
Represented By: Kristina L. Gray
Represented By: Gerald M. Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LESLIE BROWN, JR.
Represented By: Leslie Brown Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?