Santillan-Borrayo v. Barr
Petitioner: HECTOR SANTILLAN-BORRAYO
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Case Number: 20-9584
Filed: July 28, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 14, 2021 Santillan-Borrayo v. Garland

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 [10758870] Entry of appearance filed by Hakeem Ishola for Hector Santillan-Borrayo. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. Served on 07/29/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9584] [Entered: 07/29/2020 01:53 PM]
July 29, 2020 [10758842] Docketing statement filed by Hector Santillan-Borrayo. Served on 07/29/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9584] HI [Entered: 07/29/2020 12:01 PM]
July 29, 2020 [10758837] Entry of appearance submitted by Hakeem Ishola for Petitioner Hector Santillan-Borrayo for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/29/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 07/29/2020 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 7/29/20.][20-9584] HI [Entered: 07/29/2020 11:52 AM]
July 29, 2020 [10758768] Entry of appearance filed by Ms. Julia Tyler for Mr. William P. Barr. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: y. Served on 07/29/2020. Manner of Service: email. [20-9584] [Entered: 07/29/2020 09:35 AM]
July 29, 2020 [10758737] Entry of appearance submitted by Julia J. Tyler for Respondent Mr. William P. Barr for court review. Certificate of Interested Parties: Yes. Served on 07/29/2020. Manner of Service: email.--[Edited 07/29/2020 by LAB to remove PDF from entry as pleading was filed 7/29/20.] [20-9584] JT [Entered: 07/29/2020 08:44 AM]
July 28, 2020 [10758634] Petition for review filed. Served on 07/28/2020. Manner of Service: email - Attorney for Respondents: DOH/EOIR/BIA, Oil, Tyler. Copy of petition served on party at address shown in 07/28/2020 letter. Docketing statement, fee, and notice of appearance due 08/11/2020 for Hector Santillan-Borrayo. Agency record due 09/08/2020 for William P. Barr. Notice of appearance due on 08/11/2020 for William P. Barr [20-9584] [Entered: 07/28/2020 02:52 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Santillan-Borrayo v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, United States Attorney General
Represented By: Julia Tyler
Represented By: Lansing W. Tyler
Represented By: DOH/EOIR/BIA
Represented By: Oil Oil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HECTOR SANTILLAN-BORRAYO
Represented By: Hakeem Ishola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?