Horton v. Tayloe, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOHN D. HORTON
Defendant / Appellee: DONALD EMMITT TAYLOE, MICHAEL CHARLES FLANAGAN, GERLAD FRANK NEUWIRTH, JAY STANLEY WALKER, TAYLOR CURREL STEIN, JOHN WESLEY KINSLOW, STEPHEN KEITH NEWCOMBE, BRADLEY W. BURGESS, SYLVIA M. BURGESS, MANTON MONTY HIGHTOWER, COLBY AUSTIN STEPHENSON and CITY NATIONAL BANK
Case Number: 23-6139
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Tenth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Civil (RICO)
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 [11040768] Appellant's motion filed by Mr. John D. Horton for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. [23-6139] [Entered: 10/31/2023 02:43 PM]
October 27, 2023 [11040771] Appellant's brief filed by Mr. John D. Horton. Original (clerk made 4 copies). Required 10th Cir. R. 28.2 Attachments Included? n. [23-6139] [Entered: 10/31/2023 02:50 PM]
October 27, 2023 [11040770] Entry of appearance filed by Mr. John D. Horton. CERT. OF INTERESTED PARTIES: n. [23-6139] [Entered: 10/31/2023 02:47 PM]
October 23, 2023 [11038296] Record on appeal filed. No. of Volumes: 1. Comments: One volume containing pleadings. [23-6139] [Entered: 10/23/2023 07:48 AM]
October 20, 2023 [11038221] District court order denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. [23-6139] [Entered: 10/20/2023 02:46 PM]
October 20, 2023 [11038228] Jurisdictional review complete. Appellant's brief, fee or ifp forms and notice of appearance due by 11/29/2023 for John D. Horton. Record on appeal 10th circuit due 11/13/2023 [23-6139] [Entered: 10/20/2023 02:57 PM]
September 19, 2023 [11030033] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 09/19/2023 Notice of appearance and Fee or ifp forms due 10/19/2023 for John D. Horton. [23-6139] [Entered: 09/19/2023 02:54 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Horton v. Tayloe, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN D. HORTON
Represented By: John D. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DONALD EMMITT TAYLOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL CHARLES FLANAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GERLAD FRANK NEUWIRTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JAY STANLEY WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TAYLOR CURREL STEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN WESLEY KINSLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: STEPHEN KEITH NEWCOMBE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRADLEY W. BURGESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SYLVIA M. BURGESS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MANTON MONTY HIGHTOWER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COLBY AUSTIN STEPHENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CITY NATIONAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?