State of Georgia, et al v. National Wildlife Federation, et al
Not Classified By Court: SERVICE
Not Yet Classified: NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION and ONE HUNDRED MILES
Plaintiff / Appellee: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, STATE OF FLORIDA, STATE OF KANSAS, STATE OF ALABAMA, STATE OF GEORGIA and STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Defendant / Appellee: REGINA MCCARTHY, JO ELLEN DARCY, ANDREW WHEELER, U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS and U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Intervenor: AMERICAN FARM BUREAU FEDERATION
Case Number: 19-14237
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 TIME SENSITIVE MOTION for extension of time to file appellant's brief to 01/27/2020 filed by National Wildlife Federation and One Hundred Miles. Motion is Unopposed. [8960648-1] [19-14237] (ECF: Megan Huynh) [Entered: 12/17/2019 02:02 PM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to withdraw as counsel filed by Lindsay S. See is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8952497-2 ] Attorney terminated: Attorney Erica N. Peterson for Appellee State of West Virginia in 19-14237. [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:28 PM]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Taylor Hampton Crabtree is GRANTED by clerk. [8954089-2] [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:23 PM]
December 9, 2019 MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Taylor Hampton Crabtree for Appellee State of North Carolina. [8954089-1] [Entered: 12/10/2019 03:20 PM]
December 9, 2019 Notice to Counsel of Record. Counsel of Record must be logged in to CM/ECF and Pacer to access this document. This is the only notice you will receive regarding this matter. Please print a copy for your file. [Entered: 12/09/2019 03:00 PM]
December 9, 2019 MOTION to withdraw as counsel filed by Attorney Lindsay S. See for Appellee State of West Virginia. Motion is Unopposed [8952497-1] [19-14237] (ECF: Lindsay See) [Entered: 12/09/2019 02:38 PM]
December 4, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellee State of Georgia [19-14237] (ECF: Andrew Pinson) [Entered: 12/04/2019 05:10 PM]
December 4, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellees Jo Ellen Darcy, Regina McCarthy, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler [19-14237] (ECF: Robert Lundman) [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:25 PM]
December 4, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Robert J. Lundman for Appellees Jo Ellen Darcy, Regina McCarthy, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14237] (ECF: Robert Lundman) [Entered: 12/04/2019 03:22 PM]
December 4, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Intervenor American Farm Bureau Federation [19-14237] (ECF: Timothy Bishop) [Entered: 12/04/2019 02:39 PM]
December 4, 2019 Response to Jurisdictional Question filed by Appellants National Wildlife Federation and One Hundred Miles [19-14237] (ECF: Megan Huynh) [Entered: 12/04/2019 01:59 PM]
December 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kurtis G. Anderson for Georgia [19-14237] (ECF: Kurtis Anderson) [Entered: 12/02/2019 03:07 PM]
December 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Kurtis G. Anderson for Georgia [19-14237] (ECF: Andrew Pinson) [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:25 PM]
December 2, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Robert J. Lundman for Regina McCarthy, Jo-Ellen Darcy, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, and Andrew Wheeler [19-14237] (ECF: Robert Lundman) [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:20 PM]
November 26, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Amit Agarwal for State of Florida. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/26/2019 09:30 AM]
November 26, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Jeffrey A. Chanay for State of Kansas. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/26/2019 09:29 AM]
November 26, 2019 NOTICE OF CIP FILING DEFICIENCY to Lindsay S. See for State of West Virginia. You are receiving this notice because you have not completed the Web-Based Stock Ticker Symbol CIP via the court's public web-page and have not filed the CIP via the electronic filing system (CM/ECF). Failure to comply with 11th Cir. Rules 26.1-1 through 26.1-4 may result in dismissal of the case or appeal under 11th Cir. R. 42-1(b), return of deficient documents without action, or other sanctions on counsel, the party, or both. [Entered: 11/26/2019 09:28 AM]
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion to stay further appellate proceedings filed by Appellants National Wildlife Federation and One Hundred Miles is DENIED. Appellants' brief is due 30 days from the date of this order, with the appendix due seven days from the filing of the brief. [ # 8936696-2 ] BBM [Entered: 11/25/2019 02:52 PM]
November 22, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Andrew Alan Pinson for Appellee State of Georgia. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14237] (ECF: Andrew Pinson) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:42 PM]
November 22, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Tyler Green for appellee State of Utah Tyler Richard Green for Service. [19-14237] (ECF: Tyler Green) [Entered: 11/22/2019 01:26 PM]
November 21, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Amit Agarwal for State of Florida [19-14237] (ECF: Amit Agarwal) [Entered: 11/21/2019 02:09 PM]
November 20, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lindsay S. See for State of West Virginia. [19-14237] (ECF: Lindsay See) [Entered: 11/20/2019 02:00 PM]
November 20, 2019 JURISDICTIONAL QUESTION issued as to National Wildlife Federation and One Hundred Miles. [Entered: 11/20/2019 12:23 PM]
November 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by State of South Carolina Ex Rel. Alan Wilson in his official capacity as Attorney General of South Carolina James Emory Smith, Jr. for Service. [19-14237] (ECF: James Smith) [Entered: 11/19/2019 04:03 PM]
November 19, 2019 TIME-SENSITIVE MOTION to stay further appellate proceedings filed by National Wildlife Federation and One Hundred Miles. Motion is Unopposed. [8936696-1] [19-14237]--[Edited 11/20/2019 by JC] (ECF: Megan Huynh) [Entered: 11/19/2019 02:40 PM]
November 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Thomas M. Fisher for State of Indiana [19-14237] (ECF: Thomas Fisher) [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:58 PM]
November 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Jeffrey A. Chanay for State of Kansas. [19-14237] (ECF: Jeffrey Chanay) [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:43 PM]
November 19, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Andrew A. Pinson for Georgia [19-14237] (ECF: Andrew Pinson) [Entered: 11/19/2019 12:18 PM]
November 15, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Timothy S. Bishop for Intervenor American Farm Bureau Federation and Not Party Service. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14237] (ECF: Timothy Bishop) [Entered: 11/15/2019 12:41 PM]
November 14, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by James Blanding Holman, IV for National Wildlife Federation and One Hundred Miles. [19-14237] (ECF: James Holman) [Entered: 11/14/2019 12:58 PM]
November 13, 2019 Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Megan Hinkle Huynh for Appellants National Wildlife Federation and One Hundred Miles. [19-14237] (ECF: Megan Huynh) [Entered: 11/13/2019 03:12 PM]
November 13, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Megan Hinkle Huynh for National Wildlife Federation and One Hundred Miles. [19-14237] (ECF: Megan Huynh) [Entered: 11/13/2019 11:30 AM]
November 13, 2019 Notice of deficient Certificate of Interested Persons filed by Megan Hinkle Huynh for National Wildlife Federation and One Hundred Miles on 11/08/2019. Counsel who wish to participate in this appeal must complete and file an appearance form. Appearance of Counsel Form are available on the Internet at www.ca11.uscourts.gov. The clerk may not process filings from an attorney until that attorney files an appearance form. See 11th Cir. R. 46-6. Certificate will be returned if Appearance of Counsel Form is not filed within 3 days from the date of this notice. [Entered: 11/13/2019 10:57 AM]
November 13, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr. for State of Alabama. [19-14237] (ECF: Edmund LaCour) [Entered: 11/13/2019 10:33 AM]
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: Motion for substitution of counsel filed by Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr. is GRANTED by clerk. [ # 8929073-3 ] [Entered: 11/13/2019 09:58 AM]
November 12, 2019 Removed from case: Attorney Andrew Lynn Brasher for Appellee State of Alabama in 19-14237. [Entered: 11/12/2019 04:57 PM]
November 12, 2019 APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Timothy S. Bishop for Service. [19-14237] (ECF: Timothy Bishop) [Entered: 11/12/2019 11:15 AM]
November 8, 2019 [8929073-1] [19-14237] MOTION to file substitution of counsel filed by Attorney Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr. for Appellee State of Alabama. Opposition to Motion is Unknown [8929073-1] --[Edited 11/13/2019 by RAV] (ECF: Edmund LaCour) [Entered: 11/08/2019 04:25 PM]
November 8, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Edmund Gerard LaCour, Jr. for Appellee State of Alabama. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14237] (ECF: Edmund LaCour) [Entered: 11/08/2019 04:21 PM]
November 8, 2019 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Megan Hinkle Huynh for Appellants National Wildlife Federation and One Hundred Miles. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). [19-14237] (ECF: Megan Huynh) [Entered: 11/08/2019 09:56 AM]
October 25, 2019 CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant National Wildlife Federation on 10/21/2019. Fee Status: Fee Paid. USDC motion pending: Defendant - Intervenors' Motion to Hold Case in Abeyance 278. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 12/04/2019. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/08/2019 as to Appellant National Wildlife Federation. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 11/22/2019 as to Appellee State of Alabama [Entered: 10/30/2019 02:55 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Georgia, et al v. National Wildlife Federation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SERVICE
Represented By: Asher Paris Spiller
Represented By: Thomas Molnar Fisher
Represented By: James Emory Smith Jr.
Represented By: Sean J. Riley
Represented By: Craig A. Bromby
Represented By: Parker Douglas
Represented By: Sam M. Hayes
Represented By: Karla Z. Keckhaver
Represented By: Andrew J. Norton
Represented By: Tyler Richard Green
Represented By: Sarah Ellen Adkins
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Newberg
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: NATIONAL WILDLIFE FEDERATION
Represented By: Megan Hinkle Huynh
Represented By: Catherine Wannamaker
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: ONE HUNDRED MILES
Represented By: Megan Hinkle Huynh
Represented By: Catherine Wannamaker
Represented By: James Blanding Holman IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Patrick Morrisey
Represented By: Lindsay S. See
Represented By: Erica N. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF FLORIDA
Represented By: Jonathan Alan Glogau
Represented By: Ashley Moody
Represented By: Amit Agarwal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: Derek Schmidt
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Chanay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF ALABAMA
Represented By: Steven Marshall
Represented By: Edmund Gerard LaCour Jr.
Represented By: Andrew Lynn Brasher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Christopher Michael Carr
Represented By: Andrew Alan Pinson
Represented By: Kurtis George Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: STATE OF NORTH CAROLINA
Represented By: Taylor Hampton Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: REGINA MCCARTHY
Represented By: Robert J. Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JO ELLEN DARCY
Represented By: Robert J. Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANDREW WHEELER
Represented By: Robert J. Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. ARMY CORPS OF ENGINEERS
Represented By: Robert J. Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Represented By: Robert J. Lundman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: AMERICAN FARM BUREAU FEDERATION
Represented By: Timothy S. Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?