Authors Guild, Inc. v. Hathitrust Featured Case

Plaintiff - Appellant: Authors Guild, Inc., Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Pat Cummins, Angelo Loukakis, Roxana Robinson, Andre Roy, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Fay Weldon, Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Writers' Union of Canada, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Helge Ronning, Jack R. Salamanca and Danielle Simpson
Defendant - Appellee: Hathitrust, Regents Of The University Of Michigan, Regents of the University of California, Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, Trustees Of Indiana University, Cornell University, Julia Donovan Darlow, Laurence B. Deitch, Denise Ilitch, Olivia P. Maynard, Andrea Fischer Newman, Andrew C. Richner, S. Martin Taylor, in his official capacity as the Regents of the University of Michigan, Katherine E. White, in her official capacity as the Regents of the University of Michigan, Richard C. Blum, David Crane, William De La Pena, Russell Gould, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, George M. Marcus, Alfredo Mireles, Jr., Norman J. Pattiz, Bonnie Reiss, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Bruce D. Varner, Paul Wachter, in his official capacity as the Regents of the University of California, Charlene Zettel, in his official capacity as the Regents of the University of California, Jeffrey Bartell, Mark J. Bradley, Judith V. Crain, John Drew, Tony Evers, Michael J. Falbo, Edmund Manydeeds, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Troy Sherven, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, S. Mark Tyler, Jose F. Vazquez, in his official capacity as the Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, David G. Walsh, in his official capacity as the Regents of the University of Wisconsin System, William R. Cast, Patrick A. Shoulders, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Bruce Cole, Philip N. Eskew, Jr., Cora J. Griffin, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr., Derica W. Rice, in his official capacity as the Trustee of Indiana University, William H. Strong, in his official capacity as the Trustee of Indiana University, National Federation of the Blind, Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler
Case Number: 12-4547
Filed: November 14, 2012
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: PROPERTY RIGHTS-Copyright

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
June 10, 2014 Summary Authors Guild, Inc. v. HathiTrust

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2014 285 JUDGMENT, FILED.[1244595] [12-4547]
June 10, 2014 282 CAPTION, in light of Opinion filed 06/10/2014, AMENDED.[1244066] [12-4547]
June 10, 2014 280 NEW CASE MANAGER, Connie Mazariego, ASSIGNED.[1244018] [12-4547]
June 10, 2014 279 Featured Case CERTIFIED OPINION, dated 06/10/2014, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[1244013] [12-4547]
June 10, 2014 278 Featured Case OPINION, the district court judgment is affirmed in part, vacated in part and remanded, by JMW, JAC BDP, FILED.[1244004] [12-4547]
January 17, 2014 276 ARGUMENT CD sent to Edward Rosenthal, TRANSMITTED.[1137217] [12-4547]
January 17, 2014 275 ARGUMENT CD sent to Denise Altobelli, TRANSMITTED.[1137213] [12-4547]
January 17, 2014 274 ARGUMENT CD sent to Michael Bamberger, TRANSMITTED.[1137164] [12-4547]
January 17, 2014 273 ARGUMENT CD sent to Jason Schultz, TRANSMITTED.[1137083] [12-4547]
December 9, 2013 272 LETTER, dated 12/09/2013, on behalf of Michael A. Bamberger from Dentons. Fee Paid. Forwarded to Calendar Team. Receipt # 219464. RECEIVED. Service date 12/09/2013 by hand delivery.[1110006] [12-4547]
December 5, 2013 271 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from BROWN GOLDSTEIN LEVY with fee, RECEIVED.[1108265] [12-4547]
December 5, 2013 270 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from FRANKFURT KURNIT KLEIN & SELZ with fee, RECEIVED.[1108257] [12-4547]
November 27, 2013 269 ARGUMENT CD sent to MargaretAnn Franz, TRANSMITTED.[1103456] [12-4547]
November 25, 2013 268 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from NYU with fee, RECEIVED.[1101091] [12-4547]
November 15, 2013 267 ARGUMENT CD to Jennifer Jun, TRANSMITTED.[1093899] [12-4547]
November 15, 2013 266 ARGUMENT CD to Abdul Hafiz, TRANSMITTED.[1093888] [12-4547]
November 15, 2013 265 ARGUMENT CD to Alberto Garcia, TRANSMITTED.[1093870] [12-4547]
November 14, 2013 264 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD, with fee from DURIE TANGRI, RECEIVED.[1092960] [12-4547]
November 1, 2013 263 REQUEST FOR ARGUMENT CD from WILMER HALE, with fee, RECEIVED.[1081749] [12-4547]
October 30, 2013 262 CASE, before JMW,JAC,BDP, C.JJ., HEARD.[1079472] [12-4547]
October 9, 2013 259 LETTER, dated 10/09/2013, re: reference material, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, RECEIVED. Service date 10/09/2013 by CM/ECF.[1062152] [12-4547]--[Edited 10/09/2013 by DH]
September 19, 2013 258 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. Service date 09/19/2013 by CM/ECF. [1046208] [12-4547]
September 18, 2013 257 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Mary Sue Coleman, Cornell University, Hathitrust, Michael McRobbie, Kevin Reilly and Mark G. Yudof, FILED. Service date 09/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1045364] [12-4547]
September 18, 2013 256 NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 09/18/2013 by CM/ECF. [1045228] [12-4547]
September 18, 2013 255 ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[1044973] [12-4547]
September 4, 2013 254 CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 10/30/2013, SET.[1032437] [12-4547]
August 13, 2013 253 CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 10/28/2013, PROPOSED.[1015461] [12-4547]
July 16, 2013 245 SEALED FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. [991052] [12-4547]--[Edited 07/16/2013 by DH]
July 12, 2013 249 SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Mary Sue Coleman, Mary Sue Coleman, Cornell University, Hathitrust, Michael McRobbie, Kevin Reilly and Mark G. Yudof, FILED. [995469] [12-4547]
July 12, 2013 243 SEALED BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. [991019] [12-4547]
July 12, 2013 241 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Mary Sue Coleman, Cornell University, Hathitrust, Michael McRobbie, Kevin Reilly and Mark G. Yudof, FILED. Service date 07/12/2013 by CM/ECF. [988395] [12-4547]
July 11, 2013 240 FINAL FORM REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [987252] [12-4547]
July 11, 2013 239 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/11/2013 by CM/ECF. [987244] [12-4547]
July 10, 2013 238 FINAL FORM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. Service date 07/10/2013 by email, CM/ECF, US mail. [986068] [12-4547]
July 2, 2013 232 SEALED REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. [980472] [12-4547]
July 2, 2013 231 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal document [209] filed by Appellant Authors Guild, Inc., Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Pat Cummins, Angelo Loukakis, Roxana Robinson, Andre Roy, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Fay Weldon, Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Writers' Union of Canada, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Helge Ronning, Jack R. Salamanca and Danielle Simpson, by CFD, FILED. [980396][231] [12-4547]
July 1, 2013 229 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [167] filed by Appellee National Federation of the Blind, by CFD, FILED. [979828][229] [12-4547]
June 28, 2013 236 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 2, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. [983680] [12-4547]--[Edited 07/08/2013 by DH]
June 28, 2013 235 SEALED APPENDIX, volume 1, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. [983677] [12-4547]--[Edited 07/08/2013 by DH]
June 28, 2013 224 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 5 of 5, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978669] [12-4547]
June 28, 2013 223 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 4 of 5, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978665] [12-4547]
June 28, 2013 222 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 3 of 5, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978658] [12-4547]
June 28, 2013 221 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 2 of 5, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978651] [12-4547]
June 28, 2013 220 DEFERRED APPENDIX, volume 1 of 5, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 06/28/2013 by CM/ECF.[978638] [12-4547]
June 26, 2013 218 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF [215], [216], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois, Northwestern University, Pennsylvania State Unviersity, Regents of the University of Minnesota and Trustees of Purdue University, FILED.[976376] [12-4547]
June 26, 2013 217 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, CORRECTED BRIEF, [215], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois, Northwestern University, Pennsylvania State Unviersity, Regents of the University of Minnesota and Trustees of Purdue University, FILED.[976350] [12-4547]
June 24, 2013 216 AMICUS BRIEF, Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois, Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Regents of the University of Minnesota, Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, Northwestern University , Pennsylvania State University and Trustees of Purdee University, FILED. Service date 06/24/2013 by CM/ECF. [972782] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/26/2013 by DH]
June 24, 2013 215 CORRECTED BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois, Northwestern University, Pennsylvania State Unviersity, Regents of the University of Minnesota and Trustees of Purdue University, FILED. Service date 06/24/2013 by CM/ECF. [972765] [12-4547]
June 21, 2013 214 PAGE PROOF REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 06/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [972642] [12-4547]
June 21, 2013 213 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUS BRIEF, [152], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois, Northwestern University, Pennsylvania State Unviersity, Regents of the University of Minnesota and Trustees of Purdue University, FILED.[972402] [12-4547]
June 21, 2013 212 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois, Board of Trustees of Michigan State University, Regents of the University of Minnesota, Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, Northwestern University , Pennsylvania State Unviersity and Trustees of Purdue University, ADDED.[972381] [12-4547]
June 21, 2013 209 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 06/21/2013 by CM/ECF. [971858] [12-4547]
June 20, 2013 207 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Marilyn J. Bartlett, Center for Applied Special Technologhy, Center for Law and Education, Melissa Chafee, Council of Parents Attorneys and Advocates, Disability Rights Advocates, Everyone Reading, Inc., Everyone Reading Illinois, Eye to Eye, Inc., International Dyslexia Association and Society for Disability Studies, ADDED.[970954] [12-4547]
June 19, 2013 206 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Council of the Blind, American Council of the Blind, American Foundation for the Blind, Association of Late-Deafened Adults, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Peter Blanck, Disability Rights Education & Defense Fund (DREDF), Disability Rights Legal Center, Gallaudet University, Hearing Loss Association of America, National Association of the Deaf (NAD), National Disability Rights Newtwork, Telecommunications for Deaf and Hard of Hearing, Inc. (TDI), United Cerebral Palsy, Inc. and Gregg Vanderheiden, ADDED.[969252] [12-4547]
June 19, 2013 204 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL [184], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Association of People with Disabilities, FILED.[969165] [12-4547]
June 17, 2013 202 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Association on Higher Education and Disability, FILED. Service date 06/17/2013 by CM/ECF.[967541] [12-4547]
June 12, 2013 199 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Edward Rosenthal, Esq. for Appellant Authors Guild, Inc., Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Pat Cummins, Angelo Loukakis, Roxana Robinson, Andre Roy, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Fay Weldon, Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Writers' Union of Canada, Pat Cummings, Erik Grundstrom, Helge Ronning, Jack R. Salamanca and Danielle Simpson, FILED. Service date 06/12/2013 by CM/ECF. [962974] [12-4547]
June 10, 2013 195 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae The Leland Stanford Junior University, ADDED.[959968] [12-4547]
June 10, 2013 194 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Association on Higher Education and Disability, ADDED.[959922] [12-4547]
June 10, 2013 193 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, [136], on behalf of , American Association of People with Disabilites, FILED.[959887] [12-4547]
June 10, 2013 192 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Association of People with Disabilities, ADDED.[959855] [12-4547]
June 7, 2013 189 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The Board of Trustees of the University of Illinois, The Board of Trustess of Michigan State University, The Regents of the University of Minnesota, The Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, Northwester University, The Pennsylvania State University, and The Board of Trustees of Purdue University, FILED. Service date 06/07/2013 by CM/ECF. [959341] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/14/2013 by DH]
June 7, 2013 188 ATTORNEY, Stephanie Powers Skaff for Electronic Frontier Foundation Center for Democracy & Technology Public Knowledge, in case 12-4547 , [155], ADDED.[959159] [12-4547]
June 7, 2013 187 ATTORNEY, Rochelle Lee Woods for Electronic Frontier Foundation Center for Democracy & Technology Public Knowledge, in case 12-4547, [154], ADDED.[959147] [12-4547]
June 7, 2013 186 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [150], on behalf of The Regents of the University of Minnesota, The Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, Northwestern University, The Pennsylvania State University, The Board of Trustees of Purdue University, FILED.[959121] [12-4547]
June 7, 2013 185 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time to file reply brief and the deferred joint appendix [170] filed by Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois and Fay Weldon, FILED. [959088][185] [12-4547]
June 7, 2013 184 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Association of People with Disabilities, American Council of the Blind, American Foundation of Late-Deafened-Adults, Judge David L. Bazelon Center for Mental Health Law, Dr. Peter Blanck, Disability Rights Education & Defense (DREDF), Disability Rights Legal Center, Gallaudet University, Hearing Loss Assocation of America, National Association of the Deaf (NAD), National Disability Rights Network, Telecommunications for the Deaf and Hard of Hearing, Inc, (TDI), United Cerebral Palsy, and Dr. Gregg Vanderheiden, FILED. Service date 06/07/2013 by CM/ECF. [959039] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/14/2013 by DH]
June 7, 2013 182 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Joseph E. Petersen, Esq. for Appellee Cornell University, Hathitrust, Mary Sue Coleman, Mark G. Yudof, Kevin Reilly and Michael McRobbie, FILED. Service date 06/07/2013 by CM/ECF. [958910] [12-4547]
June 7, 2013 176 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of appearance[166], on behalf of American Association of People with Diasabilities, et al., FILED.[958623] [12-4547]
June 6, 2013 174 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Association of Community Colleges, The National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities and EDUCAUSE, ADDED.[958363] [12-4547]
June 6, 2013 172 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Learning Ally, Inc., ADDED.[957432] [12-4547]
June 6, 2013 171 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Beneficent Technology, Inc., ADDED.[957421] [12-4547]
June 5, 2013 170 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois and Fay Weldon, FILED. Service date 06/05/2012 by CM/ECF. [957223] [12-4547]
June 5, 2013 169 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Academic Authors and Digital Humanities and Law Scholars, ADDED.[957171] [12-4547]
June 5, 2013 168 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Medical Historians, Disability Law Professors, Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge and Center for Democracy & Technology, ADDED.[957158] [12-4547]
June 5, 2013 166 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Association of People with Diasabilities, et al., FILED. Service date 06/05/2013 by CM/ECF. [955927] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/07/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 165 AMICUS BRIEF, Association on Higher Education and Disability, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955902] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/10/2013 by AM]
June 4, 2013 164 AMICUS BRIEF, <EDIT by Clerk's Office>, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955898] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 163 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Medical Historians, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955897] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/05/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 162 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Medical Historians, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955896] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/05/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Disability Law Professors, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by email. [955886] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/05/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 160 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Academic Authors, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955883] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/05/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 159 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Digital Humanities and Law Scholars, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955881] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/05/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 158 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge, and Center for Democracy & Technology, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955879] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/05/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 157 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge, and Center for Democracy & Technology, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955877] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/05/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 156 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> , FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955874] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 155 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge and Center for Democracy & Technology, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955873] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/07/2013 by DE]
June 4, 2013 154 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Electronic Frontier Foundation, Public Knowledge and Center for Democracy & Technology, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955871] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/07/2013 by DE]
June 4, 2013 153 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Association of College and Research Libraries and Association of Research Libraries, ADDED.[955859] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 152 AMICUS BRIEF, <EDIT by Clerk's Office>, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955815] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 151 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Association of Community Colleges, The National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities and EDUCAUSE, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955765] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/06/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 150 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, The Regents of the University of Minnesota, The Board of Regents of the University of Nebraska, Northwestern University, The Pennsylvania State University, The Board of Trustees of Purdue University, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955749] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/07/2013 by DE]
June 4, 2013 149 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Digital Humanities and Law Scholars, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955747] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/05/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 148 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae Academic Authors, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955741] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/05/2013 by JW]
June 4, 2013 147 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Library Assocation, ADDED.[955734] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 146 AMICUS BRIEF, <EDIT by Clerk's Office>, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955727] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 145 AMICUS BRIEF, Disbility Law Professors, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955600] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/04/2013 by DH]
June 4, 2013 144 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL [127], [128], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Disability Law Professors, FILED.[955591] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 143 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, [127], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Disability Law Professors, FILED.[955573] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 142 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Disability Law Professors, ADDED.[955569] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 141 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> , FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955424] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 140 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, The Leland Stanford Junior University, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955412] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 139 AMICUS BRIEF, The Leland Stanford Junior University--[Edited 06/10/2013 by AM], FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955409] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 138 AMICUS BRIEF, American Association of People with Disabilites, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955378] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/10/2013 by AM]
June 4, 2013 137 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, <EDIT by Clerk's Office> , FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955297] [12-4547]
June 4, 2013 136 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Association of People with Disabilities, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [955013] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/10/2013 by AM]
June 4, 2013 135 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Beneficent Technology, Inc., and Learning Ally, Inc, FILED. Service date 06/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [954967] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/04/2013 by DH]
June 3, 2013 167 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee National Federation of the Blind, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF.[955979] [12-4547]
June 3, 2013 134 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Disability Law Professors , FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by email. [954713] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/04/2013 by DH]
June 3, 2013 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Disability Law Professors, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [954711] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/04/2013 by DH]
June 3, 2013 132 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, and Association of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [954697] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/04/2013 by DH]
June 3, 2013 131 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Library Association, Association of College and Research Libraries, And Association of Research Libraries, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [954696] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/04/2013 by DH]
June 3, 2013 130 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Beneficent Technology, Inc., and Learning Ally, Inc.--[Edited 06/04/2013 by DH], FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [954637] [12-4547]
June 3, 2013 129 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Council on Education, Association of American Universities, Association of Public and Land-Grant Universities, American Association of State Colleges and Universities, American Association of Community Colleges, The National Association of Independent Colleges and Universities and EDUCAUSE, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [954601] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/06/2013 by JW]
June 3, 2013 128 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Disability Law Professors , FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [954529] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/04/2013 by DH]
June 3, 2013 127 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Disability Law Professors , FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [954459] [12-4547]--[Edited 06/04/2013 by DH]
June 3, 2013 126 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [115] filed by Appellee National Federation of the Blind, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [116] filed by Appellee National Federation of the Blind, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [119] filed by Appellee National Federation of the Blind, by GEL, FILED. [954267][126] [12-4547]
June 3, 2013 122 ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Daniel Frank Goldstein for Appellee National Federation of the Blind, Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. Service date 06/03/2013 by CM/ECF. [953706] [12-4547]
May 31, 2013 119 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee National Federation of the Blind, FILED. Service date 05/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[953169] [12-4547]
May 31, 2013 116 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee National Federation of the Blind, FILED. Service date 05/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[953064] [12-4547]
May 31, 2013 115 MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee National Federation of the Blind, FILED. Service date 05/30/2013 by CM/ECF.[953060] [12-4547]
May 31, 2013 110 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal document [98] filed by Appellee National Federation of the Blind, Georgina Kleege, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, granting motion to seal document [101] filed by Appellee Cornell University, Hathitrust, Mary Sue Coleman, Mark G. Yudof, Kevin Reilly and Michael McRobbie, by GEL, FILED. [952650][110] [12-4547]
May 28, 2013 107 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Mary Sue Coleman, Cornell University, Hathitrust, Michael McRobbie, Kevin Reilly and Mark G. Yudof, FILED. Service date 05/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [949114] [12-4547]
May 28, 2013 106 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. Service date 05/28/2013 by email, CM/ECF. [948967] [12-4547]
May 28, 2013 101 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellee Mary Sue Coleman, Cornell University, Hathitrust, Michael McRobbie, Kevin Reilly and Mark G. Yudof, FILED. Service date 05/28/2013 by CM/ECF. [948371] [12-4547]
May 24, 2013 99 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [98], on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. Service date 05/24/2013 by CM/ECF.[947903][99] [12-4547]
May 24, 2013 98 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. Service date 05/24/2013 by CM/ECF. [947701] [12-4547]
May 24, 2013 97 NEW PARTY, Appellee Mark G. Yudof, ADDED.[947680] [12-4547]
May 24, 2013 96 NEW PARTY, Appellee Mary Sue Coleman, Kevin Reilly and Michael McRobbie, ADDED.[947672] [12-4547]--[Edited 05/24/2013 by DH]
March 14, 2013 93 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF [87], [92], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED.[875903] [12-4547]
March 8, 2013 92 AMICUS BRIEF, Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [869737] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/14/2013 by DH]
March 7, 2013 90 CAPTION, defendants have been substituted as per stipulation of the district district court dated 12/21/2011, AMENDED.[868412] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/11/2013 by DH]--[Edited 03/11/2013 by DH]
March 7, 2013 88 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Association of American Publishers, ADDED.[868345] [12-4547]
March 7, 2013 87 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUSE BRIEF, [73], on behalf of Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED.[868165] [12-4547]
March 7, 2013 85 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., ADDED.[868115] [12-4547]
March 7, 2013 83 CURED DEFECTIVE AMICUS BRIEF [71], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc. ("ASJA"), FILED.[868077] [12-4547]
March 7, 2013 82 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, AMICUS BRIEF, [67], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc. ("ASJA"), FILED.[868057] [12-4547]
March 7, 2013 81 ATTORNEY, Shane St. Hill for American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc. ("ASJA"), in case 12-4547 , [70], ADDED.[868026] [12-4547]
March 7, 2013 80 ATTORNEY, Hillel Ira Parness for American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc. ("ASJA"), in case 12-4547 , [69], ADDED.[868003] [12-4547]
March 7, 2013 79 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc. ("ASJA"), ADDED.[867971] [12-4547]
March 7, 2013 77 NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae Associated Press, ADDED.[867868] [12-4547]
March 6, 2013 76 CERTIFIED DOCKET SHEET, RECEIVED.[866848] [12-4547]
March 4, 2013 75 AMICUS BRIEF, Association of American Pubilshers, FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [864144] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Association of American Publishers , FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [864141] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 73 AMICUS BRIEF, Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [864116] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Motion Picture Association of America, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [864107] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 71 AMICUS BRIEF, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [864068] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [863989] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [863987] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 68 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc , FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [863984] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 67 AMICUS BRIEF, American Society of Journalists and Authors, Inc., FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [863820] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 66 AMICUS BRIEF, The Associated Press, FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [863629] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, Associated Press, FILED. Service date 03/04/2013 by CM/ECF. [863627] [12-4547]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]--[Edited 03/07/2013 by DH]
March 4, 2013 64 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler Brief due date as 05/28/2013, FILED.[862852] [12-4547]
March 1, 2013 60 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee Hathitrust Brief due date as 05/28/2013, FILED.[862364] [12-4547]
March 1, 2013 59 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, informing Court of proposed due date 05/28/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 03/01/2013 by CM/ECF.[862323] [12-4547]
March 1, 2013 56 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Hathitrust, informing Court of proposed due date 05/28/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 03/01/2013 by CM/ECF.[862179] [12-4547]
February 25, 2013 54 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 02/25/2013 by CM/ECF. [856426] [12-4547]
February 22, 2013 53 SO-ORDERED NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, re: deferred appendix, FILED.[854213] [12-4547]
February 20, 2013 49 NON-DISPOSITIVE STIPULATION, re: deferred appendix, RECEIVED. Service date 02/20/2013 by CM/ECF.[851012] [12-4547]--[Edited 02/20/2013 by DH]
December 21, 2012 48 ATTORNEY, Jessica Paulie Weber for Georgina Kleege National Federation of the Blind Blair Seidlitz Courtney Wheeler, in case 12-4547 , [47], ADDED.[800399] [12-4547]
December 20, 2012 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. Service date 12/20/2012 by CM/ECF. [799493] [12-4547]
December 7, 2012 45 ATTORNEY, Robert J. Bernstein for Georgina Kleege National Federation of the Blind Blair Seidlitz Courtney Wheeler, in case 12-4547 , [43], ADDED.[790056] [12-4547]
December 7, 2012 44 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [26], [43], on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED.[790029] [12-4547]
December 7, 2012 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. Service date 12/07/2012 by CM/ECF. [789542] [12-4547]
December 6, 2012 42 ATTORNEY, Jeremy Seth Goldman for Pat Cummings Writers' Union of Canada Erik Grundstrom Helge Ronning Fay Weldon Authors League Fund, Inc. Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening Jack R. Salamanca Andre Roy Sveriges Forfattarforbund T.J. Stiles Daniele Simpson Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois James Shapiro Danielle Simpson Pat Cummins Angelo Loukakis Authors Guild, Inc. Australian Society Of Authors Limited Roxana Robinson, in case 12-4547 , [41], ADDED.[788460] [12-4547]
December 6, 2012 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 12/06/2012 by CM/ECF. [788229] [12-4547]
December 6, 2012 40 NOTICE, for the submission of additional paper copies of the appendix or joint appendix, SENT.[787667] [12-4547]
December 6, 2012 39 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada Brief due date as 02/25/2013; Joint Appendix due date as 02/25/2013, FILED.[787665] [12-4547]
December 5, 2012 37 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 12/17/2012, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Conference Note: Conference date and time changed., endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[787322] [12-4547]
December 5, 2012 35 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, informing Court of proposed due date 02/25/2013, RECEIVED. Service date 12/05/2012 by CM/ECF.[787038] [12-4547]
December 4, 2012 34 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Amended Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 12/20/2012, Start Time: 3:00 PM, Conference Note: Conference date changed to 12/20/12, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[785979] [12-4547]
December 3, 2012 33 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Hathitrust, FILED. Service date 12/03/2012 by CM/ECF.[785226] [12-4547]
December 3, 2012 32 ATTORNEY, Allison M. Scott Roach for Norman J. Pattiz Richard C. Blum Bruce D. Varner Katherine Pointer Philip N. Eskew Jr. Thomas E. Reilly Jr. Charlene Zettel Trustees Of Indiana University David Crane Alfredo Mireles Jr. Denise Ilitch MaryEllen Kiley Bishop Julia Donovan Darlow George M. Marcus Troy Sherven Fred Ruiz Sherry L. Lansing Edmund Manydeeds Jose F. Vazquez Katherine E. White Olivia P. Maynard Derica W. Rice S. Martin Taylor Mark J. Bradley S. Mark Tyler Michael J. Falbo Russell Gould Bonnie Reiss William R. Cast Jeffrey Bartell John Drew Laurence B. Deitch Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System Brent Smith Patrick A. Shoulders Paul Wachter Hadi Makarechian Odessa Johnson Cornell University Andrew C. Richner Monica Lozano Michael J. Spector Andrea Fischer Newman David G. Walsh William H. Strong George Kieffer Hathitrust Judith V. Crain Regents of the University of California Leslie Tang Schilling Regents Of The University Of Michigan Tony Evers Cora J. Griffin Eddie Island William De La Pena Bruce Cole Charles Pruitt, in case 12-4547 , [24], ADDED.[785011] [12-4547]
December 3, 2012 31 ATTORNEY, Robert Nathan Potter for Norman J. Pattiz Richard C. Blum Bruce D. Varner Katherine Pointer Philip N. Eskew Jr. Thomas E. Reilly Jr. Charlene Zettel Trustees Of Indiana University Alfredo Mireles Jr. David Crane Denise Ilitch MaryEllen Kiley Bishop Julia Donovan Darlow George M. Marcus Troy Sherven Fred Ruiz Sherry L. Lansing Edmund Manydeeds Jose F. Vazquez Katherine E. White Olivia P. Maynard Derica W. Rice S. Martin Taylor Mark J. Bradley S. Mark Tyler Michael J. Falbo Russell Gould Bonnie Reiss William R. Cast Jeffrey Bartell John Drew Laurence B. Deitch Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System Brent Smith Patrick A. Shoulders Paul Wachter Hadi Makarechian Odessa Johnson Cornell University Andrew C. Richner Monica Lozano Michael J. Spector Andrea Fischer Newman David G. Walsh William H. Strong George Kieffer Judith V. Crain Regents of the University of California Leslie Tang Schilling Regents Of The University Of Michigan Tony Evers Cora J. Griffin Eddie Island William De La Pena Bruce Cole Charles Pruitt, in case 12-4547 , [21], ADDED.[784995] [12-4547]
December 3, 2012 30 ATTORNEY, W. Andrew Pequignot for Norman J. Pattiz Richard C. Blum Bruce D. Varner Katherine Pointer Philip N. Eskew Jr. Thomas E. Reilly Jr. Charlene Zettel Trustees Of Indiana University David Crane Alfredo Mireles Jr. Denise Ilitch MaryEllen Kiley Bishop Julia Donovan Darlow George M. Marcus Troy Sherven Fred Ruiz Sherry L. Lansing Edmund Manydeeds Jose F. Vazquez Katherine E. White Olivia P. Maynard Derica W. Rice S. Martin Taylor Mark J. Bradley S. Mark Tyler Michael J. Falbo Russell Gould Bonnie Reiss William R. Cast Jeffrey Bartell John Drew Laurence B. Deitch Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System Brent Smith Patrick A. Shoulders Paul Wachter Hadi Makarechian Odessa Johnson Cornell University Andrew C. Richner Monica Lozano Michael J. Spector Andrea Fischer Newman David G. Walsh William H. Strong George Kieffer Hathitrust Judith V. Crain Regents of the University of California Leslie Tang Schilling Regents Of The University Of Michigan Tony Evers Cora J. Griffin Eddie Island William De La Pena Bruce Cole Charles Pruitt, in case 12-4547 , [25], ADDED.[784773] [12-4547]
December 3, 2012 29 ATTORNEY, Joseph M. Beck for Norman J. Pattiz Richard C. Blum Bruce D. Varner Katherine Pointer Philip N. Eskew Jr. Thomas E. Reilly Jr. Charlene Zettel Trustees Of Indiana University David Crane Alfredo Mireles Jr. Denise Ilitch MaryEllen Kiley Bishop Julia Donovan Darlow George M. Marcus Troy Sherven Fred Ruiz Sherry L. Lansing Edmund Manydeeds Jose F. Vazquez Katherine E. White Olivia P. Maynard Derica W. Rice S. Martin Taylor Mark J. Bradley S. Mark Tyler Michael J. Falbo Russell Gould Bonnie Reiss William R. Cast Jeffrey Bartell John Drew Laurence B. Deitch Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System Brent Smith Patrick A. Shoulders Paul Wachter Hadi Makarechian Odessa Johnson Cornell University Andrew C. Richner Monica Lozano Michael J. Spector Andrea Fischer Newman David G. Walsh William H. Strong George Kieffer Hathitrust Judith V. Crain Regents of the University of California Leslie Tang Schilling Regents Of The University Of Michigan Tony Evers Cora J. Griffin Eddie Island William De La Pena Bruce Cole Charles Pruitt, in case 12-4547 , [25], ADDED.[784762] [12-4547]
December 3, 2012 28 ATTORNEY, Joseph Petersen, [22], in place of attorney Robert Nathan Potter, SUBSTITUTED.[784736] [12-4547]
December 3, 2012 27 ATTORNEY, Robert Nathan Potter for Norman J. Pattiz Richard C. Blum Bruce D. Varner Katherine Pointer Philip N. Eskew Jr. Thomas E. Reilly Jr. Charlene Zettel Trustees Of Indiana University David Crane Alfredo Mireles Jr. Denise Ilitch MaryEllen Kiley Bishop Julia Donovan Darlow George M. Marcus Troy Sherven Fred Ruiz Sherry L. Lansing Edmund Manydeeds Jose F. Vazquez Katherine E. White Olivia P. Maynard Derica W. Rice S. Martin Taylor Mark J. Bradley S. Mark Tyler Michael J. Falbo Russell Gould Bonnie Reiss William R. Cast Jeffrey Bartell John Drew Laurence B. Deitch Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System Brent Smith Patrick A. Shoulders Paul Wachter Hadi Makarechian Odessa Johnson Cornell University Andrew C. Richner Monica Lozano Michael J. Spector Andrea Fischer Newman David G. Walsh William H. Strong George Kieffer Hathitrust Judith V. Crain Regents of the University of California Leslie Tang Schilling Regents Of The University Of Michigan Tony Evers Cora J. Griffin Eddie Island William De La Pena Bruce Cole Charles Pruitt, in case 12-4547 , [21], ADDED.[784696] [12-4547]
December 3, 2012 26 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [20], on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED.[784635] [12-4547]
December 1, 2012 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr., Tony Evers, Michael J. Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J. Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr., Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Regents Of The University Of Michigan, Regents of the University of California, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr., Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White and Charlene Zettel, FILED. Service date 12/01/2012 by CM/ECF. [783862] [12-4547]
December 1, 2012 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr., Tony Evers, Michael J. Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J. Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr., Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Regents Of The University Of Michigan, Regents of the University of California, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr., Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White and Charlene Zettel, FILED. Service date 12/01/2012 by CM/ECF. [783861] [12-4547]
December 1, 2012 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr., Tony Evers, Michael J. Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J. Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr., Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Regents Of The University Of Michigan, Regents of the University of California, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr., Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White and Charlene Zettel, FILED. Service date 12/01/2012 by CM/ECF. [783860] [12-4547]
December 1, 2012 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr., Tony Evers, Michael J. Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J. Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr., Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Regents Of The University Of Michigan, Regents of the University of California, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr., Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White and Charlene Zettel, FILED. Service date 12/01/2012 by CM/ECF. [783859] [12-4547]
December 1, 2012 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Jeffrey Bartell, MaryEllen Kiley Bishop, Richard C. Blum, Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System, Mark J. Bradley, William R. Cast, Bruce Cole, Cornell University, Judith V. Crain, David Crane, Julia Donovan Darlow, William De La Pena, Laurence B. Deitch, John Drew, Philip N. Eskew, Jr., Tony Evers, Michael J. Falbo, Russell Gould, Cora J. Griffin, Hathitrust, Denise Ilitch, Eddie Island, Odessa Johnson, George Kieffer, Sherry L. Lansing, Monica Lozano, Hadi Makarechian, Edmund Manydeeds, George M. Marcus, Olivia P. Maynard, Alfredo Mireles, Jr., Andrea Fischer Newman, Norman J. Pattiz, Katherine Pointer, Charles Pruitt, Regents Of The University Of Michigan, Regents of the University of California, Thomas E. Reilly, Jr., Bonnie Reiss, Derica W. Rice, Andrew C. Richner, Fred Ruiz, Leslie Tang Schilling, Troy Sherven, Patrick A. Shoulders, Brent Smith, Michael J. Spector, William H. Strong, S. Martin Taylor, Trustees Of Indiana University, S. Mark Tyler, Bruce D. Varner, Jose F. Vazquez, Paul Wachter, David G. Walsh, Katherine E. White and Charlene Zettel, FILED. Service date 12/01/2012 by CM/ECF. [783858] [12-4547]
December 1, 2012 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. Service date 12/01/2012 by CM/ECF. [783857] [12-4547]
November 29, 2012 19 NEW CASE MANAGER, Deborah Holmes, ASSIGNED.[781648] [12-4547]
November 28, 2012 15 CURED DEFECTIVE FORM C, [11], on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED.[780602] [12-4547]
November 28, 2012 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Georgina Kleege, National Federation of the Blind, Blair Seidlitz and Courtney Wheeler, FILED. Service date 11/28/2012 by CM/ECF.[780434] [12-4547]
November 28, 2012 13 CAMP CONFERENCE ORDER: Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 12/17/2012, Start Time: 3:00 PM, endorsed by Vidya Kurella, FILED.[780412] [12-4547]
November 27, 2012 11 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 11/27/2012 by CM/ECF.[779275] [12-4547]
November 27, 2012 10 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT,FORM C, [8], on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED.[778368] [12-4547]
November 26, 2012 9 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 11/26/2012 by CM/ECF.[777699] [12-4547]
November 26, 2012 8 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. Service date 11/26/2012 by CM/ECF.[777697] [12-4547]
November 14, 2012 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[772476] [12-4547]
November 14, 2012 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 10/12/2012, RECEIVED.[772474] [12-4547]
November 14, 2012 2 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/10/2012, RECEIVED.[772470] [12-4547]
November 14, 2012 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Australian Society Of Authors Limited, Authors Guild, Inc., Authors League Fund, Inc., Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society, Pat Cummings, Pat Cummins, Erik Grundstrom, Angelo Loukakis, Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening, Roxana Robinson, Helge Ronning, Andre Roy, Jack R. Salamanca, James Shapiro, James Shapiro, Daniele Simpson, Danielle Simpson, T.J. Stiles, Sveriges Forfattarforbund, Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois, Fay Weldon and Writers' Union of Canada, FILED. [772456] [12-4547]

Search for this case: Authors Guild, Inc. v. Hathitrust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Authors Guild, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Australian Society Of Authors Limited
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Union Des Ecrivaines Et Des Ecrivains Quebecois
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Pat Cummins
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Angelo Loukakis
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Roxana Robinson
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Andre Roy
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: James Shapiro
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Daniele Simpson
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: T.J. Stiles
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Fay Weldon
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Authors League Fund, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Authors' Licensing and Collecting Society
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Sveriges Forfattarforbund
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Norsk Faglitteraer Forfatter0OG Oversetterforening
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Writers' Union of Canada
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Pat Cummings
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Erik Grundstrom
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Helge Ronning
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Jack R. Salamanca
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellant: Danielle Simpson
Represented By: Edward Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Hathitrust
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Regents Of The University Of Michigan
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Board Of Regents Of The University Of Wisconsin System
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Trustees Of Indiana University
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Cornell University
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Julia Donovan Darlow
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Laurence B. Deitch
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Denise Ilitch
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Olivia P. Maynard
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Andrea Fischer Newman
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Andrew C. Richner
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: S. Martin Taylor, in his official capacity as the Regents of the University of Michigan
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Katherine E. White, in her official capacity as the Regents of the University of Michigan
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Richard C. Blum
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: David Crane
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: William De La Pena
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Russell Gould
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Eddie Island
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Odessa Johnson
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: George Kieffer
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Sherry L. Lansing
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Monica Lozano
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Hadi Makarechian
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: George M. Marcus
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Alfredo Mireles, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Norman J. Pattiz
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Bonnie Reiss
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Fred Ruiz
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Leslie Tang Schilling
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Bruce D. Varner
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Paul Wachter, in his official capacity as the Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Charlene Zettel, in his official capacity as the Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Jeffrey Bartell
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Mark J. Bradley
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Judith V. Crain
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: John Drew
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Tony Evers
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Michael J. Falbo
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Edmund Manydeeds
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Katherine Pointer
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Charles Pruitt
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Troy Sherven
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Brent Smith
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Michael J. Spector
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: S. Mark Tyler
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Jose F. Vazquez, in his official capacity as the Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: David G. Walsh, in his official capacity as the Regents of the University of Wisconsin System
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: William R. Cast
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Patrick A. Shoulders
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: MaryEllen Kiley Bishop
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Bruce Cole
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Philip N. Eskew, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Cora J. Griffin
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Thomas E. Reilly, Jr.
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Derica W. Rice, in his official capacity as the Trustee of Indiana University
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: William H. Strong, in his official capacity as the Trustee of Indiana University
Represented By: Robert Nathan Potter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: National Federation of the Blind
Represented By: Daniel Frank Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Georgina Kleege
Represented By: Daniel Frank Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Blair Seidlitz
Represented By: Daniel Frank Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant - appellee: Courtney Wheeler
Represented By: Daniel Frank Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?