Morse v. Stamps street gang
Defendant / Appellee: Patrick Antonio Napier, Ronzell Stamps, street gang and Bobby Kirven, street gangs place of employment
Plaintiff / Appellant: Lisa Morse
Case Number: 19-125
Filed: January 11, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 29 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, MOTION, for extension of time to appeal at Supreme Court of the United States due to due process not followed by ab actis, [28],[28],[28], on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2502512] [19-125] [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:46 PM]
February 21, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, for extension of time to appeal at Supreme Court of the United States due to due process not followed by ab actis, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, FILED. Service date 02/19/2019 by US mail.[2502507] [19-125] [Entered: 02/21/2019 04:42 PM]
February 12, 2019 Filing 27 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to dismiss duress and Notice of Defective Filing concerning Acknowledgment and Notice of Apperance claims of needs to properly serve, [26], on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2494657] [19-125] [Entered: 02/12/2019 10:13 AM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION, to dismiss duress and Notice of Defective Filing concercing Acknowledgment and Notice of Apperance claims of needs to properly serve, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, FILED. No service date.[2494649] [19-125] [Entered: 02/12/2019 10:11 AM]
February 11, 2019 Filing 25 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to dismiss ab actis notice of defective filing served to an incorrect address, [24], on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2494176] [19-125] [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:04 PM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 23 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D-P, [19], on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2492629] [19-125] [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:46 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 22 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [18], on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2492609] [19-125] [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:39 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 21 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to acknowledge and accept Appellant's Notice of Appeal, to proceed in forma pauperis, [17],[17], on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, FILED.[2492582] [19-125] [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:27 AM]
February 8, 2019 Filing 20 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to acknowledge and accept Appellant's Notice of Appeal, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, [17],[17], on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2492569] [19-125] [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:24 AM]
February 7, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION, to dismiss ab actis notice of defective filing served to an incorrect address, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, FILED. Service date 02/05/2019 by US mail.[2494168] [19-125] [Entered: 02/11/2019 04:02 PM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 19 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, FILED. Service date 02/04/2019 by hand delivery, US mail.[2492566] [19-125] [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:22 AM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Lisa Morse, FILED. Service date 02/04/2019 by hand delivery, US mail.[2492564] [19-125] [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:21 AM]
February 6, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION, to acknowledge and accept Appellant's Notice of Appeal, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, FILED. Service date 02/04/2019 by US mail, hand delivery.[2492559] [19-125] [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:19 AM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE, to Appellee Bobby Kirven, Patrick Antonio Napier and Ronzell Stamps, for failure to file an appearance, copy to pro se appellees, SENT.[2485652] [19-125] [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:34 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [12], on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2485635] [19-125] [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:27 PM]
January 28, 2019 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Party Lisa Morse, FILED. No service date.[2485632] [19-125] [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:26 PM]
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, dated 01/25/2019, dismissing appeal by 02/15/2019, unless Appellant Lisa Morse, submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2482740] [19-125] [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:02 PM]
January 25, 2019 Filing 9 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion, to proceed in forma pauperis, [8], on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2482324] [19-125] [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:00 AM]
January 23, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2482362] [19-125] [Entered: 01/25/2019 11:18 AM]
January 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, FILED. No service date.[2482322] [19-125] [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:58 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, to acknowledge and accept appellants notice of appeal, to retrieve supporting facts and compensation from appellants surety-bond birth certificate, [4],[4], on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2474036] [19-125] [Entered: 01/14/2019 10:18 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellees, SENT.[2474011] [19-125] [Entered: 01/14/2019 10:06 AM]
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se Appellant, SENT.[2473986] [19-125] [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:53 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION, to proceed in forma pauperis, to acknowledge and accept appellants notice of appeal, to retrieve supporting facts and compensation from appellants surety-bond birth certificate, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, FILED. Service date 01/14/2018 by US mail.[2474010] [19-125] [Entered: 01/14/2019 10:06 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 12/18/2018, RECEIVED.[2473976] [19-125] [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:47 AM]
January 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Lisa Morse, copy to pro se appellants and appellees, FILED. [2473961] [19-125] [Entered: 01/14/2019 09:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morse v. Stamps street gang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Patrick Antonio Napier
Represented By: Patrick Antonio Napier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ronzell Stamps, street gang
Represented By: Ronzell Stamps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bobby Kirven, street gangs place of employment
Represented By: Bobby Kirven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Lisa Morse
Represented By: Lisa Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?