Sullivan v. Barclays PLC
Defendant: BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, HSBC Holdings PLC, John Does 1-50, Barclays PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Citibank, N.A., Deutsche Bank, AG, HSBC Bank PLC, Citigroup, Inc., Barclays Bank PLC and DB Group Services (UK) Limited
Defendant / Appellee: The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, UBS AG, ICAP Europe Limited, Credit Agricole S.A., Societe Generale S.A., Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, Credit Agricole CIB, ICAP plc and Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, California State Teachers' Retirement System, Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., White Oak Fund LP, Stephen Sullivan, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated and FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P.
Intervenor: United States of America
Case Number: 19-1769
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System and Stephen Sullivan in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 08/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2632864] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:55 AM]
August 14, 2019 Filing 111 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [108], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FILED.[2632368] [19-1769] [Entered: 08/14/2019 03:35 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 110 ATTORNEY, Patrick Thomas Egan for Stephen Sullivan California State Teachers' Retirement System, in case 19-1769 , [108], ADDED.[2631457] [19-1769] [Entered: 08/13/2019 05:02 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 109 ATTORNEY, T. Jakob Sebrow for ICAP Europe Limited ICAP plc, in case 19-2012 T. Jakob Sebrow for ICAP Europe Limited ICAP plc, in case 19-1769 , [108], ADDED.[2631298] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/13/2019 03:47 PM]
August 13, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System and Stephen Sullivan in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 08/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2631287] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/13/2019 03:43 PM]
August 12, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 08/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2629553] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/12/2019 11:11 AM]
August 2, 2019 Filing 106 CAPTION, added Cross-Appellants and Cross-Appellees designations to all the parties on appeal, AMENDED.[2623315] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 08/02/2019 02:35 PM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 105 ATTORNEY, Peter Dexter St. Phillip Jr. for Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. Stephen Sullivan FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust White Oak Fund LP California State Teachers' Retirement System, in case 19-2012, [ # 2614619-2 ], ADDED.[2614888] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:33 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 104 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 100 ], [ # 2614619-2 ], on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, in case 19-2012, FILED.[2614886] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:32 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 103 ATTORNEY, Geoffrey M. Horn for Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust White Oak Fund LP California State Teachers' Retirement System, in case 19-2012, [ # 2614615-2 ], ADDED.[2614881] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:29 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 102 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 99 ], [ # 2614615-2 ], on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-2012, FILED.[2614875] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:27 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 101 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 98 ], [ # 2614612-2 ], on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-2012, FILED.[2614846] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/23/2019 11:19 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 100 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [97], on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-2012, FILED.[2614597] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:51 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 99 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [96], on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-2012, FILED.[2614584] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:47 AM]
July 23, 2019 Filing 98 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [95], on behalf of Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-2012, FILED.[2614561] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/23/2019 09:38 AM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2614330] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:45 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 96 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2614319] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:43 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 95 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant-Cross-Appellee California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Stephen Sullivan in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF.[2614311] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/22/2019 04:40 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 94 ATTORNEY, Andrew Hammond for Credit Agricole S.A. Credit Agricole CIB, in case 19-2012, [ # 2613969-2 ], ADDED.[2614068] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/22/2019 03:15 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 93 ATTORNEY, Stratton C. Strand, [ # 92 ], in place of attorney Benjamin H. Torrance, SUBSTITUTED.[2613886] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/22/2019 01:21 PM]
July 22, 2019 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of United States of America in 19-2012, FILED. Service date 07/22/2019 by CM/ECF. [2613779] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/22/2019 12:05 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 91 ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 19-2012, [ # 2613258-2 ], ADDED.[2613267] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:51 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 90 ATTORNEY, Tawfiq Saifee Rangwala for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 19-2012, [ # 2613254-2 ], ADDED.[2613259] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:47 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 89 ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 19-2012, [ # 2613239-2 ], ADDED.[2613252] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 04:44 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 88 ATTORNEY, Jamie Dycus for The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, in case 19-2012, [ # 2612883-2 ], ADDED.[2612897] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:37 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 87 ATTORNEY, David Sapir Lesser, [ # 2612857-2 ], in place of attorney Fraser L. Hunter in case 19-2012, SUBSTITUTED.[2612861] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 01:05 PM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 86 ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for UBS AG, in case 19-2012, [ # 2612737-2 ], ADDED.[2612746] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:52 AM]
July 19, 2019 Filing 85 CAMP ORDER, Vacating Scheduled Mediation for August 2, 2019, ENTERED.[2612379] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/19/2019 08:55 AM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 82 ATTORNEY, H. Rowan Gaither IV for ICAP Europe Limited ICAP plc, in case 19-2012, [ # 2612044-2 ], ADDED.[2612177] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 04:35 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 81 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc in 19-2012, FILED. Service date 07/18/2019 by CM/ECF.[2612031] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/18/2019 03:29 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 79 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM D, [ # 74 ], [ # 2611918-2 ], on behalf of Appellant Credit Agricole S.A. in 19-2012, FILED.[2611936] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:45 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 78 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: FORM C, [ # 73 ], [ # 2611911-2 ], on behalf of Appellant Societe Generale S.A. in 19-2012, FILED.[2611933] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:44 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 77 ATTORNEY, Andrew Calica for Societe Generale S.A., in case 19-2012, [ # 2611862-2 ], ADDED.[2611896] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:23 PM]
July 18, 2019 Filing 76 ATTORNEY, Steven Wolowitz for Societe Generale S.A., in case 19-2012, [ # 2611858-2 ], ADDED.[2611892] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:21 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 74 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form D, [68], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Societe Generale S.A. in case 19-1769, FILED.[2611006] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:32 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 73 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [67], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Societe Generale S.A. in case 19-1769, FILED.[2610992] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:27 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 72 ATTORNEY, Tawfiq Saifee Rangwala for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 19-1769, [ # 70 ], ADDED.[2610965] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:16 PM]
July 17, 2019 Filing 71 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 69 ], [ # 70 ], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED.[2610962] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/17/2019 03:15 PM]
July 16, 2019 Filing 70 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/16/2019 by CM/ECF. [2610171] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/16/2019 04:18 PM]
July 15, 2019 Filing 69 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [66], on behalf of Appellee-Cross-Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in 19-1796, FILED.[2609156] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/15/2019 04:49 PM]
July 12, 2019 Filing 68 FORM D, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A. in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2607695] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:12 PM]
July 12, 2019 Filing 67 FORM C, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A. in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2607682] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/12/2019 04:08 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 75 ATTORNEY, Nicole Saharsky, [ # 2611858-2 ], in place of attorney Steven Wolowitz, SUBSTITUTED.[2611888] [19-2012] [Entered: 07/18/2019 02:18 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A. in 19-1769, FILED. Service date 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2606489] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/11/2019 06:08 PM]
July 11, 2019 Filing 65 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. and Stephen Sullivan in 19-1769, informing Court of proposed due date 09/27/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 07/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2605537] [19-1769, 19-2012] [Entered: 07/11/2019 10:35 AM]
July 9, 2019 Filing 64 ATTORNEY, Stratton C. Strand, [ # 63 ], in place of attorney Benajmin H. Torrance, SUBSTITUTED.[2602675] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/09/2019 08:53 AM]
July 8, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of United States of America, FILED. Service date 07/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2601691] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/08/2019 11:02 AM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 60 NOTE: See lead case, 19-1769, containing complete set of docket entries.[2601074] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:59 PM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 55 CAMP ORDER, Type of Conference: Telephonic, Scheduled Date of Conference: 08/02/2019, Start Time: 2:00 PM, Required Attendees: Clients with Counsel, with Kathleen M. Scanlon, ENTERED.[2600736] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 12:17 PM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Steven Wolowitz for Societe Generale S.A., in case 19-1769, [ # 51 ], ADDED.[2600534] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:00 AM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 53 ATTORNEY, Andrew Calica for Societe Generale S.A., in case 19-1769, [ # 50 ], ADDED.[2600532] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:59 AM]
July 3, 2019 Filing 52 ATTORNEY, Nicole A. Saharsky, [ # 49 ], in place of attorney Andrew Calica, SUBSTITUTED.[2600529] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 10:58 AM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF. [2600029] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 04:49 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF. [2600020] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 04:42 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF. [2600000] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 04:37 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 48 ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for UBS AG, in case 19-1769, [ # 41 ], ADDED.[2599681] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:55 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 47 ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 19-1769, [ # 40 ], ADDED.[2599675] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:53 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 46 CURED DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 45 ], [ # 40 ], on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED.[2599670] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:52 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 45 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance for Additional Counsel, [30], on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED.[2599664] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:48 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 19-1769, [ # 39 ], ADDED.[2599655] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:46 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 43 CAPTION, changed the name for Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A. to Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., per the Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance [ # 38 ], filed on 07/02/2019, AMENDED.[2599640] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:43 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 42 ATTORNEY, H. Rowan Gaither IV for ICAP Europe Limited ICAP plc, in case 19-1769, [ # 37 ], ADDED.[2599622] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 02:35 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF. [2599418] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 12:27 PM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleebank B.A., FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF. [2599062] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:15 AM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleebank B.A., FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF. [2599054] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:13 AM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 38 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleebank B.A., FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF.[2599047] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:10 AM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc, FILED. Service date 07/02/2019 by CM/ECF. [2599033] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 10:06 AM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 36 ATTORNEY, Jamie Dycus for The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, in case 19-1769, [ # 32 ], ADDED.[2598886] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 09:21 AM]
July 2, 2019 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, David R. Gelfand, [ # 29 ], in place of attorney Mark D. Villaverde, SUBSTITUTED.[2598868] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/02/2019 09:12 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2598772] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 06:35 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 31 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2598769] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 06:31 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2598766] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 06:28 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2598753] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 05:58 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 28 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2598629] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 04:32 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, Kimberly Haviv for Credit Agricole S.A. Credit Agricole CIB, in case 19-1769, [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2598465] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 03:20 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole S.A. and Credit Agricole CIB, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2598436] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 03:09 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole CIB and Credit Agricole S.A., FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2598426] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 03:07 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 23 ATTORNEY, Andrew W. Hammond, [ # 22 ], in place of attorney Kimberly A. Haviv, SUBSTITUTED.[2598384] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 02:43 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole S.A. and Credit Agricole CIB, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF. [2598373] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 02:37 PM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee ICAP Europe Limited and ICAP plc, FILED. Service date 07/01/2019 by CM/ECF.[2597921] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 10:22 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY, Peter Dexter St. Phillip Jr. for Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. Stephen Sullivan FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust White Oak Fund LP California State Teachers' Retirement System, in case 19-1769, [ # 13 ], ADDED.[2597753] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 08:39 AM]
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Geoffrey M. Horn for Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. Stephen Sullivan FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P. FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust White Oak Fund LP California State Teachers' Retirement System, in case 19-1769, [ # 12 ], ADDED.[2597750] [19-1769] [Entered: 07/01/2019 08:36 AM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 59 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2601069] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:58 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 58 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole CIB, Credit Agricole S.A., ICAP Europe Limited, ICAP plc, Societe Generale S.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC and UBS AG in 19-2012, district court receipt # BNYSDC-17164578, FILED.[2601067] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:57 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 57 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 02/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2601062] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:55 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF CIVIL CROSS APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Agricole CIB, Credit Agricole S.A., ICAP Europe Limited, ICAP plc, Societe Generale S.A., The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC and UBS AG in 19-2012, FILED. [2601056] [19-2012, 19-1769] [Entered: 07/03/2019 02:53 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, FILED. Service date 06/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2597707] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/28/2019 09:33 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. Service date 06/28/2019 by US mail. [2597705] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/28/2019 09:14 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. Service date 06/28/2019 by US mail.[2597704] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/28/2019 08:58 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. Service date 06/28/2019 by CM/ECF. [2597693] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:18 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. Service date 06/28/2019 by CM/ECF. [2597692] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:16 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. Service date 06/28/2019 by CM/ECF.[2597691] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:13 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. Service date 06/28/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2597689] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:11 PM]
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. Service date 06/28/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2597688] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/28/2019 06:07 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2589768] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/18/2019 05:10 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17093413, FILED.[2589767] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/18/2019 05:09 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/17/2017, RECEIVED.[2589762] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/18/2019 05:08 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 04/17/2017, RECEIVED.[2589760] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/18/2019 05:07 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 02/21/2017, RECEIVED.[2589757] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/18/2019 05:06 PM]
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant California State Teachers' Retirement System, FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust, FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., Stephen Sullivan and White Oak Fund LP, FILED. [2589751] [19-1769] [Entered: 06/18/2019 05:02 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan v. Barclays PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UBS AG
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Jefferson E. Bell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICAP Europe Limited
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Agricole S.A.
Represented By: Kimberly Haviv Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Societe Generale S.A.
Represented By: Andrew Calica Esq.
Represented By: Steven Wolowitz
Represented By: Nicole A. Saharsky Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen Boerenleenbank B.A
Represented By: Mark D. Villaverde Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Agricole CIB
Represented By: Kimberly Haviv Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICAP plc
Represented By: Shari A. Brandt Esq.
Represented By: H. Rowan Gaither Esq. IV
Represented By: T. Jakob Sebrow Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.
Represented By: Mark D. Villaverde Esq.
Represented By: Tawfiq Saifee Rangwala Esq.
Represented By: Robert Charles Hora Esq.
Represented By: David R. Gelfand Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank, AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Group Services (UK) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FrontPoint Australian Opportunities Trust
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Lovell Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: California State Teachers' Retirement System
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Lovell Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Egan
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Lovell Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: White Oak Fund LP
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Lovell Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Stephen Sullivan, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Lovell Esq.
Represented By: Patrick Thomas Egan
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FrontPoint Partners Trading Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Lovell Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Horn Esq.
Represented By: Peter Dexter St. Phillip Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin H. Torrance
Represented By: Stratton Christopher Strand Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?