FrontPoint Asian Event Driven v. Citibank, N.A.
Plaintiff: FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P., Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. and FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, Ltd.
Defendant: John Does, Nos. 1-50, Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Inc., JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, as assignee and successor-in-interest to FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund L.P., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated,
Defendant / Appellee: DBS Bank Ltd., UBS AG, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Deutsche Bank AG, Credit Suisse International, Bank of America, N.A., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., RBS Securities Japan Limited, UOB Global Capital, LLC, HSBC USA Inc., Credit Agricole S.A., Royal Bank of Scotland plc, Standard Chartered Bank, Macquarie Bank Ltd., Barclays Capital Inc., Standard Chartered PLC, ING Bank N.V., Barclays Bank PLC, United Overseas Bank Limited, HSBC Holdings PLC, The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, ING Capital Markets LLC, The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, BNP Paribas North America, Inc., UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd., Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Ltd., Barclays PLC, BNP Paribas Prime Brokerage, Inc., DBS Group Holdings Ltd., HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Bank of America Corporation, Credit Suisse Group AG, BNP Paribas, S.A., DBS Vickers Securities (USA) Inc., Commerzbank AG, Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., Credit Suisse AG, ANZ Securities, Inc., Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Ltd., Macquarie Group Ltd., ING Groep NV and The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Case Number: 19-2719
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Filing 115 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD. Brief due date as 11/22/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 11/22/2019, FILED.[2677620] [19-2719] [Entered: 10/10/2019 04:18 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 113 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC and Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., informing Court of proposed due date 11/22/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 10/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2677554] [19-2719] [Entered: 10/10/2019 03:58 PM]
October 10, 2019 Filing 112 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to remove case from the expedited appeals calendar, [ # 108 ], filed by Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse International, by RKW, FILED. [2677374][112] [19-2719] [Entered: 10/10/2019 02:33 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 108 MOTION, requesting case be removed from the expedited appeal calendar, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 10/03/2019 by CM/ECF. [2671568] [19-2719]--[Edited 10/03/2019 by EC] [Entered: 10/03/2019 02:33 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 107 ATTORNEY, Noah Saul Czarny for United Overseas Bank Limited, in case 19-2719 , [ # 106 ], ADDED.[2671374] [19-2719] [Entered: 10/03/2019 12:10 PM]
October 3, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee United Overseas Bank Limited, FILED. Service date 10/03/2019 by CM/ECF. [2671363] [19-2719] [Entered: 10/03/2019 12:05 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 104 ATTORNEY, Gary W. Kubek for DBS Bank Ltd. DBS Group Holdings Ltd. DBS Vickers Securities (USA) Inc., in case 19-2719 , [ # 103 ], ADDED.[2660567] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/20/2019 12:26 PM]
September 20, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee DBS Bank Ltd., DBS Group Holdings Ltd. and DBS Vickers Securities (USA) Inc., FILED. Service date 09/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2660543] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/20/2019 12:20 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 101 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellant's brief due date as 10/18/2019, appellee's brief due date as 11/22/2019,TRANSMITTED.[2655045] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:18 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 100 NEW CASE MANAGER, Evelyn Cruz, ASSIGNED.[2655037] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/13/2019 12:12 PM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 97 ATTORNEY, Eric F. Citron for Appellant Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD., and Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, in case 19-2719, [ # 95 ], ADDED.[2654954] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:25 AM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 96 CAPTION, to add Sonterra Capital Master Fund, Ltd. as Appellant per [ # 94 ], AMENDED.[2654949] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/13/2019 11:23 AM]
September 13, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, FILED. Service date 09/13/2019 by CM/ECF. [2654649] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/13/2019 09:11 AM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 94 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, FILED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF.[2654462] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/12/2019 04:55 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 93 ATTORNEY, Eric Jonathan Stock for Appellee UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd., and UBS AG, in case 19-2719, [ # 91 ], ADDED.[2654315] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:53 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 92 ATTORNEY, Mark A. Kirsch for Appellee UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd., and UBS AG, in case 19-2719, [ # 90 ], ADDED.[2654309] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:52 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2654259] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:29 PM]
September 12, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2654187] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/12/2019 03:06 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 89 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [ # 47 ], [ # 87 ], on behalf of Appellee Commerzbank AG, FILED.[2653208] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:59 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 88 ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Appellee Commerzbank AG, in case 19-2719, [ # 87 ], ADDED.[2653204] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:58 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Commerzbank AG, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2653097] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:15 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 86 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Commerzbank AG, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2653086] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 04:10 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 85 ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Appellee Standard Chartered PLC and Standard Chartered Bank, in case 19-2719, [ # 78 ], ADDED.[2653051] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:57 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 84 ATTORNEY, Erica Weisgerber, [ # 77 ], in place of attorney Catherin Fairley Spillman, SUBSTITUTED.[2653043] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:56 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 83 ATTORNEY, Lisa J Fried for Appellee Standard Chartered PLC and Standard Chartered Bank, in case 19-2719, [ # 76 ], ADDED.[2653032] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:53 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 82 ATTORNEY, Nowell Bamberger for Appellee HSBC USA Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A,. HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., and The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, in case 19-2719, [ # 75 ], ADDED.[2653023] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:51 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 81 ATTORNEY, Leigh Nathanson for Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., and Barclays PLC, in case 19-2719, [ # 72 ], ADDED.[2653011] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:49 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 80 ATTORNEY, Christopher Emmanuel Duffy for Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., and Barclays PLC, in case 19-2719, [ # 71 ], ADDED.[2653003] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:47 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 79 ATTORNEY, David R. Gelfand, [ # 69 ], in place of attorney Mark D. Villaverde, SUBSTITUTED.[2652992] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:45 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 78 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank and Standard Chartered PLC, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2652876] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:13 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee DBS Bank Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2652870] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:11 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank and Standard Chartered PLC, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2652869] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 03:11 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc. and HSBC USA Inc., FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2652839] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:40 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 74 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Standard Chartered Bank and Standard Chartered PLC, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2652838] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 02:39 PM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 73 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee ING Bank N.V., ING Capital Markets LLC and ING Groep NV, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2652591] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:56 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2652478] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:24 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2652470] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:20 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 70 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2652451] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 11:15 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Commerzbank AG, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF. [2652314] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 10:24 AM]
September 11, 2019 Filing 68 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 09/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2652228] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/11/2019 10:00 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 64 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UOB Global Capital, LLC, FILED. Service date 09/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2651438] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:41 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 63 CAPTION, to conform with party changes per, [ # 61 ], AMENDED.[2651396] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:15 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 62 CAPTION, to conform with party changes per [ # 60 ], AMENDED.[2651382] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:10 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 61 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., informing the court they will not be participating with the appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 09/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2651377] [19-2719]--[Edited 09/10/2019 by HT] [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:05 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 60 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase & Co., informing the court they will not be participating with the appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 09/10/2019 by CM/ECF.[2651363] [19-2719]--[Edited 09/10/2019 by HT] [Entered: 09/10/2019 12:00 PM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 59 ATTORNEY, Corey Omer for Appellee Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Ltd., and ANZ Securities, Inc., in case 19-2719, [ # 38 ], ADDED.[2651278] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:13 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 58 ATTORNEY, Amanda Flug Davidoff, [ # 35 ], in place of attorney Joel Kurtzberg, SUBSTITUTED.[2651274] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:11 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 57 ATTORNEY, Adam Gabor Mehes for Appellee Bank of America Corporation, and Bank of America, N.A., in case 19-2719, [ # 34 ], ADDED.[2651271] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:10 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 56 ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin for Appellee Bank of America Corporation, and Bank of America, N.A., in case 19-2719, [ # 33 ], ADDED.[2651268] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:08 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 55 ATTORNEY, Charity E. Lee for Appellee HSBC USA Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., and The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, in case 19-2719, [ # 31 ], ADDED.[2651266] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:07 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Hallie S. Goldblatt for Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, in case 19-2719, [ # 28 ], ADDED.[2651262] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:04 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 53 ATTORNEY, Lauren Perlgut for Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 19-2719, [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2651259] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:03 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 52 ATTORNEY, Jason M. Hall for Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 19-2719, [ # 25 ], ADDED.[2651257] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:01 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 51 ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 19-2719, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2651255] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 11:00 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 50 ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 19-2719, [ # 23 ], ADDED.[2651251] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:58 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 49 ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse International, and Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 19-2719, [ # 21 ], ADDED.[2651241] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:55 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 48 ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [ # 20 ], in place of attorney Adam Mintz, SUBSTITUTED.[2651233] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:51 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 47 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [19], on behalf of Appellee Commerzbank AG, FILED.[2651163] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:18 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 46 ATTORNEY, Jamie Dycus for Appellee The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland plc, and RBS Securities Japan Limited, in case 19-2719, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2651156] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:16 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 45 ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Cassady for Appellee Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., in case 19-2719, [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2651150] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:14 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 40 ATTORNEY, Pratik A. Shah for Appellee Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Ltd., in case 19-2719, [ # 9 ], ADDED.[2651127] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:09 AM]
September 10, 2019 Filing 39 ATTORNEY, Kimberly Anne Havlin for Appellee Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank Credit Agricole S.A., in case 19-2719, [ # 7 ], ADDED.[2651119] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:07 AM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee ANZ Securities, Inc. and Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650936] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 11:36 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 37 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee ANZ Securities, Inc. and Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650935] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 11:33 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 36 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG and UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650929] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:25 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee ING Bank N.V., ING Capital Markets LLC and ING Groep NV, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650927] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:07 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650924] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:03 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650923] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 09:00 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 32 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650922] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 08:58 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC USA Inc. and The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650921] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 08:49 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 30 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., HSBC USA Inc. and The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650920] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 08:36 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 29 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee DBS Group Holdings Ltd. and DBS Vickers Securities (USA) Inc., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650919] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 08:31 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650916] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 08:17 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 27 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650915] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 08:14 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650898] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:19 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650897] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:18 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650896] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:16 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650894] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:14 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Macquarie Bank Ltd. and Macquarie Group Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650892] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:12 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650890] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:10 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse International, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650886] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 06:02 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Commerzbank AG, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650880] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 05:34 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Commerzbank AG, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650877] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 05:30 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Scotland plc, RBS Securities Japan Limited and The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650845] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 05:04 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 16 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee RBS Securities Japan Limited, Royal Bank of Scotland plc and The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650834] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:56 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2650778] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:36 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650750] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 04:28 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas, S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., BNP Paribas Prime Brokerage, Inc. and BNP Paribas North America, Inc., FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650588] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 03:35 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650442] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:26 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 11 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, FILED. Service date 09/09/2019 by CM/ECF.[2650440] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 02:24 PM]
September 9, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY, Joel Laurence Kurtzberg, [ # 1 ], in place of attorney Karen Patton Seymour, SUBSTITUTED.[2650002] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/09/2019 10:34 AM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/06/2019 by CM/ECF, email. [2649793] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/06/2019 07:19 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Ltd., FILED. Service date 09/06/2019 by CM/ECF, email.[2649792] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/06/2019 07:17 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole S.A. and Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, FILED. Service date 09/06/2019 by CM/ECF. [2649789] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/06/2019 07:00 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank and Credit Agricole S.A., FILED. Service date 09/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2649788] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/06/2019 06:57 PM]
September 6, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee United Overseas Bank Limited, FILED. Service date 09/06/2019 by CM/ECF.[2649325] [19-2719] [Entered: 09/06/2019 03:02 PM]
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17490913, FILED.[2643777] [19-2719] [Entered: 08/29/2019 12:28 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2643775] [19-2719] [Entered: 08/29/2019 12:26 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT OPINION, dated 07/26/2019, RECEIVED.[2643773] [19-2719] [Entered: 08/29/2019 12:25 PM]
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, FILED. [2643770] [19-2719] [Entered: 08/29/2019 12:23 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FrontPoint Asian Event Driven v. Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fund Liquidation Holdings LLC, as assignee and successor-in-interest to FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund L.P., on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated,
Represented By: Vincent Briganti Esq.
Represented By: Eric F. Citron Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does, Nos. 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DBS Bank Ltd.
Represented By: Catherine Fairley Spillman Esq.
Represented By: Erica Weisgerber Esq.
Represented By: Gary W. Kubek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UBS AG
Represented By: Jefferson E. Bell Esq.
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Mark A. Kirsch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Jayant W. Tambe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank
Represented By: Andrew Hammond
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Havlin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Aidan Synnott Esq.
Represented By: Hallie S. Goldblatt Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Suisse International
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Represented By: Jason M. Hall Esq.
Represented By: Lauren Perlgut Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin Esq.
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Lewis J. Liman
Represented By: Charity E. Lee Esq.
Represented By: Nowell Bamberger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RBS Securities Japan Limited
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UOB Global Capital, LLC
Represented By: Dale C. Christensen Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC USA Inc.
Represented By: Lewis J. Liman
Represented By: Charity E. Lee Esq.
Represented By: Nowell Bamberger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Agricole S.A.
Represented By: Andrew Hammond
Represented By: Kimberly Anne Havlin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Royal Bank of Scotland plc
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Standard Chartered Bank
Represented By: Marc J. Gottridge Esq.
Represented By: Lisa J. Fried
Represented By: Benjamin Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Macquarie Bank Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Martin Paparella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Schiller
Represented By: Christopher Emmanuel Duffy
Represented By: Leigh Nathanson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Standard Chartered PLC
Represented By: Marc J. Gottridge Esq.
Represented By: Lisa J. Fried
Represented By: Benjamin Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ING Bank N.V.
Represented By: Karen Patton Seymour
Represented By: Amanda Flug Davidoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Schiller
Represented By: Christopher Emmanuel Duffy
Represented By: Leigh Nathanson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: United Overseas Bank Limited
Represented By: Dale C. Christensen Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Noah Saul Czarny Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC Holdings PLC
Represented By: Lewis J. Liman
Represented By: Charity E. Lee Esq.
Represented By: Nowell Bamberger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited
Represented By: Lewis J. Liman
Represented By: Charity E. Lee Esq.
Represented By: Nowell Bamberger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ING Capital Markets LLC
Represented By: Karen Patton Seymour
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Represented By: Amanda Flug Davidoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BNP Paribas North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jayant W. Tambe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UBS Securities Japan Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Jefferson E. Bell Esq.
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Mark A. Kirsch Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Oversea-Chinese Banking Corporation Ltd.
Represented By: Catherine Fairley Spillman Esq.
Represented By: Pratik A. Shah Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barclays PLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Schiller
Represented By: Christopher Emmanuel Duffy
Represented By: Leigh Nathanson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BNP Paribas Prime Brokerage, Inc.
Represented By: Jayant W. Tambe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DBS Group Holdings Ltd.
Represented By: Erica Weisgerber Esq.
Represented By: Gary W. Kubek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC North America Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Lewis J. Liman
Represented By: Charity E. Lee Esq.
Represented By: Nowell Bamberger Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin Esq.
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Represented By: Jason M. Hall Esq.
Represented By: Lauren Perlgut Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BNP Paribas, S.A.
Represented By: Jayant W. Tambe Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DBS Vickers Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Erica Weisgerber Esq.
Represented By: Gary W. Kubek Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Commerzbank AG
Represented By: Mark D. Villaverde Esq.
Represented By: David R. Gelfand Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ, Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Cassady Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Suisse AG
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Represented By: Jason M. Hall Esq.
Represented By: Lauren Perlgut Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANZ Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Penny Shane
Represented By: Corey Omer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Australia and New Zealand Banking Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Penny Shane
Represented By: Corey Omer Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Macquarie Group Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher Martin Paparella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ING Groep NV
Represented By: Karen Patton Seymour
Represented By: Amanda Flug Davidoff Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonterra Capital Master Fund, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FrontPoint Asian Event Driven Fund, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?