In re Payment Card Interchange
Plaintiff: QVC, Inc., Fryingpan River Ranch, LLC, Big Cedar, LLC, Plaintiffs in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Mastercard Incorporated et al 06-cv-2534 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in Delta Airlines Inc et all v. Visa Inc et al, 1:13-cv-04766-JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action The Kroger Co., et al. v. MasterCard Inc., et al., 06-cv-0039 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action 518 Restaurant Corp. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5884 JG-JO, Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Lombardo Bros., Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-5882 JG-JO, Motel 6 Operating LP, Plaintiffs in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO, Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc., G6 Hospitality LLC, DSW Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3924 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Fitlife Health Systems of Arcadia, Inc. v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-5153 JG-JO, Keith Superstores, BKS, INC., BKS of LA, Inc. d/b/a KEITH SUPERSTORES, and KEITHCO PETROLEUM, INC., Robersons Fine Jewlery, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-CV-5069 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in Target Corporation, et al. v. Visa Inc., et al., 13-cv-03477, Minnesota Twins LLC, Plaintiffs in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4728-JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action BKS. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-2264-JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv- 4799 JG-JO, Jacksons Food Stores, Inc./PacWest Energy LLC, Tobacco Plus, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG-JO, Gielen Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiffs in Civil Action Target Corporation, et al. v. Visa Inc. et al., 13-cv-4442, Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC, Plaintiffs in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974 JG-JO, BPIP, LLC, Plaintiffs in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO, BPS Direct, LLC, GMRI, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3925-JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2532 JG-JO, Kum & Go, L.C., National Community Pharmacists Association, Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO, Jetblue Airways Corporation, Sheetz, Inc., Manheim Inc., Cox Communications, Inc., D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action JGSA, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5885 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Lee et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-3800 JG-JO, National Restaurant Association, Furniture Row BC, Inc., Bass Pro Group, LLC, Plaintiffs in civil action Dr. Roy Hyman, et al v. Visa International Service Association, Inc., et al . 05-cv-5866 JG-JO, Sunoco, Inc. (RM), Plaintiffs in Civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5074 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Leeber Cohen, M.D. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5878 JG-JO, Google, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076 JG JO, The Pantry, Inc., Cox Media Group, Inc., National Cooperative Grocers Association, Susser Holdings Corporation, Plaintiffs in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5073 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in Civil Action 7-Eleven Inc., et al. v. Visa Inc. et al, 1:13-cv-05746-JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Performance Labs, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5869 JG-JO, E-Z Mart Stores, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG-JO, Payless Shoe Source, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action LDC, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5871 JG-JO, Keithco Petroleum, Inc., BKS, INC., BKS of LA, Inc. d/b/a KEITH SUPERSTORES, and KEITHCO PETROLEUM, INC., Affiliated Foods Midwest, NATSO, Incorporated, Google Payment Corporation, Crystal Rock LLC, Plaintiffs in civil action G.E.S. Bakery, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5879 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081JG JO, Coborn's Incorporated, Plaintiffs in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5075 JG-JO, Cox Enterprises, Inc., Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Fringe, Inc. v. Visa, U.S.A., Inc et al 05-cv-4194 JG-JO, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Plaintiffs in civil action Gulfside Casino Partnership. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-03225 JG-JO, American Sportsman Holdings Co., Plaintiffs in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677 - JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action 06-cv-5583, Esdacy, INC. v. Visa USA, INC. et al, Plaintiffs in civil action Connecticut Food Association, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5880 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO, Plaintiffs in civil action Abdallah Bishara, etc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5883 JG-JO, Rice Palace, Inc. and Plaintiffs in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131-JG-JO
Defendant: Jonbro, Durango Natural Foods, Defendants in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05--cv-4728 JG-JO, First National Bank of Omaha, Wells Fargo & Company, Discover, HSBC Holdings PLC, Defendants in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO, Sears Holdings Management Corporation, Barclays Financial Corp., Capital One Financial Corporation, Defendants in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 -JG-JO, Daviss Donuts and Deli, Defendants in civil action G.E.S. Bakery, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc,. et al. 05-cv-5879 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Performace Labs, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al 05-cv-5869 JG-JO, Top Gun Wrecker, PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., Washington Mutual, Inc., Defendants in civil action Gulfside Casino Partnership. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-03225 JG-JO, SunTrust Bank Holding Company, Premier Enterprises Group, Defendants in civil action Leeber Cohen, M.D. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5878 JG-JO, FIA Card Services, N.A., Defendants in civil action Fringe, Inc. v. Visa, U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4194 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG -JO, Suntrust Banks Inc, Visa Europe Services Inc., Defendants in civil action The Kroger Co., et al. v. MasterCard Inc., et al., 06-cv-0039 JG-JO, BA Merchant Services LLC, FKA National Processing, Inc., SunTrust Bank, Defendants in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG -JO, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Dennis D Gibson, Defendants in civil actionNational Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO, Barclays Bank PLC, Defendants in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO, National City Corporation, JPMorgan Chase & Co., Discover Financial Services, Defendants in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4799- JG-JO, HSBC North America Holdings Inc., Defendants in civil action Photos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071-JG-JO, Capital One Bank, (USA), N.A., Defendants in civil action LDC, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5871 JG-JO, Newport European Motorcars, Ltd. Newport Beach, California, Newport European Motorcars, Ltd. Newport Beach, California, JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., River Valley Market, LLC, Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC, Defendants iin civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG -JO, Refund Recovery Services, LLC, Defendants in civil action JGSA, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5885, Defendants in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677-JG-JO, Bank of America, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, Defendants in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076-JG-JO, Wachovia Corporation, Defendants in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5073-JG-JO, Defendants in civil action 06-cv-5583, Esdacy, INC. v. Visa USA, INC. et al, Electronic Payment Systems, LLC, LAJ, Inc., DBA Grapevine Wines an Spirits, Capital One, F.S.B., Defendants in civil action Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-03925 JG-JO, Citibank, N.A., Defendants in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO, Ragland Bros. Retail Cos., Inc., Citibank (South Dakota), N.A., Defendants in civil case Fitlife Health Systems of Arcadia, Inc. v. Mastercard International Incorporated et a 05-cv-5153 JG -JO, Defendants in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S. A, Inc. et al, 05-cv-3924 JG-JO, Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC, Defendants in civil action Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO, Wachovia Bank, National Association, Juniper Financial Corporation, Paymentech, LLC, NJ Applebee's (Paramus), Visa U.S.A. Inc., Defendants in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974-JG-JO, Citigroup Inc., Lane Courkamp, National City Bank of Kentucky, Defendants in civil action Lombardo Bros., Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5882 JG-JO, Visa Inc., Bass Pro Shops White River Conference and Education Center, LLC, Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A., Defendants in civil action Abdallah Bishara, etc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5883 JG-JO, Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc., Defendants in civil action Dr. Roy Hyman, et al. v. Visa International Service Association, Inc., et al. 05-cv-5866, Bank of America Corporation, Defendants in civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5074-JG-JO, The Real Good Fashion Store, Inc., Mastercard Incorporated, Visa Europe Limited, Landers Harley-Davidson Little Rock, Defendants in civil action 518 Restaurant Corp. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., et al. 05-cv-5884 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO, MBNA America Bank, N.A., Defendants in civil action Lee et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-03800, Fifth Third Bancorp, Defendants in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2534 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO, Enterprise Holdings, Inc., Bishop, DBA Hat & Gown, ABP Corporation, Defendants in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131 JG-JO, Chase Bank USA, N.A., Visa International Service Association, Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO, Barclays Bank Delaware, Defendants in civil action BKS. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-2264-JG-JO, Capital One Bank, Defendants in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5069-JG-JO, Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc., Class Action Recovery Service, HSBC North America Holdings, Inc, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Defendants in civil action Connecticut Food Association, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5880 JG-JO, Orange County Bldg Materials, Defendants in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2532 JG-JO, Defendants in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO and Defendants in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO
Plaintiff / Appellee: Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Traditions, Ltd., Leons Transmission Service, Inc. and CHS Inc.
Appellant: Jack Rabbit LLC, Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc., DBA Cahaba Heights Chevron, Pets USA LLC, Quincy Woodrights, LLC, Midwest Petroleum Company, Falls Auto Gallery, DBA Falls Car Collection, Slidell Oil Company, LLC, R & M Objectors, Gnarlywood LLC, National Association of Shell Marketers, Inc., Petroleum Marketers Association of America, Kevan McLaughlin and Society of Independent Gasoline Marketers of America
Plaintiff / Appellant: Fikes Wholesale, Inc.
Defendant / Appellee: Mastercard International Incorporated
Case Number: 19-4065
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 134 CURED DEFECTIVE LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification and Form C, [ # 2770641-2 ], [ # 2771259-2 ], on behalf of Appellants Pets USA LLC and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc., FILED.[2771655] [20-343] [Entered: 02/06/2020 11:28 AM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 133 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 2771235-2 ], on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery, FILED.[2771627] [20-340] [Entered: 02/06/2020 11:14 AM]
February 6, 2020 Filing 128 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2771511] [20-344] [Entered: 02/06/2020 10:21 AM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 125 CURED DEFECTIVE Form C, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification and Certificate of Service, [ # 2770557-2 ], [ # 2770575-2 ], [ # 2770590-2 ], on behalf of Appellants Gnarlywood LLC and Quincy Woodrights, LLC, FILED.[2771190] [20-341] [Entered: 02/05/2020 05:03 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 124 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 2770650-2 ], on behalf of Appellants Pets USA LLC and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc., FILED.[2771185] [20-343] [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:57 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 123 CURED DEFECTIVE Form C, Form D, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [ # 2771121-2 ], [ # 2761907-2 ], [ # 2771132-2 ], on behalf of Appellant R & M Objectors, FILED.[2771157] [20-304] [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:44 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 122 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [ # 121 ], on behalf of Appellees BA Merchant Services LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and FIA Card Services, N.A., FILED.[2771150] [19-4065] [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:39 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 121 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee BA Merchant Services LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and FIA Card Services, N.A., FILED. Service date 02/05/2020 by CM/ECF. [2771114] [19-4065] [Entered: 02/05/2020 04:22 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 119 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [ # 97 ], on behalf of Appellees BA Merchant Services LLC, Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A. and FIA Card Services, N.A., FILED.[2770842] [19-4065] [Entered: 02/05/2020 02:05 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 118 CURED DEFECTIVE Form C, [ # 2768618-2 ], on behalf of Appellants Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED.[2770765] [20-339] [Entered: 02/05/2020 01:23 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 117 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [ # 98 ], on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery, FILED.[2770718] [20-340] [Entered: 02/05/2020 12:51 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 116 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [ # 2766229-2 ], on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery, FILED.[2770704] [20-340] [Entered: 02/05/2020 12:44 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 115 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 2766227-2 ], on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery, FILED.[2770690] [20-340] [Entered: 02/05/2020 12:37 PM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 114 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification and Certificate of Service, [109], [110], on behalf of Appellants Gnarlywood LLC and Quincy Woodrights, LLC, FILED.[2770452] [20-341] [Entered: 02/05/2020 11:02 AM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 113 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 2770064-2 ], on behalf of Appellants Gnarlywood LLC and Quincy Woodrights, LLC, FILED.[2770441] [20-341] [Entered: 02/05/2020 10:57 AM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 112 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [ # 96 ], on behalf of Appellants Pets USA LLC and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc., FILED.[2770427] [20-343] [Entered: 02/05/2020 10:50 AM]
February 5, 2020 Filing 111 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 2764599-2 ], on behalf of Appellants Pets USA LLC and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc., FILED.[2770416] [20-343] [Entered: 02/05/2020 10:45 AM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 110 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Form C (with attachments), Form D, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, and Scheduling Notification Letter (Local Rule 31.2), on behalf of Appellant Gnarlywood LLC and Quincy Woodrights, LLC in 20-341, 19-4065, FILED. Service date 02/04/2020 by email.[2770077] [20-341, 19-4065, 20-304, 20-339, 20-340, 20-342, 20-343, 20-344] [Entered: 02/04/2020 06:08 PM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 109 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Gnarlywood LLC and Quincy Woodrights, LLC in 20-341, 19-4065, informing Court of proposed due date 05/04/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 02/04/2020 by email.[2770075] [20-341, 19-4065, 20-304, 20-339, 20-340, 20-342, 20-343, 20-344] [Entered: 02/04/2020 06:02 PM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 108 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mastercard Incorporated and Mastercard International Incorporated, FILED. Service date 02/04/2020 by CM/ECF.[2769872] [19-4065] [Entered: 02/04/2020 04:03 PM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 107 ATTORNEY, Kannon K. Shanmugam for Mastercard International Incorporated, in case 19-4065, [ # 105 ], ADDED.[2769782] [19-4065] [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:38 PM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 106 ATTORNEY, Kannon K. Shanmugam, [ # 105 ], in place of attorney Justin Anderson, SUBSTITUTED.[2769773] [19-4065] [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:36 PM]
February 4, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mastercard Incorporated and Mastercard International Incorporated, FILED. Service date 02/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2769730] [19-4065] [Entered: 02/04/2020 03:22 PM]
February 3, 2020 Filing 104 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, LR 31.2 Scheduling Notification, [ # 93 ], on behalf of Appellant R & M Objectors, FILED.[2767590] [20-304] [Entered: 02/03/2020 09:08 AM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 103 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 2766518-2 ], on behalf of Appellants Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED.[2766831] [20-339] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:04 PM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 102 CURED DEFECTIVE Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [ # 2766437-2 ], on behalf of Appellants Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED.[2766821] [20-339] [Entered: 01/31/2020 01:01 PM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 101 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of Appearance as Substitute Counsel, [ # 95 ], on behalf of Appellants Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED.[2766809] [20-339] [Entered: 01/31/2020 12:56 PM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 100 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC, FILED. Service date 01/31/2020 by CM/ECF.[2766679] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/31/2020 11:53 AM]
January 31, 2020 Filing 99 ATTORNEY, N. Albert Bacharach Jr. for Jack Rabbit LLC and Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc., in case 20-339, [ # 2766437-2 ], ADDED.[2766451] [20-339] [Entered: 01/31/2020 10:08 AM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 98 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Falls Auto Gallery in 20-340, 19-4065, informing Court of proposed due date 04/30/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 01/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2766231] [20-340, 19-4065, 20-304, 20-339, 20-341, 20-342, 20-343, 20-344] [Entered: 01/30/2020 08:49 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 97 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of -- BA Merchant Services LLC, FIA Card Services, N.A. and Appellee Bank of America Corporation and Bank of America, N.A. in 19-4065, 20-304, 20-339, 20-340, 20-341, 20-342, 20-343, 20-344, FILED. Service date 01/30/2020 by CM/ECF. [2766221] [19-4065, 20-304, 20-339, 20-340, 20-341, 20-342, 20-343, 20-344] [Entered: 01/30/2020 06:19 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 96 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Pets USA LLC and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc. in 20-343, 19-4065, informing Court of proposed due date 04/30/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 01/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2766213] [20-343, 19-4065, 20-304, 20-339, 20-340, 20-341, 20-342, 20-344] [Entered: 01/30/2020 06:07 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 95 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Jack Rabbit LLC and Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. in 20-339, 19-4065, FILED. Service date 01/30/2020 by CM/ECF. [2766206] [20-339, 19-4065, 20-304, 20-340, 20-341, 20-342, 20-343, 20-344] [Entered: 01/30/2020 05:58 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 94 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [ # 2764988-2 ], on behalf of Appellants Pets USA LLC and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc., FILED.[2765696] [20-343] [Entered: 01/30/2020 01:32 PM]
January 30, 2020 Filing 93 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant R & M Objectors in 20-304, 19-4065, informing Court of proposed due date 04/20/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 01/30/2020 by CM/ECF.[2765488] [20-304, 19-4065, 20-339, 20-340, 20-341, 20-342, 20-343, 20-344] [Entered: 01/30/2020 11:34 AM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 91 ATTORNEY, Conor Michael Shaffer for PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 87 ], ADDED.[2764765] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/29/2020 03:31 PM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 90 ATTORNEY, Michelle Ann Mantine for PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 86 ], ADDED.[2764757] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/29/2020 03:29 PM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 89 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C, [ # 2761666-2 ], on behalf of Appellant R & M Objectors, FILED.[2764729] [20-304] [Entered: 01/29/2020 03:16 PM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 88 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [ # 2764593-2 ], on behalf of Appellants Pets USA LLC and Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc., FILED.[2764688] [20-343] [Entered: 01/29/2020 02:58 PM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2764634] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/29/2020 02:25 PM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of PNC Financial Services Group, Inc., FILED. Service date 01/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2764628] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/29/2020 02:19 PM]
January 29, 2020 Filing 81 NOTE: See lead case, 19-4065, containing complete set of docket entries.[2764563] [20-343] [Entered: 01/29/2020 01:29 PM]
January 24, 2020 Filing 68 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Form C and Form D, [ # 2761236-2 ], [ # 2761238-2 ], on behalf of Appellant R & M Objectors, FILED.[2761252] [20-304] [Entered: 01/24/2020 05:11 PM]
January 23, 2020 Filing 59 ATTORNEY, Richard F. Schwed for Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Bank Delaware, Juniper Financial Corporation, Barclays Financial Corp., in case 19-4065, [ # 58 ], ADDED.[2759085] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/23/2020 10:46 AM]
January 22, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Barclays Financial Corp., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Bank Delaware and Juniper Financial Corporation, FILED. Service date 01/22/2020 by CM/ECF. [2758400] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/22/2020 03:37 PM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 57 ATTORNEY, Kara Kennedy for Suntrust Banks Inc, SunTrust Bank, in case 19-4065, [ # 55 ], ADDED.[2756410] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:18 AM]
January 21, 2020 Filing 56 ATTORNEY, Robert C. Mason for Visa Inc., Visa U.S.A. Inc., Visa International Service Association, in case 19-4065, [ # 54 ], ADDED.[2756407] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/21/2020 11:17 AM]
January 17, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- SunTrust Bank and Suntrust Banks Inc, FILED. Service date 01/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2755995] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/17/2020 04:30 PM]
January 14, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A. Inc., FILED. Service date 01/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2751688] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/14/2020 11:36 AM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 49 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED. Service date 01/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2748695] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/09/2020 05:50 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 48 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED. Service date 01/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2748694] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/09/2020 05:47 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 47 ATTORNEY, David Sapir Lesser for HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC North America Holdings, Inc HSBC Finance Corporation HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC North America Holdings Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 46 ], ADDED.[2748668] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/09/2020 05:21 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corporation, HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC North America Holdings Inc., FILED. Service date 01/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2748638] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/09/2020 05:01 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 45 ATTORNEY, Demian Alexander Ordway for Visa Inc., Visa U.S.A. Inc., Visa International Service Association, in case 19-4065, [ # 44 ], ADDED.[2748634] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/09/2020 04:59 PM]
January 9, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Visa Inc., Visa International Service Association and Visa U.S.A. Inc., FILED. Service date 01/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2748103] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/09/2020 01:07 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 64 NOTE: See lead case, 19-4065, containing complete set of docket entries.[2761230] [20-304] [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:57 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 63 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2761211] [20-304] [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:46 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 62 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2761200] [20-304] [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:43 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 61 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL, with copy of district court docket, on behalf of Appellant R & M Objectors, FILED.[2761196] [20-304] [Entered: 01/24/2020 04:42 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 43 ATTORNEY, James M. Sulentic for First National Bank of Omaha, in case 19-4065, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2747330] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:54 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 42 ATTORNEY, Benjamin R. Nagin for Citigroup Inc., Citibank, N.A., in case 19-4065, [ # 23 ], ADDED.[2747316] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:49 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 41 ATTORNEY, N. Albert Bacharach Jr. for Jack Rabbit LLC, Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 22 ], ADDED.[2747311] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:47 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 40 ATTORNEY, Boris Bershteyn for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., JPMorgan Chase & Co., Chase Bank USA, N.A., Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC, in case 19-4065, [ # 21 ], ADDED.[2747304] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:45 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 39 ATTORNEY, Patrick J. Coughlin for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Payless Shoe Source, Inc. Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 20 ], ADDED.[2747294] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:42 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, Carmen Medici for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Payless Shoe Source, Inc. Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2747288] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:39 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Alexandra Senya Bernay for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Payless Shoe Source, Inc. Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2747279] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:37 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY, Joseph David Daley for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Payless Shoe Source, Inc. Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2747260] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:30 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, Eric Barstad for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Payless Shoe Source, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 16 ], ADDED.[2747253] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:26 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Joseph Goldberg for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Payless Shoe Source, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2747241] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:24 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY, Michael J. Kane for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Payless Shoe Source, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 14 ], ADDED.[2747237] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 04:22 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 32 ATTORNEY, Merrill G. Davidoff for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Payless Shoe Source, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 12 ], ADDED.[2747054] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 03:22 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, H. Laddie Montague Jr. for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Payless Shoe Source, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 11 ], ADDED.[2747027] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 03:11 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Eric J. Magnuson for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Payless Shoe Source, Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 7 ], ADDED.[2746988] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 02:42 PM]
January 8, 2020 Filing 29 ATTORNEY, Thomas J. Undlin for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc. Plaintiffs in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO, in case 19-4065, [ # 6 ], ADDED.[2746982] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/08/2020 02:40 PM]
January 7, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant R & M Objectors in 20-304, FILED. [2761066] [20-304, 19-4065] [Entered: 01/24/2020 03:59 PM]
January 6, 2020 Filing 28 CURED DEFECTIVE Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [ # 26 ], on behalf of Appellants Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED.[2744804] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:19 PM]
January 6, 2020 Filing 27 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance Form, [25], on behalf of Appellants Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED.[2744790] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/06/2020 04:15 PM]
January 3, 2020 Filing 26 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED. Service date 01/03/2020 by CM/ECF.[2743303] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:22 PM]
January 3, 2020 Filing 25 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED. Service date 01/03/2020 by CM/ECF.[2743248] [19-4065] [Entered: 01/03/2020 03:09 PM]
December 30, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of First National Bank of Omaha, FILED. Service date 12/30/2019 by CM/ECF. [2740758] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/30/2019 04:59 PM]
December 30, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Citibank, N.A. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 12/30/2019 by CM/ECF. [2740305] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/30/2019 01:02 PM]
December 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED. Service date 12/27/2019 by CM/ECF. [2739801] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/27/2019 06:36 PM]
December 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Chase Bank USA, N.A., Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 12/26/2019 by CM/ECF. [2738210] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/26/2019 12:24 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Appellee CHS Inc., Leons Transmission Service, Inc. and Traditions, Ltd., FILED. Service date 12/23/2019 by CM/ECF. [2737358] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/23/2019 02:42 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Appellee CHS Inc., Leons Transmission Service, Inc. and Traditions, Ltd., FILED. Service date 12/23/2019 by CM/ECF. [2737348] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/23/2019 02:37 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Appellee Traditions, Ltd., CHS Inc. and Leons Transmission Service, Inc., FILED. Service date 12/23/2019 by CM/ECF. [2737337] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/23/2019 02:32 PM]
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of -- Capital Audio Electronics, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Appellee CHS Inc., Leons Transmission Service, Inc. and Traditions, Ltd., FILED. Service date 12/23/2019 by CM/ECF. [2737320] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/23/2019 02:22 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2736184] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 03:46 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735879] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 02:01 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735850] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:50 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 13 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, CHS Inc., Leons Transmission Service, Inc. and Traditions, Ltd., FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF.[2735843] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:44 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735840] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:42 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735810] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:32 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735737] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:05 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY, K. Craig Wildfang for Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, Leons Transmission Service, Inc. Traditions, Ltd. CHS Inc., in case 19-4065, [ # 5 ], ADDED.[2735728] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:03 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735704] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:59 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735665] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:49 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735657] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:46 PM]
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO, FILED. Service date 12/20/2019 by CM/ECF. [2735637] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/20/2019 12:34 PM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2724749] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/09/2019 04:04 PM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellants Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, district court receipt # NYEDC-12110431, FILED.[2724744] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/09/2019 04:03 PM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 10/30/2019, RECEIVED.[2724742] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/09/2019 04:02 PM]
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellants Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc. and Jack Rabbit LLC, FILED. [2724737] [19-4065] [Entered: 12/09/2019 04:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re Payment Card Interchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonbro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Durango Natural Foods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05--cv-4728 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First National Bank of Omaha
Represented By: James M. Sulentic Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings PLC
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sears Holdings Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Financial Corp.
Represented By: Richard F. Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 -JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daviss Donuts and Deli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action G.E.S. Bakery, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc,. et al. 05-cv-5879 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Performace Labs, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al 05-cv-5869 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Top Gun Wrecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Gulfside Casino Partnership. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-03225 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premier Enterprises Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Leeber Cohen, M.D. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5878 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FIA Card Services, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Fringe, Inc. v. Visa, U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4194 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG -JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Banks Inc
Represented By: Kara Kennedy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Europe Services Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action The Kroger Co., et al. v. MasterCard Inc., et al., 06-cv-0039 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BA Merchant Services LLC, FKA National Processing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SunTrust Bank
Represented By: Kara Kennedy Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG -JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis D Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil actionNational Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Richard F. Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Discover Financial Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4799- JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings Inc.
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Photos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank, (USA), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action LDC, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5871 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport European Motorcars, Ltd. Newport Beach, California, Newport European Motorcars, Ltd. Newport Beach, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Valley Market, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Merchant Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants iin civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG -JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refund Recovery Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action JGSA, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5885
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Finance Corporation
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5073-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action 06-cv-5583, Esdacy, INC. v. Visa USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Payment Systems, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAJ, Inc., DBA Grapevine Wines an Spirits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-03925 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Benjamin R. Nagin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ragland Bros. Retail Cos., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank (South Dakota), N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil case Fitlife Health Systems of Arcadia, Inc. v. Mastercard International Incorporated et a 05-cv-5153 JG -JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S. A, Inc. et al, 05-cv-3924 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Paymentech Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Bank, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juniper Financial Corporation
Represented By: Richard F. Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paymentech, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NJ Applebee's (Paramus)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa U.S.A. Inc.
Represented By: Demian Alexander Ordway Esq.
Represented By: Robert C. Mason Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin R. Nagin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lane Courkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Bank of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Lombardo Bros., Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5882 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Inc.
Represented By: Demian Alexander Ordway Esq.
Represented By: Robert C. Mason Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bass Pro Shops White River Conference and Education Center, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Manhattan Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Abdallah Bishara, etc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5883 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Texas Independent Bancshares, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Dr. Roy Hyman, et al. v. Visa International Service Association, Inc., et al. 05-cv-5866
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5074-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Good Fashion Store, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastercard Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa Europe Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landers Harley-Davidson Little Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action 518 Restaurant Corp. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., et al. 05-cv-5884 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MBNA America Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Lee et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-03800
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2534 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bishop, DBA Hat & Gown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABP Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Visa International Service Association
Represented By: Demian Alexander Ordway Esq.
Represented By: Robert C. Mason Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank Delaware
Represented By: Richard F. Schwed Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action BKS. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-2264-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5069-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unlimited Vacations and Cruises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Class Action Recovery Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC North America Holdings, Inc
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Connecticut Food Association, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5880 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange County Bldg Materials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2532 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Defendants in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QVC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fryingpan River Ranch, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Cedar, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Mastercard Incorporated et al 06-cv-2534 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in Delta Airlines Inc et all v. Visa Inc et al, 1:13-cv-04766-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Jasperson v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5070 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in Twisted Spoke v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5881 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Kroger Co. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5078 JG-JO
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action The Kroger Co., et al. v. MasterCard Inc., et al., 06-cv-0039 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action 518 Restaurant Corp. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5884 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Audio Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra Senya Bernay Esq.
Represented By: Joseph David Daley
Represented By: Carmen Medici Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action National Association of Convenience Stores et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4521 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Lombardo Bros., Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-5882 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Motel 6 Operating LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Broken Ground, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5082 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Einstein Noah Restaurant Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G6 Hospitality LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DSW Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Resnick Amsterdam & Leshner P.C. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3924 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Fitlife Health Systems of Arcadia, Inc. v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-5153 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Superstores, BKS, INC., BKS of LA, Inc. d/b/a KEITH SUPERSTORES, and KEITHCO PETROLEUM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robersons Fine Jewlery, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Rookies, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-CV-5069 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in Target Corporation, et al. v. Visa Inc., et al., 13-cv-03477
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minnesota Twins LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Tabu Salon & Spa, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5072 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Harris Stationers, Inc., et al. v. Visa International Service Association, et al. 05-cv-5868 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Seaway Gas & Petroleum, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4728-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action BKS. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-2264-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Baltimore Avenue Foods, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5080 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Raley's v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv- 4799 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacksons Food Stores, Inc./PacWest Energy LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tobacco Plus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action American Booksellers Association v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-5319 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gielen Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in Civil Action Target Corporation, et al. v. Visa Inc. et al., 13-cv-4442
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bass Pro Outdoor World, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Lepkowski v. Mastercard International Incorporated et al 05-cv-4974 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BPIP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Bonte Wafflerie, LLC v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5083 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BPS Direct, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GMRI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Hy-Vee, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-3925-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Discount Optics, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5870 JG-JO
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin Esq.
Represented By: Carmen Medici Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Bi-Lo, LLC. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 06-cv-2532 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kum & Go, L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Community Pharmacists Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action National Grocers Association et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv- 5207 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jetblue Airways Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheetz, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manheim Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D'Agostino Supermarkets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Jetro Holding, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 05-cv-4520 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Supervalu Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4650 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action JGSA, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5885 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Lee et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-3800 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Restaurant Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Furniture Row BC, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bass Pro Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Dr. Roy Hyman, et al v. Visa International Service Association, Inc., et al . 05-cv-5866 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunoco, Inc. (RM)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in Civil action Animal Land, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc 05-cv-5074 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Leeber Cohen, M.D. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5878 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Fairmont Orthopedics & Sports Medicine, PA v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5076 JG JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Pantry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Media Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Cooperative Grocers Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susser Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action East Goshen Pharmacy, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5073 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in Civil Action 7-Eleven Inc., et al. v. Visa Inc. et al, 1:13-cv-05746-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Rite Aid Corporation et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al. 05-cv-5352 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Performance Labs, Inc. v. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5869 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E-Z Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Hyman v. VISA International Service Association, Inc. 05-cv-5866 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Payless Shoe Source, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin Esq.
Represented By: H. Laddie Montague Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Eric Barstad Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra Senya Bernay Esq.
Represented By: Joseph David Daley
Represented By: Merrill G. Davidoff
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Carmen Medici Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Kane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action LDC, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al 05-cv-5871 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keithco Petroleum, Inc., BKS, INC., BKS of LA, Inc. d/b/a KEITH SUPERSTORES, and KEITHCO PETROLEUM, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Affiliated Foods Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATSO, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Google Payment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Rock LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action G.E.S. Bakery, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5879 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Lakeshore Interiors v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5081JG JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coborn's Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action NuCity Publications, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5075 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cox Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Fringe, Inc. v. Visa, U.S.A., Inc et al 05-cv-4194 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Gulfside Casino Partnership. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. et al 09-cv-03225 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Sportsman Holdings Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Publix Supermarkets, Inc. v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4677 - JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action 06-cv-5583, Esdacy, INC. v. Visa USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Connecticut Food Association, Inc., et al. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc., et al. 05-cv-5880 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Parkway Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5077 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Abdallah Bishara, etc. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5883 JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rice Palace, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plaintiffs in civil action Meijer, Inc. et al v. Visa U.S.A. Inc. et al 05-cv-4131-JG-JO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Plaintiffs in civil actionPhotos Etc. Corp. v. Visa U.S.A., Inc. 05-cv-5071JG-JO
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin Esq.
Represented By: K. Craig Wildfang Esq.
Represented By: H. Laddie Montague Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Eric Barstad Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra Senya Bernay Esq.
Represented By: Joseph David Daley
Represented By: Merrill G. Davidoff
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Carmen Medici Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Kane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Traditions, Ltd.
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin Esq.
Represented By: K. Craig Wildfang Esq.
Represented By: H. Laddie Montague Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Eric Barstad Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra Senya Bernay Esq.
Represented By: Joseph David Daley
Represented By: Merrill G. Davidoff
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Carmen Medici Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Kane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: Leons Transmission Service, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin Esq.
Represented By: K. Craig Wildfang Esq.
Represented By: H. Laddie Montague Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Eric Barstad Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra Senya Bernay Esq.
Represented By: Joseph David Daley
Represented By: Merrill G. Davidoff
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Carmen Medici Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Kane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: CHS Inc.
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Patrick J. Coughlin Esq.
Represented By: K. Craig Wildfang Esq.
Represented By: H. Laddie Montague Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Eric Barstad Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Alexandra Senya Bernay Esq.
Represented By: Joseph David Daley
Represented By: Merrill G. Davidoff
Represented By: Joseph Goldberg Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Carmen Medici Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Kane Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jack Rabbit LLC
Represented By: Paul S. Rothstein Esq.
Represented By: N. Albert Bacharach Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Cahaba Heights Service Center, Inc., DBA Cahaba Heights Chevron
Represented By: Paul S. Rothstein Esq.
Represented By: N. Albert Bacharach Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Pets USA LLC
Represented By: John Jacob Pentz Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Quincy Woodrights, LLC
Represented By: Kendrick Jan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Midwest Petroleum Company
Represented By: Steve W. Berman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Falls Auto Gallery, DBA Falls Car Collection
Represented By: Sam P. Cannata Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Slidell Oil Company, LLC
Represented By: Steve W. Berman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: R & M Objectors
Represented By: Jay L. T. Breakstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Gnarlywood LLC
Represented By: Kendrick Jan Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: National Association of Shell Marketers, Inc.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Petroleum Marketers Association of America
Represented By: Steve W. Berman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kevan McLaughlin
Represented By: John W. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Society of Independent Gasoline Marketers of America
Represented By: Steve W. Berman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Fikes Wholesale, Inc.
Represented By: Steve W. Berman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mastercard International Incorporated
Represented By: Kannon K. Shanmugam Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?