Al-Bukhari v. Corrections
Defendant: John Doe, 3, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Barbara Savoie, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Henry Falcone, Lisa Alvarez, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Michael Pereira, All sued in their individual and official capacities, John Does 1-50, 1-10, all sued in their individual and official capacities, James Vesser, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Kyle Boulerice, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Mark Frayne, all sued in their individual and official capacities, John Doe, 1, 2, and 3, all sued in their individual and official capacities, Craig Burns, all sued in their individual and official capacities, Jane Doe, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Marc Congelos, Lieutanant, Gerard Gagne, all sued in their individual and official capacities, Department of Corrections, All sued in their individual and official capacities, John Doe, 2, All sued in their individual and official capacities and Rossini, Correctional Officer
Defendant / Appellee: Ellen Durko, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Jeremie St. Pierre, All sued in their individual and official capacities, William Faneuff, All sued in their individual and official capacities, McCarthy, Individual and Official Capacities, Wemmel, Loney, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Derrick Molden, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Thorpe, all sued in their individual and official capacities, Schmidt, Individual and Official Capacities, Sandone, Correctional Officer, Jesse Johnson, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Tuttle, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Alphonso Lindsey, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Guimond, Lieutanant, Buynicki, all sued in their individual and official capacities, Josh Whitted, all sued in their individual and official capacities, James Vassar, all sued in their individual and official capacities, Scott Semple, Commissioner, all sued in their individual and official capacities, Ryan Baron, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Paul Balatka, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Bogan, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Christopher Porylo, Individual and Official Capacities, Kristin Carabine, Individual and Official Capacities, Ryan Day, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Daniel Phillips, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Bradley, All sued in their individual and official capacities, Nancy Hill, Individual and Official Capacities, Anne Cournoyer, Individual and Official Capacities, William Mulligan, Warden, Individual and Official Capacities and Scott Erfe, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Plaintiff / Appellant: Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FKA Jerome Riddick
Case Number: 19-577
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION ORDER, denying motion to hold appeal in abeyance [ # 28 ] filed by Appellant Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, by SLC, FILED. [2548000][33] [19-577] [Entered: 04/25/2019 09:49 AM]
April 19, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION, to hold appeal in abeyance, [2544949] on behalf of Appellant Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FILED--[Edited 04/22/2019 by TC] [Entered: 04/22/2019 02:17 PM]
April 10, 2019 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, DeAnn S. Varunes for Ellen Durko Thorpe Loney Bradley William Faneuff Nancy Hill Jesse Johnson Anne Cournoyer Daniel Phillips Derrick Molden Ryan Baron William Mulligan McCarthy Bogan Scott Semple James Vassar Scott Erfe Christopher Porylo Schmidt Kristin Carabine Ryan Day Jeremie St. Pierre Wemmel Sandone Buynicki Guimond Josh Whitted Tuttle Paul Balatka, in case 19-577 , [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2536365] [19-577] [Entered: 04/10/2019 08:30 AM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Paul Balatka, Ryan Baron, Bogan, Bradley, Buynicki, Kristin Carabine, Anne Cournoyer, Ryan Day, Ellen Durko, Scott Erfe, William Faneuff, Guimond, Nancy Hill, Jesse Johnson, Alphonso Lindsey, Loney, McCarthy, Derrick Molden, William Mulligan, Daniel Phillips, Christopher Porylo, Sandone, Schmidt, Scott Semple, Jeremie St. Pierre, Thorpe, Tuttle, James Vassar, Wemmel and Josh Whitted, FILED. Service date 04/09/2019 by CM/ECF, US mail. [2536086] [19-577] [Entered: 04/09/2019 03:39 PM]
April 9, 2019 Filing 25 PAPERS, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, Form D-P, and Prisoner Authorization Form, RECEIVED.[2535889] [19-577] [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:08 PM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 24 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Ja Qure Al-Bukhari Brief due date as 06/12/2019. Joint Appendix due date as 06/12/2019, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2530952] [19-577] [Entered: 04/02/2019 02:35 PM]
April 2, 2019 Filing 21 NEW CASE MANAGER, Tiffany Campbell, copy to pro se appellant, ASSIGNED.[2530933] [19-577] [Entered: 04/02/2019 02:26 PM]
March 28, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFIED PRISONER AUTHORIZATION FORM, dated 03/28/2019, to MacDougall-Walker Correctional Institution, in care of Warden, ISSUED.[2528170] [19-577] [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:48 PM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 PRISON LITIGATION REFORM ACT AUTHORIZATION FORM, FILED. Service date 03/12/2019 by US mail.[2528141] [19-577] [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:33 PM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, informing Court of proposed due date 06/12/2019, RECEIVED. Service date 03/12/2019 by US mail.[2528137] [19-577] [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:31 PM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 FORM D-P, on behalf of Appellant Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FILED. Service date 03/12/2019 by US mail.[2528134] [19-577] [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:30 PM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FORM, on behalf of Appellant Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FILED. Service date 03/12/2019 by US mail.[2528128] [19-577] [Entered: 03/28/2019 04:28 PM]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER, dated 03/26/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/16/2019 unless Appellant Ja Qure Al-Bukhari submits Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance form, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2525545] [19-577] [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:12 AM]
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, dated 03/26/2019, dismissing appeal by 04/16/2019 unless Appellant Ja Qure Al-Bukhari submits Form D-P, copy to pro se appellant, FILED.[2525540] [19-577] [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:06 AM]
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE, to Appellee Paul Balatka, Ryan Baron, Bogan, Bradley, Buynicki, Kristin Carabine, Anne Cournoyer, Ryan Day, Ellen Durko, Scott Erfe, William Faneuff, Guimond, Nancy Hill, Jesse Johnson, Alphonso Lindsey, Loney, McCarthy, Derrick Molden, William Mulligan, Daniel Phillips, Christopher Porylo, Sandone, Schmidt, Scott Semple, Jeremie St. Pierre, Thorpe, Tuttle, James Vassar, Wemmel and Josh Whitted, for failure to file an appearance, SENT.[2525532] [19-577] [Entered: 03/26/2019 09:04 AM]
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 AUTHORIZATION FORM, REQUESTED.[2513600] [19-577] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:52 AM]
March 8, 2019 Filing 6 INSTRUCTIONAL FORMS, to Pro Se litigant, SENT.[2513597] [19-577] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:50 AM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2513595] [19-577] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:49 AM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT RULING, dated 02/22/2019, RECEIVED.[2513587] [19-577] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:46 AM]
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY PRISONER APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, copy to pro se appellant, FILED. [2513583] [19-577] [Entered: 03/08/2019 11:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Bukhari v. Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 3, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Savoie, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Falcone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Alvarez, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Pereira, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50, 1-10, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Vesser, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Boulerice, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Frayne, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 1, 2, and 3, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Burns, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Congelos, Lieutanant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Gagne, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe, 2, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rossini, Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ellen Durko, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jeremie St. Pierre, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William Faneuff, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: McCarthy, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wemmel
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Loney, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Derrick Molden, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Thorpe, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Schmidt, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sandone, Correctional Officer
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Jesse Johnson, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Tuttle, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Alphonso Lindsey, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Guimond, Lieutanant
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Buynicki, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Josh Whitted, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: James Vassar, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Semple, Commissioner, all sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ryan Baron, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Paul Balatka, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bogan, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Christopher Porylo, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Kristin Carabine, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Ryan Day, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Daniel Phillips, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bradley, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Nancy Hill, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Anne Cournoyer, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: William Mulligan, Warden, Individual and Official Capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Scott Erfe, All sued in their individual and official capacities
Represented By: Clare E. Kindall
Represented By: DeAnn S. Varunes Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Ja Qure Al-Bukhari, FKA Jerome Riddick
Represented By: Ja Qure Al-Bukhari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?