IN RE: ICE LIBOR ANTITRUST LIT
Plaintiff / Appellant: City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated and Putnam Bank, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated,
Defendant / Appellee: Merill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd., The Norinchukin Bank, UBS AG, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., smBC Capital Markets, Inc,, Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS Securities LLC, The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., Credit Agricole S.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Bank of America N.A., Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., Lloyds Bank PLC, Citigroup Inc., The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., SG Americas Securities, LLC, Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Barclays Bank PLC, ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, FKA NYSE Euronext Rate Administration Limited, National Westminster Bank PLC, Societe Generale S.A., Natwest Markets Securities Inc., FKA RBS Securities, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., MUFG Securities Americas Inc., ICE Data Services, Inc., HSBC Bank PLC, Barclays PLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Barclays Capital, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., NatWest Markets PLC, FKA The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Credit Suisse AG, BNP Paribas SA, Citibank, N.A., Credit Suisse Group AG, Lloyds Securities Inc., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., UBS Group AG, Bank of America Corporation, Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., HSBC Holdings PLC, MUFG Bank, Ltd., FKA The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Royal Bank of Canada and HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Amicus Curiae: American Antitrust Institute
Case Number: 20-1492
Filed: April 27, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Filing 202 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, informing court of updated address, RECEIVED. Service date 09/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2922313] [20-1492] [Entered: 09/02/2020 02:13 PM]
August 27, 2020 Filing 199 CURED DEFECTIVE Amicus Brief [ # 195 ], [ # 196 ], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute, FILED.[2917929] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/27/2020 12:01 PM]
August 25, 2020 Filing 196 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute, FILED. Service date 08/25/2020 by CM/ECF. [2916388] [20-1492]--[Edited 08/26/2020 by DE] [Entered: 08/25/2020 03:37 PM]
August 24, 2020 Filing 195 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Amicus Brief, [187], on behalf of Amicus Curiae American Antitrust Institute, FILED.[2914904] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/24/2020 10:42 AM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 193 ATTORNEYS, Jonathan D. Schiller, John Zach, for Appellees Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc. and Barclays PLC, TERMINATED.[2913459] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/20/2020 04:37 PM]
August 20, 2020 Filing 192 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc. and Barclays PLC, requesting withdrawal of attorneys, RECEIVED. Service date 08/20/2020 by CM/ECF.[2912695] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/20/2020 09:18 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 191 CURED DEFECTIVE Notices of Appearance as Additional Counsel [ # 186 ], [ # 188 ], [ # 189 ], on behalf of Appellees Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED.[2911380] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/19/2020 08:19 AM]
August 19, 2020 Filing 190 ATTORNEY, Jeffrey Thomas Scott, Matthew J. Porpora for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays PLC Barclays Capital, Inc., in case 20-1492, [ # 188 ], [ # 189 ], ADDED.[2911378] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/19/2020 08:18 AM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 189 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Capital, Inc., Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 08/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2911067] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:49 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 188 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 08/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2911062] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:46 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 187 AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of American Antitrust Institute, FILED. Service date 08/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2911046] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/18/2020 03:38 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 186 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, Notices of Appearance as Additional Counsel, [182], [183], on behalf of Appellees Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED.[2910976] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:57 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 185 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to waive requirement of using official caption on all pleadings [ # 179 ] filed by Appellant Putnam Bank, City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund and Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, FILED. [2910970][185] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:51 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 183 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 08/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2910923] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:29 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 182 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays PLC, Barclays Bank PLC and Barclays Capital, Inc., FILED. Service date 08/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2910872] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/18/2020 02:09 PM]
August 18, 2020 Filing 180 CURED DEFECTIVE Motion to waive a requirement [ # 169 ], [ # 179 ], on behalf of Appellants City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED.[2910282] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/18/2020 09:09 AM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 179 MOTION, to waive a requirement, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2910090] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/17/2020 05:34 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 178 CURED DEFECTIVE Notices of Appearance as Amicus Counsel [ # 174 ], [ # 176 ], [ # 177 ], on behalf of American Antitrust Institute, FILED.[2910072] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/17/2020 05:11 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 177 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Antitrust Institute, FILED. Service date 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2909981] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/17/2020 04:04 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 176 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Antitrust Institute, FILED. Service date 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2909968] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/17/2020 03:59 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 174 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, Notices of Appearance as Amicus Counsel, [171], [172], on behalf of Movant American Antitrust Institute, FILED.[2909846] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/17/2020 03:13 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 173 NEW PARTY, American Antitrust Institute, ADDED.[2909841] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/17/2020 03:11 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 172 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Antitrust Institute, FILED. Service date 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2909716] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/17/2020 02:13 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 171 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of American Antitrust Institute, FILED. Service date 08/17/2020 by CM/ECF. [2909682] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/17/2020 01:50 PM]
August 17, 2020 Filing 169 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Motion to waive a requirement, [165], on behalf of Appellants City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED.[2909509] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/17/2020 11:46 AM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 166 PAGE PROOF BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907819] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/13/2020 06:17 PM]
August 13, 2020 Filing 165 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 08/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2907815] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/13/2020 06:11 PM]
August 12, 2020 Filing 163 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to file deferred appendix [ # 160 ] filed by Appellants Putnam Bank, City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund and Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, FILED. [2906379][163] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/12/2020 02:52 PM]
August 11, 2020 Filing 160 MOTION, to file deferred appendix, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 08/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2905592] [20-1492] [Entered: 08/11/2020 06:08 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 159 ATTORNEY, Joshua Nathaniel Mitchell for HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. HSBC Bank PLC, in case 20-1492 , [ # 157 ], ADDED.[2895534] [20-1492] [Entered: 07/29/2020 03:09 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 158 ATTORNEY, Paul Alessio Mezzina for HSBC Bank USA, N.A. HSBC Holdings PLC HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. HSBC Bank PLC, in case 20-1492 , [ # 156 ], ADDED.[2895498] [20-1492] [Entered: 07/29/2020 02:49 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., FILED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2895433] [20-1492] [Entered: 07/29/2020 02:09 PM]
July 29, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., FILED. Service date 07/29/2020 by CM/ECF. [2895419] [20-1492] [Entered: 07/29/2020 02:00 PM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 155 ATTORNEY, Peter Anthony Barile III for Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan Putnam Bank Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, in case 20-1492 , [ # 154 ], ADDED.[2894372] [20-1492] [Entered: 07/28/2020 03:12 PM]
July 28, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 07/28/2020 by CM/ECF. [2894336] [20-1492] [Entered: 07/28/2020 02:55 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 153 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to extend time until 08/13/2020 to file Appellants' opening brief; no further extensions [ # 149 ] filed by Appellants Putnam Bank, City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund and Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, by RKW, FILED. [2870092][153] [20-1492] [Entered: 06/24/2020 02:47 PM]
June 22, 2020 Filing 149 MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 06/22/2020 by CM/ECF. [2867207] [20-1492] [Entered: 06/22/2020 10:58 AM]
June 17, 2020 Filing 145 MOTION ORDER, granting motion for removal of this matter from the Court's Expedited Appeals Calendar; Appellees are to be given 91 days from the date Appellant's brief is filed to file their brief [ # 137 ] filed by Appellees National Westminster Bank PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC and Natwest Markets Securities Inc., by RKW, FILED. [2864579][145] [20-1492] [Entered: 06/17/2020 03:07 PM]
June 16, 2020 Filing 141 OPPOSITION TO MOTION, [ # 137 ], on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 06/16/2020 by CM/ECF. [2863665] [20-1492] [Entered: 06/16/2020 04:50 PM]
June 7, 2020 Filing 137 MOTION, to remove appeal from the expedited appeals calendar, on behalf of Appellee National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC and Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 06/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2855886] [20-1492] [Entered: 06/07/2020 05:40 PM]
June 5, 2020 Filing 136 ATTORNEY, Alan M. Unger for The Norinchukin Bank, in case 20-1492, [ # 135 ], ADDED.[2855359] [20-1492] [Entered: 06/05/2020 08:56 AM]
June 4, 2020 Filing 135 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 06/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2855238] [20-1492] [Entered: 06/04/2020 07:17 PM]
June 2, 2020 Filing 133 LOCAL RULE 31.2 NOTICE, placing this appeal on the Court's Expedited Calendar, setting appellants' brief due date as 07/07/2020, appellees' brief due date as 08/11/2020, TRANSMITTED.[2852607] [20-1492] [Entered: 06/02/2020 02:47 PM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 131 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC and Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, responding to Appellant's request to be placed on expedited calendar, RECEIVED. Service date 06/01/2020 by CM/ECF.[2851982] [20-1492] [Entered: 06/01/2020 05:32 PM]
June 1, 2020 Filing 130 NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[2851185] [20-1492] [Entered: 06/01/2020 09:59 AM]
May 28, 2020 Filing 127 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, informing Court of proposed due date 05/28/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 05/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2849887] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/28/2020 05:34 PM]
May 21, 2020 Filing 124 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 05/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2844812] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/21/2020 12:10 PM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 123 ATTORNEY, Jefferson E. Bell for UBS Securities LLC UBS Group AG UBS AG, in case 20-1492, [ # 120 ], ADDED.[2842765] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/19/2020 01:51 PM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 122 ATTORNEY, David J. Arp for UBS Securities LLC UBS Group AG UBS AG, in case 20-1492, [ # 120 ], ADDED.[2842750] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/19/2020 01:45 PM]
May 19, 2020 Filing 121 ATTORNEY, Jason Robert Vitullo for BNP Paribas SA BNP Paribas Securities Corp., in case 20-1492, [ # 117 ], ADDED.[2842685] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/19/2020 01:10 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 120 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, UBS Group AG and UBS Securities LLC, FILED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2841975] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 09:17 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, UBS Group AG and UBS Securities LLC, FILED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2841973] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 09:10 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 118 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, UBS Group AG and UBS Securities LLC, FILED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2841970] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 09:00 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 117 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas SA and BNP Paribas Securities Corp., FILED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2841451] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 02:05 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 116 ATTORNEY, Andrew Calica for SG Americas Securities, LLC Societe Generale S.A., in case 20-1492, [ # 110 ], ADDED.[2841332] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 01:00 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 115 ATTORNEY, Alan C. Turner for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, in case 20-1492, [ # 112 ], ADDED.[2841325] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 12:58 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 114 ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis for JPMorgan Chase & Co. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, in case 20-1492, [ # 113 ], ADDED.[2841318] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 12:57 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2841135] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 11:32 AM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 112 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2841107] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 11:21 AM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 111 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase & Co., FILED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2841095] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 11:13 AM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 110 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee SG Americas Securities, LLC and Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF. [2841019] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 10:40 AM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 109 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee SG Americas Securities, LLC and Societe Generale S.A., FILED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2840988] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 10:28 AM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 108 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas SA and BNP Paribas Securities Corp., FILED. Service date 05/18/2020 by CM/ECF.[2840951] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/18/2020 10:17 AM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 107 ATTORNEY, Amy N. Vegari for BNP Paribas SA BNP Paribas Securities Corp., in case 20-1492, [ # 105 ], ADDED.[2840755] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/17/2020 07:43 PM]
May 18, 2020 Filing 106 ATTORNEY, Joshua A. Goldberg, [ # 104 ], in place of attorney Jason Robert Vitullo, SUBSTITUTED.[2840754] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/17/2020 07:40 PM]
May 15, 2020 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas SA and BNP Paribas Securities Corp., FILED. Service date 05/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2840651] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/15/2020 05:26 PM]
May 15, 2020 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee BNP Paribas SA and BNP Paribas Securities Corp., FILED. Service date 05/15/2020 by CM/ECF. [2840642] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/15/2020 05:18 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 100 ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in case 20-1492, [ # 91 ], ADDED.[2839018] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 06:26 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 99 ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in case 20-1492, [ # 92 ], ADDED.[2839017] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 06:21 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 98 ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse Group AG Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, in case 20-1492, [ # 90 ], ADDED.[2839008] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 06:05 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 97 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Group AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2838993] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 05:41 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 96 ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [ # 89 ], in place of attorney Adam Mintz, SUBSTITUTED.[2838985] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 05:19 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 95 ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Lloyds Bank PLC Lloyds Securities Inc., in case 20-1492, [ # 88 ], ADDED.[2838975] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 05:13 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 94 ATTORNEY, Lisa J Fried for Lloyds Bank PLC Lloyds Securities Inc., in case 20-1492, [ # 87 ], ADDED.[2838973] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 05:12 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 93 ATTORNEY Marc J. Gottridge, [ # 86 ], in place of attorney Benjamin Fleming, SUBSTITUTED.[2838972] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 05:11 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 92 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838952] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:52 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838949] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:50 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838945] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:47 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, Credit Suisse AG and Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838938] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 04:42 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Bank PLC and Lloyds Securities Inc., FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838787] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 03:05 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 87 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Bank PLC and Lloyds Securities Inc., FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838786] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 03:02 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 86 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Bank PLC and Lloyds Securities Inc., FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838781] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 02:59 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 85 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Bank PLC and Lloyds Securities Inc., FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2838768] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 02:57 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 84 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2838666] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 01:26 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 83 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank, Credit Agricole S.A. and Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc., FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2838642] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 01:11 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 82 ATTORNEY, Lev L Dassin for Citigroup Inc. Citigroup Global Markets Inc. Citibank, N.A., in case 20-1492, [ # 74 ], ADDED.[2838594] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:26 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 81 ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 20-1492, [ # 72 ], ADDED.[2838592] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:24 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 80 ATTORNEY, Tawfiq Saifee Rangwala for Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., in case 20-1492, [ # 71 ], ADDED.[2838589] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:21 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 79 ATTORNEY, Leigh Nathanson for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays PLC Barclays Capital, Inc., in case 20-1492, [ # 76 ], ADDED.[2838574] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:12 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 78 ATTORNEY, John Zach for Barclays Bank PLC Barclays PLC Barclays Capital, Inc., in case 20-1492, [ # 77 ], ADDED.[2838573] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 12:11 PM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838443] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 11:04 AM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838426] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 10:56 AM]
May 13, 2020 Filing 75 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc. and Barclays PLC, FILED. Service date 05/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2838395] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/13/2020 10:39 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citibank, N.A., FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838118] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 07:17 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 73 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Citibank, N.A., Citigroup Global Markets Inc. and Citigroup Inc., FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF.[2838116] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 07:12 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838111] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 06:42 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 71 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2838105] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 06:27 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 70 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF.[2838094] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 06:14 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 69 ATTORNEY, Stacey Slaughter for Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan Putnam Bank Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, in case 20-1492, [ # 66 ], ADDED.[2838036] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 05:07 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 68 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [ # 63 ], [ # 67 ], on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A. and Merill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., FILED.[2837989] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 04:45 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 67 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A. and Merill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF.[2837740] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 02:42 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2837600] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 01:27 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 65 ATTORNEY, Eric J. Magnuson for Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan Putnam Bank Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, in case 20-1492, [ # 64 ], ADDED.[2837576] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 01:08 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2837502] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 12:37 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 63 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance, [47], on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A. and Merill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., FILED.[2837443] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 12:07 PM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 62 ATTORNEY, Geoffrey H. Kozen for City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan Putnam Bank, in case 20-1492, [ # 58 ], ADDED.[2837433] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:58 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 61 ATTORNEY, Ryan W. Marth for Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan Putnam Bank Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, in case 20-1492, [ # 56 ], ADDED.[2837397] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:42 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 60 ATTORNEY, Geoffrey H. Kozen for Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund Putnam Bank Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, in case 20-1492, [ # 55 ], ADDED.[2837393] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:41 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 59 ATTORNEY, Steven M Berezney for Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan Putnam Bank Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, in case 20-1492, [ # 54 ], ADDED.[2837389] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:39 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2837380] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:35 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 57 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC and HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF.[2837355] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:26 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2837320] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:04 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund and Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2837315] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 11:00 AM]
May 12, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Putnam Bank, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan and City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, FILED. Service date 05/12/2020 by CM/ECF. [2837284] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/12/2020 10:43 AM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 53 ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin for Bank of America Corporation Merill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc. Bank of America N.A., in case 20-1492, [ # 48 ], ADDED.[2837040] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 10:53 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 52 ATTORNEY, Adam Gabor Mehes for Bank of America Corporation Merill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc. Bank of America N.A., in case 20-1492, [ # 49 ], ADDED.[2837035] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 10:41 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 51 ATTORNEY, Thomas Andrew Paskowitz for The Norinchukin Bank, in case 20-1492, [ # 46 ], ADDED.[2837034] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 10:39 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 50 ATTORNEY, Andrew W. Stern, [ # 45 ], in place of attorney Alan M. Unger, SUBSTITUTED.[2837033] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 10:37 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A. and Merill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2837009] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 08:42 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A. and Merill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2837008] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 08:38 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 47 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America N.A. and Merill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc., FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2837007] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 08:33 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836987] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 07:15 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836984] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 07:11 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 44 ATTORNEY, Lilia B. Vazova for Royal Bank of Canada RBC Capital Markets, LLC, in case 20-1492, [ # 42 ], ADDED.[2836973] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 06:54 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 43 ATTORNEY, Richard D. Owens for Royal Bank of Canada RBC Capital Markets, LLC, in case 20-1492, [ # 41 ], ADDED.[2836971] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 06:53 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada and RBC Capital Markets, LLC, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836948] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 06:18 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836941] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 06:12 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 40 ATTORNEY, Susan Katina Alexander for Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan Putnam Bank Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, in case 20-1492, [ # 36 ], ADDED.[2836939] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 06:08 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 39 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836938] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 06:08 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, Andrew Love for Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan Putnam Bank Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, in case 20-1492, [ # 37 ], ADDED.[2836936] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 06:05 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund and Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836909] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 05:34 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund and Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836904] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 05:31 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, Hallie S. Goldblatt for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. Deutsche Bank AG, in case 20-1492, [ # 29 ], ADDED.[2836880] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 05:13 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 34 ATTORNEY, Jessica S. Carey for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. Deutsche Bank AG, in case 20-1492, [ # 28 ], ADDED.[2836877] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 05:12 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 33 ATTORNEY, Brian Hauser for ICE Data Services, Inc. Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. ICE Benchmark Administration Limited ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., in case 20-1492, [ # 26 ], ADDED.[2836858] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 05:04 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 32 ATTORNEY, John Cove Jr. for ICE Data Services, Inc. Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. ICE Benchmark Administration Limited ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., in case 20-1492, [ # 25 ], ADDED.[2836857] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 05:02 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 31 ATTORNEY, Jerome S. Fortinsky for ICE Data Services, Inc. Intercontinental Exchange, Inc. ICE Benchmark Administration Limited ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., in case 20-1492, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2836848] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 05:00 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, Jamie Dycus for National Westminster Bank PLC Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC Natwest Markets Securities Inc. Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, in case 20-1492, [ # 21 ], ADDED.[2836840] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 04:57 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG and Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836753] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 04:13 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG and Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836748] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 04:10 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 27 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG and Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836738] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 04:06 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc. and Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836625] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 03:01 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc. and Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836615] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:57 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc., Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc. and ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836606] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:53 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 23 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, ICE Data Services, Inc., ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC, Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc. and Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836600] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:44 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee smBC Capital Markets, Inc,, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd. and Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836587] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 02:39 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc. and National Westminster Bank PLC, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836476] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:20 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 20 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee National Westminster Bank PLC, Natwest Markets Securities Inc., Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC and Royal Bank of Scotland PLC, FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF.[2836471] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:17 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 19 ATTORNEY, Jon Roellke for Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd. Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc smBC Capital Markets, Inc,, in case 20-1492, [ # 17 ], ADDED.[2836458] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:10 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 18 CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, [ # 15 ], [ # 17 ], on behalf of Appellee Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc and smBC Capital Markets, Inc,, FILED.[2836457] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 01:09 PM]
May 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee smBC Capital Markets, Inc,, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc and Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., FILED. Service date 05/11/2020 by CM/ECF. [2836151] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/11/2020 10:03 AM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Cassady for MUFG Bank, Ltd. Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc. MUFG Securities Americas Inc., in case 20-1492, [ # 10 ], ADDED.[2835870] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/08/2020 06:34 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgement and Notice of Appearance, [14], on behalf of Appellee Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd., Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc and smBC Capital Markets, Inc,, FILED.[2835868] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/08/2020 06:26 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee smBC Capital Markets, Inc,, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation, Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd. and Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc, FILED. Service date 05/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2835687] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/08/2020 03:59 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 05/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2835659] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/08/2020 03:45 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 05/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2835656] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/08/2020 03:44 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. Service date 05/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2835651] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/08/2020 03:42 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd. and MUFG Securities Americas Inc., FILED. Service date 05/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2835507] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/08/2020 02:28 PM]
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc., MUFG Bank, Ltd. and MUFG Securities Americas Inc., FILED. Service date 05/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2835500] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/08/2020 02:24 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2833861] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/06/2020 06:15 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 4 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, USCA receipt # ANYSDC-19579744, FILED.[2833860] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/06/2020 06:15 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 03/30/2020, RECEIVED.[2833859] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/06/2020 06:14 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 03/26/2020, RECEIVED.[2833858] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/06/2020 06:13 PM]
April 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System, City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund and Putnam Bank, FILED. [2833856] [20-1492] [Entered: 05/06/2020 06:10 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: IN RE: ICE LIBOR ANTITRUST LIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: City of Livonia Retiree Health amd Disability Benefits Plan, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Love Esq.
Represented By: Stacey Slaughter Esq.
Represented By: Steven M. Berezney Esq.
Represented By: Susan Katina Alexander
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey H. Kozen Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Annuity Fund, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Love Esq.
Represented By: Stacey Slaughter Esq.
Represented By: Steven M. Berezney Esq.
Represented By: Susan Katina Alexander
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey H. Kozen Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: City of Livonia Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Love Esq.
Represented By: Stacey Slaughter Esq.
Represented By: Steven M. Berezney Esq.
Represented By: Susan Katina Alexander
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey H. Kozen Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Pension Fund, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Love Esq.
Represented By: Stacey Slaughter Esq.
Represented By: Steven M. Berezney Esq.
Represented By: Susan Katina Alexander
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey H. Kozen Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Health & Welfare Fund, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Love Esq.
Represented By: Stacey Slaughter Esq.
Represented By: Steven M. Berezney Esq.
Represented By: Susan Katina Alexander
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey H. Kozen Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Hawaii Sheet Metal Workers Training Fund, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Love Esq.
Represented By: Stacey Slaughter Esq.
Represented By: Steven M. Berezney Esq.
Represented By: Susan Katina Alexander
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey H. Kozen Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Putnam Bank, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated,
Represented By: Thomas J. Undlin Esq.
Represented By: Andrew Love Esq.
Represented By: Stacey Slaughter Esq.
Represented By: Steven M. Berezney Esq.
Represented By: Susan Katina Alexander
Represented By: Ryan W. Marth Esq.
Represented By: Geoffrey H. Kozen Esq.
Represented By: Eric J. Magnuson Esq.
Represented By: Peter Anthony Barile Esq. III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Merill Lynch, Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc.
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin Esq.
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MUFG Bank, Ltd.
Represented By: Elizabeth Cassady Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Norinchukin Bank
Represented By: Alan M. Unger Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Paskowitz Esq.
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UBS AG
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Jefferson E. Bell Esq.
Represented By: David J. Arp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Jason Robert Vitullo Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Goldberg
Represented By: Amy N. Vegari Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: smBC Capital Markets, Inc,
Represented By: Kenneth I. Schacter Esq.
Represented By: Jon Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Agricole Corporate and Investment Bank
Represented By: Joseph E. Neuhaus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICE Pricing and Reference Data LLC
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki Esq.
Represented By: Brian Hauser Esq.
Represented By: Jerome S. Fortinsky Esq.
Represented By: John Cove Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Brad S. Karp Esq.
Represented By: Hallie S. Goldblatt Esq.
Represented By: Jessica S. Carey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Jefferson E. Bell Esq.
Represented By: David J. Arp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Agricole S.A.
Represented By: Joseph E. Neuhaus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Roger A. Cooper
Represented By: Lev L. Dassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.
Represented By: David R. Gelfand Esq.
Represented By: Tawfiq Saifee Rangwala Esq.
Represented By: Mark D. Villaverde Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin Esq.
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Agricole Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Joseph E. Neuhaus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lloyds Bank PLC
Represented By: Benjamin Fleming
Represented By: Lisa J. Fried
Represented By: Marc J. Gottridge Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citigroup Inc.
Represented By: Roger A. Cooper
Represented By: Lev L. Dassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Damien J. Marshall Esq.
Represented By: Paul Alessio Mezzina Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Nathaniel Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SG Americas Securities, LLC
Represented By: Steven Wolowitz
Represented By: Andrew Calica Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Mitsubishi UFJ Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Cassady Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Schiller
Represented By: John Zach Esq.
Represented By: Leigh Nathanson Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Scott Esq.
Represented By: Matthew J. Porpora Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICE Benchmark Administration Limited, FKA NYSE Euronext Rate Administration Limited
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki Esq.
Represented By: Brian Hauser Esq.
Represented By: Jerome S. Fortinsky Esq.
Represented By: John Cove Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: National Westminster Bank PLC
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Societe Generale S.A.
Represented By: Steven Wolowitz
Represented By: Andrew Calica Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Natwest Markets Securities Inc., FKA RBS Securities, Inc.
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Douglas Kent Yatter Esq.
Represented By: Richard D. Owens
Represented By: Lilia B. Vazova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Paul C. Gluckow Esq.
Represented By: Alan C. Turner
Represented By: Abram Ellis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MUFG Securities Americas Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Cassady Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ICE Data Services, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki Esq.
Represented By: Brian Hauser Esq.
Represented By: Jerome S. Fortinsky Esq.
Represented By: John Cove Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC Bank PLC
Represented By: Damien J. Marshall Esq.
Represented By: Paul Alessio Mezzina Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Nathaniel Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barclays PLC
Represented By: Jonathan D. Schiller
Represented By: John Zach Esq.
Represented By: Leigh Nathanson Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Scott Esq.
Represented By: Matthew J. Porpora Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Intercontinental Exchange Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki Esq.
Represented By: Brian Hauser Esq.
Represented By: Jerome S. Fortinsky Esq.
Represented By: John Cove Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Barclays Capital, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan D. Schiller
Represented By: John Zach Esq.
Represented By: Leigh Nathanson Esq.
Represented By: Jeffrey Thomas Scott Esq.
Represented By: Matthew J. Porpora Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Paul C. Gluckow Esq.
Represented By: Alan C. Turner
Represented By: Abram Ellis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NatWest Markets PLC, FKA The Royal Bank of Scotland PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Suisse AG
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BNP Paribas SA
Represented By: Jason Robert Vitullo Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Goldberg
Represented By: Amy N. Vegari Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Roger A. Cooper
Represented By: Lev L. Dassin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lloyds Securities Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Fleming
Represented By: Lisa J. Fried
Represented By: Marc J. Gottridge Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sumitomo Mitsui Financial Group, Inc
Represented By: Kenneth I. Schacter Esq.
Represented By: Jon Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Paul C. Gluckow Esq.
Represented By: Alan C. Turner
Represented By: Abram Ellis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation Europe Ltd.
Represented By: Kenneth I. Schacter Esq.
Represented By: Jon Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UBS Group AG
Represented By: Eric Jonathan Stock
Represented By: Jefferson E. Bell Esq.
Represented By: David J. Arp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Paul S. Mishkin Esq.
Represented By: Adam Gabor Mehes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Intercontinental Exchange, Inc.
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki Esq.
Represented By: Brian Hauser Esq.
Represented By: Jerome S. Fortinsky Esq.
Represented By: John Cove Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: Brad S. Karp Esq.
Represented By: Hallie S. Goldblatt Esq.
Represented By: Jessica S. Carey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC Holdings PLC
Represented By: Damien J. Marshall Esq.
Represented By: Paul Alessio Mezzina Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Nathaniel Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MUFG Bank, Ltd., FKA The Bank of Tokyo-Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Sumitomo Mitsui Banking Corporation
Represented By: Kenneth I. Schacter Esq.
Represented By: Jon Roellke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Royal Bank of Canada
Represented By: Douglas Kent Yatter Esq.
Represented By: Richard D. Owens
Represented By: Lilia B. Vazova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Damien J. Marshall Esq.
Represented By: Paul Alessio Mezzina Esq.
Represented By: Joshua Nathaniel Mitchell Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Antitrust Institute
Represented By: Laura Alexander Esq.
Represented By: Sharon K. Robertson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?