In Re: Libor-Based Financial
Plaintiff: Lawrence W. Gardner, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, David Klusendorf, Axiom Investment Advisors Holdings L.P., Henryk Malinowski, on behalf of themsevles and all others similarly situated, PFI Bond Market Index Fund, Principal Capital Interest Only I, LLC, Gary Francis, Carpenters Pension Fund of West Virginia, Charles Schwab Bank, N.A., The Regents of the University of California, Nicholas Pesa, Salix Capital US Inc., Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust, PFI Diversified Real Asset Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, Gildor Family Advisors L.P., Greenwich Commons II, LLC, The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority, The Riverside Public Financing Authority, Jeffrey Laydon, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, Directors Financial Group, on behalf of all others similarly situated, PFI Bond & Mortgage Securities Fund, Scott Federighi, Philip Olson, Bay Area Toll Authority, Directors Financial Group, individually, Charles Schwab Worldwide Funds PLC, on behalf of its series Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, PFI Government & High Quality Bond Fund, Roberto E. Calle Gracey, Jerry Weglarz, Jeffrey D. Buckley, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Direct Action Plaintiffs, PVC Equity Income Account, Principal Variable Contracts Funds, Inc., City of Richmond, Ephraim F. Gildor, Jill Court Associates II, LLC, Courtyard at Amwell II, LLC, The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Schwab Money Market Fund, County of Sacramento, Schwab Investments, on behalf of its former series Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, and Schwab Yieldplus Fund, Cement Masons' International Association Employees' Trust Fund, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, David Vecchione, County of San Diego, The City of Philadelphia, PVC Bond & Mortgage Securities Account, Gildor Family Company L.P., Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency, Axiom Investment Advisors, LLC, PFI Inflation Protection Fund, Principal Funds, Inc., Capital Ventures International, Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Federal Deposit Insurance, as Receiver for Doral Bank, John Henderson, Community Bank & Trust, Triaxx Prime CDO 2006-2 Ltd., California Public Plaintiffs, PVC Asset Allocation Account, The Charles Schwab Family of Funds, on behalf of its current or former series Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Cash Reserves, and Schwab Advisor Ca, Principal Real Estate Investors, LLC, Annie Bell Adams, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, Richard Deogracias, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Principal Commercial Funding, LLC, Raritan Commons, LLC, Christopher Lang, PFI Income Fund, Axiom Investment Company, LLC, PFI High Yield Fund I, Principal Life Insurance Company, Betty L. Gunter, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, PVC Government & High Quality Bond Account, Vistra Energy Corporation, Michael Cahill, Norman Byster, Randall Williams, East Bay Municipal Utility District, Atlantic Trading USA, LLC, Robert Furlong, Eric Friedman, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Federal National Mortgage Association, PFI Core Plus Bond I Fund, Axiom FX Investment Fund II, L.P., Brett Pankau, Louie Amabile, Elizabeth Lieberman, on behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated, The Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority, Richard Hershey, Stephanie Nagel, Nathan Weglarz, on behalf of plaintiffs and a class, Maidencreek Ventures II LP, John Monckton, Leigh E. Fobes, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, County of Riverside, AVP Properties, LLC, FTC Captial GMBH, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Axiom Investment Company Holdings L.P., PVC Money Market Account, Schwab Cash Reserves, Carl A. Payne, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated, Guaranty Bank and Trust Company, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Bucks County Water and Sewer Authority, David E. Sundstrom, in his official capcity as Treasurer of the County of Sonoma for and on behalf of the Sonoma County Tresury Pool Investment, Eduardo Restani, Ellen Gelboim, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, SEIU Pension Plans Master Trust, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, CEMA Joint Venture, Ronald Krug, PFI Equity Income Fund, Dennis Paul Fobes, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated, 303 Proprietary Trading LLC, National Credit Union Administration Board, as Liquidating Agent of U.S. Central Federal Credit Union, Western Corporate Federal Credit Union, Members United Corporate Federal Credit Union, Southwest Corporate Federal Credit Union, and Constitution C, Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund, Axiom FX Investment 2X Fund, L.P., Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc., Pension Trust for Operating Engineers, Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, Linda Zacher, Principal Financial Group, Inc., 33-35 Green Pond Road Associates, LLC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, PFI Global Diversified Income Fund, 303030 Trading LLC, PVC Short-Term Income Account, PFI Preferred Securities Fund, Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, formerly known as Dryden Core Investment Fund on behalf of Prudential Core Short-Term Bond Fund, County of Sonoma, Darby Financial Products, Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC, National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund, Triaxx Prime CDO 2007-1, Ltd., PFI High Yield Fund, PFI Money Market Fund, Gildor Management, LLC, Yale University, PFI Short-Term Income Fund, Fran P. Goldsleger, Direct Action Plaintiff, PVC Balanced Account, Ravan Invenstments, LLC, County of San Mateo, Axiom FX Investment Fund, L.P., PVC Income Account, City of New Britain Firefighters' and Police Benefit Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, FTC Futures Fund SICAV, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, The Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority, Marc Federighi, Linda Carr, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Kenneth W. Coker, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated, Joseph Amabile, Nathaniel Haynes, Principal Commercial Funding II, LLC, Prudential Core Taxable Money Market Fund, Margaret Lambert, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated, San Diego Association of Governments, Todd Augenbaum, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver, Triaxx Prime CDO 2006-1, Ltd., David Gough, Heather M. Earle, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated, Axiom HFT LLC, Metzler Investment GmbH, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated, Brian Haggerty, City of Dania Beach Police & Firefighters' Retirement System, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, Highlander Realty, LLC, Hawaii Annuity Trust Fund for Operating Engineers, Principal Financial Services, Inc., City of Riverside, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Schwab YieldPlus Fund and FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC, formerly known as Bear Stearns Bank PLC, Portigon/WestLB AG, Credit Suisse International, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Citigroup Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Barclays Capital (Cayman) Limited, Citizens Bank N.A., Bank of America Home Loans, Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, HSBC Finance Corp., Bank of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited, Societe Generale S.A., Barclays Capital Inc., UBS Limited, Societe Generale, Merrill Lynch International, HSBC Holdings PLC, UBS Securities LLC, ICAP PLC, J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp., Bank of America, N.A., UBS AG, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., Rabobank Group, Barclays Bank PLC, HSBC USA Inc., RBS Securities, Inc., Bank of Tokyo-Mistsubishi UFJ, HSBC Bank PLC, Bank of America Corporation, J.P. Morgan Markets Ltd., Bear Stearns Capital Markets, Inc., Citi Swapco Inc., Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Citizens Bank of Massachusetts, agent of RBS Citizens Bank, NA, JPMorgan Chase Bank, Robobank International, Does 1-10, inclusive, Portigon AG, Bank of America, National Association, National Association, HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., John Does 1-5, JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, RBS Citizens, N.A., incorrectly sued as the other Charter One Bank NA, FKA Citizens Bank of Massachusetts, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., Merrill Lynch & Co., JPMorgan & Co., Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc., UBS Group AG, Bank of Scotland PLC, Merrill Lynch International Bank, Ltd., Barclays U.S. Funding LLC, Citibank N.A., HBOS PLC, DB Group Services (UK) Limited, Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., Citigroup Funding Inc., Deutsche Bank Financial LLC, Credit Suisse Group, NA and RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Defendant / Appellee: BBA Libor, Ltd., Credit Suisse Group AG, Lloyds Bank PLC, FKA Lloyds TSB Bank PLC, BBA Enterprises, Ltd., Cooperative Rabobank U.A., WestLB AG, British Bankers' Association, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Norinchukin Bank, Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Royal Bank of Canada, Bank of Tokyo- Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd, WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG and Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: The Berkshire Bank, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated and Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico
Case Number: 20-1987
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Second Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Filing 179 STAY STATUS UPDATE LETTER, dated 10/28/2020, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, alerting court that the party has filed the motion for preliminary approval of the settlement with the district Court., RECEIVED. Service date 10/28/2020 by CM/ECF.[2962438] [20-1987]--[Edited 10/28/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/28/2020 01:25 PM]
October 27, 2020 Filing 177 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellee BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd., Bank of Tokyo- Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd, British Bankers' Association, Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., Credit Suisse Group AG, HBOS PLC, Lloyds Bank PLC, Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Royal Bank of Canada, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, The Norinchukin Bank, WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG and WestLB AG Brief due date as 12/22/2020, FILED.[2961015] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/27/2020 10:58 AM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 175 CAPTION, as per order dated 10/26/2020, AMENDED.[2960419] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/26/2020 04:18 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 174 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to amend caption [ # 166 ] filed by Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC, by RSP, FILED. [2960404][174] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/26/2020 04:13 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 171 CURED DEFECTIVE SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION[ # 169 ], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED.[2960149] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/26/2020 01:33 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 169 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, informing Court of proposed due date 12/22/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/26/2020 by CM/ECF.[2960082] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/26/2020 12:55 PM]
October 26, 2020 Filing 168 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, letter[159], on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED.[2959918] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/26/2020 11:14 AM]
October 23, 2020 Filing 166 MOTION, to amend caption, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC, FILED. Service date 10/23/2020 by CM/ECF. [2959126] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/23/2020 01:58 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 165 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG and WestLB AG, informing Court of proposed due date 12/22/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/19/2020 by CM/ECF.[2955504] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/19/2020 05:09 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 164 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to seal document [ # 117 ] filed by Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, by SJM, FILED. [2955397][164] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/19/2020 04:17 PM]
October 19, 2020 Filing 162 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd. and British Bankers' Association, informing Court of proposed due date 12/22/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2955335] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/19/2020 03:47 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 160 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd. and British Bankers' Association, in re: scheduling notification, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954517] [20-1987]--[Edited 10/26/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/16/2020 07:13 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 159 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, in re: scheduling notification, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954510] [20-1987]--[Edited 10/26/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/16/2020 06:31 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 158 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., informing Court of proposed due date 12/22/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954482] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/16/2020 05:43 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 157 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Bank of Tokyo- Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd, informing Court of proposed due date 12/22/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954435] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:56 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 156 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee HBOS PLC, Lloyds Bank PLC and Lloyds Banking Group PLC, informing Court of proposed due date 12/22/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954375] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/16/2020 04:20 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 155 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, informing Court of proposed due date 12/22/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954206] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/16/2020 02:44 PM]
October 16, 2020 Filing 154 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, informing Court of proposed due date 12/22/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2020 by CM/ECF.[2954169] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/16/2020 02:03 PM]
October 15, 2020 Filing 153 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, informing Court of proposed due date 12/22/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 10/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2953175] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/15/2020 02:23 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 152 ATTORNEY, Peter J. Mardian for The Norinchukin Bank, in case 20-1987 , [ # 151 ], ADDED.[2952277] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/14/2020 04:54 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 10/14/2020 by CM/ECF. [2952234] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/14/2020 04:34 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 149 CURED DEFECTIVE SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION[ # 148 ], on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED.[2951965] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/14/2020 02:30 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 148 SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [ # 117 ], on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 10/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2951925][148] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/14/2020 02:06 PM]
October 14, 2020 Filing 147 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, memorandum brief[146], on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED.[2951787] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/14/2020 12:57 PM]
October 13, 2020 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 10/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2951217] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/13/2020 09:49 PM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 145 ATTORNEYS, Brian J. Poronsky, Matthew Haws, Shannon Gross for Royal Bank of Canada RBC Capital Markets, LLC, in case 20-1987 , [ # 144 ], [ # 143 ], [ # 142 ], ADDED.[2945970] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:44 AM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 144 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 10/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2945948] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:33 AM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 10/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2945936] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:28 AM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 10/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2945929] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:23 AM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 141 ATTORNEY, Christian T. Kemnitz for Royal Bank of Canada RBC Capital Markets, LLC, in case 20-1987 , [ # 140 ], ADDED.[2945925] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:18 AM]
October 6, 2020 Filing 140 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 10/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2945920] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/06/2020 10:15 AM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 139 ATTORNEY, Michael Zbiegien, Jr., for Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, TERMINATED.[2945308] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/05/2020 02:12 PM]
October 5, 2020 Filing 138 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, in re: advising Court of withdrawing counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 10/05/2020 by CM/ECF.[2945214] [20-1987]--[Edited 10/05/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/05/2020 01:08 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 136 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Sealed Brief for Plaintiffs-Appellants, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by 3rd party.[2944373] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:53 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, for Sealed Appendix Volumes I - III, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by 3rd party.[2944371] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:52 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 134 SPECIAL APPENDIX, volume 3 of 3, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944367] [20-1987]--[Edited 10/05/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:51 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 133 SPECIAL APPENDIX, volume 2 of 3, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944362] [20-1987]--[Edited 10/05/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:49 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 132 SPECIAL APPENDIX, volume 1 of 3, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944357] [20-1987]--[Edited 10/05/2020 by JW] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:49 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 131 BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944356] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:47 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 130 APPENDIX, volume 12 of 12, (pp. 3201-3326), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944353] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:45 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 129 APPENDIX, volume 11 of 12, (pp. 3001-3200), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944348] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:44 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 128 APPENDIX, volume 10 of 12, (pp. 2701-3000), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944344] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:43 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 127 APPENDIX, volume 9 of 12, (pp. 2401-2700), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944341] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:41 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 126 APPENDIX, volume 8 of 12, (pp. 2101-2400), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944338] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:40 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 125 APPENDIX, volume 7 of 12, (pp. 1801-2100), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944335] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:38 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 124 APPENDIX, volume 6 of 12, (pp. 1501-1800), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944330] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:37 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 123 APPENDIX, volume 5 of 12, (pp. 1201-1500), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944324] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:34 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 122 APPENDIX, volume 4 of 12, (pp. 901-1200), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944321] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:32 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 121 APPENDIX, volume 3 of 12, (pp. 601-900), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944320] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:31 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 120 APPENDIX, volume 2 of 12, (pp. 301-600), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944316] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:28 PM]
October 2, 2020 Filing 119 APPENDIX, volume 1 of 12, (pp. 1-300), on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2944314] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/02/2020 03:27 PM]
October 1, 2020 Filing 117 MOTION, to seal document, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 10/01/2020 by CM/ECF. [2943618] [20-1987] [Entered: 10/01/2020 06:36 PM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 116 CERTIFIED ORDER, dated 09/28/2020, to SDNY (New York City), ISSUED.[2939480] [20-1987] [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:18 AM]
September 28, 2020 Filing 115 MOTION ORDER, granting motion to partially sever appeal as to Deutsche Bank, stay that portion of appeal and remand to the district court for approval of settlement and directing appellants to file stay status update letters [ # 111 ] filed by Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, by SLC, FILED. [2939470][115] [20-1987] [Entered: 09/28/2020 10:13 AM]
September 4, 2020 Filing 111 MOTION, for partial severance, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 09/04/2020 by CM/ECF. [2924716] [20-1987]--[Edited 09/08/2020 by JW] [Entered: 09/04/2020 04:46 PM]
September 2, 2020 Filing 110 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, in re: advising Court of firm address change, RECEIVED. Service date 09/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2922356] [20-1987]--[Edited 09/02/2020 by JW] [Entered: 09/02/2020 02:28 PM]
July 23, 2020 Filing 109 SO-ORDERED SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, setting Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank Brief due date as 10/02/2020. Joint Appendix due date as 10/02/2020, FILED.[2890991] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/23/2020 01:25 PM]
July 23, 2020 Filing 107 CAPTION, correcting "FKA Citizens Bank of Massachusetts" from appellees' listing, AMENDED.[2890780] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/23/2020 11:21 AM]
July 23, 2020 Filing 104 NEW CASE MANAGER, Jason Wang, ASSIGNED.[2890589] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/23/2020 09:42 AM]
July 22, 2020 Filing 102 LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, in re: advising Court of error in caption, RECEIVED. Service date 07/22/2020 by CM/ECF.[2890314] [20-1987]--[Edited 07/23/2020 by JW] [Entered: 07/22/2020 04:26 PM]
July 21, 2020 Filing 100 LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant The Berkshire Bank and Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, informing Court of proposed due date 10/02/2020, RECEIVED. Service date 07/21/2020 by CM/ECF.[2889230] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/21/2020 03:36 PM]
July 20, 2020 Filing 98 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Lloyds Bank PLC and HBOS PLC, FILED. Service date 07/20/2020 by CM/ECF.[2887795] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/20/2020 09:58 AM]
July 16, 2020 Filing 96 CAPTION, corrected and changed designations of several appellees to Defendants, AMENDED.[2886672] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/16/2020 06:31 PM]
July 16, 2020 Filing 94 ATTORNEY, Eric Jonathan Stock, for Appellee UBS Securities LLC, UBS Group AG, UBS Limited and UBS AG, TERMINATED.[2885681] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/16/2020 08:37 AM]
July 15, 2020 Filing 93 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee UBS AG, UBS Group AG, UBS Limited and UBS Securities LLC, informing the Court the UBS Entities entered into a class action settlement making the named defendants not apart of this appeal. Accordingly, they will not be participating and respectfully request to be removed as appellees from this appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 07/15/2020 by CM/ECF.[2885590] [20-1987]--[Edited 07/16/2020 by RW] [Entered: 07/15/2020 10:12 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 91 ATTORNEY, Jonathan D. Schiller, for Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays U.S. Funding LLC, TERMINATED.[2884429] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/14/2020 04:28 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 90 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Barclays U.S. Funding LLC, informing the Court the Barclay Entities were not defendants on the Lender Action, therefore, should not be parties on this appeal. Lastly, they inform they will not be paticipating and request to be removed from the caption on this appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 07/14/2020 by CM/ECF.[2884414] [20-1987]--[Edited 07/14/2020 by RW] [Entered: 07/14/2020 04:19 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 88 ATTORNEY, Debra A. Djupman, for Bank of America, National Association and Bank of America Home Loans, TERMINATED.[2884040] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:54 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 86 ATTORNEY, Benjamin Fleming for Lloyds Bank PLC, HBOS PLC, and Lloyds Banking Group PLC, in case 20-1987, [ # 82 ], ADDED.[2884016] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:44 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 85 ATTORNEY, Lisa J. Fried, [ # 81 ], in place of attorney Megan P. Davis, SUBSTITUTED.[2884008] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:41 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 84 ATTORNEY, Marc J. Gottridge, [ # 80 ], in place of attorney Benjamin Fleming, SUBSTITUTED.[2883997] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/14/2020 12:36 PM]
July 14, 2020 Filing 83 ATTORNEY, James Matthew Goodin, for Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corp., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. and HSBC USA Inc., TERMINATED.[2883853] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/14/2020 11:30 AM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Lloyds Bank PLC and HBOS PLC, FILED. Service date 07/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2883156] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:45 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Lloyds Bank PLC and HBOS PLC, FILED. Service date 07/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2883154] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:43 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Lloyds Bank PLC and HBOS PLC, FILED. Service date 07/13/2020 by CM/ECF. [2883148] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:39 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 79 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Lloyds Banking Group PLC, Lloyds Bank PLC and HBOS PLC, FILED. Service date 07/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2883140] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/13/2020 02:33 PM]
July 13, 2020 Filing 78 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee HSBC Bank PLC, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Finance Corp., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc. and HSBC USA Inc., informing the listed defendants are not appellees on this appeal and request the HSBC Entities removed as parites on the appeal,. They conferred with the appellant and consented to the correction., RECEIVED. Service date 07/13/2020 by CM/ECF.[2882558] [20-1987]--[Edited 07/14/2020 by RW] [Entered: 07/13/2020 10:18 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 77 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 76 ], on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED.[2881793] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 01:41 PM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 76 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881592] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 11:55 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 75 CURED DEFECTIVE ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, [ # 74 ], on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2881561] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 11:44 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 74 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881551] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 11:41 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 73 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [66], on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED.[2881544] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 11:38 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 72 DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Acknowledgment and Notice of Appearance, [71], on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED.[2881525] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 11:32 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 71 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee RBC Capital Markets, LLC and Royal Bank of Canada, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881478] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 11:15 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 70 ATTORNEY, Robert T. Smith, [ # 64 ], in place of attorney Christian T. Kemnitz, SUBSTITUTED.[2881467] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 11:08 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 69 ATTORNEY, Lilia B. Vazova for British Bankers' Association, BBA Enterprises, Ltd., and BBA Libor, Ltd., in case 20-1987, [ # 63 ], ADDED.[2881462] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 11:04 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 68 ATTORNEY, Richard D. Owens for British Bankers' Association, BBA Enterprises, Ltd., and BBA Libor, Ltd., in case 20-1987, [ # 62 ], ADDED.[2881457] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:59 AM]
July 10, 2020 Filing 67 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee WestLB AG and WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, FILED. Service date 07/10/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881435] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/10/2020 10:42 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 66 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881150] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 06:11 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Canada and RBC Capital Markets, LLC, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2881128] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:40 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd. and British Bankers' Association, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2881117] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:26 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd. and British Bankers' Association, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2881113] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:22 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 61 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd. and British Bankers' Association, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881109] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:18 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 60 ATTORNEY, Jamie Dycus for Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, in case 20-1987, [ # 59 ], ADDED.[2881099] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:09 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2881090] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:05 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 58 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2881085] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 05:01 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 57 ATTORNEY, Elizabeth Cassady for Bank of Tokyo-Mistsubishi UFJ Deutsche Bank AG, in case 20-1987, [ # 51 ], ADDED.[2881079] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 04:58 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 56 ATTORNEY, Mark D. Villaverde for Cooperative Rabobank U.A., in case 20-1987, [ # 48 ], ADDED.[2881059] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 04:48 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 55 ATTORNEY, Adam Mintz for Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 20-1987, [ # 47 ], ADDED.[2881054] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 04:46 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 54 ATTORNEY, Elai Katz for Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 20-1987, [ # 46 ], ADDED.[2881049] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 04:44 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 53 ATTORNEY, Herbert Scott Washer for Credit Suisse Group AG, in case 20-1987, [ # 45 ], ADDED.[2881047] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 04:43 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 52 ATTORNEY, Joel Kurtzberg, [ # 44 ], in place of attorney Arthur Joseph Burke, SUBSTITUTED.[2881045] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 04:40 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Bank of Tokyo- Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2880960] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 04:17 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 50 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Bank of Tokyo- Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2880945] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 04:13 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 49 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Deutsche Bank AG, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2880921] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 03:59 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperative Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2880720] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:29 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2880681] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:07 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2880677] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:06 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2880670] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:04 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Credit Suisse Group AG, FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2880666] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 02:02 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 43 ATTORNEY, John Joseph Hughes III for Cooperative Rabobank U.A, in case 20-1987 , [ # 41 ], ADDED.[2880588] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 01:17 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 42 ATTORNEY, Robert Charles Hora for Cooperative Rabobank U.A., in case 20-1987, [ # 40 ], ADDED.[2880583] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 01:16 PM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperative Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2880289] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 10:44 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperative Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF. [2880271] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 10:34 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 39 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cooperative Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/09/2020 by CM/ECF.[2880257] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 10:20 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 38 ATTORNEY, David R. Gelfand, [ # 33 ], in place of attorney Arthur Joseph Burke, SUBSTITUTED.[2880159] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 09:34 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY, Abram Ellis, for Bank of America Corporation, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., Royal Bank of Canada, Bank of America, N.A.., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, JPMorgan & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC, formerly known as Bear Stearns Bank PLC, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Bear Stearns Capital Markets, Inc., J.P. Morgan Markets Ltd., TERMINATED.[2880152] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 09:29 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY, Paul S. Mishkin, for Bank of America Corporation, TERMINATED.[2880141] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 09:23 AM]
July 9, 2020 Filing 35 ATTORNEY, Arthur Joseph Burke, for Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, UBS AG, UBS Limited, WestLB AG, Bank of Tokyo- Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd, Royal Bank of Canada, Societe Generale, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc, Barclays Capital Inc., HSBC Securities (USA) Inc., HSBC Bank USA, N.A, UBS Securities LLC, Bank of America, N.A., HSBC Bank PLC., WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG, Citigroup Inc., Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, JPMorgan & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, British Bankers' Association, BBA Enterprises, Ltd., BBA Libor, Ltd., Portigon AG, J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC, Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc., Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc., RBS Securities, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Citigroup Funding Inc., HSBC Finance Corp, HSBC USA Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co., Merrill Lynch International Bank, Ltd., Bear Stearns Capital Markets, Inc., Citi Swapco Inc., The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited., J.P. Morgan Markets Ltd., J.P. Morgan Markets Ltd., Bank of America, National Association, TERMINATED.[2880136] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/09/2020 09:20 AM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cooperative Rabobank U.A., FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2879988] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/08/2020 10:45 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 32 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC, J.P. Morgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association, J.P. Morgan Markets Ltd., J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Bear Stearns Capital Markets, Inc., JPMorgan & Co. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, informing the Court that the JP Morgan Entities should be removed as an appellee because the named entities were not named defendants in the Lender Action. Furthermore, other attorneys were inaccurately listed as counsel of record when Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP should be the only firm as counsel, RECEIVED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2879979] [20-1987]--[Edited 07/09/2020 by RW] [Entered: 07/08/2020 09:59 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 31 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Bank of America Corporation, informing the Court the Bank of America Entities should be removed from the caption as parties on the appeal. Furthermore, other attorneys were inaccurately designated as counsel for Bank of America Enttities when Davis & Polk Wardwell was the only firm representing them. Lastly, due to the settlement granted in the underlying action, they will not be participating on this appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF.[2879923] [20-1987]--[Edited 07/09/2020 by RW] [Entered: 07/08/2020 05:23 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 30 ATTORNEY, David S. Lesser, [ # 29 ], in place of attorney Andrea J. Robinson, SUBSTITUTED.[2879884] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/08/2020 04:51 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC, FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2879878] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/08/2020 04:48 PM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 27 ATTORNEY, Michael J. Wernke for The Berkshire Bank Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico, in case 20-1987, [ # 24 ], ADDED.[2879162] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/08/2020 11:18 AM]
July 8, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 07/08/2020 by CM/ECF. [2879023] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/08/2020 10:23 AM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 23 FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2878630] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/07/2020 05:52 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 22 FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2878627] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/07/2020 05:50 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2878593] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/07/2020 05:14 PM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 20 ATTORNEY, Thomas Andrew Paskowitz for The Norinchukin Bank, in case 20-1987, [ # 19 ], ADDED.[2877557] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/07/2020 10:14 AM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF. [2877507] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:53 AM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 18 ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/07/2020 by CM/ECF.[2877461] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/07/2020 09:36 AM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY, Andrew W. Stern for The Norinchukin Bank, in case 20-1987, [ # 15 ], ADDED.[2877363] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/07/2020 08:53 AM]
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY, Andrew A. Ruffino, for Appellee Citibank N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited and Citigroup Inc., TERMINATED.[2877359] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/07/2020 08:51 AM]
July 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee The Norinchukin Bank, FILED. Service date 07/06/2020 by CM/ECF. [2877108] [20-1987] [Entered: 07/06/2020 11:02 AM]
July 2, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Citibank N.A., Citigroup Financial Products, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Limited and Citigroup Inc., informing the Court the Citi entities are not parties on the appeal because a settlement was entered in the underlying case. Furthermore, they will not be participating as parties on the appeal, RECEIVED. Service date 07/02/2020 by CM/ECF.[2876938] [20-1987]--[Edited 07/07/2020 by RW] [Entered: 07/02/2020 05:22 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2871403] [20-1987] [Entered: 06/25/2020 06:34 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, district court receipt # ANYSDC-20385450, FILED.[2871402] [20-1987] [Entered: 06/25/2020 06:33 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 05/26/2020, RECEIVED.[2871401] [20-1987] [Entered: 06/25/2020 06:31 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 02/02/2017, RECEIVED.[2871400] [20-1987] [Entered: 06/25/2020 06:30 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 12/20/2016, RECEIVED.[2871399] [20-1987] [Entered: 06/25/2020 06:29 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 DISTRICT COURT MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 11/03/2020, RECEIVED.[2871398] [20-1987] [Entered: 06/25/2020 06:28 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 DISTRICT COURT AMENDED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, dated 10/20/2015, RECEIVED.[2871397] [20-1987] [Entered: 06/25/2020 06:27 PM]
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico and The Berkshire Bank, FILED. [2871392] [20-1987] [Entered: 06/25/2020 06:13 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: In Re: Libor-Based Financial
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence W. Gardner, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Klusendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiom Investment Advisors Holdings L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henryk Malinowski, on behalf of themsevles and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Bond Market Index Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Capital Interest Only I, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carpenters Pension Fund of West Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Regents of the University of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Pesa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salix Capital US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab YieldPlus Fund Liquidation Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Diversified Real Asset Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Total Bond Market Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gildor Family Advisors L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenwich Commons II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The San Mateo County Joint Powers Financing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Riverside Public Financing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Laydon, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Directors Financial Group, on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Bond & Mortgage Securities Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Federighi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Toll Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Directors Financial Group, individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab Worldwide Funds PLC, on behalf of its series Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Government & High Quality Bond Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto E. Calle Gracey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Weglarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey D. Buckley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Investor Money Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Direct Action Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVC Equity Income Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Variable Contracts Funds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ephraim F. Gildor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Court Associates II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtyard at Amwell II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Schwab & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Money Market Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Investments, on behalf of its former series Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund, Schwab Total Bond Market Fund, and Schwab Yieldplus Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cement Masons' International Association Employees' Trust Fund, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of Philadelphia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVC Bond & Mortgage Securities Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gildor Family Company L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Successor Agency to the Richmond Community Redevelopment Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiom Investment Advisors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Inflation Protection Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Funds, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Ventures International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Short-Term Bond Market Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance, as Receiver for Doral Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Community Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triaxx Prime CDO 2006-2 Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Public Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVC Asset Allocation Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charles Schwab Family of Funds, on behalf of its current or former series Schwab Money Market Fund, Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Retirement Advantage Money Fund, Schwab Investor Money Fund, Schwab Cash Reserves, and Schwab Advisor Ca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Real Estate Investors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Bell Adams, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Deogracias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Value Advantage Money Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Commercial Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raritan Commons, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiom Investment Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI High Yield Fund I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty L. Gunter, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVC Government & High Quality Bond Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vistra Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Byster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Bay Municipal Utility District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Trading USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Furlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Friedman, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Core Plus Bond I Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiom FX Investment Fund II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Pankau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louie Amabile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Lieberman, on behalf of themselves and all other similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Pennsylvania Intergovernmental Cooperation Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Hershey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Nagel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Weglarz, on behalf of plaintiffs and a class
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maidencreek Ventures II LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Monckton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh E. Fobes, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Riverside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AVP Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FTC Captial GMBH, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiom Investment Company Holdings L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVC Money Market Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab Cash Reserves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl A. Payne, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guaranty Bank and Trust Company, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bucks County Water and Sewer Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Sundstrom, in his official capcity as Treasurer of the County of Sonoma for and on behalf of the Sonoma County Tresury Pool Investment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Restani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellen Gelboim, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEIU Pension Plans Master Trust, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CEMA Joint Venture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Krug
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Equity Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Paul Fobes, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 303 Proprietary Trading LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Credit Union Administration Board, as Liquidating Agent of U.S. Central Federal Credit Union, Western Corporate Federal Credit Union, Members United Corporate Federal Credit Union, Southwest Corporate Federal Credit Union, and Constitution C
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab U.S. Dollar Liquid Assets Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiom FX Investment 2X Fund, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennie Stuart Medical Center, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust for Operating Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Zacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 33-35 Green Pond Road Associates, LLC, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Global Diversified Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 303030 Trading LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVC Short-Term Income Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Preferred Securities Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Investment Portfolios 2, formerly known as Dryden Core Investment Fund on behalf of Prudential Core Short-Term Bond Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darby Financial Products
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Competitive Electric Holdings Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Asbestos Workers Pension Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triaxx Prime CDO 2007-1, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI High Yield Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Money Market Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gildor Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yale University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PFI Short-Term Income Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran P. Goldsleger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Direct Action Plaintiff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVC Balanced Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ravan Invenstments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of San Mateo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiom FX Investment Fund, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PVC Income Account
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of New Britain Firefighters' and Police Benefit Fund, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FTC Futures Fund SICAV, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Richmond Joint Powers Financing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Federighi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Carr, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Coker, individually, and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Amabile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Commercial Funding II, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prudential Core Taxable Money Market Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Lambert, on behalf of herself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Association of Governments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Augenbaum, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Triaxx Prime CDO 2006-1, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather M. Earle, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Axiom HFT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metzler Investment GmbH, on behalf of itself and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Haggerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Dania Beach Police & Firefighters' Retirement System, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Highlander Realty, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Annuity Trust Fund for Operating Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Principal Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Riverside
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schwab YieldPlus Fund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FTC Futures Fund PCC Ltd, on behalf of themselves and all others similarly situated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Bank Dublin PLC, formerly known as Bear Stearns Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portigon/WestLB AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital (Cayman) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Financial Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Finance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The HongKong and Shanghai Banking Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Generale S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Societe Generale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Holdings PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ICAP PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rabobank Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC USA Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Tokyo-Mistsubishi UFJ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Markets Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bear Stearns Capital Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Swapco Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds TSB Bank PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank of Massachusetts, agent of RBS Citizens Bank, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robobank International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portigon AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Securities (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBS Citizens, N.A., incorrectly sued as the other Charter One Bank NA, FKA Citizens Bank of Massachusetts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Group AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Scotland PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch International Bank, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays U.S. Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBOS PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Group Services (UK) Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cooperative Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Funding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Group, NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Represented By: Christian T. Kemnitz Esq.
Represented By: Robert Thomas Smith Esq.
Represented By: Shannon Gross Esq.
Represented By: Brian J. Poronsky Esq.
Represented By: Matthew Haws Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BBA Libor, Ltd.
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Richard D. Owens
Represented By: Lilia B. Vazova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Credit Suisse Group AG
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Elai Katz Esq.
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer Esq.
Represented By: Joel Kurtzberg
Represented By: Adam Mintz Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lloyds Bank PLC, FKA Lloyds TSB Bank PLC
Represented By: Lisa J. Fried
Represented By: Benjamin Fleming
Represented By: Marc J. Gottridge Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BBA Enterprises, Ltd.
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Richard D. Owens
Represented By: Lilia B. Vazova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cooperative Rabobank U.A.
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WestLB AG
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Martin Paparella
Represented By: Marc Alan Weinstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: British Bankers' Association
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Jeff G. Hammel
Represented By: Richard D. Owens
Represented By: Lilia B. Vazova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Royal Bank of Scotland Group PLC
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Robert G. Houck Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Zbiegien Esq. Jr.
Represented By: Andrea J. Robinson Esq.
Represented By: Jamie Dycus Esq.
Represented By: David Sapir Lesser Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: The Norinchukin Bank
Represented By: Alan M. Unger Esq.
Represented By: Thomas Andrew Paskowitz Esq.
Represented By: Andrew W. Stern Esq.
Represented By: Peter J. Mardian Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Lloyds Banking Group PLC
Represented By: Benjamin Fleming
Represented By: Megan P. Davis Esq.
Represented By: Lisa J. Fried
Represented By: Marc J. Gottridge Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: Aidan Synnott Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Cassady Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Royal Bank of Canada
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Abram Ellis Esq.
Represented By: Christian T. Kemnitz Esq.
Represented By: Robert Thomas Smith Esq.
Represented By: Shannon Gross Esq.
Represented By: Brian J. Poronsky Esq.
Represented By: Matthew Haws Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bank of Tokyo- Mitsubishi UFJ Ltd
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Michael Viapiano Esq.
Represented By: Elizabeth Cassady Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WestDeutsche ImmobilienBank AG
Represented By: Arthur Joseph Burke Esq.
Represented By: Christopher Martin Paparella
Represented By: Marc Alan Weinstein Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Cooperatieve Rabobank U.A.
Represented By: John Joseph Hughes Esq. III
Represented By: Mark D. Villaverde Esq.
Represented By: Robert Charles Hora Esq.
Represented By: David R. Gelfand Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: The Berkshire Bank, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: Government Development Bank for Puerto Rico
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman Esq.
Represented By: Michael J. Wernke Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?