Robert Sanfiel v. Superintendent Retreat SCI, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY BERKS COUNTY, ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA and SUPERINTENDENT RETREAT SCI
Plaintiff / Appellant: ROBERT SANFIEL
Case Number: 19-3747
Filed: November 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Kenneth W. Kelecic on behalf of Appellee(s) District Attorney of Berks County. [19-3747] (KWK) [Entered: 12/04/2019 02:24 PM]
December 2, 2019 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (NF) [Entered: 12/02/2019 02:23 PM]
November 29, 2019 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CLW) [Entered: 11/29/2019 11:26 AM]
November 29, 2019 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Robert Sanfiel in District Court No. 2-18-cv-04435. (CLW) [Entered: 11/29/2019 11:23 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Sanfiel v. Superintendent Retreat SCI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DISTRICT ATTORNEY BERKS COUNTY
Represented By: Matthew A. Thren Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth W. Kelecic Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Matthew A. Thren Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth W. Kelecic Esq.
Represented By: Ronald Eisenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUPERINTENDENT RETREAT SCI
Represented By: Matthew A. Thren Esq.
Represented By: Kenneth W. Kelecic Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT SANFIEL
Represented By: Robert Sanfiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?