Darryl Newkirk v. Superintendent Huntingdon SCI, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DARRYL NEWKIRK
Defendant / Appellee: SUPERINTENDENT HUNTINGDON SCI, SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA
Case Number: 21-1739
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Third Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Filing 7 ECF FILER: ENTRY OF APPEARANCE from Jeffrey M. Paladina, Esq. on behalf of Appellee(s) Kevin Kauffman, Superintendent of SCI-Huntingdon; John Wetzel, Secretary of Corrections. [21-1739] (JP) [Entered: 05/27/2021 11:14 AM]
May 27, 2021 Filing 6 FOLLOW UP LETTER to Attorney General Pennsylvania for Attorney General Pennsylvania, Ronald Eisenberg, Esq. for Attorney General Pennsylvania and Jeffrey Paladina, Esq. for Superintendent Huntingdon SCI and Secretary Pennsylvania Department of Corrections requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 06/03/2021.. (JK) [Entered: 05/27/2021 10:54 AM]
May 21, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION filed by Appellant Darryl Newkirk for Certificate of Appealability. Certificate of Service dated 05/12/2021. Service made by US mail. (JK) [Entered: 05/27/2021 10:48 AM]
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 Document filed by Appellant Darryl Newkirk in reference to the fiing of an Application for Certificate of Appealability.. (JK) [Entered: 05/05/2021 05:57 PM]
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 LEGAL DIVISION LETTER SENT advising that the case will be submitted to a panel of this Court for a decision on the issuance of certificate of appealability. (SH) [Entered: 04/23/2021 01:31 PM]
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) [Entered: 04/20/2021 02:10 PM]
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Darryl Newkirk in District Court No. 4-21-cv-00088. (JK) [Entered: 04/20/2021 02:05 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Darryl Newkirk v. Superintendent Huntingdon SCI, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARRYL NEWKIRK
Represented By: Darryl Newkirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SUPERINTENDENT HUNTINGDON SCI
Represented By: Jeffrey Paladina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SECRETARY PENNSYLVANIA DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Represented By: Jeffrey Paladina Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ATTORNEY GENERAL PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Attorney General Pennsylvania
Represented By: Ronald Eisenberg Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?