In re: Under Seal Featured Case

: In re: UNDER SEAL
Plaintiff - Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Party-in-Interest - Appellant: UNDER SEAL
Case Number: 13-4625
Filed: August 29, 2013
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date FiledDescription
April 16, 2014 Summary United States v. Lavabit, LLC, et al.

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 8, 2014 68 Mandate issued. Referencing: [67] Judgment Order , [66] Published Authored Opinion. Originating case number: 1:13-sw-00522-CMH-1,1:13-dm-00022-CMH-1.. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
April 16, 2014 67 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 13-4625 opn.p.arg 13-4626 opn.p.arg. Decision: Affirmed. Originating case number: 1:13-sw-00522-CMH-1,1:13-dm-00022-CMH-1. Entered on Docket Date: 04/16/2014. [999337221] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
April 16, 2014 66 Featured Case PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:13-sw-00522-CMH-1,1:13-dm-00022-CMH-1. [999337217]. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
January 28, 2014 65 ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable Paul V. Niemeyer, Roger L. Gregory and G. Steven Agee. Attorneys arguing case: Ian James Samuel for Appellants Ladar Levison and Lavabit LLC and Andrew Peterson for Appellee US in 13-4625. Courtroom Deputy: Judith Evans. [999286324] [13-4625, 13-4626] (JLE)
January 10, 2014 64 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Lavabit LLC and Ladar Levison in 13-4625, 13-4626 to to court inquiry [61],notice requesting response [61]. [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
January 10, 2014 63 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Appellee US in 13-4626. [999275405]. [13-4625, 13-4626] Andrew Peterson
January 10, 2014 62 RESPONSE/ANSWER by US in 13-4626 to to court inquiry [61],notice requesting response [61]. [13-4625, 13-4626] Andrew Peterson
January 9, 2014 61 NOTICE ISSUED to Ian James Samuel for Ladar Levison and Lavabit LLC and Andrew Peterson for US in 13-4625, 13-4626 requesting response to court inquiry. [999274295].. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
January 8, 2014 60 COURT ORDER filed [999273484] denying Motion to participate in oral argument [59] Copies to all parties. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
December 18, 2013 Appendix [27] released to public. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
December 18, 2013 59 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellant Empeopled, LLC. in 13-4625 to participate in oral argument. Date and method of service: 12/18/2013 ecf. [999262060] [13-4625, 13-4626] Mahesha Subbaraman
December 12, 2013 58 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Lavabit LLC and Ladar Levison in 13-4625, 13-4626. Counsel arguing: Ian Samuel [999258085] [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
December 2, 2013 57 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 01/28/2014. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [13-4625, 13-4626] (JLC)
November 26, 2013 56 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee US in 13-4625, 13-4626. [999248388] [13-4625, 13-4626] Andrew Peterson
November 22, 2013 55 REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Lavabit LLC and Ladar Levison in 13-4625, 13-4626. Number of pages: [34]. Sufficient: YES. Entered on Docket Date: 11/25/2013. [999247279] [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
November 22, 2013 54 BRIEF by Appellants Under Seal and Under Seal 2 in 13-4625, 13-4626 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Reply. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/22/2013. [999246078] [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
November 15, 2013 52 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by David W. Warrington for Under Seal in 13-4625.[999240738] [13-4625, 13-4626] David Warrington
November 12, 2013 53 RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of US in 13-4625, 13-4626. Number of pages: [61]. Sufficient: YES. Entered on Docket Date: 11/19/2013. [999242950] [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
November 12, 2013 51 BRIEF by Appellee US in 13-4625, 13-4626 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/13/2013. [999238407] [13-4625, 13-4626] Andrew Peterson
November 12, 2013 50 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Andrew Peterson for US in 13-4625, 13-4626.[999238016] [13-4625, 13-4626] Andrew Peterson
November 8, 2013 49 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 1/28/14 - 1/30/14 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 11/18/2013 [13-4625, 13-4626] (JLC)
November 8, 2013 48 RESPONSE/ANSWER by US in 13-4625, 13-4626 Michael P. Ben'Ary to notice requesting response [43]. [13-4625, 13-4626] Michael Ben'Ary
October 30, 2013 47 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Under Seal and Under Seal 2 in 13-4625, 13-4626 to notice requesting response [43]. [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 29, 2013 43 NOTICE ISSUED to Jesse Ryan Binnall for Under Seal 2 and Under Seal, Marcia C. Hofmann for Under Seal 2 and Under Seal, Mr. Laurin Howard Mills for Under Seal 2 and Under Seal, Ian James Samuel for Under Seal 2 and Under Seal, David Alan Warrington for Under Seal 2 and Under Seal, Mr. Michael Phillip Ben'Ary for US and Mr. James L. Trump for US in 13-4625, 13-4626 requesting response to inquiry. Responses due 11/08/2013. [999229040].. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 25, 2013 42 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amici Supporting Appellant ACLU and ACLU VA in 13-4625, 13-4626. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999226636] [13-4625, 13-4626] Alexander Abdo
October 25, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER filed [999226627] granting filing of amicus curiae brief by American Civl Liberties Union and American Civil Liberties Union of Virginia (FRAP 29(e)) Copies to all parties.. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 25, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER filed [999226623] granting filing of amicus curiae brief by Empeopled, LLC (FRAP 29(e)) Copies to all parties. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 25, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER filed [999226618] granting filing of amicus curiae brief by Electronic Frontier Foundation (FRAP 29(e)) Copies to all parties. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 24, 2013 46 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Empeopled, LLC. in 13-4625, 13-4626. Number of pages: [46]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/29/2013.[999229418] [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 24, 2013 45 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of EEF in 13-4625, 13-4626. Number of pages: [40]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/29/2013.[999229412] [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 24, 2013 44 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of ACLU and ACLU VA in 13-4625, 13-4626. Number of pages: [36]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/29/2013.[999229404] [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 24, 2013 38 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Empeopled, LLC in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/25/2013. [999226270] [13-4625, 13-4626] Mahesha Subbaraman
October 24, 2013 37 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union of Virginia Foundation, Inc., Amici Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/25/2013. [999226269] [13-4625, 13-4626] Alexander Abdo
October 24, 2013 36 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Kurt Opsahl for Amicus Curiae Electronic Frontier Foundation in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/25/2013. [999226267] [13-4625, 13-4626] Kurt Opsahl
October 24, 2013 35 -- DOCUMENT STRUCK --APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) [13-4625, 13-4626]--[Edited 10/25/2013 by RW] Kurt Opsahl
October 17, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER filed [999220678] sealing Joint Appendix Volume Two and Sealed Opening Brief. Copies to all parties.. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 11, 2013 30 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Laurin H. Mills for Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626.[999217020] [13-4625, 13-4626] Laurin Mills
October 10, 2013 33 APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Under Seal and Under Seal 2 in 13-4625, 13-4626. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 2. Total number of pages in all volumes: 181. Total number of sealed volumes: 1. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Entered on Docket Date: 10/17/2013. [999220614] [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 10, 2013 32 SEALED BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Under Seal and Under Seal 2 in 13-4625, 13-4626. Type of Brief: Opening Number of pages: [43]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/17/2013. [999220608] [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 10, 2013 31 Redacted OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Under Seal and Under Seal 2 in 13-4625, 13-4626. Number of pages: [43]. Sufficient: YES. Entered on Docket Date: 10/17/2013. [999220605] [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 10, 2013 29 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: JA Vol II of II. [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 10, 2013 28 SEALED APPENDIX VOLUME(S) by Appellant Under Seal in 13-4625, Appellee US in 13-4626 in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to court: 10/10/2013.. Filed Ex parte: N. [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 10, 2013 27 FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 10/10/2011. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? No. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999216730] [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 10, 2013 26 BRIEF by Appellant Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/10/2013. [999216727] [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 10, 2013 25 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Brief of Appellant. [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 10, 2013 24 SEALED BRIEF by Appellant Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626 in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to court: 10/10/2013.. Filed Ex parte: N. [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 9, 2013 23 COURT ORDER filed [999214882] denying Motion to unseal [12]; granting Motion to extend filing time [12] Copies to all parties., updating briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 11/12/2013 Copies to all parties. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 7, 2013 22 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Ian Samuel for Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626.[999209890] [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 3, 2013 21 RESPONSE/ANSWER by US in 13-4625, 13-4626 to notice requesting response [13]. Nature of response: in opposition. [13-4625, 13-4626] James Trump
October 2, 2013 20 Featured Case ORDER filed [999207481] granting Motion to extend filing time [19], updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/10/2013. Response brief due 11/04/2013. Copies to all parties.. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
October 2, 2013 19 MOTION by Appellant Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626 to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 10/10/2013. Date and method of service: 10/02/2013 ecf, US mail. [999207401] [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 2, 2013 18 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Motion to Extend Time. [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 2, 2013 17 SEALED DOCUMENT by Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626. Document type: MOTION to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix until 10/10/2013. Date and manner of service: 10/02/2013 ecf, US mail. Filed Ex parte: N. [999207395] [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
October 2, 2013 16 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Marcia Hofmann for Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626.[999207037] [13-4625, 13-4626] Marcia Hofmann
September 27, 2013 15 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by US in 13-4625, 13-4626. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Sealed Document by US filed 09/27/2013. [13-4625, 13-4626] James Trump
September 27, 2013 14 SEALED DOCUMENT by US in 13-4625, 13-4626. Document type: RESPONSE. Date and manner of service: 09/27/2013 US mail. Filed Ex parte: N. [999203761] [13-4625, 13-4626] James Trump
September 25, 2013 13 NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Michael Phillip Ben'Ary for US and Mr. James L. Trump for US in 13-4625 requesting response to Motion to unseal [12], Motion to extend filing time for amicus curiae briefs [12]Response due: 10/02/2013.[999201188].. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
September 24, 2013 12 MOTION by Appellant Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626 to unseal portion of record., to extend filing time for Amicus Curiae Briefs until 10/31/2013. Date and method of service: 09/24/2013 US mail, ecf. [999200859] [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
September 13, 2013 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Michael P. Ben'Ary for US in 13-4625, 13-4626.[999193530] [13-4625, 13-4626] Michael Ben'Ary
September 13, 2013 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by James L. Trump for US in 13-4625, 13-4626.[999193476] [13-4625, 13-4626] James Trump
September 13, 2013 9 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Under Seal. [13-4625] Jesse Binnall
September 13, 2013 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jesse R. Binnall for Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626.[999192969] [13-4625, 13-4626] Jesse Binnall
September 12, 2013 7 SEALED DOCUMENT by Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626. Document type: DOCKETING STATEMENT. Date and manner of service: 09/12/2013 US mail. Filed Ex parte: N. [999192703] [13-4625, 13-4626]--[Edited 09/13/2013 by RW] Jesse Binnall
September 12, 2013 6 --DOCKET ENTRY STRUCK--SEALED DOCUMENT by Under Seal in 13-4625, 13-4626. Document type: OTHER DOCUMENT. Date and manner of service: 09/12/2013 US mail. Filed Ex parte: N. [999192700] [13-4625, 13-4626]--[Edited 09/13/2013 by RW] Jesse Binnall
August 29, 2013 5 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening brief and appendix due 10/03/2013. Response brief due 10/28/2013 [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
August 29, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER filed [999183250] sealing district court case opening documents. Copies to all parties. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
August 29, 2013 3 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed , [999183217-2] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:13-sw-00522-CMH-1,1:13-dm-00022-CMH-1.. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
August 29, 2013 2 Featured Case ORDER filed [999183226] consolidating case 13-4626 with 13-4625. Copies to all parties.. [13-4625, 13-4626] (RW)
August 29, 2013 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:13-sw-00522-CMH-1. Case manager: RWarren. [13-4625] (RW)

Search for this case: In re: Under Seal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Represented By:
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff - appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Michael Phillip Ben'Ary
Represented By: James L. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Party-in-interest - appellant: UNDER SEAL
Represented By: Jesse Ryan Binnall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?