Gerard Morrison v. County of Fairfax, VA
Plaintiff: GARY DIZE
Plaintiff / Appellant: TRACY CRAWFORD, BRADFORD COCHRANE, JR., ROBERT LISON, LORENZO THROWER, PAUL MASIELLO, OSCAR WELLS, LEO BURT, BRYAN NIX, JR., RAMIRO GALVEZ, STEPHEN O'BRIEN, STEVEN CLARK, STEPHEN MILLER, JOHN PETERS, JAMES STICKLEN, ROBERT MOHLER, ROBERT BURLINGAME, WESLEY GRIGG, MICHAEL FONTANA, KIT HESSEL, MICHAEL CIARROCCHI, STEVEN MCFARLAND, THOMAS JOHNSON, KENNETH WILDMAN, ROGER MCGEHEE, JAMES LEE, MARCUS WILLIAMS, E. MARTIN RANCK, III, THOMAS CONNOLLY, KENNETH GEFFEN, COREY MATTHEWS, ANTHONY JACKSON, NATALIE ROBB, JOHN HIGGINBOTHAM, MICHAEL ISTVAN, MERVIN BARRERA, GARY PEMBERTON, BRIAN EDMONSTON, JOHN MORRIS, WILLIAM SCHELLHAMMER, III, RONALD KULEY, JOHN CHESEK, JR., MICHAEL FISCHER, CARLTON BURKHAMMER, JOSPEH PALAU, III, MICHAEL DAVIS, RICHARD MCKINNEY, JR., WAYNE WENTZEL, KEITH CERZULLO, CHRISTOPHER THOMPSON, JAMES ISTVAN, JAMES JOHNSON, THOMAS MAYHEW, PAUL WHITE, WALTER JOHNSON, JACK WALMER, JR., JOSPEH KISER, ROCCO ALVARO, KEVIN EDWARDS, SEAN EVANS, DAVID TOBIN, MATHEW BARNHART, JON BRULEY, RICHARD LANCING, REGINALD JOHNSON, DAVID GRUENDEL, DAVID CONRAD, CHRISTOPHER TILLES, WILLIAM BEST, JR., CHERI STROUP, WILLIAM KINGDON, CLYDE BUCHANAN, RAYMOND GRIFFIN, MARK FEASTER, MARK MENTON, DAVID SCHWARZMANN, JOSEPH KALEDA, THOMAS FLINT, JEROME WILLIAMS, JAMES IACONE, TRENTON HOUGHTON, GEORGE GONZALEZ, BARRY MAHAM, RONALD SYDNOR, KEITH DUBETSKY, DENNIS PASSMORE, GREGORY HUNTER, TONY KOSTECKA, DAVID SELLERS, MATTHEW LOPEZ, JAMES HOBGOOD, THOMAS WEALAND, RICHARD MOXLEY, FELECIA EDWARDS, JOHN WALSER, BARRY RATHBONE, ARTHUR COX, MILTON PAINTER, MARK GUDITUS, DEREK EDWARDS, GLENN MASON, JEFFREY MONGOLD, CALVIN ALEXANDER, JOSEPH MERRITT, JR., DAVID LANGE, ELTON WRIGHT, DANIEL BORDEN, JR., MATTHEW RYAN, RONNIE RODRIGUEZ, EDWARD BOWMAN, RICHARD SMITH, JOSEPH KNERR, BILL BETZ, ERIC CUNNINGHAM, MICHAEL ALLEN, LEROY BUTLER, JR., CHARLES CUNNINGHAM, KENDALL THOMPSON, JAMES HARRISON, III, PATRICK KELLY, STEVEN NORRIS, DONALD BRASFIELD, ROBERT KITCHEN, THOMAS ARNOLD, FRED BRANDELL, JAMES A. SOBOTA, COLIN FLANIGAN, TODD GORHAM, GERARD MORRISON, REX STRICKLAND, DONALD VAUGHT, CHARLES PULLEN, SAMUEL GRAY, MARK SCHROEDER, DAVID HALL, DONALD MONTAGUE, OSCAR BEASLEY, REBECCA KELLY, FRANCIS MENSAH, MICHAEL SNAPP, GLENN KAPLAN, CHRISTOPHER BROWN, DANIEL SHAW, JOHN RICHTER, DUSTIN CRAMER, WILLIAM VANNOY, JOHN NIEMIEC, SCOTT SMITH, KEITH CROSS, BRIAN MORAVITZ, KIMBERLY HOOD, WILLIAM ATWELL, CHARLES MARTIN, ROBERT KONCZAL, TIMOTHY BARB, TODD BARB, GLENN TSCHANN, MICHAEL WHETSELL, DALLAS PHILLIPS, JEFFREY LEWIS, MATTHEW BURNS, MICHAEL MARKS, JAMES MASIELLO, CHARLES HENDERSON, ROBERT BANASIK, MICHAEL GARCIA, TROY DEAN, KERWIN MCNAMARA, JOHN LEETE, SAMUEL DEVERA, MICHAEL SEASE, II, JEFFREY TOLLE, ELTON POLEN, JR., SHERYL HEMINGWAY, WILLIAM LYNCH, YOLANDA DEMARK, DANNY DANIELS, II, JARED GOFF and RALPH PISANI
Defendant / Appellee: COUNTY OF FAIRFAX, VA
Amicus Curiae: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Case Number: 14-2308
Filed: December 2, 2014
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2016 Filing 75 Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 71 ] Judgment Order , [ # 70 ] Published Authored Opinion. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-00005-CMH-JFA.. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 07/27/2016 07:56 AM]
July 19, 2016 Filing 74 COURT ORDER filed [999891257] denying Motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc [ # 72 ] Copies to all parties.. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 07/19/2016 10:30 AM]
July 5, 2016 Filing 73 Mandate stayed by FRAP 41(d)(1) pending ruling on petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc.. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 07/05/2016 02:23 PM]
July 5, 2016 Filing 72 PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc by Appellee County of Fairfax. [14-2308] Sona Rewari [Entered: 07/05/2016 01:29 PM]
June 21, 2016 Filing 71 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 14-2308 opn.p.arg. Decision: Reversed and remanded. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-00005-CMH-JFA. Entered on Docket Date: 06/21/2016. [999860870] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [14-2308] DL [Entered: 06/21/2016 09:18 AM]
June 21, 2016 Filing 70 PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-00005-CMH-JFA. [999860852]. [14-2308] DL [Entered: 06/21/2016 09:13 AM]
January 27, 2016 Filing 69 ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable William B. Traxler, Jr., Stephanie D. Thacker and Pamela A. Harris. Attorneys arguing case: Sarah Kay Marcus for Amicus Curiae United States Department of Labor, Molly A. Elkin for Appellants Jerome Williams, Patrick Kelly, Jeffrey Lewis, Marcus Williams, David Hall, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Paul White, Charles Cunningham, Kevin Edwards, James Johnson, James Lee, John Morris, Reginald Johnson, Stephen Miller, Walter Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Christopher Brown, John Walser, Raymond Griffin, John Peters, Daniel Shaw, Michael Allen, Christopher Thompson, Elton Polen, Jr., Calvin Alexander, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, Michael Istvan, James Istvan, Anthony Jackson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, John Leete, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Kenneth Wildman, Elton Wright and Gerard Morrison and Sona Rewari for Appellee County of Fairfax. Courtroom Deputy: RJ Warren. [999742937] [14-2308] RW [Entered: 01/27/2016 01:36 PM]
December 18, 2015 Filing 68 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Amicus Curiae United States Department of Labor. Counsel arguing: Sarah Marcus Opening argument time: 5 [999721720] [14-2308] Sarah Marcus [Entered: 12/18/2015 06:27 PM]
December 17, 2015 Filing 67 COURT ORDER filed [999720754] granting Motion to participate in oral argument [ # 60 ] Copies to all parties.. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 12/17/2015 04:05 PM]
December 8, 2015 Filing 65 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of County of Fairfax. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [8]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/08/2015. [999714513] [14-2308] BHR [Entered: 12/08/2015 01:17 PM]
December 7, 2015 Filing 66 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright. Number of pages: [28]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/09/2015. [999715274] [14-2308] DL [Entered: 12/09/2015 11:27 AM]
December 7, 2015 Filing 64 BRIEF by Appellants Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/08/2015. [999713950] [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 12/07/2015 05:04 PM]
December 7, 2015 Filing 63 BRIEF by Appellee County of Fairfax in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/08/2015. [999713831] [14-2308] Sona Rewari [Entered: 12/07/2015 03:39 PM]
December 1, 2015 Filing 62 Notice issued re: sup.brs.. . [14-2308] TF [Entered: 12/01/2015 03:18 PM]
December 1, 2015 Filing 61 RESPONSE/ANSWER by County of Fairfax to Motion to participate in oral argument [ # 60 ]. [14-2308] Sona Rewari [Entered: 12/01/2015 12:12 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 60 MOTION by Amicus Curiae United States Department of Labor to participate in oral argument. Date and method of service: 11/30/2015 ecf. [999708807] [14-2308] Sarah Marcus [Entered: 11/30/2015 04:12 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 59 Additional copies of AMICUS BRIEF BRIEF received from United States Department of Labor. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 11/30/2015 02:59 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 58 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright. Counsel arguing: Molly A. Elkin Opening argument time: 15 minutes Rebuttal argument time: 5 minutes [999708168] [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 11/30/2015 12:14 PM]
November 25, 2015 Filing 57 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee County of Fairfax. Counsel arguing: Sona Rewari [999707475] [14-2308] Sona Rewari [Entered: 11/25/2015 02:56 PM]
November 24, 2015 Filing 56 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 01/27/2016. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [14-2308] JLC [Entered: 11/24/2015 03:34 PM]
November 24, 2015 Filing 55 COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to United States Department of Labor requesting additional copies of brief(s).. Additional copies due 11/30/2015 [14-2308] TF [Entered: 11/24/2015 02:45 PM]
November 23, 2015 Filing 54 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of United States Department of Labor. Number of pages: [61]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/24/2015.[999706333] [14-2308] TF [Entered: 11/24/2015 02:45 PM]
November 23, 2015 Filing 53 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Curiae United States Department of Labor in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/23/2015. [999705394] [14-2308] Sarah Marcus [Entered: 11/23/2015 05:01 PM]
November 19, 2015 Filing 52 NOTICE RE: CONFLICT WITH PROPOSED ARGUMENT DATES by Amicus Curiae United States Department of Labor. Argument Session: 01/16 Days you are available: 1/27/16, 1/28/16 [14-2308] Sarah Marcus [Entered: 11/19/2015 06:18 PM]
November 19, 2015 Filing 51 COURT ORDER filed [999702759] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 47 ] Copies to all parties.; granting Motion to continue/reschedule oral argument (Local Rule 34(c)) [ # 47 ], updating/ resuming supplemental briefing order deadlines Supplemental Opening Brief due 12/07/2015. Supplemental Response Brief due 12/07/2015 Copies to all parties.. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 11/19/2015 02:17 PM]
November 19, 2015 Filing 50 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 1/26/16 - 1/28/16 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 11/20/2015 [14-2308] JLC [Entered: 11/19/2015 11:32 AM]
November 17, 2015 Filing 49 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright to notice requesting response [ # 48 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 11/17/2015 03:27 PM]
November 16, 2015 Filing 48 NOTICE ISSUED to Molly A. Elkin for Jerome Williams, Patrick Kelly, Jeffrey Lewis, Marcus Williams, David Hall, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Paul White, Charles Cunningham, Kevin Edwards, James Johnson, James Lee, John Morris, Reginald Johnson, Stephen Miller, Walter Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Christopher Brown, John Walser, Raymond Griffin, John Peters, Daniel Shaw, Michael Allen, Christopher Thompson, Elton Polen, Jr., Calvin Alexander, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, Michael Istvan, James Istvan, Anthony Jackson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, John Leete, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Kenneth Wildman, Elton Wright and Gerard Morrison requesting response to Motion to continue/reschedule oral argument (Local Rule 34(c)) [ # 47 ], Motion to extend filing time [ # 47 ]Response due: 11/18/2015 Noon..[999700044].. [14-2308] RHS [Entered: 11/16/2015 05:09 PM]
November 16, 2015 Filing 47 MOTION by Appellee County of Fairfax to extend filing time for response/reply brief, to continue/reschedule oral argument (Local Rule 34(c)). Date and method of service: 11/16/2015 ecf. [999699852] [14-2308] Evangeline Paschal [Entered: 11/16/2015 03:02 PM]
November 13, 2015 Filing 46 COURT ORDER filed [999699087] granting Motion to exceed length limitations [ # 45 ] Copies to all parties.. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 11/13/2015 03:05 PM]
November 4, 2015 Filing 45 MOTION by Amicus Curiae United States Department of Labor to exceed length limitations for brief. Date and method of service: 11/04/2015 ecf. [999693384] [14-2308] Sarah Marcus [Entered: 11/04/2015 06:14 PM]
October 8, 2015 Filing 44 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee County of Fairfax. Counsel arguing: Sona Rewari Counsel present but not arguing in criminal case: Evangeline Paschal [999674973] [14-2308] Sona Rewari [Entered: 10/08/2015 02:33 PM]
October 7, 2015 Filing 43 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellants Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright. [999674308] [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 10/07/2015 04:03 PM]
October 7, 2015 Filing 42 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 12/10/2015. Registration Time: 7:45 - 8:00 a.m.. Daily Arguments Begin: 8:30 a.m.. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [14-2308] JLE [Entered: 10/07/2015 01:59 PM]
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER filed [999659492] granting transmittal of electronic and paper versions of sealed appendix to amicus curiae. Copies to all parties.. [14-2308] DL [Entered: 09/14/2015 03:47 PM]
September 14, 2015 Filing 40 RESPONSE/ANSWER by Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright to notice requesting response [ # 37 ], Letter [ # 36 ]. Nature of response: in support of. [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 09/14/2015 01:08 PM]
September 11, 2015 Filing 39 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sarah Marcus for United States Department of Labor.[999658785] [14-2308] Sarah Marcus [Entered: 09/11/2015 06:05 PM]
September 11, 2015 Filing 38 RESPONSE/ANSWER by County of Fairfax to Letter [ # 36 ]. Nature of response: in support of. [14-2308] Evangeline Paschal [Entered: 09/11/2015 04:47 PM]
September 11, 2015 Filing 37 NOTICE ISSUED to Molly A. Elkin for Jerome Williams, Patrick Kelly, Jeffrey Lewis, Marcus Williams, David Hall, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Paul White, Charles Cunningham, Kevin Edwards, James Johnson, James Lee, John Morris, Reginald Johnson, Stephen Miller, Walter Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Christopher Brown, John Walser, Raymond Griffin, John Peters, Daniel Shaw, Michael Allen, Christopher Thompson, Elton Polen, Jr., Calvin Alexander, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, Michael Istvan, James Istvan, Anthony Jackson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, John Leete, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Kenneth Wildman, Elton Wright and Gerard Morrison, Ms. Evangeline C. Paschal for County of Fairfax and Sona Rewari for County of Fairfax requesting response to Letter [ # 36 ]Response due: 09/14/2015.[999658715].. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 09/11/2015 04:03 PM]
September 11, 2015 Filing 36 Letter/request for access to sealed apx by Amicus Curiae United States Department of Labor. [999658713] [14-2308] TF [Entered: 09/11/2015 04:01 PM]
September 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER filed [999658694] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 34 ], updating/ resuming supplemental briefing order deadlines Supplemental Response Brief due 12/03/2015 Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Frieden, Marcus. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 09/11/2015 03:43 PM]
September 11, 2015 Filing 34 MOTION by Appellee County of Fairfax to extend filing time for response brief to amicus curiae brief to be filed by the Department of Labor until December 4, 2015. Date and method of service: 09/11/2015 ecf. [999658453] [14-2308] Evangeline Paschal [Entered: 09/11/2015 12:56 PM]
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER filed [999656342] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) Amicus brief due: Amicus brief due 11/23/2015. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? N/A. Appearance Form filed? N., file supplemental brief(s). Supplemental brief(s) tendered?: N Copies to all parties.. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 09/09/2015 08:34 AM]
September 8, 2015 Filing 32 LETTER REQUEST by Department of Labor, Office of the Solicitor to extend filing time for amicus brief until 11/23/2015. Date and method of service: 09/08/2015 ecf. [999656161] [14-2308] PSC [Entered: 09/08/2015 06:56 PM]
September 4, 2015 Filing 31 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 12/8/15 - 12/10/15 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 09/14/2015 [14-2308] JLC [Entered: 09/04/2015 02:27 PM]
August 28, 2015 Filing 30 Letter to Solicitor General requesting filing of amicus brief. [999650262] [14-2308] PSC [Entered: 08/28/2015 05:02 PM]
July 31, 2015 Filing 29 NOTICE ISSUED RE: Rule 34 pre-argument review. [14-2308] MH [Entered: 07/31/2015 04:31 PM]
May 7, 2015 Appendix [ # 17 ] released to public. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 05/07/2015 03:23 PM]
May 1, 2015 Filing 28 REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright. Number of pages: [39]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [8]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/05/2015. [999578327] [14-2308] TF [Entered: 05/05/2015 04:07 PM]
April 30, 2015 Filing 27 BRIEF by Appellants Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/01/2015. [999575628] [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 04/30/2015 03:46 PM]
April 20, 2015 Filing 26 RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of County of Fairfax. Number of pages: [104]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [8]. Entered on Docket Date: 04/23/2015. [999570666] [14-2308] TF [Entered: 04/23/2015 11:50 AM]
April 17, 2015 Filing 25 Corrected BRIEF by Appellee County of Fairfax in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/20/2015. [999567071] [14-2308] Sona Rewari [Entered: 04/17/2015 03:07 PM]
April 17, 2015 Filing 24 Docket correction requested from Ms. Evangeline C. Paschal for County of Fairfax and Sona Rewari for County of Fairfax.... [14-2308] TF [Entered: 04/17/2015 12:30 PM]
April 16, 2015 Filing 23 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) BRIEF by Appellee County of Fairfax in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/17/2015. [999566426] [14-2308]--[Edited 04/21/2015 by TF] Sona Rewari [Entered: 04/16/2015 06:28 PM]
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER filed [999541971] sealing sealed appendix (volume 10). Copies to all parties.. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 03/09/2015 11:32 AM]
March 2, 2015 Filing 21 APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 10. Total number of pages in all volumes: 4640. Total number of sealed volumes: 1. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of Copies: [6]. Entered on Docket Date: 03/09/2015. [999541968] [14-2308] TF [Entered: 03/09/2015 11:30 AM]
March 2, 2015 Filing 20 OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright. Number of pages: [71]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [8]. Entered on Docket Date: 03/09/2015. [999541939] [14-2308] TF [Entered: 03/09/2015 11:07 AM]
March 2, 2015 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF CONFIDENTIALITY (Local Rule 25(c)) by Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright. Sealing Required: Yes. Description of document referenced by certificate: Sealed Appendix. [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 03/02/2015 05:48 PM]
March 2, 2015 Filing 18 SEALED APPENDIX VOLUME(S) by Appellants Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to court: 03/02/2015.. Filed Ex parte: N. [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 03/02/2015 05:46 PM]
March 2, 2015 Filing 17 FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellants Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 03/02/2015. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? No. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999538405] [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 03/02/2015 05:42 PM]
March 2, 2015 Filing 16 BRIEF by Appellants Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/02/2015. [999538352] [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 03/02/2015 04:45 PM]
February 5, 2015 Filing 15 DISTRICT COURT UPDATE.TRANSCRIPT of proceedings for dates of October 3, 2014, before Judge Hilton, re [148] USCA Case Number,,,,,,,,,,,, [143] Notice of Appeal,,,,,,,,,,, Court Reporter/Transcriber Tracy Westfall, Telephone number 703-549-2080. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Does this satisfy all appellate orders for this reporter? y Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/9/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/7/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2015 [14-2308] JB [Entered: 02/05/2015 01:22 PM]
January 12, 2015 Filing 14 Mediation conference data modified. [14-2308] SLW [Entered: 01/12/2015 12:52 PM]
January 2, 2015 Filing 13 Mediation conference data modified. [14-2308] SLW [Entered: 01/02/2015 01:12 PM]
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER filed [999497219] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 11 ], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 03/02/2015. Response brief due 04/17/2015 Copies to all parties.. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 12/19/2014 11:11 AM]
December 18, 2014 Filing 11 MOTION by Appellants Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix, and response. Date and method of service: 12/18/2014 ecf. [999496505] [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 12/18/2014 02:12 PM]
December 17, 2014 Filing 10 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [14-2308] SLW [Entered: 12/17/2014 03:50 PM]
December 16, 2014 Filing 9 BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 01/26/2015. Response Brief due 02/27/2015 [14-2308] TF [Entered: 12/16/2014 03:50 PM]
December 16, 2014 Filing 8 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellants Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright. [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 12/16/2014 03:28 PM]
December 16, 2014 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellants Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999494425] [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 12/16/2014 03:27 PM]
December 16, 2014 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Molly A Elkin for Calvin Alexander, Michael Allen, Rocco Alvaro, Thomas Arnold, William Atwell, Robert Banasik, Timothy Barb, Todd Barb, Mathew Barnhart, Mervin Barrera, Oscar Beasley, William Best, Jr., Bill Betz, Daniel Borden, Jr., Edward Bowman, Fred Brandell, Donald Brasfield, Christopher Brown, Jon Bruley, Clyde Buchanan, Carlton Burkhammer, Robert Burlingame, Matthew Burns, Leo Burt, Leroy Butler, Jr., Keith Cerzullo, John Chesek, Jr., Michael Ciarrocchi, Steven Clark, Bradford Cochrane, Jr., Thomas Connolly, David Conrad, Arthur Cox, Dustin Cramer, Tracy Crawford, Keith Cross, Charles Cunningham, Eric Cunningham, Danny Daniels, II, Michael Davis, Troy Dean, Yolanda Demark, Samuel Devera, Keith Dubetsky, Brian Edmonston, Derek Edwards, Felecia Edwards, Kevin Edwards, Sean Evans, Mark Feaster, Michael Fischer, Colin Flanigan, Thomas Flint, Michael Fontana, Ramiro Galvez, Michael Garcia, Kenneth Geffen, Jared Goff, George Gonzalez, Todd Gorham, Samuel Gray, Raymond Griffin, Wesley Grigg, David Gruendel, Mark Guditus, David Hall, James Harrison, III, Sheryl Hemingway, Charles Henderson, Kit Hessel, John Higginbotham, James Hobgood, Kimberly Hood, Trenton Houghton, Gregory Hunter, James Iacone, James Istvan, Michael Istvan, Anthony Jackson, James Johnson, Reginald Johnson, Thomas Johnson, Walter Johnson, Joseph Kaleda, Glenn Kaplan, Patrick Kelly, Rebecca Kelly, William Kingdon, Jospeh Kiser, Robert Kitchen, Joseph Knerr, Robert Konczal, Tony Kostecka, Ronald Kuley, Richard Lancing, David Lange, James Lee, John Leete, Jeffrey Lewis, Robert Lison, Matthew Lopez, William Lynch, Barry Maham, Michael Marks, Charles Martin, James Masiello, Paul Masiello, Glenn Mason, Corey Matthews, Thomas Mayhew, Steven McFarland, Roger McGehee, Richard McKinney, Jr., Kerwin McNamara, Francis Mensah, Mark Menton, Joseph Merritt, Jr., Stephen Miller, Robert Mohler, Jeffrey Mongold, Donald Montague, Brian Moravitz, John Morris, Gerard Morrison, Richard Moxley, John Niemiec, Bryan Nix, Jr., Steven Norris, Stephen O'Brien, Milton Painter, Jospeh Palau, III, Dennis Passmore, Gary Pemberton, John Peters, Dallas Phillips, Ralph Pisani, Elton Polen, Jr., Charles Pullen, E. Martin Ranck, III, Barry Rathbone, John Richter, Natalie Robb, Ronnie Rodriguez, Matthew Ryan, William Schellhammer, III, Mark Schroeder, David Schwarzmann, Michael Sease, II, David Sellers, Daniel Shaw, Richard Smith, Scott Smith, Michael Snapp, James A. Sobota, James Sticklen, Rex Strickland, Cheri Stroup, Ronald Sydnor, Christopher Thompson, Kendall Thompson, Lorenzo Thrower, Christopher Tilles, David Tobin, Jeffrey Tolle, Glenn Tschann, William Vannoy, Donald Vaught, Jack Walmer, Jr., John Walser, Thomas Wealand, Oscar Wells, Wayne Wentzel, Michael Whetsell, Paul White, Kenneth Wildman, Jerome Williams, Marcus Williams and Elton Wright.[999494420] [14-2308] Molly Elkin [Entered: 12/16/2014 03:27 PM]
December 16, 2014 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Evangeline C. Paschal for County of Fairfax.[999494003] [14-2308] Evangeline Paschal [Entered: 12/16/2014 11:48 AM]
December 11, 2014 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee County of Fairfax. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999491076] [14-2308] Sona Rewari [Entered: 12/11/2014 08:37 AM]
December 11, 2014 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sona Rewari for County of Fairfax.[999491075] [14-2308] Sona Rewari [Entered: 12/11/2014 08:36 AM]
December 3, 2014 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-00005-CMH-JFA. Mailed to: Elkin, Paschal. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 12/03/2014 03:26 PM]
December 2, 2014 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-00005-CMH-JFA. Case manager: TFischer. [14-2308] TF [Entered: 12/02/2014 04:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gerard Morrison v. County of Fairfax, VA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRACY CRAWFORD
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRADFORD COCHRANE, JR.
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT LISON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORENZO THROWER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL MASIELLO
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OSCAR WELLS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEO BURT
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRYAN NIX, JR.
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAMIRO GALVEZ
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN O'BRIEN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVEN CLARK
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEPHEN MILLER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN PETERS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES STICKLEN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT MOHLER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT BURLINGAME
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WESLEY GRIGG
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL FONTANA
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KIT HESSEL
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL CIARROCCHI
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVEN MCFARLAND
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS JOHNSON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH WILDMAN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROGER MCGEHEE
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES LEE
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARCUS WILLIAMS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: E. MARTIN RANCK, III
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS CONNOLLY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENNETH GEFFEN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: COREY MATTHEWS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY JACKSON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NATALIE ROBB
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN HIGGINBOTHAM
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL ISTVAN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MERVIN BARRERA
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GARY PEMBERTON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRIAN EDMONSTON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN MORRIS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM SCHELLHAMMER, III
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD KULEY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN CHESEK, JR.
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL FISCHER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CARLTON BURKHAMMER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSPEH PALAU, III
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL DAVIS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD MCKINNEY, JR.
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WAYNE WENTZEL
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEITH CERZULLO
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER THOMPSON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES ISTVAN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES JOHNSON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS MAYHEW
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PAUL WHITE
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WALTER JOHNSON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JACK WALMER, JR.
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSPEH KISER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROCCO ALVARO
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEVIN EDWARDS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SEAN EVANS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID TOBIN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATHEW BARNHART
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JON BRULEY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD LANCING
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REGINALD JOHNSON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID GRUENDEL
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID CONRAD
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER TILLES
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM BEST, JR.
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHERI STROUP
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM KINGDON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CLYDE BUCHANAN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RAYMOND GRIFFIN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK FEASTER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK MENTON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID SCHWARZMANN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH KALEDA
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS FLINT
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEROME WILLIAMS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES IACONE
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRENTON HOUGHTON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GEORGE GONZALEZ
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARRY MAHAM
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONALD SYDNOR
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEITH DUBETSKY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DENNIS PASSMORE
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GREGORY HUNTER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TONY KOSTECKA
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID SELLERS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATTHEW LOPEZ
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES HOBGOOD
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS WEALAND
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD MOXLEY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FELECIA EDWARDS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN WALSER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BARRY RATHBONE
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ARTHUR COX
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MILTON PAINTER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK GUDITUS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DEREK EDWARDS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENN MASON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY MONGOLD
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALVIN ALEXANDER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH MERRITT, JR.
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID LANGE
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELTON WRIGHT
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL BORDEN, JR.
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATTHEW RYAN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RONNIE RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: EDWARD BOWMAN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RICHARD SMITH
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOSEPH KNERR
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BILL BETZ
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERIC CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL ALLEN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LEROY BUTLER, JR.
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES CUNNINGHAM
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KENDALL THOMPSON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES HARRISON, III
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PATRICK KELLY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: STEVEN NORRIS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD BRASFIELD
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT KITCHEN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: THOMAS ARNOLD
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRED BRANDELL
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES A. SOBOTA
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: COLIN FLANIGAN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TODD GORHAM
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GERARD MORRISON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REX STRICKLAND
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD VAUGHT
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES PULLEN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAMUEL GRAY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARK SCHROEDER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DAVID HALL
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DONALD MONTAGUE
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: OSCAR BEASLEY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: REBECCA KELLY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: FRANCIS MENSAH
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL SNAPP
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENN KAPLAN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHRISTOPHER BROWN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANIEL SHAW
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN RICHTER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DUSTIN CRAMER
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM VANNOY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN NIEMIEC
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SCOTT SMITH
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KEITH CROSS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRIAN MORAVITZ
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KIMBERLY HOOD
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM ATWELL
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES MARTIN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT KONCZAL
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TIMOTHY BARB
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TODD BARB
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: GLENN TSCHANN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL WHETSELL
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DALLAS PHILLIPS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY LEWIS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MATTHEW BURNS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL MARKS
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JAMES MASIELLO
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CHARLES HENDERSON
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ROBERT BANASIK
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL GARCIA
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TROY DEAN
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KERWIN MCNAMARA
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOHN LEETE
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SAMUEL DEVERA
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MICHAEL SEASE, II
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JEFFREY TOLLE
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELTON POLEN, JR.
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: SHERYL HEMINGWAY
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM LYNCH
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: YOLANDA DEMARK
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DANNY DANIELS, II
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JARED GOFF
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: RALPH PISANI
Represented By: Molly A. Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY DIZE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COUNTY OF FAIRFAX, VA
Represented By: Sona Rewari
Represented By: Evangeline C. Paschal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: M. Patricia Smith
Represented By: Paul L. Frieden
Represented By: Sarah Kay Marcus
Represented By: Jennifer S. Brand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?