Gavin Grimm v. Gloucester County School Board
Amicus Curiae: WENDY RANCK-BUHR, Ph. D., SARAH LORE, STATE OF WASHINGTON, STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA, WARBY PARKER, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS, APPLE, INC., STATE OF DELAWARE, GENDER SPECTRUM, LEE TERRY, CLAUDIA CLIFTON, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL PSYCHOLOGISTS, STATE OF OREGON, WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, INC., d/b/a Whitman-Walker Health, KIM WARD, THE GAP, INC., AMERICAN PSYCHOANALYTIC ASSOCIATION, PUBLIC JUSTICE, ILONA GAMBILL, MICHELLE KING, JOCELYN SAMUELS, PAUL R. MCHUGH, M.D., NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS, THE OUTCAST AGENCY, MARK FRECHETTE, DYLAN PAULY, School Administrator Wisconsin, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION, EAGLE FORUM EDUCATION AND LEGAL DEFENSE FUND, PASTOR JAMES LARSEN, JILL GURTNER, PATRICK L. MCCRORY, In his official capacity as Governor State of North Carolina, THE NATIONAL CRITTENTON FOUNDATION, STATE OF MISSOURI, DONALD CAULDER, NEXTDOOR.COM, INC., JAMES C. MORSE, SR., Ed.D., AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION, SAMUEL R. BAGENSTOS, YELP, INC., MONICA GARCIA, NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION, SOUTHWEST WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, STATE OF MISSISSIPPI, MICHAEL SCHILDER, Ed.D., STATE OF KANSAS, JAMES COLE, JR., TUMBLR, INC., SHERRI CYRA, INTEL CORPORATION, WENDY CAULDER, AMERICAN SCHOOL COUNSELOR ASSOCIATION, MARY DORAN, School Administrator Minnesota, NETAPP, INC., JERRY NICHOLSON, ROWAN WOOLDRIDGE, STATE OF HAWAII, BLOOMBERG, L.P., STATE OF ARIZONA, DAVID LOPEZ, MATTHEW HANEY, MONTPELIER PUBLIC SCHOOLS, GAY-STRAIGHT ALLIANCE NETWORK, STATE OF UTAH, CARTER BROWN, THE MITCHELL GOLD CO., d/b/a Mitchell Gold + Bob Williams, LISA TERRY, LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., d/b/a Linden Lab, KELLIE M. HARGIS, Ed.D., AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS, JOHN B. KING, JR., NEW VOICES FOR REPRODUCTIVE JUSTICE, STATE OF GEORGIA, EVIE PRIESTMAN, RYZAC, INC., d/b/a Codecademy, YAHOO! INCORPORATED, WOMEN'S SPORTS FOUNDATION, GLSEN, LINDSEY POLLOCK, Ed.D., ROBERT BOURGEOIS, School Administrator Massachusetts, STATE OF TENNESSEE, MICROSOFT CORPORATION, DIANA K. BRUCE, School Administrator District of Columbia, SHUTTERSTOCK, INC., GITHUB, INC., ZIAD W. MUNSON, Ph. D., WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM, THOMAS SMITH, Ed.D., MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA, RECONSTRUCTIONIST RABBINICAL ASSOCIATION, STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, FOUNDATION FOR MORAL LAW, KATRINA KARKAZIS, Ph. D., CATHERINE FROM, PANDORA MEDIA, INC., POSTMATES INC., AVIVA L. KATZ, M.D., CITIZENS UNITED FOUNDATION, STATE OF ARKANSAS, SAN DIEGO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, BRYAN DAVIS, Ph. D., LAWRENCE MAYER, Ph. D., DORETHA GUJU, DAVID THORNTON, GREGORY R. MEECE, JEREMY MAJESKI, School Administrator Illinois, SYDNEY GREENSTEIN, a/k/a Siddy, HEIDI CARTER, ADELITA GRIJALVA, ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, PAUL R. LEPAGE, In his official capacity as Governor State of Maine, ANTHONY GATTO, PAYPAL HOLDINGS, INC., CENTER FOR TRANSYOUTH HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENT AT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES, MEETUP, INC., KEN KUNIN, CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS, UNITED STATES JUSTICE FOUNDATION, STOP SEXUAL ASSAULT IN SCHOOLS, STATE OF VERMONT, ELIZABETH REIS, Ph. D., BRADLY FRIEDLIN, CALIFORNIA WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, MATHEW S. NOSANCHUK, STATE OF TEXAS, AFFIRM, INC., KATE BROWN, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY & MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO, STATE OF NEW YORK, CHIMILLE E. DILLARD, Ed.D., STATE OF MAINE, KATHY THORNTON, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS, NEXT FIFTEEN COMMUNICATIONS CORP, MATTHEW G. BEVIN, Governor, Commonwealth of Kentucky, MARTIN S. LEDERMAN, PATRICIA SHIU, CYNDY TAYMORE, SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE, STATE OF VIRGINIA, JON LYNSKY, LIBERTY CENTER FOR CHILD PROTECTION, WOMEN'S LIBERATION FRONT, PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES, DAVID MICHAELS, KAYDEN ORTIZ, CRAIG MCCALLA, THE BECKET FUND FOR RELIGIOUS LIBERTY, NORMAN SPACK, M.D., FUTURES WITHOUT VIOLENCE, CINDY MARTEN, ISSAC RUTAN, GAY, LESBIAN & STRAIGHT EDUCATION NETWORK, LAURA H. LOVE, CITIZENS UNITED, FASTLY, INC., THOMAS A. ABERLI, School Administrator Kentucky, SLACK TECHNOLOGIES, INC., LEAH FREGULIA, JUDITH REISMAN, Ph. D., FAMILY RESEARCH COUNCIL, STATE OF IOWA, AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO, TIM KENNEY, JULIE VITALE, Ph. D., STATE OF MASSACHUSETTS, REPLACEMENTS, LTD., STATE OF NEW MEXICO, HARVARD LAW GENDER VIOLENCE POLICY WORKSHOP, TRANS YOUTH EQUALITY FOUNDATION, PAULA INSLEY MILLER, Ed.D., MORGAN BARTH, WE ARE FAMILY, CRAIG VAUGHN, BOX, INC., KNOW YOUR IX, AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, THE NATIONAL WOMEN'S LAW CENTER, IBM CORPORATION, KICKSTARTER, PBC, KESHET, STATE OF ILLINOIS, RETAILMENOT, INC., APPNEXUS, INC., NIO, ROBERT A. MOTLEY, AKAMAI TECHNOLOGIES, INC., STATE OF MARYLAND, KNOTEL, INC., UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, GLMA: HEALTH PROFESSIONALS ADVANCING LGBT EQUALITY, STATE OF CALIFORNIA, LEAH M. LITMAN, EBAY, INCORPORATED, MAXWELL PLATT, PAUL HRUZ, Ph. D., M. D., NATIONAL COUNCIL OF JEWISH WOMEN, DANIEL F. GOHL, STATE OF NEBRASKA, MARIN SOFTWARE INC., WASHINGTON CENTRAL SUPERVISORY UNION, DENISE PALAZZO, School Administrator Florida, MAPBOX, INC., JOHN O'REILLY, School Administrator New York, ACHIEVEMENT FIRST PUBLIC CHARTER SCHOOLS, LEGAL MOMENTUM, ASANA, INC., ALLIANCE DEFENDING FREEDOM, EMILY SUTHERLAND, STATE OF OKLAHOMA, THE NATIONAL PTA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SECONDARY SCHOOL PRINCIPALS, STATE OF LOUISIANA, DOCTOR RODNEY AUTRY, EQUAL RIGHTS ADVOCATES, JOSHUA CUBA, M. PATRICIA SMITH, LIZBETH DESELM, MONGODB, INC., AMERICAN ACADEMY OF FAMILY PHYSICIANS, AIS-DSD SUPPORT GROUP, DEANNA ADKINS, M.D., ELDGRIDGE GREER, Ph. D., GENDER BENDERS, TIME OUT YOUTH, MICHAEL C. DORF, SHERIE HOHS, School Administrator Wisconsin, STATE OF ALABAMA, NORTH CAROLINA VALUES COALITION, AMERICANS UNITED FOR SEPARATION OF CHURCH AND STATE, ZENDESK, INC., NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SOCIAL WORKERS, AIRBNB, INC., DROPBOX, INC., JANICE K. JACKSON, Ed.D., BLAKE PREWITT, Ed.S., SAN DIEGO COOPERATIVE CHARTER SCHOOLS, FAMILY POLICY ALLIANCE, PARU SHAH, Ph. D., SALESFORCE.COM, INC., PFLAG, INC., ARTHUR DIBENEDETTO, THE SCHOOL DISTRICT OF SOUTH ORANGE AND MAPLEWOOD, WILLIAMS-SONOMA, INCORPORATED, HADASSAH, MILTON DIAMOND, M.D., SCHOOL SOCIAL WORK ASSOCIATION OF AMERICA, TWILIO, INC., CONSTITUTIONAL ACCOUNTABILITY CENTER, LISA LOVE, School Administrator Washington, LINKEDIN CORPORATION, MARYLAND PTA, THE WOMEN'S LAW PROJECT, LEGAL AID SOCIETY - EMPLOYMENT LAW CENTER, NATIONAL LGBT BAR ASSOCIATION, AMERICAN ACADEMY OF CHILD AND ADOLESCENT PSYCHIATRY, LORRAINE WALSH, INSIDEOUT, THE WORLD PROFESSIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR TRANSGENDER HEALTH, STATE OF CONNECTICUT, ALICE MAY, WASHOE COUNTY SCHOOL DISTRICT, ARNE DUNCAN, RUDY RUDOLPH, School Administrator Oregon, INDIEGOGO, INC., JUDY CHIASSON, Ph. D., School Administrator California, AMERICAN NURSES ASSOCIATION, THE UNITED SYNAGOGUE OF CONSERVATIVE JUDAISM, DYLAN KLEIMAN, BEND THE ARC: A JEWISH PARTNERSHIP FOR JUSTICE, GENDER JUSTICE, EMILY BANKS, LEGAL VOICE, MAC COSMETICS, INC, TWITTER, INCORPORATED, XEROX CORPORATION, GENDER DIVERSITY, PEYTON CHAPMAN, GENERAL ASSEMBLY SPACE, INC., CREDO MOBILE, INC., TIM BYRD, MICHELLE FORCIER, M.D., LAS CRUCES PUBLIC SCHOOLS, CHILD AND ADOLESCENT GENDER CENTER CLINIC AT UCSF BENIOFF CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL, ANTI-DEFAMATION LEAGUE, CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS, THE FAMILY FOUNDATION OF VIRGINIA, STATE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, THE CHILD PROTECTION INSTITUTE, GENDER & SEX DEVELOPMENT PROGRAM AT ANN & ROBERT H. LURIE CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL OF CHICAGO, ARLINGTON COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD, THE ASSOCIATION OF TITLE IV ADMINISTRATORS, STATE OF RHODE ISLAND, GIRLS INC., UNION FOR REFORM JUDAISM, HOWARD COLTER, TRANSGENDER LAW & POLICY INSTITUTE, THOMAS WEBER, REF RODRIGUEZ, Ph. D., PEDIATRIC ENDOCRINE SOCIETY, SAN FRANCISCO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT, AMAZON.COM, INC., KAISER PERMANENTE, KAREN CARNEY, ASSOCIATION OF MEDICAL SCHOOL PEDIATRIC DEPARTMENT CHAIRS, JOEL FRADER, M.D., SPOTIFY USA INC., WILLIAM DENO, FAN FREE CLINIC, STATE OF OHIO, MASSMUTUAL LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, AMERICAN MEDICAL WOMEN'S ASSOCIATION, BETH BAZER, Ed.D., PAMELA RETZLAFF, Ed.D., RACHEL SANTA, Ed.D., CATHERINE ELIZABETH LHAMON, SUGARCRM INC, JIM RUTAN, DAVID VANNASDALL, School Administrator California, CAROLYNE ALBERT-GARVEY, INTERACT: ADVOCATES FOR INTERSEX YOUTH, ROSMY, VALERIA SILVA, School Administrator Minnesota, SARAH SHIRK, FLIPBOARD, INC., SOCIETY FOR PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS IN PEDIATRICS, ERIC DOSS, BRIAN SCHAFFER, AMERICAN PSYCHIATRIC ASSOCIATION, JOSHUA SAFER, M.D., DELOIS COOKE SPRYSZAK, WEEBLY, INC., SUZANNE VINCENT, STANFORD PRESCOTT, MONICA SCHOMMER, CONSERVATIVE LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, A BETTER BALANCE: THE WORK & FAMILY LEGAL CENTER, NAACP LEGAL DEFENSE AND EDUCATION FUND, INC., TOMMY CHANG, Ed.D., AMERICAN ACADEMY OF NURSING, NATIONAL ORGANIZATION FOR WOMEN FOUNDATION, JOHN WALSH and LEGAL AID AT WORK
Not Yet Classified: 50 GLOUCESTER STUDENTS, PARENTS, GRANDPARENTS, AND COMMUNITY MEMBERS
Defendant / Appellee: GLOUCESTER COUNTY SCHOOL BOARD
Plaintiff / Appellant: GAVIN GRIMM
Case Number: 15-2056
Filed: September 10, 2015
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER filed [1000251429] granting motion withdrawing/relieving/substituting counsel [ # 258 ], \ Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 03/02/2018 04:18 PM]
March 2, 2018 Filing 258 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee State of West Virginia to approve/authorize Withdrawal of Erica N. Peterson as counsel. Date and method of service: 03/02/2018 ecf. [1000251171] [15-2056] Paul Martin [Entered: 03/02/2018 01:54 PM]
March 2, 2018 Filing 257 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Paul Anthony Martin for State of West Virginia.[1000251160] [15-2056] Paul Martin [Entered: 03/02/2018 01:42 PM]
November 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER filed [1000185638] granting Motion to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel [ # 255 ] Representation Type:null, terminating Attorney Thomas M. Johnson Jr. for Amicus Supporting Appellee State of West Virginia in 15-2056 Copies to all parties.. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 11/02/2017 11:20 AM]
November 2, 2017 Filing 255 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee State of West Virginia Erica N. Peterson to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? Y. Was the defendant advised of right to file response within 7 days? Y. Date and method of service: 11/02/2017 ecf. [1000185445] [15-2056] Erica Peterson [Entered: 11/02/2017 09:28 AM]
November 2, 2017 Filing 254 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Erica N. Peterson for State of West Virginia.[1000185439] [15-2056] Erica Peterson [Entered: 11/02/2017 09:26 AM]
August 30, 2017 Filing 253 Rule 42(b) mandate issued. Originating case number: 4:15-cv-00054-RGD-DEM. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 08/30/2017 10:22 AM]
August 30, 2017 Filing 252 COURT ORDER filed [1000146733] granting Motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [ # 249 ]. Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 08/30/2017 10:19 AM]
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER filed [1000139466] terminating Motion to withdraw [ # 250 ], granting withdrawing counsel. Copies to all parties. [15-2056] TW [Entered: 08/17/2017 01:54 PM]
August 17, 2017 Filing 250 MOTION by to withdraw. motion.. Date and method of service: 08/17/2017 ecf. [1000139307] [15-2056] Elbert Lin [Entered: 08/17/2017 11:42 AM]
August 11, 2017 Filing 249 CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellant Gavin Grimm to dismiss appeal pursuant to FRAP 42(b) [249] [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 08/11/2017 03:17 PM]
August 2, 2017 Filing 248 Published OPINION/ORDER DIRECTING LIMITED REMAND [4CCA retains jurisdiction]. Originating case number: 4:15-cv-00054-RGD-DEM Copies to all parties and the district court. [1000130344] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 08/02/2017 01:40 PM]
August 2, 2017 Filing 247 COURT ORDER filed [1000130335] removing case from argument calendar. Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 08/02/2017 01:37 PM]
August 1, 2017 Filing 246 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Janai Nelson for NAACP Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc..[1000129910] [15-2056] Janai Nelson [Entered: 08/01/2017 06:10 PM]
July 31, 2017 Filing 245 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Nursing, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Physician Assistants, American College of Physicians, American Medical Association, American Medical Women's Association, American Nurses Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Psychoanalytic Association, Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs, Endocrine Society, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, MHA, NASW, Society for Adolescent Health and Medicine and Society for Physician Assistants in Pediatrics. Number of pages: [47]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 08/01/2017. Received by clerk date: 08/01/2017. [1000129686] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 08/01/2017 02:35 PM]
July 31, 2017 Filing 244 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellant American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Nursing, American Academy of Pediatrics, American Academy of Physician Assistants, American College of Physicians, American Medical Women's Association, American Nurses Association, American Psychiatric Association, American Psychoanalytic Association, Association of Medical School Pediatric Department Chairs, Endocrine Society, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, MHA, NASW, Society for Adolescent Health and Medicine and Society for Physician Assistants in Pediatrics American Medical Association in electronic and paper format. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 08/01/2017. [1000128685] [15-2056] Scott Wilkens [Entered: 07/31/2017 06:13 PM]
July 27, 2017 Filing 243 COURT ORDER filed [1000126749] granting Motion to join nunc pro tunc the brief of Amici Curiae America Academy of Pediatrics, American Psychiatric Association, American College of Physicians, and 14 Additional Medical and Mental Health Organizations in support of plaintiff-appellant [ # 242 ]. Amicus brief due 08/07/2017. Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 07/27/2017 02:23 PM]
July 20, 2017 Filing 242 MOTION by American Medical Association for / Motion to Join Brief of Amici Curiae Nunc Pro Tunc. Date and method of service: 07/20/2017 ecf. [1000122054] [15-2056] Scott Wilkens [Entered: 07/20/2017 10:17 AM]
July 5, 2017 Filing 241 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Gloucester County School Board. Counsel arguing: S. Kyle Duncan Opening argument time: 20 minutes Answering argument time: n/a Rebuttal argument time: n/a Counsel present but not arguing in criminal case: n/a [1000112684] [15-2056] Stuart Duncan [Entered: 07/05/2017 10:04 PM]
July 5, 2017 Filing 240 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Gavin Grimm. Counsel arguing: Joshua A. Block Opening argument time: 15 minutes Rebuttal argument time: 5 minutes [1000112645] [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 07/05/2017 04:40 PM]
July 3, 2017 Filing 239 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Eric S. Baxter for The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty.[1000111203] [15-2056] Eric Baxter [Entered: 07/03/2017 02:10 PM]
July 3, 2017 Filing 238 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 09/12/2017. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [15-2056] JLC [Entered: 07/03/2017 11:07 AM]
June 19, 2017 Filing 237 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) response by Appellee Gloucester County School Board. [1000103050]. [15-2056] Stuart Duncan [Entered: 06/19/2017 05:11 PM]
June 15, 2017 Filing 236 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellant Gavin Grimm. [1000101274]. [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 06/15/2017 11:41 AM]
June 13, 2017 Filing 235 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Anti-Defamation League, Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Hadassah, Keshet, National LGBT Bar Association, Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association, Union for Reform Judaism and Women of Reform Judaism. Number of pages: [42]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 06/15/2017. Received by clerk date: 06/15/2017. [1000101223] [15-2056] TW [Entered: 06/15/2017 11:17 AM]
June 13, 2017 Filing 234 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellant Americans United for Separation of Church and State, Anti-Defamation League, Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice, Central Conference of American Rabbis, Hadassah, Keshet, National LGBT Bar Association, Reconstructionist Rabbinical Association, Union for Reform Judaism and Women of Reform Judaism, United Synagogue of Conservative Judaism; Amicus Supporting Plaintiff-Appellant in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [1000099657] [15-2056] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 06/13/2017 10:42 AM]
June 7, 2017 Filing 232 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Steven L. Tiedemann for Paul Hruz, Lawrence Mayer, Ph. D. and Paul R. McHugh, M.D..[1000097024] [15-2056] Steven Tiedemann [Entered: 06/07/2017 10:19 PM]
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER filed [1000095878] granting motion to join amicus brief [ # 227 ]. Copies to all parties. [15-2056] TW [Entered: 06/06/2017 02:38 PM]
June 6, 2017 Filing 229 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Potential Amicus Curiae USCJ. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000095871] [15-2056] TW [Entered: 06/06/2017 02:35 PM]
June 6, 2017 Filing 228 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by ERICA T. DUBNO for USCJ.[1000095671] [15-2056] Erica Dubno [Entered: 06/06/2017 12:40 PM]
June 6, 2017 Filing 227 MOTION by Potential Amicus Curiae USCJ for AMENDED MOTION TO JOIN AMICUS BRIEF NUNC PRO TUNC. Date and method of service: 06/06/2017 ecf. [1000095669] [15-2056] Erica Dubno [Entered: 06/06/2017 12:38 PM]
June 2, 2017 Filing 231 SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Gloucester County School Board. Number of pages: [40]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 06/07/2017. Received by clerk date: 06/06/2017. [1000096319] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 06/07/2017 08:48 AM]
June 2, 2017 Filing 226 Supplemental REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Gavin Grimm. Number of pages: [37]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 06/05/2017. Received by clerk date: 06/02/2017. [1000094033] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 06/05/2017 09:15 AM]
June 2, 2017 Filing 225 BRIEF by Appellant Gavin Grimm in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/02/2016. [1000093684] [15-2056] Gail Deady [Entered: 06/02/2017 02:28 PM]
June 2, 2017 Filing 224 BRIEF by Appellee Gloucester County School Board in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/05/2017. [1000093670] [15-2056] Stuart Duncan [Entered: 06/02/2017 02:19 PM]
June 2, 2017 Filing 223 Docket correction requested from Erica Tamar Dubno for The United Synagogue of Conservative Judaism. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 06/02/2017 09:19 AM]
June 1, 2017 Filing 222 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the September 12-15, 2017 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 06/12/2017. [15-2056] PSC [Entered: 06/01/2017 04:13 PM]
May 31, 2017 Filing 221 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) MOTION by The United Synagogue of Conservative Judaism for MOTION TO JOIN AMICUS BRIEF NUNC PRO TUNC. Date and method of service: 05/31/2017 ecf. [1000091917] [15-2056]--[Edited 06/29/2017 by TW] Erica Dubno [Entered: 05/31/2017 01:29 PM]
May 31, 2017 Filing 220 Docket correction requested from Mr. Steven Lee Tiedemann for Paul R. McHugh, M.D., Paul Hruz and Lawrence Mayer, Ph. D.. Re: [ # 219 ] Brief. Access to Brief has been restricted to case participants. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/31/2017 07:13 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 233 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Paul Hruz, Lawrence Mayer, Ph. D. and Paul R. McHugh, M.D.. Number of pages: [29]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 06/08/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/30/2017. [1000097068] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 06/08/2017 07:34 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 219 BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellee Paul Hruz, Lawrence Mayer, Ph. D. and Paul R. McHugh, M.D. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: AMICUS CURIAE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000091056] [15-2056]--[Edited 06/08/2017 by SAC] Steven Tiedemann [Entered: 05/30/2017 10:51 PM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 218 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amicus Supporting Appellant Joel Frader, M.D.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000090178] [15-2056] Aron Fischer [Entered: 05/30/2017 10:40 AM]
May 30, 2017 Filing 217 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amicus Supporting Appellant AIS-DSD Support Group. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000090174] [15-2056] Aron Fischer [Entered: 05/30/2017 10:37 AM]
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER filed [1000089108] granting Motion to file addendum/attachment [ # 170 ], granting Motion to file addendum/attachment [ # 179 ]. Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/26/2017 08:52 AM]
May 24, 2017 Filing 213 CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellant Gavin Grimm and Appellee Gloucester County School Board leave to file addenda to amicus briefs notice requesting response [ # 182 ], Motion to file addendum/attachment [ # 170 ], notice requesting response [ # 177 ], Motion to file addendum/attachment [ # 179 ] [15-2056] Stuart Duncan [Entered: 05/24/2017 04:09 PM]
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER filed [1000087419] granting Motion to amend/correct [ # 211 ]. Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/24/2017 12:29 PM]
May 24, 2017 Filing 211 MOTION by Appellant G. G. to amend/correct caption. Date and method of service: 05/24/2017 hand delivery. [1000087294] [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 05/24/2017 11:12 AM]
May 24, 2017 Filing 210 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellee Paul Hruz, Lawrence Mayer, Ph. D. and Paul R. McHugh, M.D. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: AMICUS CURIAE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000087134] [15-2056]--[Edited 05/31/2017 by JR] Steven Tiedemann [Entered: 05/24/2017 09:36 AM]
May 22, 2017 Filing 207 Notice issued re: [ # 206 ] Document. Mailed to: Edward Rudofsky 601 West 26th St, NY, NY 10001. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/22/2017 03:39 PM]
May 22, 2017 Filing 206 DOCUMENT referencing [ # 153 ] amicus curiae Brief by Edward Rudofsky. [1000085886] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/22/2017 03:32 PM]
May 19, 2017 Filing 204 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amicus Supporting Appellant Elizabeth Reis, Ph. D.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000085152] [15-2056] Aron Fischer [Entered: 05/19/2017 05:10 PM]
May 19, 2017 Filing 203 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amicus Supporting Appellant Aviva L. Katz, M.D.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000085150] [15-2056] Aron Fischer [Entered: 05/19/2017 05:09 PM]
May 19, 2017 Filing 182 NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Joshua A. Block, Leslie Cooper, Gail Marie Deady for G. G., and Mr. Jeremy David Capps, Mr. David Patrick Corrigan, Stuart Kyle Duncan, Mr. Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr., Mr. Gene C. Schaerr, Stephen S. Schwartz for Gloucester County School Board requesting response to Motion to file addendum/attachment [ # 179 ]Response due: 05/30/2017.[1000084795].. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 12:02 PM]
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER filed [1000084790] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 178 ]. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties.. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 11:56 AM]
May 19, 2017 Filing 177 NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Joshua A. Block, Leslie Cooper, Gail Marie Deady for G. G., and Mr. Jeremy David Capps, Mr. David Patrick Corrigan, Stuart Kyle Duncan, Mr. Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr., Mr. Gene C. Schaerr, Stephen S. Schwartz for Gloucester County School Board requesting response to Motion to file addendum/attachment [ # 170 ]Response due: 05/30/2017.[1000084665].. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 10:33 AM]
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER filed [1000084554] granting Motion for leave to file [ # 175 ] Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 09:10 AM]
May 19, 2017 Filing 175 MOTION by McHugh, Paul, et al, Amici Supporting Affirmance leave to file. Date and method of service: 05/19/2017 ecf. [1000084476] [15-2056] Steven Tiedemann [Entered: 05/19/2017 08:07 AM]
May 18, 2017 Filing 174 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amicus Supporting Appellant Joshua Safer, M.D.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000084430] [15-2056] Aron Fischer [Entered: 05/18/2017 08:24 PM]
May 18, 2017 Filing 173 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amicus Supporting Appellant Katrina Karkazis, Ph. D.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000084429] [15-2056] Aron Fischer [Entered: 05/18/2017 08:22 PM]
May 18, 2017 Filing 172 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amicus Supporting Appellee Foundation for Moral Law. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000084421] [15-2056] John Eidsmoe [Entered: 05/18/2017 05:42 PM]
May 18, 2017 Filing 171 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John Eidsmoe for Foundation for Moral Law.[1000084420] [15-2056] John Eidsmoe [Entered: 05/18/2017 05:39 PM]
May 18, 2017 Filing 170 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Alliance Defending Freedom file addendum/attachment to Amicus Curiae Brief of Alliance Defending Freedom in Support of Defendant-Appellee.. Date and method of service: 05/18/2017 ecf. [1000084415] [15-2056] Gary McCaleb [Entered: 05/18/2017 05:06 PM]
May 18, 2017 Filing 169 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amicus Supporting Appellant NWLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000084311] [15-2056] Charles Rothfeld [Entered: 05/18/2017 03:39 PM]
May 17, 2017 Filing 168 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert J. Olson for Citizens United and Citizens United Foundation.[1000083280] [15-2056] Robert Olson [Entered: 05/17/2017 11:14 AM]
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER filed [1000083240] granting Motion to extend filing time [ # 164 ] Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/17/2017 10:48 AM]
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER filed [1000083229] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 144 ]. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties.. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/17/2017 10:35 AM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 215 ADDENDUM/ATTACHMENT (PAPER) file-stamped on behalf of Leah Fregulia et al (School Administrators from Thirty-Three States and the District of Columbia) . Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on docket date: 05/26/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000089132] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/26/2017 09:01 AM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 202 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Leah Fregulia et al (School Administrators from Thirty-Three States and the District of Columbia) . Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/17/2017. [1000084980] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 03:05 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 200 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of SECRETARY OF EDUCATION ARNE DUNCAN et al. Number of pages: [443]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000084951] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 02:45 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 180 Addendum/attachment to [ # 155 ] amicus curiae Brief by Amicus Supporting Appellant Leah Fregulia in electronic and paper format. Method of filing paper copies: US Mail. Date copies mailed, dispatched, or delivered: 05/19/2017 If paper copies filed, number of copies filed: 4 Number of pages per copy if paper copies filed: 38 [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 11:53 AM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 179 MOTION by School Administrators from Thirty-Three States and the District of Columbia file addendum/attachment to amicus brief.. Date and method of service: 05/16/2017 ecf. [1000084767] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 11:43 AM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 178 MOTION by School Administrators from Thirty-Three States and the District of Columbia to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e). Date and method of service: 05/16/2017 ecf. [1000084766] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 11:40 AM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 164 MOTION by SECRETARY OF EDUCATION ARNE DUNCAN, SECRETARY OF EDUCATION JOHN B. KING, JR., AND OTHER FORMER OFFICIALS FROM THE EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION AND DEPARTMENTS OF EDUCATION, JUSTICE, LABOR AND HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES to extend filing time for Amicus Brief until 5/16/2017. Date and method of service: 05/16/2017 ecf. [1000082995] [15-2056] Jeffrey Bleich [Entered: 05/16/2017 05:36 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 163 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Anita L. Staver for The Child Protection Institute.[1000082976] [15-2056] Mary McAlister [Entered: 05/16/2017 04:42 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 162 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Horatio G. Mihet for The Child Protection Institute.[1000082975] [15-2056] Mary McAlister [Entered: 05/16/2017 04:41 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 161 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mathew D. Staver for The Child Protection Institute.[1000082931] [15-2056] Mary McAlister [Entered: 05/16/2017 04:02 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 160 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mary E. McAlister for The Child Protection Institute.[1000082930] [15-2056] Mary McAlister [Entered: 05/16/2017 04:01 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 159 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amici Supporting Appellant American School Counselor Association, GLSEN, Maryland PTA, National Association of School Psychologists and The National PTA. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000082733] [15-2056] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 05/16/2017 02:08 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 158 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Mary Eaton for American School Counselor Association, GLSEN, Maryland PTA, National Association of School Psychologists and The National PTA.[1000082722] [15-2056] Mary Eaton [Entered: 05/16/2017 02:01 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 157 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Wesley R. Powell for American School Counselor Association, GLSEN, Maryland PTA, National Association of School Psychologists and The National PTA.[1000082719] [15-2056] Wesley Powell [Entered: 05/16/2017 01:58 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 156 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by SECRETARY OF EDUCATION ARNE DUNCAN, SECRETARY OF EDUCATION JOHN B. KING, JR., AND OTHER FORMER OFFICIALS FROM THE EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION AND DEPARTMENTS OF EDUCATION, JUSTICE, LABOR AND HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2017. [1000082715] [15-2056] Jeffrey Bleich [Entered: 05/16/2017 01:54 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 155 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Cynthia Cook Robertson, counsel for Amici Curiae School Administrators from Thirty-Three States and the District of Columbia in Support of Plaintiff-Appellant in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2017. [1000082656] [15-2056] Cynthia Robertson [Entered: 05/16/2017 12:49 PM]
May 16, 2017 Filing 154 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amici Supporting Appellee Family Policy Alliance and Women's Liberation Front. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000082637] [15-2056] David Bookbinder [Entered: 05/16/2017 12:32 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 216 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of State of California, State of Connecticut, State of Delaware, State of Hawaii, State of Illinois, State of Iowa, State of Maine, State of Maryland, State of Massachusetts, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Oregon, State of Pennsylvania, State of Rhode Island, State of Vermont, State of Virginia and State of Washington. Number of pages: [60]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/26/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/26/2017. [1000089596] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/26/2017 02:44 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 209 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Family Policy Alliance and Women's Liberation Front. Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/23/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/23/2017. [1000086783] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/23/2017 03:07 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 208 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Judy Chiasson et al. Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/17/2017. [1000085966] [15-2056]--[Edited 06/02/2017 by JR] JR [Entered: 05/22/2017 04:14 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 205 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Alliance Defending Freedom. Number of pages: [91]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/22/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/17/2017. [1000085366] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/22/2017 09:21 AM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 201 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty. Number of pages: [53]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/17/2016. [1000084961] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 02:51 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 199 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of NATIONAL WOMENS LAW CENTER, ET AL. Number of pages: [54]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/17/2017. [1000084934] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 02:33 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 198 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Apple, IBM, Microsoft and 56 Other Companies. Number of pages: [163]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000084931] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 02:31 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 197 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund. Number of pages: [42]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/17/2017. [1000084926] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 02:28 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 196 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Public Advocate of the United States et al. Number of pages: [34]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/17/2017. [1000084921] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 02:25 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 195 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of NAACP Legal Defense and Education Fund, Inc.. Number of pages: [46]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/17/2017. [1000084911] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 02:14 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 194 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of The National PTA et al. Number of pages: [44]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/18/2017. [1000084905] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 02:10 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 193 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of National Education Association et al. Number of pages: [46]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/18/2017. [1000084899] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 02:06 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 192 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Bar Association. Number of pages: [40]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000084898] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 02:04 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 191 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of State of West Virginia and 16 Other States. Number of pages: [37]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000084880] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 01:46 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 190 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Americans United for Separation of Church and State et al. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000084875] [15-2056]--[Edited 08/01/2017 by JR] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 01:38 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 189 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of PFLAG, Inc. et al. Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000084870] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 01:30 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 188 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of interACT: Advocates for Intersex Youth et al. Number of pages: [46]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000084869] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 01:27 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 187 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Evie Priestman, Carter Brown, Kate Brown, Sydney Siddy Greenstein, Dylan Kleiman, Sarah Lore, Kayden Ortiz, Maxwell Platt, Rowan Woodridge. Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000084865] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 01:20 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 186 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of American Academy of Pediatrics, American College of Physicians and American Psychiatric Association et al. Number of pages: [47]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/17/2017. [1000084861] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 01:14 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 185 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Samuel R. Bagenstos, Michael C. Dorf, Martin S. Lederman and Leah M. Litman. Number of pages: [39]. Number of Copies: [5]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000084859] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 01:08 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 184 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Judith Reisman and The Child Protection Institute. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/16/2017. [1000084856] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 01:03 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 165 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by NATIONAL WOMENS LAW CENTER, ET AL. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. [1000083053] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/17/2017 07:40 AM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 153 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Apple, IBM, Microsoft and 56 Other Companies in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000082077] [15-2056] Ona Wang [Entered: 05/15/2017 11:54 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 152 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2017. [1000082076] [15-2056] Lawrence Joseph [Entered: 05/15/2017 11:45 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 151 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by The Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in support of Defendant-Appellee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2017. [1000082075] [15-2056] Daniel Blomberg [Entered: 05/15/2017 10:40 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 150 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Becket Fund for Religious Liberty in Support of Defendant-Appellee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2017. [1000082067] [15-2056]--[Edited 05/18/2017 by JR] Daniel Blomberg [Entered: 05/15/2017 10:15 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 149 Supplemental AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Public Advocate of the United States, United States Justice Foundation, Citizens United, Citizens United Foundation, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2017. [1000082056] [15-2056] Robert Olson [Entered: 05/15/2017 09:27 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 148 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by State of New York Amicus Supporting Appellant in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2017. [1000082055] [15-2056] Anisha Dasgupta [Entered: 05/15/2017 09:20 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 147 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Cynthia Cook Robertson, counsel for Amici Curiae School Administrators from Thirty-Three States and the District of Columbia in Support of Appellant-Plaintiff in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2017. [1000082053] [15-2056]--[Edited 05/19/2017 by JR] Cynthia Robertson [Entered: 05/15/2017 08:59 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 146 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Christina A. Swarns, Amicus Curiae NAACP Legal Defense and Educational Fund, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2017. [1000082052] [15-2056] Christina Swarns [Entered: 05/15/2017 08:49 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 145 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by National PTA, GLSEN, American School Counselor Association, National Association of School Psychologists, Maryland PTA, amici curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000082050] [15-2056] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 05/15/2017 08:42 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 144 MOTION by National PTA, GLSEN, American School Counselor Association, National Association of School Psychologists, and Maryland PTA, amici curiae to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 05/15/2017 ecf. [1000082049] [15-2056] Richard Bernstein [Entered: 05/15/2017 08:39 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 143 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by National Education Association; American Federation of Teachers; National Association of Secondary School Principals; American Federation of State, County, and Municipal Employees; SEIU; and School Social Work Association of America in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2017. [1000082014] [15-2056] Eric Harrington [Entered: 05/15/2017 05:04 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 142 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by American Bar Association as Amicus Supporting Appellant in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081999] [15-2056] Linda Klein [Entered: 05/15/2017 04:40 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 141 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee State of West VirginiaState of West Virginia and 16 other States as amici curiae in support of defendant-appellee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081977] [15-2056] Thomas Johnson [Entered: 05/15/2017 04:23 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 140 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Americans United for Separation of Church and State; Anti-Defamation League; Bend the Arc: A Jewish Partnership for Justice; Central Conference of American Rabbis; Hadassah; Keshet; National LGBT Bar Association; et al.; as Amicus Supporting Appellant in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081959] [15-2056]--[Edited 08/01/2017 by JR] Catherine Stetson [Entered: 05/15/2017 04:12 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 139 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by PFLAG, INC., TRANS YOUTH EQUALITY FOUNDATION, GENDER SPECTRUM, AND GENDER DIVERSITY in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081945] [15-2056] Maureen Alger [Entered: 05/15/2017 04:01 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 138 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by interACT: ADVOCATES FOR INTERSEX YOUTH, ET AL. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081904] [15-2056] Aron Fischer [Entered: 05/15/2017 03:40 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 137 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellant Evie Priestman, Carter Brown, amicus curiae; Kate Brown, amicus curiae,; Sydney Siddy Greenstein, amicus curiae; Dylan Kleiman, amicus curiae; Sarah Lore, amicus curiae; Kayden Ortiz, amicus curiae; Maxwell Platt, amicus curiae; Rowan Woodridge, amicus curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081890] [15-2056] Jesse Loffler [Entered: 05/15/2017 03:35 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 135 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by American Academy of Pediatrics, American Psychiatric Association, American College of Physicians, American Academy of Child and Adolescent Psychiatry, American Academy of Family Physicians, American Academy of Nursing, et al. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081760] [15-2056] Scott Wilkens [Entered: 05/15/2017 02:36 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 134 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Women's Liberation Front and Family Policy Alliance in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081699] [15-2056] David Bookbinder [Entered: 05/15/2017 01:59 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 133 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Alliance Defending Freedom, Amicus Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081685] [15-2056] Gary McCaleb [Entered: 05/15/2017 01:41 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 132 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Profs. Bagenstos, Dorf, Lederman, and Litman as Amici Curiae in support of Plaintiff-Appellant in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081602] [15-2056] Kevin Russell [Entered: 05/15/2017 12:24 PM]
May 15, 2017 Filing 131 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amicus Supporting Appellee Judith ReismanThe Child Protection Institute in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/15/2017. [1000081578] [15-2056] Mary McAlister [Entered: 05/15/2017 12:09 PM]
May 12, 2017 Filing 183 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Family Research Council and North Carolina Values Coalition. Number of pages: [31]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/19/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/17/2017. [1000084833] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/19/2017 12:26 PM]
May 12, 2017 Filing 136 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Constitutional Accountability Center. Number of pages: [33]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/15/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/15/2017. [1000081853] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/15/2017 03:17 PM]
May 12, 2017 Filing 129 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Constitutional Accountability Center as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff-Appellant in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/12/2017. [1000080754] [15-2056] Elizabeth Wydra [Entered: 05/12/2017 12:02 PM]
May 12, 2017 Filing 128 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by North Carolina Values Coalition and The Family Research Council in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/12/2017. [1000080532] [15-2056] Deborah Dewart [Entered: 05/12/2017 09:10 AM]
May 11, 2017 Filing 127 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gene C. Schaerr for Gloucester County School Board.[1000080337] [15-2056] Gene Schaerr [Entered: 05/11/2017 03:48 PM]
May 10, 2017 Filing 125 Amended ORDER filed [1000079124] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)). Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? N. Appearance Form filed? N. Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/10/2017 10:02 AM]
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER filed [1000079113] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)). Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? N. Appearance Form filed? N. Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/10/2017 09:49 AM]
May 10, 2017 Filing 123 DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Attorney John Allen Eidsmoe for Amicus Supporting Appellee Foundation for Moral Law re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 05/15/2017 from John Allen Eidsmoe, filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Disclosure statement due from Foundation for Moral Law on 05/15/2017. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/10/2017 09:12 AM]
May 9, 2017 Filing 130 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Foundation for Moral Law. Number of pages: [23]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/12/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/12/2017. [1000080947] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/12/2017 02:47 PM]
May 9, 2017 Filing 122 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Foundation for Moral Law in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/10/2017. [1000078852] [15-2056] John Eidsmoe [Entered: 05/09/2017 04:27 PM]
May 8, 2017 Filing 126 SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Gloucester County School Board. Number of pages: [59]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 05/10/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/10/2017. [1000079556] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/10/2017 02:39 PM]
May 8, 2017 Filing 121 APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of G. G.. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 1. Total number of pages in all volumes: 167. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of Copies: 4. Entered on Docket Date: 05/09/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/08/2017. [1000078118] [15-2056] 4 additional copies of the original Joint Appendix filed 10/21/15 JR [Entered: 05/09/2017 08:27 AM]
May 8, 2017 Filing 120 SUPPLEMENTAL OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of G. G.. Number of pages: [70]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on the Docket Date: 05/09/2017. Received by clerk date: 05/08/2017. [1000078115] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/09/2017 08:25 AM]
May 8, 2017 Filing 119 Supplemental BRIEF by Appellee Gloucester County School Board in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/09/2017. [1000077828] [15-2056] Stuart Duncan [Entered: 05/08/2017 03:37 PM]
May 8, 2017 Filing 118 FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant G. G.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. [1000077808] [15-2056] Gail Deady [Entered: 05/08/2017 03:25 PM]
May 8, 2017 Filing 117 BRIEF by Appellant G. G. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: SUPPLEMENTAL OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. [1000077804] [15-2056] Gail Deady [Entered: 05/08/2017 03:22 PM]
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER filed [1000074916] granting Motion to withdraw as counsel [ # 115 ] Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/03/2017 10:38 AM]
May 3, 2017 Filing 115 MOTION by Appellant G. G. to withdraw/relieve/substitute counsel.Attorney or client motion? Attorney. Was a copy of the motion served on the defendant? Y. Was the defendant advised of right to file response within 7 days? Y. Date and method of service: 05/03/2017 ecf. [1000074903] [15-2056] Rebecca Glenberg [Entered: 05/03/2017 10:28 AM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 114 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Thomas M. Johnson, Jr. for State of West Virginia.[1000061510] [15-2056] Thomas Johnson [Entered: 04/13/2017 12:39 PM]
April 13, 2017 Filing 113 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Victoria Lill, Paul LePage & Clare Wuerker. Simultaneous Opening Briefs and Appendix due 05/08/2017. Amicus briefs in support of either party due 05/15/2017. Simultaneous Reply Briefs due 06/02/2017. [15-2056] TW [Entered: 04/13/2017 08:46 AM]
April 12, 2017 Filing 112 NOTICE re: suggested briefing schedule by G. G. and Gloucester County School Board. [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 04/12/2017 09:22 AM]
April 7, 2017 Filing 111 NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Joshua A. Block, Leslie Cooper, Gail Marie Deady and Rebecca Glenberg for G. G., Mr. Jeremy David Capps, Mr. David Patrick Corrigan, Stuart Kyle Duncan, Mr. Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr. and Stephen S. Schwartz for Gloucester County School Board requesting response to court inquiry [1000058123]. 04/17/2017 [15-2056] JR [Entered: 04/07/2017 02:52 PM]
April 7, 2017 Filing 110 COURT ORDER filed [1000058069] denying Motion to expedite oral argument [ # 102 ]; denying Motion to expedite briefing [ # 102 ] Copies to all parties. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 04/07/2017 02:15 PM]
April 7, 2017 Filing 109 Case reopened. Supreme Court Remand. Originating case number: 4:15-cv-00054-RGD-DEM. [15-2056] SJC [Entered: 04/07/2017 09:28 AM]
April 7, 2017 Filing 108 SUPREME COURT REMARK--judgment remanding case received. REMANDED vacated, 04/07/2017. [15-2056] SJC [Entered: 04/07/2017 09:21 AM]
March 14, 2017 Filing 107 REPLY by G. G. to Response [ # 106 ].. [15-2056] Gail Deady [Entered: 03/14/2017 02:39 PM]
March 14, 2017 Filing 106 RESPONSE/ANSWER by to Motion for other relief [ # 102 ], Motion to schedule oral argument [ # 102 ]. Nature of response: in opposition. [15-2056] Stuart Duncan [Entered: 03/14/2017 11:26 AM]
March 10, 2017 Filing 105 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Stephen S. Schwartz for Gloucester County School Board.[1000040003] [15-2056] Stephen Schwartz [Entered: 03/10/2017 12:15 PM]
March 10, 2017 Filing 104 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by S. Kyle Duncan for Gloucester County School Board.[1000039870] [15-2056] Stuart Duncan [Entered: 03/10/2017 10:35 AM]
March 8, 2017 Filing 103 NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Jeremy David Capps, Mr. David Patrick Corrigan and Mr. Maurice Scott Fisher, Jr. for Gloucester County School Board requesting response to Motion to schedule oral argument [ # 102 ], Motion for other relief [ # 102 ] Response due 03/14/2017.[1000038656]. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 03/08/2017 04:21 PM]
March 8, 2017 Filing 102 MOTION by Appellant G. G. for EXPEDITE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING, to schedule oral argument. Argument Date or Session:.. Date and method of service: 03/08/2017 ecf. [1000038633] [15-2056] Gail Deady [Entered: 03/08/2017 04:09 PM]
March 6, 2017 Filing 101 SUPREME COURT REMARK--order remanding case received. 03/06/2017, REMANDED vacated. [15-2056] PSC [Entered: 03/06/2017 05:44 PM]
February 7, 2017 RECORD (4CCA) transmitted to Supreme Court. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-273. [15-2056, 16-1733] SJC [Entered: 02/07/2017 09:59 AM]
February 7, 2017 RECORD requested by Supreme Court from court of appeals and district court/agency. Supreme Court Docket No.: 16-273. [15-2056, 16-1733] SJC [Entered: 02/07/2017 09:49 AM]
November 1, 2016 Filing 100 SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari granted. 10/31/2016 [15-2056, 16-1733] SJC [Entered: 11/01/2016 03:11 PM]
September 2, 2016 Filing 99 SUPREME COURT REMARK--petition for writ of certiorari filed. 08/29/2016. 16-273. [15-2056, 16-1733] SAC [Entered: 11/01/2016 03:02 PM]
September 2, 2016 Filing 98 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) SUPREME COURT REMARK -- petition for writ of certiorari filed 08/29/2016. 16-273 [15-2056]--[Edited 11/01/2016 by SAC] SJC [Entered: 09/02/2016 02:06 PM]
August 3, 2016 Filing 97 SUPREME COURT REMARK--Order of the Supreme Court granting the application to recall and stay this court's mandate and staying the preliminary injunction entered by the district court pending the timely filing and disposition of a petition for writ of certiorari. [15-2056] PSC [Entered: 08/03/2016 04:30 PM]
June 17, 2016 Filing 95 [MANDATE RECALLED, 08/03/2016, see DE 97] Mandate issued. Referencing: [ # 74 ] Published Authored Opinion, [ # 75 ] Judgment Order. Originating case number: 4:15-cv-00054-RGD-DEM. Mailed to: Victoria Lill, Paul LePage & Clare Wuerker. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 06/17/2016 11:07 AM]
June 9, 2016 Filing 94 COURT ORDER filed [999849259] denying Motion to stay mandate [FRAP 41(d)] [ # 91 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Victoria Lill, Paul LePage & Clare Wuerker. [15-2056] TW [Entered: 06/09/2016 04:12 PM]
June 7, 2016 Filing 93 COURT ORDER filed [999846184] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 87 ], granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 85 ], granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 83 ], granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 81 ]. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Victoria Lill, Paul LePage & Clare Wuerker. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 06/07/2016 04:07 PM]
June 7, 2016 Filing 92 Mandate stayed by FRAP 41(d)(1) pending ruling on motion to stay the mandate. Mailed to: Victoria Lill, Paul LePage & Clare Wuerker. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 06/07/2016 02:16 PM]
June 7, 2016 Filing 91 MOTION by Appellee Gloucester County School Board to stay mandate [FRAP 41(d)]. Date and method of service: 06/07/2016 ecf. [999845549] [15-2056] David Corrigan [Entered: 06/07/2016 12:20 PM]
May 31, 2016 Filing 90 COURT ORDER filed [999838355] denying Motion for rehearing en banc [ # 76 ]. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Victoria Lill, Paul LePage & Clare Wuerker. [15-2056] TW [Entered: 05/31/2016 04:31 PM]
May 16, 2016 Filing 89 RESPONSE/ANSWER to rehearing by G. G.. [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 05/16/2016 01:43 PM]
May 16, 2016 Filing 88 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellee Gloucester County School Board. [999823451]. [15-2056] David Corrigan [Entered: 05/16/2016 11:14 AM]
May 11, 2016 Filing 87 MOTION by Amici Supporting Appellee Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, State of Arizona and State of West Virginia States of Kansas, Nebraska, Texas, and Utah to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) as government agency or officer within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 05/11/2016 Courier delivery, ecf. [999820189] [15-2056] Elbert Lin [Entered: 05/11/2016 02:52 PM]
May 11, 2016 Filing 86 Corrected AMICUS BRIEF on Petition for Rehearing (with appearance of counsel) by 50 Gloucester Students, Parents and Grandparents, et al.. Supporting: appellee. [999820001] [15-2056] John Sharp [Entered: 05/11/2016 01:33 PM]
May 11, 2016 Filing 85 MOTION by 50 Gloucester Students, Parents and Grandparents, et al. to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 05/11/2016 ecf. [999819997] [15-2056] John Sharp [Entered: 05/11/2016 01:31 PM]
May 10, 2016 Filing 84 AMICUS BRIEF on Petition for Rehearing (with appearance of counsel) by Amicus Supporting Appellee Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund. Supporting: appellee. [999819242] [15-2056] Lawrence Joseph [Entered: 05/10/2016 10:24 PM]
May 10, 2016 Filing 83 MOTION by Amicus Supporting Appellee Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 05/10/2016 ecf, US mail. [999819241] [15-2056] Lawrence Joseph [Entered: 05/10/2016 10:21 PM]
May 10, 2016 Filing 82 AMICUS BRIEF on Petition for Rehearing (with appearance of counsel) by Public Advocate of the US, US Justice Foundation, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, amici curiae. Supporting: appellee. [999819234] [15-2056] William Olson [Entered: 05/10/2016 07:28 PM]
May 10, 2016 Filing 81 MOTION by Public Advocate of the US, US Justice Foundation, and Conservative Legal Defense and Education Fund, amici curiae to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 05/10/2016 ecf. [999819233] [15-2056] William Olson [Entered: 05/10/2016 07:25 PM]
May 10, 2016 Filing 80 AMICUS BRIEF on Petition for Rehearing (with appearance of counsel) by Amici Supporting Appellee Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, State of Arizona and State of West VirginiaStates of Kansas, Nebraska, Texas, and Utah. Supporting: appellee. [999819218] [15-2056] Elbert Lin [Entered: 05/10/2016 05:44 PM]
May 10, 2016 Filing 79 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) AMICUS BRIEF on Petition for Rehearing (with appearance of counsel) by 50 Gloucester Students, Parents, and Grandparents, et al.. Supporting: appellee. [999819092] [15-2056]--[Edited 05/11/2016 by JR] John Sharp [Entered: 05/10/2016 04:19 PM]
May 4, 2016 Filing 78 Court order filed requesting response to Mr. Joshua A. Block, Leslie Cooper, Gail Marie Deady, and Rebecca Glenberg requesting response to Motion for rehearing en banc. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/04/2016 04:43 PM]
May 3, 2016 Filing 77 Mandate stayed by FRAP 41(d)(1). Mailed to: Clare Patricia Wuerker, Victoria Lill. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 05/03/2016 01:39 PM]
May 3, 2016 Filing 76 PETITION for rehearing en banc (FRAP 35) by Appellee Gloucester County School Board. [15-2056] David Corrigan [Entered: 05/03/2016 01:19 PM]
April 19, 2016 Filing 75 JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 15-2056 opn.p.arg. Decision: Reversed in part, vacated in part, and remanded. Originating case number: 4:15-cv-00054-RGD-DEM. Entered on Docket Date: 04/19/2016. [999798406] Copies to all parties and the district court. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 04/19/2016 12:49 PM]
April 19, 2016 Filing 74 PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 4:15-cv-00054-RGD-DEM. [999798388] Annotation added to opinion reflecting Supreme Court history. [15-2056]--[Edited 12/02/2016 by SJC] JR [Entered: 04/19/2016 12:43 PM]
March 19, 2016 Filing 73 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellant G. G.. [999777925]. [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 03/19/2016 08:11 PM]
January 27, 2016 Filing 72 ORAL ARGUMENT heard before the Honorable Paul V. Niemeyer, Henry F. Floyd and Andre M. Davis. Attorneys arguing case: Mr. Joshua A. Block for Appellant G. G. and Mr. David Patrick Corrigan for Appellee Gloucester County School Board. Courtroom Deputy: Cathy Eagles. [999742790] [15-2056] CWE [Entered: 01/27/2016 12:04 PM]
January 6, 2016 Filing 71 Corrected BRIEF by Appellant G. G. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: N/A. [999731266] [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 01/06/2016 03:23 PM]
January 6, 2016 Filing 70 Errata sheet for paper briefs by G. G.. Identify brief: OPENING. Corrected electronic brief must be filed separately by counsel. [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 01/06/2016 03:19 PM]
December 7, 2015 Filing 69 REPLY BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of G. G.. Number of pages: [39]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/07/2015. [999713876] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 12/07/2015 04:06 PM]
December 7, 2015 Filing 68 BRIEF by Appellant G. G. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/07/2015. [999713437] [15-2056] Gail Deady [Entered: 12/07/2015 11:42 AM]
December 4, 2015 Filing 67 Additional copies of AMICUS BRIEF received from Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, State of Arizona, State of Mississippi, State of South Carolina and State of West Virginia. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 12/04/2015 11:20 AM]
December 2, 2015 Filing 66 COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, State of Arizona, State of Mississippi, State of South Carolina and State of West Virginia requesting 3 additional copies of brief. Additional copies due 12/07/2015 [15-2056] JR [Entered: 12/02/2015 01:20 PM]
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER filed [999709340] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 57 ], granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 59 ]. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Victoria Lill, Clare Patricia Wuerker. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 12/01/2015 10:16 AM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 65 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Paul R. LePage, Patrick L. McCrory, State of Arizona, State of Mississippi, State of South Carolina and State of West Virginia. Number of pages: [33]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/02/2015.[999710582] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 12/02/2015 01:12 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 64 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Liberty Center for Child Protection and Judith Reisman. Number of pages: [44]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/02/2015.[999710496] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 12/02/2015 11:45 AM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 63 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Rodney Autry, Tim Byrd, Donald Caulder, Wendy Caulder, Claudia Clifton, Joshua Cuba, Mark Frechette, Bradly Friedlin, Ilona Gambill, Doretha Guju, James Larsen, Jon Lynsky, Alice May, Issac Rutan, Jim Rutan, Lee Terry, Lisa Terry, The Family Foundation of Virginia, David Thornton, Kathy Thornton, John Walsh, Lorraine Walsh and Kim Ward. Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [8]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/02/2015.[999710399] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 12/02/2015 10:59 AM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 62 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Eagle Forum Education and Legal Defense Fund. Number of pages: [43]. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 12/02/2015.[999710236] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 12/02/2015 09:03 AM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 60 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Lawrence J. Joseph, counsel for amicus Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/01/2015. [999708985] [15-2056] Lawrence Joseph [Entered: 11/30/2015 11:32 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 59 MOTION by Lawrence J. Joseph, counsel for movant-amicus Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 11/30/2015 US mail, ecf. [999708984] [15-2056] Lawrence Joseph [Entered: 11/30/2015 11:29 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 58 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Family Foundation of Virginia, et al., amicus curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/01/2015. [999708898] [15-2056] John Sharp [Entered: 11/30/2015 04:44 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 57 MOTION by Family Foundation of Virginia, et al., amicus curiae to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 11/30/2015 ecf. [999708890] [15-2056] John Sharp [Entered: 11/30/2015 04:40 PM]
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER filed [999708768] granting filing of amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)). Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Victoria Lill, Clare Patricia Wuerker. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 11/30/2015 03:58 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 55 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Liberty Center for Child Protection & Dr. Judith Reisman, Amici Supporting Appellee in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/30/2015. [999708351] [15-2056] Mary McAlister [Entered: 11/30/2015 01:36 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 54 MOTION by Liberty Center for Child Protection & Dr. Judith Reisman, Amici Curiae Supporting Appellee to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 11/30/2015 ecf. [999708346] [15-2056] Mary McAlister [Entered: 11/30/2015 01:31 PM]
November 30, 2015 Filing 53 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by State of South Carolina, amicus curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/01/2015. [999708335] [15-2056] James Smith [Entered: 11/30/2015 01:18 PM]
November 25, 2015 Filing 52 Additional copies of AMICUS BRIEF received from National Women's Law Center, et al. [15-2056] AC [Entered: 11/25/2015 10:28 AM]
November 24, 2015 Filing 51 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant G. G.. Counsel arguing: Joshua A. Block [999706733] [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 11/24/2015 05:21 PM]
November 24, 2015 Filing 50 ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Gloucester County School Board. [999706659] [15-2056] David Corrigan [Entered: 11/24/2015 04:41 PM]
November 24, 2015 Filing 49 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 01/27/2016. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [15-2056] JLC [Entered: 11/24/2015 03:49 PM]
November 23, 2015 Filing 48 RESPONSE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Gloucester County School Board. Number of pages: [61]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [4]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/24/2015. [999706246] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 11/24/2015 01:55 PM]
November 23, 2015 Filing 47 BRIEF by Appellee Gloucester County School Board in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/23/2015. [999705264] [15-2056] David Corrigan [Entered: 11/23/2015 03:55 PM]
November 23, 2015 Filing 46 Additional copies of AMICUS BRIEF received from Gender Benders. [15-2056] AC [Entered: 11/23/2015 09:58 AM]
November 18, 2015 Filing 45 Additional copies of AMICUS BRIEF received from The World Professional Association for Transgender Health, et al. [15-2056] AC [Entered: 11/18/2015 10:32 AM]
November 17, 2015 Filing 44 Additional copies of OPENING BRIEF and Joint Appendix received from G. G. [15-2056] AD [Entered: 11/17/2015 02:01 PM]
November 17, 2015 Filing 43 COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to Gender Benders, Gender Justice, The World Professional Association for Transgender Health and G. G. requesting additional copies of brief(s). Additional copies due 11/23/2015 [15-2056] AC [Entered: 11/17/2015 08:25 AM]
November 5, 2015 Filing 42 Additional copies (3) received from Thomas A Aberli, Robert Bourgeois, Diana K. Bruce, Judy Chiasson, Mary Doran, Sherie Hohs, Lisa Love, Jeremy Majeski, John O'Reilly, Denise Palazzo, Dylan Pauly, Rudy Rudolph and David Vannasdall. Select type of brief: AMICUS BRIEF. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 11/05/2015 01:53 PM]
November 5, 2015 Filing 41 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Gay, Lesbian & Straight Education Network, Gay-Straight Alliance Network, Gender Benders, Evie Priestman, ROSMY, Time Out Youth, We Are Family and iNSIDEoUT. Number of pages: [42]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/05/2015.[999694024] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 11/05/2015 01:30 PM]
November 4, 2015 Filing 40 CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 1/26/16 - 1/28/16 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 11/09/2015 [15-2056] JLC [Entered: 11/04/2015 11:35 AM]
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER filed [999692493] [ # 35 ], granting motion for expedited oral argument and tentatively calendaring case. Argument Date or Session: January 26-28, 2016. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Victoria Lill and Clare Patricia Wuerker. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 11/04/2015 08:38 AM]
November 3, 2015 Filing 39 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of US. Number of pages: [41]. Number of Copies: [8]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/04/2015.[999692588] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 11/04/2015 09:27 AM]
November 3, 2015 Filing 38 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Center for Transyouth Health and Development at Children's Hospital Los Angeles, Child and Adolescent Gender Center Clinic at UCSF Benioff Children's Hospital, Fan Free Clinic, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, Gender & Sex Development Program at Ann & Robert H. Lurie Children's Hospital of Chicago, Pediatric Endocrine Society, The World Professional Association for Transgender Health, Transgender Law & Policy Institute and Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc. Norman Spack and Michelle Forcier. Number of pages: [63]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/04/2015.[999692579] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 11/04/2015 09:18 AM]
November 3, 2015 Filing 35 MOTION by Appellant G. G. for EXPEDITED ORAL ARGUMENT. Date and method of service: 11/03/2015 ecf. [999692228] [15-2056] Gail Deady [Entered: 11/03/2015 03:39 PM]
November 2, 2015 Filing 34 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Supporting Appellant Center for Transyouth Health and Development at Children's Hospital Los Angeles, Child and Adolescent Gender Center Clinic at UCSF Benioff Children's Hospital, Fan Free Clinic, GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, Gender & Sex Development Program at Ann & Robert H. Lurie Children's Hospital of Chicago, Pediatric Endocrine Society, The World Professional Association for Transgender Health, Transgender Law & Policy Institute and Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc. Norman Spack, MD and Michelle Forcier, MD in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 11/02/2015. [999690813] [15-2056] Thomas Hefferon [Entered: 11/02/2015 02:46 PM]
November 2, 2015 Filing 33 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of California Women's Law Center, Equal Rights Advocates, Gender Justice, Legal Aid Society - Employment Law Center, Legal Momentum, Legal Voice, Southwest Women's Law Center, The Association of Title IV Administrators, NWLC and The Women's Law Project. Number of pages: [25]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 11/02/2015.[999690399] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 11/02/2015 11:25 AM]
October 30, 2015 Filing 32 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Leslie Cooper for G. G..[999689674] [15-2056] Leslie Cooper [Entered: 10/30/2015 12:37 PM]
October 30, 2015 Filing 31 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Rebecca K. Glenberg for G. G..[999689490] [15-2056] Rebecca Glenberg [Entered: 10/30/2015 11:20 AM]
October 30, 2015 Filing 30 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of Thomas A Aberli, Robert Bourgeois, Diana K. Bruce, Judy Chiasson, Mary Doran, Sherie Hohs, Lisa Love, Jeremy Majeski, John O'Reilly, Denise Palazzo, Dylan Pauly, Rudy Rudolph and David Vannasdall. Number of pages: [37]. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/30/2015.[999689474] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 10/30/2015 11:12 AM]
October 30, 2015 Appendix [ # 14 ] released to public. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 10/30/2015 08:39 AM]
October 29, 2015 Filing 29 Docket correction requested from Mr. Thomas Michael Hefferon for GLMA: Health Professionals Advancing LGBT Equality, The World Professional Association for Transgender Health, Pediatric Endocrine Society, Child and Adolescent Gender Center Clinic at UCSF Benioff Children's Hospital, Center for Transyouth Health and Development at Children's Hospital Los Angeles, Gender & Sex Development Program at Ann & Robert H. Lurie Children's Hospital of Chicago, Fan Free Clinic, Whitman-Walker Clinic, Inc. and Transgender Law & Policy Institute. Mailed to: Victoria Lill and Clare Patricia Wuerker. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 10/29/2015 04:24 PM]
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER filed [999689019] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 26 ], granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 23 ], granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 21 ], granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [ # 19 ]. Disclosure Statement filed (if corporate amicus)? Y. Appearance Form filed? Y. Copies to all parties. Mailed to: Victoria Lill and Clare Patricia Wuerker. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 10/29/2015 04:04 PM]
October 29, 2015 Filing 27 Corrected AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Gender Benders et al. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/29/2015. [999688646] [15-2056] David Dinielli [Entered: 10/29/2015 11:30 AM]
October 28, 2015 Filing 26 MOTION by Gender Benders et al., Amici Curiae to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 10/28/2015 ecf. [999688378] [15-2056] David Dinielli [Entered: 10/28/2015 08:19 PM]
October 28, 2015 Filing 25 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Christine Monta, counsel for United States - Amicus Curiae in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/28/2015. [999688374] [15-2056] Christine Monta [Entered: 10/28/2015 07:21 PM]
October 28, 2015 Filing 24 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by AMICI CURIAE: World Professional Association for Transgender Health; Pediatric Endocrine Society; et al. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/28/2015. [999688368] [15-2056] Thomas Hefferon [Entered: 10/28/2015 07:08 PM]
October 28, 2015 Filing 23 MOTION by AMICI CURIAE: World Professional Association for Transgender Health; Pediatric Endocrine Society; et al. to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 10/28/2015 ecf. [999688367] [15-2056] Thomas Hefferon [Entered: 10/28/2015 07:03 PM]
October 28, 2015 Filing 22 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Amici Curiae Judy Chiasson, et al. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/29/2015. [999688362] [15-2056] Cynthia Robertson [Entered: 10/28/2015 06:30 PM]
October 28, 2015 Filing 21 MOTION by Amici Curiae Judy Chiasson, et al. to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) without consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 10/28/2015 ecf. [999688359] [15-2056] Cynthia Robertson [Entered: 10/28/2015 06:25 PM]
October 28, 2015 Filing 20 AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Suzanne B. Goldberg, counsel for Amici National Women's Law Center, et al in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/29/2015. [999688320] [15-2056] Suzanne Goldberg [Entered: 10/28/2015 04:55 PM]
October 28, 2015 Filing 19 MOTION by Suzanne B. Goldberg, counsel for Amici National Women's Law Center, et al leave to file. Date and method of service: 10/28/2015 ecf. [999688303] [15-2056] Suzanne Goldberg [Entered: 10/28/2015 04:43 PM]
October 28, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE re: Change of address of appellant's attorney Rebecca Glenberg by G. G.. [15-2056] Rebecca Glenberg [Entered: 10/28/2015 10:38 AM]
October 21, 2015 Filing 17 APPENDIX (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of G. G.. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): 1. Total number of pages in all volumes: 167. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/21/2015. [999683214] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 10/21/2015 11:47 AM]
October 21, 2015 Filing 16 OPENING BRIEF (PAPER) file-stamped, on behalf of G. G.. Number of pages: [75]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [1]. Entered on Docket Date: 10/21/2015. [999683159] [15-2056] JR [Entered: 10/21/2015 11:24 AM]
October 21, 2015 Filing 15 (ENTRY RESTRICTED) BRIEF by Appellant G. G. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 10/21/2015. [999683006] [15-2056]--[Edited 01/06/2016 by JR] Rebecca Glenberg [Entered: 10/21/2015 10:01 AM]
October 21, 2015 Filing 14 FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant G. G.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 10/21/2015. Has district court 90-day restriction expired for all transcripts included in appendix? No. The electronic appendix is initially restricted to case participants only. Case participants must be logged into CM/ECF to view the appendix prior to public release. Appendices in Immigration and Social Security cases will remain restricted.[999683001] [15-2056] Rebecca Glenberg [Entered: 10/21/2015 10:00 AM]
September 22, 2015 Filing 13 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Gail M. Deady for G. G..[999665175] [15-2056] Gail Deady [Entered: 09/22/2015 05:48 PM]
September 18, 2015 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Gloucester County School Board. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999662942] [15-2056] David Corrigan [Entered: 09/18/2015 12:02 PM]
September 18, 2015 Filing 11 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by M. Scott Fisher, Jr. for Gloucester County School Board.[999662937] [15-2056] Maurice Fisher [Entered: 09/18/2015 12:00 PM]
September 18, 2015 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jeremy D. Capps for Gloucester County School Board.[999662921] [15-2056] Jeremy Capps [Entered: 09/18/2015 11:53 AM]
September 18, 2015 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by David P. Corrigan for Gloucester County School Board.[999662899] [15-2056] David Corrigan [Entered: 09/18/2015 11:38 AM]
September 18, 2015 Filing 8 DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. MEMORANDUM OPINION - the Court GRANTED the Motion to Dismiss as to Count II, Plaintiff's claim under Title IX, and DENIED the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Robert G. Doumar on 9/17/15. [15-2056] JB [Entered: 09/18/2015 11:05 AM]
September 11, 2015 Filing 7 Initial mediation conference scheduled. [15-2056] LHP [Entered: 09/11/2015 05:08 PM]
September 11, 2015 Filing 6 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Clare Patricia Wuerker, Victoria Lill, Gail Marie Deady. Opening Brief and Appendix due 10/21/2015. Response Brief due 11/23/2015 [15-2056] JR [Entered: 09/11/2015 08:21 AM]
September 10, 2015 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant G. G.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999657889] [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 09/10/2015 03:59 PM]
September 10, 2015 Filing 4 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant G. G.. [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 09/10/2015 03:57 PM]
September 10, 2015 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Joshua Block for G. G..[999657665] [15-2056] Joshua Block [Entered: 09/10/2015 01:36 PM]
September 10, 2015 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 4:15-cv-00054-RGD-DEM. Mailed to: Leslie Cooper, Gail Marie Deady, Victoria Lill, Clare Patricia Wuerker. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 09/10/2015 10:21 AM]
September 10, 2015 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 4:15-cv-00054-RGD-DEM. Case manager: JRice. [15-2056] JR [Entered: 09/10/2015 10:05 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Gavin Grimm v. Gloucester County School Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WENDY RANCK-BUHR, Ph. D.
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SARAH LORE
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Represented By: Jesse Ryan Loffler
Represented By: Janice Mac Avoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WASHINGTON
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Maura Healey
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Mark Rankin Herring
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF WEST VIRGINIA
Represented By: Erica Nicole Peterson
Represented By: Patrick Morrisey
Represented By: Paul Anthony Martin
Represented By: Julie Marie Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WARBY PARKER
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PHYSICIAN ASSISTANTS
Represented By: Erica L. Ross
Represented By: Benjamin J. Brysacz
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: APPLE, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF DELAWARE
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Maura Healey
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Mark Rankin Herring
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GENDER SPECTRUM
Represented By: Patrick Gunn
Represented By: Ilona M. Turner
Represented By: Kara C. Wilson
Represented By: John C. Dwyer
Represented By: Kyle Wong
Represented By: Sasha J. Buchert
Represented By: Jennifer Lerner
Represented By: Maureen P. Alger
Represented By: Janna Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEE TERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CLAUDIA CLIFTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOL PSYCHOLOGISTS
Represented By: Daniel S. Gordon
Represented By: Wesley Railey Powell
Represented By: Arthur L. Coleman
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Emma J. James
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF OREGON
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WHITMAN-WALKER CLINIC, INC., d/b/a Whitman-Walker Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KIM WARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE GAP, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN PSYCHOANALYTIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Erica L. Ross
Represented By: Benjamin J. Brysacz
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PUBLIC JUSTICE
Represented By: Alexandra Brodsky
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Adaku Onyeka-Crawford
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Neena Kumari Chaudhry
Represented By: Fatima Goss Graves
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ILONA GAMBILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHELLE KING
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOCELYN SAMUELS
Represented By: Peter Stockburger
Represented By: Ian R. Barker
Represented By: Jeffrey Laurence Bleich
Represented By: Evan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PAUL R. MCHUGH, M.D.
Represented By: Gerard Vincent Bradley
Represented By: Steven Lee Tiedemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL WOMEN'S POLITICAL CAUCUS
Represented By: Alexandra Brodsky
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Adaku Onyeka-Crawford
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Neena Kumari Chaudhry
Represented By: Fatima Goss Graves
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE OUTCAST AGENCY
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARK FRECHETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DYLAN PAULY, School Administrator Wisconsin
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: Narumi Ito
Represented By: Alison Pennington
Represented By: Amy L. Pierce
Represented By: Alexander P. Hardiman
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Represented By: Shawn P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION
Represented By: Nicole G. Berner
Represented By: Eric A. Harrington
Represented By: David John Strom
Represented By: Mary Deweese
Represented By: Judith E. Rivlin
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EAGLE FORUM EDUCATION AND LEGAL DEFENSE FUND
Represented By: Lawrence John Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PASTOR JAMES LARSEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JILL GURTNER
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PATRICK L. MCCRORY, In his official capacity as Governor State of North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE NATIONAL CRITTENTON FOUNDATION
Represented By: Alexandra Brodsky
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Adaku Onyeka-Crawford
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Neena Kumari Chaudhry
Represented By: Fatima Goss Graves
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MISSOURI
Represented By: Joshua D. Hawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DONALD CAULDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEXTDOOR.COM, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES C. MORSE, SR., Ed.D.
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN BAR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Alan E. Schoenfeld
Represented By: Bruce Martin Berman
Represented By: Linda Ann Klein
Represented By: Joshua Michael Koppel
Represented By: Adam M. Cambier
Represented By: Anuradha Sivaram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SAMUEL R. BAGENSTOS
Represented By: Eric Franklin Citron
Represented By: Kevin Kendrick Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: YELP, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MONICA GARCIA
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NATIONAL EDUCATION ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Nicole G. Berner
Represented By: Eric A. Harrington
Represented By: David John Strom
Represented By: Mary Deweese
Represented By: Judith E. Rivlin
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOUTHWEST WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MISSISSIPPI
Represented By: Jim Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICHAEL SCHILDER, Ed.D.
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF KANSAS
Represented By: Derek Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JAMES COLE, JR.
Represented By: Peter Stockburger
Represented By: Ian R. Barker
Represented By: Jeffrey Laurence Bleich
Represented By: Evan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TUMBLR, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SHERRI CYRA
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: INTEL CORPORATION
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WENDY CAULDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN SCHOOL COUNSELOR ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Daniel S. Gordon
Represented By: Wesley Railey Powell
Represented By: Arthur L. Coleman
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Emma J. James
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARY DORAN, School Administrator Minnesota
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: Narumi Ito
Represented By: Alison Pennington
Represented By: Amy L. Pierce
Represented By: Alexander P. Hardiman
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Represented By: Shawn P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NETAPP, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JERRY NICHOLSON
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROWAN WOOLDRIDGE
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Represented By: Jesse Ryan Loffler
Represented By: Janice Mac Avoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF HAWAII
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BLOOMBERG, L.P.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARIZONA
Represented By: Mark Brnovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID LOPEZ
Represented By: Peter Stockburger
Represented By: Ian R. Barker
Represented By: Jeffrey Laurence Bleich
Represented By: Evan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MATTHEW HANEY
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MONTPELIER PUBLIC SCHOOLS
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GAY-STRAIGHT ALLIANCE NETWORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF UTAH
Represented By: Sean Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CARTER BROWN
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Represented By: Jesse Ryan Loffler
Represented By: Janice Mac Avoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE MITCHELL GOLD CO., d/b/a Mitchell Gold + Bob Williams
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LISA TERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LINDEN RESEARCH, INC., d/b/a Linden Lab
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KELLIE M. HARGIS, Ed.D.
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS
Represented By: Erica L. Ross
Represented By: Benjamin J. Brysacz
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JOHN B. KING, JR.
Represented By: Peter Stockburger
Represented By: Ian R. Barker
Represented By: Jeffrey Laurence Bleich
Represented By: Evan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEW VOICES FOR REPRODUCTIVE JUSTICE
Represented By: Alexandra Brodsky
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Adaku Onyeka-Crawford
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Neena Kumari Chaudhry
Represented By: Fatima Goss Graves
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF GEORGIA
Represented By: Christopher M. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: EVIE PRIESTMAN
Represented By: Rick Mula
Represented By: David Carter Dinielli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RYZAC, INC., d/b/a Codecademy
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: YAHOO! INCORPORATED
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN'S SPORTS FOUNDATION
Represented By: Alexandra Brodsky
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Adaku Onyeka-Crawford
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Neena Kumari Chaudhry
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GLSEN
Represented By: Daniel S. Gordon
Represented By: Wesley Railey Powell
Represented By: Arthur L. Coleman
Represented By: Richard D. Bernstein
Represented By: Emma J. James
Represented By: Mary Jane Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LINDSEY POLLOCK, Ed.D.
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ROBERT BOURGEOIS, School Administrator Massachusetts
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: Narumi Ito
Represented By: Alison Pennington
Represented By: Amy L. Pierce
Represented By: Alexander P. Hardiman
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Represented By: Shawn P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TENNESSEE
Represented By: Herbert H. Slatery III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DIANA K. BRUCE, School Administrator District of Columbia
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: Narumi Ito
Represented By: Alison Pennington
Represented By: Amy L. Pierce
Represented By: Alexander P. Hardiman
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Represented By: Shawn P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SHUTTERSTOCK, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GITHUB, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ZIAD W. MUNSON, Ph. D.
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN OF REFORM JUDAISM
Represented By: Sheree R. Kanner
Represented By: James Anthony Huang
Represented By: Catherine Emily Stetson
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Jessica Black Livingston
Represented By: Carmen N. Green
Represented By: Kenneth Y. Choe
Represented By: Andrew S. Furlow
Represented By: Mark D. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THOMAS SMITH, Ed.D.
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MENTAL HEALTH AMERICA
Represented By: Erica L. Ross
Represented By: Benjamin J. Brysacz
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: RECONSTRUCTIONIST RABBINICAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Sheree R. Kanner
Represented By: James Anthony Huang
Represented By: Catherine Emily Stetson
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Jessica Black Livingston
Represented By: Carmen N. Green
Represented By: Kenneth Y. Choe
Represented By: Andrew S. Furlow
Represented By: Mark D. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FOUNDATION FOR MORAL LAW
Represented By: John Allen Eidsmoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KATRINA KARKAZIS, Ph. D.
Represented By: Jonah Moses Knobler
Represented By: Aron Russell Fischer
Represented By: Tara J. Norris
Represented By: Lauren M. Capaccio
Represented By: Derek Borchardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CATHERINE FROM
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PANDORA MEDIA, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: POSTMATES INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AVIVA L. KATZ, M.D.
Represented By: Jonah Moses Knobler
Represented By: Aron Russell Fischer
Represented By: Tara J. Norris
Represented By: Lauren M. Capaccio
Represented By: Derek Borchardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITIZENS UNITED FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Michael Boos
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF ARKANSAS
Represented By: Leslie Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SAN DIEGO UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRYAN DAVIS, Ph. D.
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAWRENCE MAYER, Ph. D.
Represented By: Gerard Vincent Bradley
Represented By: Steven Lee Tiedemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DORETHA GUJU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID THORNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GREGORY R. MEECE
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JEREMY MAJESKI, School Administrator Illinois
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: Narumi Ito
Represented By: Alison Pennington
Represented By: Amy L. Pierce
Represented By: Alexander P. Hardiman
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Represented By: Shawn P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SYDNEY GREENSTEIN, a/k/a Siddy
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Represented By: Jesse Ryan Loffler
Represented By: Janice Mac Avoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: HEIDI CARTER
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ADELITA GRIJALVA
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ENDOCRINE SOCIETY
Represented By: Erica L. Ross
Represented By: Benjamin J. Brysacz
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PAUL R. LEPAGE, In his official capacity as Governor State of Maine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ANTHONY GATTO
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PAYPAL HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTER FOR TRANSYOUTH HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENT AT CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL LOS ANGELES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MEETUP, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KEN KUNIN
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CENTRAL CONFERENCE OF AMERICAN RABBIS
Represented By: Sheree R. Kanner
Represented By: James Anthony Huang
Represented By: Catherine Emily Stetson
Represented By: Richard Brian Katskee
Represented By: Jessica Black Livingston
Represented By: Carmen N. Green
Represented By: Kenneth Y. Choe
Represented By: Andrew S. Furlow
Represented By: Mark D. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: UNITED STATES JUSTICE FOUNDATION
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Michael Robert Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STOP SEXUAL ASSAULT IN SCHOOLS
Represented By: Alexandra Brodsky
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Adaku Onyeka-Crawford
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Neena Kumari Chaudhry
Represented By: Fatima Goss Graves
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF VERMONT
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Maura Healey
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Mark Rankin Herring
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ELIZABETH REIS, Ph. D.
Represented By: Jonah Moses Knobler
Represented By: Aron Russell Fischer
Represented By: Tara J. Norris
Represented By: Lauren M. Capaccio
Represented By: Derek Borchardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADLY FRIEDLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CALIFORNIA WOMEN'S LAW CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MATHEW S. NOSANCHUK
Represented By: Peter Stockburger
Represented By: Ian R. Barker
Represented By: Jeffrey Laurence Bleich
Represented By: Evan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF TEXAS
Represented By: Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AFFIRM, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KATE BROWN
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Represented By: Jesse Ryan Loffler
Represented By: Janice Mac Avoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE, COUNTY & MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Nicole G. Berner
Represented By: Eric A. Harrington
Represented By: David John Strom
Represented By: Mary Deweese
Represented By: Judith E. Rivlin
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF NEW YORK
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Maura Healey
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Mark Rankin Herring
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CHIMILLE E. DILLARD, Ed.D.
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF MAINE
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KATHY THORNTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ACADEMY OF PEDIATRICS
Represented By: Erica L. Ross
Represented By: Benjamin J. Brysacz
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NEXT FIFTEEN COMMUNICATIONS CORP
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MATTHEW G. BEVIN, Governor, Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Mark Stephen Pitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: MARTIN S. LEDERMAN
Represented By: Eric Franklin Citron
Represented By: Kevin Kendrick Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PATRICIA SHIU
Represented By: Peter Stockburger
Represented By: Ian R. Barker
Represented By: Jeffrey Laurence Bleich
Represented By: Evan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CYNDY TAYMORE
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SOCIETY FOR ADOLESCENT HEALTH AND MEDICINE
Represented By: Erica L. Ross
Represented By: Benjamin J. Brysacz
Represented By: Scott Block Wilkens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF VIRGINIA
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JON LYNSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LIBERTY CENTER FOR CHILD PROTECTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: WOMEN'S LIBERATION FRONT
Represented By: David Gabriel Bookbinder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: PUBLIC ADVOCATE OF THE UNITED STATES
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Represented By: Jeremiah L. Morgan
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Represented By: Michael Robert Connelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: DAVID MICHAELS
Represented By: Peter Stockburger
Represented By: Ian R. Barker
Represented By: Jeffrey Laurence Bleich
Represented By: Evan Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: KAYDEN ORTIZ
Represented By: Mark Siegmund
Represented By: Jesse Ryan Loffler
Represented By: Janice Mac Avoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CRAIG MCCALLA
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THE BECKET FUND FOR RELIGIOUS LIBERTY
Represented By: Eric Shawn Baxter
Represented By: Daniel Howard Blomberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: NORMAN SPACK, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FUTURES WITHOUT VIOLENCE
Represented By: Alexandra Brodsky
Represented By: Charles Alan Rothfeld
Represented By: Andrew John Pincus
Represented By: Adaku Onyeka-Crawford
Represented By: Michael B. Kimberly
Represented By: Neena Kumari Chaudhry
Represented By: Fatima Goss Graves
Represented By: Paul Whitfield Hughes III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CINDY MARTEN
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: ISSAC RUTAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GAY, LESBIAN & STRAIGHT EDUCATION NETWORK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LAURA H. LOVE
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: CITIZENS UNITED
Represented By: Herbert W. Titus
Represented By: Robert Jeffrey Olson
Represented By: Michael Boos
Represented By: William Jeffery Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FASTLY, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: THOMAS A. ABERLI, School Administrator Kentucky
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: Narumi Ito
Represented By: Alison Pennington
Represented By: Amy L. Pierce
Represented By: Alexander P. Hardiman
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Represented By: Shawn P. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: SLACK TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Represented By: Ona Theresa Wang
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sabella
Represented By: Samuel Mark Light
Represented By: Deborah Hilarie Renner
Represented By: Joanna Felice Wasick
Represented By: Seth Eric Engel
Represented By: Edward John Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: LEAH FREGULIA
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Represented By: Cynthia Cook Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: JUDITH REISMAN, Ph. D.
Represented By: Horatio Gabriel Mihet Esq.
Represented By: Mathew D. Staver
Represented By: Anita Leigh Staver
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: FAMILY RESEARCH COUNCIL
Represented By: Tami Fitzgerald
Represented By: Travis Weber
Represented By: Deborah Jane Dewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STATE OF IOWA
Represented By: Barbara D. Underwood
Represented By: Brian E. Frosh Esq.
Represented By: Thomas J. Donovan Jr.
Represented By: Douglas S. Chin
Represented By: Robert W. Ferguson
Represented By: Hector Balderas
Represented By: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Peter F. Kilmartin
Represented By: Matthew Denn
Represented By: Karl Anthony Racine
Represented By: Colleen M. Melody
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: Lisa Madigan
Represented By: George Jepsen
Represented By: Josh Shapiro
Represented By: Janet T. Mills
Represented By: Eric T. Schneiderman
Represented By: Andrew W. Amend
Represented By: Alan Dale Copsey
Represented By: Anisha Dasgupta
Represented By: Noah G. Purcell
Represented By: Ellen F. Rosenblum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN FEDERATION OF TEACHERS, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Nicole G. Berner
Represented By: Eric A. Harrington
Represented By: David John Strom
Represented By: Mary Deweese
Represented By: Judith E. Rivlin
Represented By: Alice O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: TIM KENNEY
Represented By: Richard M. Segal
Represented By: Nathaniel R. Smith
Represented By: Kyle Anthony Palazzolo
Represented By: Paul D. Castillo
Represented By: Tara Lynn Borelli
Represented By: William Clarke Miller
Represented By: Kathryn A. Nyce
Represented By: Demoya R. Gordon
Represented By: Robert C. K. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt |