Darrell Connor v. Covil Corporation

Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED, DANA COMPANIES, LLC, SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO WARNER BRAKE AND CLUTCH COMPANY, INC, FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC, WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARY OF EMERSON ELECTRIC COMPANY, PNEUMO ABEX, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ABEX CORPORATION, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED, CBS CORPORATION, agent of VIACOM, INC., SUED AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO CBS F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION, GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY, FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, f/k/a Fluor Corporation, CARRIER CORPORATION, MINE SAFETY APPLICANCES COMPANY, LLC, FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC., FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION, BW/IP, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMPS, CRANE CO, WARNER ELECTRIC LLC, FLOWSERVE US, INC., individually and as successor to BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY, METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY, NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY, SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., individually and successor in interest to MARLEY COOLING TOWERS CO., THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY and AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BUFFALO PUMPS
Defendant / Appellee: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, f/k/a Daniel Construction Company, Inc. and COVIL CORPORATION
Plaintiff / Appellant: DARRELL A. CONNOR, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Charles Franklin Connor, Deceased
Case Number: 19-1015
Filed: January 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER filed [1000464590] withdrawing/relieving/substituting counsel; administratively terminating Motion to withdraw [ # 19 ]. Copies to all parties. [19-1015] JR [Entered: 02/26/2019 07:36 AM]
February 25, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION by Covil Corporation to withdraw as Counsel... Date and method of service: 02/25/2019 ecf. [1000464461] [19-1015] William Silverman [Entered: 02/25/2019 04:58 PM]
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER filed [1000463757] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 04/10/2019. Number of days granted: 30. Opening brief and appendix due 04/10/2019. Response brief due 05/10/2019. Copies to all parties. [19-1015] TW [Entered: 02/25/2019 10:20 AM]
February 19, 2019 Filing 17 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Keith E. Coltrain for Covil Corporation. [1000459780] [19-1015] Keith Coltrain [Entered: 02/19/2019 10:01 AM]
February 5, 2019 Filing 16 Initial mediation conference scheduled. LOGIN TO CMECF TO VIEW ATTACHED DOCS BEFORE CLICKING LINK. [19-1015] LP [Entered: 02/05/2019 03:14 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 15 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Mark H. Wall for Covil Corporation. [1000448362] [19-1015] Mark Wall [Entered: 01/30/2019 02:19 PM]
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Morgan S. Templeton for Covil Corporation. [1000448317] [19-1015] Morgan Templeton [Entered: 01/30/2019 01:25 PM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 13 BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/11/2019. Response Brief due 04/10/2019. [19-1015] TW [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:39 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKETING STATEMENT by Darrell A. Connor. [19-1015] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:16 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Darrell A. Connor. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000447310] [19-1015] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:16 AM]
January 29, 2019 Filing 10 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Lisa W. Shirley for Darrell A. Connor. [1000447308] [19-1015] Lisa Shirley [Entered: 01/29/2019 11:14 AM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Denny P. Major for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441762] [19-1015] Denny Major [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:31 PM]
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Scott E. Frick for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441749] [19-1015] Scott Frick [Entered: 01/18/2019 03:12 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Daniel International Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000441087] [19-1015] Moffatt McDonald [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:22 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William David Conner for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441080] [19-1015] William Conner [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:17 PM]
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Moffatt G. McDonald for Daniel International Corporation. [1000441078] [19-1015] Moffatt McDonald [Entered: 01/17/2019 03:15 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Covil Corporation. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000433159] [19-1015] William Silverman [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:03 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 3 APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by William W. Silverman for Covil Corporation. [1000433157] [19-1015] William Silverman [Entered: 01/04/2019 02:02 PM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 2 DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [ # 1 ] case Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00127-LCB-JLW. Mailed to: Benjamin D. Braly, Charles W. Branham III, William Marc Graham, Sabrina G. Stone. [19-1015] JR [Entered: 01/04/2019 08:51 AM]
January 4, 2019 Filing 1 Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:17-cv-00127-LCB-JLW. Case manager: JRice. [19-1015] JR [Entered: 01/04/2019 08:47 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fourth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Darrell Connor v. Covil Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, f/k/a Daniel Construction Company, Inc.
Represented By: Denny Parker Major
Represented By: Scott Edward Frick
Represented By: William David Conner
Represented By: Moffatt Grier McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: COVIL CORPORATION
Represented By: William Walton Silverman
Represented By: Keith E. Coltrain
Represented By: Mark H. Wall
Represented By: Morgan Stuart Templeton Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOULDS PUMPS, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANA COMPANIES, LLC, SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO WARNER BRAKE AND CLUTCH COMPANY, INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FISHER CONTROLS INTERNATIONAL LLC, WHOLLY OWNED SUBSIDIARY OF EMERSON ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNEUMO ABEX, LLC, SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO ABEX CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS CORPORATION, agent of VIACOM, INC., SUED AS SUCCESSOR-BY-MERGER TO CBS F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR CONSTRUCTORS INTERNATIONAL, f/k/a Fluor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARRIER CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINE SAFETY APPLICANCES COMPANY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR ENTERPRISES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLUOR DANIEL SERVICES CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP, INC., INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR TO BYRON JACKSON PUMPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARNER ELECTRIC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLOWSERVE US, INC., individually and as successor to BYRON JACKSON PUMP COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: METROPOLITAN LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPX COOLING TECHNOLOGIES, INC., individually and successor in interest to MARLEY COOLING TOWERS CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS SUCCESSOR-IN-INTEREST TO BUFFALO PUMPS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DARRELL A. CONNOR, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Charles Franklin Connor, Deceased
Represented By: Lisa White Shirley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?